Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2008 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19811 Week
» 72827 Month
» 192354 Year
» 3219207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7208 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77208 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90184 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7208 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25079 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77208 |
|
|
14/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90184 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
05/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90184 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |
|
|