Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7297 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
War Dept. |
77297 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90361 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/09/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Shed) |
On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. |
SLS/196410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7297 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24968 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77297 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90361 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
30/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
24/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90361 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|