Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
867 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
70867 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90339 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1944 |
51C |
|
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/07/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. |
SLS/194805 |
13/08/1967 |
West Hartlepool MPD |
The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 867 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24937 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70867 |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90339 |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
01/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90339 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|