Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 811 Today
» 1652 Yesterday
» 811 Week
» 47649 Month
» 112766 Year
» 3139619 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 76084 on 28/03/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service Sat 28/03/1957 to Lower Darwen (24D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/12/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 10 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
24D   Lower Darwen (New) on 28/03/1957
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 04/10/1958
24G   Skipton w/e 25/10/1958
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 21/02/1959
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 28/03/1959
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 13/03/1965
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/06/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 02/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 24G Skipton 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 1982
Current Status Operational
Information Preserved initially in 1982 after a failed attempt in 1974. Subsequently bought and restored to traffic by the '76084 Locomotive Company Ltd'.
Fully operational and in traffic at the North Norfolk Railway.
Link www.standard4.com/
Current Location North Norfolk Railway
Status Date 23/10/2020


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76084
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Lower Darwen (24D)
   
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
25/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (24G)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76084 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    

prev prev