Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1621 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25252 Week
» 90206 Month
» 292870 Year
» 3319723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78027 |
m/e |
06/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78027 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78027 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|