Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4577 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23488 Week
» 88442 Month
» 291106 Year
» 3317959 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80012 |
on |
17/08/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80012 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
30/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
24/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
25/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
19/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80012 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|