Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 405 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4877 Week
» 23778 Month
» 23778 Year
» 1689154 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92134 on 30/06/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 30/06/1957 to Saltley (21A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/12/1966
Service Life 9 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
21A Saltley (New) on 30/06/1957
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 28/12/1957
15A Leicester Midland w/e 15/02/1964
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/04/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 09/12/1980
Current Status Under Restoration/Overhaul
Information Sole surviving single-chimney 9F. Currently under restoration at The Railway Age in Crewe.
Link www.cvr-extra.wanadoo.co.uk/92134.htm
Status Date 23/06/2011


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92134
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Saltley (21A)
   
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 92134    

prev prev