|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) | Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. | SLS/196504 |
04/04/1965 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. | SLS/196505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7022 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24993 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77022 | ||
02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90119 | ||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
16/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
25/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
17/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90119 | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |