Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 950 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18753 Week
» 71769 Month
» 191296 Year
» 3218149 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7210 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77210 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90186 |
on |
18/02/1949 (at Scotswood) |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1943 |
NA |
|
Newton Abbot |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
25C |
|
Goole |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7210 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25081 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77210 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
18/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90186 |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
22/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90186 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|