Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 632 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19543 Week
» 84497 Month
» 287161 Year
» 3314014 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80053 |
on |
22/12/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80053 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
07/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80053 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|