Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 845 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18648 Week
» 71664 Month
» 191191 Year
» 3218044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80089 |
on |
03/08/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Waiting works) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80089 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
30/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80089 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|