Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78014 |
m/e |
02/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
27/01/1963 |
Berkeley Road (Northallerton) |
Berkeley Road south curve (ex-GWR) was permanently closed w.e.f. 27th January, 1963, after being disused since the Severn Bridge disaster. |
SLS/196304 |
04/03/1963 |
Northallerton & Blaydon MPD (Northallerton) |
Northallerton shed (51J) closed on 4th March and its duties and engines (62003/44, 78011/2/4/5) were transferred to Darlington. From 4th March too, Blaydon lost its steam allocation and is now a sub-shed of Gateshead (52A), all its work being taken over by Type 3 diesels which are all treble-shifted. It is expected that Scarborough (50E), Malton (50F) and Heaton (52B) are to be closed with the Summer tt. upon the arrival of further diesels. |
SLS/196304 |
06/05/1963 |
Scottish Region (Northallerton) |
Steam made a rare appearance on the GNS on Monday, 6th May, when a B1 and a standard 4 took from Aberdeen a special train to Lossiemouth from Crewe. Recently this train has run via Dava and the Highland main line. On 19th April the 1-15 p.m. special from Aberdeen to Glasgow was hauled from Perth by Clan Mackenzie. On the 20th April, the 10-03 a.m. ex Waverley to Perth was double-headed by 61076 an 45433. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78014 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78014 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|