Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3354 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16760 Week
» 69776 Month
» 189303 Year
» 3216156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80123 |
on |
09/09/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
on |
09/09/1955 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
9w/e |
12/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80123 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
17/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80123 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane |
|
|