Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3960 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17366 Week
» 70382 Month
» 189909 Year
» 3216762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
1213 |
y/e |
1902 |
Great Western Railway |
9 |
on |
30/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
VR |
Company History |
VofR/GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1902 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1902 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
VoR |
|
on |
01/04/1969 |
TOSTORE |
6F |
Machynlleth |
on |
06/10/1969 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
on |
10/10/1969 |
REINS |
89CVOR |
|
on |
19/03/1970 |
TOSTORE |
6F |
Machynlleth |
on |
30/09/1970 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1213 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
30/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9 |
|
|