|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 17/08/1955 | 08/09/1955 | 23 days | Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 19/09/1955 | 29/09/1955 | 11 days | Not Classified | Hot box |
||
Derby Works | 22/10/1957 | 04/12/1957 | 44 days | Heavy General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 25/02/1960 | 19/03/1960 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water scoop gear removed |
||
Ashford Works | 02/05/1961 | 27/05/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 09/10/1961 | 21/10/1961 | 13 days | Not Classified | |||
Exmouth Junction (on shed) | 03/01/1963 | 05/02/1963 | 34 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1960 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. | SLS/196004 |
07/09/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/07/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 80042 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Bletchley (1E) |
||
17/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1955. Dep: 08/09/1955. | ||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955. Work undertaken: Hot box |
||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 04/12/1957. | ||
31/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (73F) | ||
25/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/02/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960. Work undertaken: Water scoop gear removed |
||
02/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Ashford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961. | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) | ||
09/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 09/10/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961. | ||
02/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
03/01/1963 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Exmouth Junction (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1963. Dep: 05/02/1963. | ||
06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 80042 | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend |