Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16467 Week
» 69483 Month
» 189010 Year
» 3215863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7751 |
m/e |
12/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
General |
Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7751 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24039 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
19/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7751 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|