Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 5174 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20786 Week
» 119431 Month
» 322095 Year
» 3348948 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80126 |
on |
20/10/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
63A |
|
Perth South (New) |
on |
20/10/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/11/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
63A |
Perth South |
on |
20/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/09/1963 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. |
SLS/196310 |
10/10/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. |
SLS/196311 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80126 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80126 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|