Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17235 Week
» 70251 Month
» 189778 Year
» 3216631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8720 |
m/e |
03/1931 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/01/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Works) |
In Works: 1013/24, 1656/64, 2855, 3628(86G), 3788, 4136, 5244(86B), 6357(87C), 6692, 6975(87A), 7213, 7443, 7824, 8405/37/64, 8720, 9612/69, 9724. In Yard: 2257, 6915/6(89A), 9768. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8720 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6700 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
28/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8720 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|