Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 610 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18413 Week
» 71429 Month
» 190956 Year
» 3217809 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80133 |
on |
28/03/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80133 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C) |
|
|
15/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
09/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80133 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Risca |
|
|