Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4892 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20504 Week
» 119149 Month
» 321813 Year
» 3348666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7758 |
m/e |
12/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1930 |
TYS |
|
Tyseley |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
87B |
|
Duffryn Yard |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/06/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7758 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24046 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
20/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7758 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|