Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 104 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17907 Week
» 70923 Month
» 190450 Year
» 3217303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7007 |
m/e |
02/1943 |
War Dept. |
77007 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90107 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. |
SLS/194710 |
30/06/1949 |
Brighton Works |
No. 36001, the first of the 'Leader' Class (0-6-6-0T) was outside the Works for the first time, in steam, on 21/6. The top casing was grey and the underframes and casings black. It is understood that this Class and also the new 'Battle of Britain' batch (34091 upwards) will normally be finished in lined black as for mixed traffic engines. The latest 2-8-0 repaired and re-numbered is No. 90718 (ex 79281). No. 2039 Hartland Point is in the repair shop, but its fate is uncertain: it is believed that the boiler is about worn out. Other engines recently shopped are Nos. 32488 (ex S2488), 90107 (ex 77007), 90678 (ex 79210), 32083 (plain black-so far), 90226 (ex 77311), 32536. 32576. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7007 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24978 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77007 |
|
|
07/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Brighton (BTN) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (RED) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90107 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
16/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90107 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|