Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1822 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15228 Week
» 68244 Month
» 187771 Year
» 3214624 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7736 |
m/e |
12/1929 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/08/1959 |
Tredegar MPD |
Following the allocation of 3712, 7736/87, 8711 an 9662 (w.e. 22/8) the former LMS engines are now in store at Newport Pill viz. 40098/161/71, 41201/4. 40091/145, formerly stored at Pontypool Road, have been returned to the LMR and are at Blackpool and Southport. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7736 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23932 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tredegar (86K) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
14/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7736 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|