|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 26/07/1955 | 22/08/1958 | 1124 days | Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1958 | 13/06/1958 | 30 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 28/10/1960 | 19/11/1960 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Ashford Works | 20/12/1961 | 13/01/1962 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1952 | Southern Miscellany | New standard Class '4' 2-6-4Ts for service elsewhere continue to be completed at Brighton and run in from the shed there, including journeys on the evening through train to Tonbridge and back, Nos. 80036-9 being recently noted. New Crewe-built Class '2' 2-6-2Ts numbered 41310-2 allocated to Faversham are the first of the type to operate in East Kent. In addition to Sheerness branch and associated short main line trips they also work to Dover. Nos. 41313-5 commenced running from Brighton to Lewes, Eastbourne, and etc., during June when Nos. 41316-7 were expected soon to be ready as part of the allocation of the last four to Eastbourne which may include duties from St. Leonards. There is an 'E' Class Wainwright 4-4-0 still carrying Southern Railway number preceded by an 's'-s1491 stationed at Redhill at the time of writing. For several days it operated the through Tonbridge-Eastbourne turn in place of the Class '2' Eastbourne L.M.R. tank, also running to Reading and Tonbridge or Ashford. The other two remaining un-rebuilt 'Es' work from Faversham and Gillingham, the latter including duty 225 running from Tonbridge to Redhill, then after an interval to Reading and back. There is also Guildford duty 225 (Western Section) to be found on the Redhill-Reading line, a Drummond L.S.W.R. 4-4-0 turn. 'U' Class 2-6-0s have been noted working through from Andover to Cheltenham, M.S.W. Junction route, also together with S.R. 0-6-0s through Reading to Oxford or Banbury. Two lined black 'E3' 0-6-2Ts really belonging to a Goods Class are Nos. 32166, 32459. On June 7th, the advance portion of the Birkenhead-Hastings train was hauled by Atlantic No. 32422, North Foreland, which made a fast run with nine coaches from Redhill to Brighton (having been to Kensington,. Olympia, in the morning on the up relief routed via High Wycombe); 'L' Class 4-4-0, 31769 Brighton-Eastbourne; standard 2-6-4T, 80017 on to Hastings which worked goods back to Polegate at night. Atlantics will no doubt play a valuable part in haulage of summer trains to and from Brighton and Newhaven again this summer. One sometimes goes up light early on Saturday mornings from Newhaven to haul a relief boat express back from Victoria. Continental freight trains often formed to a considerable extent with braked, dual fitted Italian or similar European waggons are run several times daily each way between Dover and Southwark Depot or other London yard with timings occupying 2½-3 hr. according to route with a service stop, loaded or empty, with not less than one-third fully braked. 'King Arthur' locomotives are often employed. Their maximum load via Tonbridge is 425 tons; with light Pacifics, 500 tons; 'N' Class Mogul, 400 and so on. On account of the severity of grading, loads are reduced if Chatham or Maidstone (East) routes used. A light Pacific has been turned at Eastbourne Shed though only with difficulty. |
SLS/195208 |
02/06/1958 | Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) | Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. | SLS/195806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/05/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 80036 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Watford (1C) |
||
26/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/07/1955. Dep: 22/08/1958. | ||
15/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1958. Dep: 13/06/1958. | ||
31/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (73F) | ||
28/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. | ||
20/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1961. Dep: 13/01/1962. | ||
28/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
06/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 80036 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |