Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 854 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18657 Week
» 71673 Month
» 191200 Year
» 3218053 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7391 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77391 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3032 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63032 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90032 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
18/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
08/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/03/1949 |
Blaydon MPD |
On 19/3 the following Class '8' 2-8-0 W.D. locomotives were noted: No. 90032, fitted with Gresley type snifting valve, while Nos. 90363, 90652/82/94 were all fitted with G.W.R. type top feed. 'W.D. 2-8-0' was painted in white on the buffer beam. |
SLS/194905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7391 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25261 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77391 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3032 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63032 but not taken up |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90032 |
|
|
08/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
27/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90032 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|