Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2643 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16049 Week
» 69065 Month
» 188592 Year
» 3215445 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80132 |
on |
15/03/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80132 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
15/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89D) |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80132 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: at Eastleigh Depot |
|
|