09/07/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. |
SLS/194908 |
27/08/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. |
SLS/194910 |
31/12/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. |
SLS/195002 |
05/03/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. |
SLS/196104 |
21/08/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) |
New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. |
SLS/196309 |