Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1098 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24729 Week
» 89683 Month
» 292347 Year
» 3319200 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7298 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
War Dept. |
77298 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3082 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63082 |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90082 |
on |
17/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7298 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24969 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77298 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3082 |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63082 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
17/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90082 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
24/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90082 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|