Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1028 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18831 Week
» 71847 Month
» 191374 Year
» 3218227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78032 |
m/e |
09/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
6K |
Rhyl |
on |
25/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
5w/e |
07/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
10/07/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78032 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (12D) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78032 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|