Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3770 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17176 Week
» 70192 Month
» 189719 Year
» 3216572 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80068 |
on |
21/08/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
1C |
Watford |
w/e |
22/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
91S |
To Southern Region |
5w/e |
02/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
29/12/1963 |
TOSTORE |
70B |
Feltham |
P |
06/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80068 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80068 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|