Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 646 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14052 Week
» 67068 Month
» 186595 Year
» 3213448 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7207 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77207 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90183 |
m/e |
12/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7207 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25078 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77207 |
|
|
12/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90183 |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
29/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90183 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|