17/08/1947 |
Stratton Park |
The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. |
SLS/194709 |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. |
SLS/194711 |
28/02/1951 |
Western Region WD\'s |
So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). |
SLS/195104 |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
04/02/1962 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. |
SLS/196203 |