|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Location | Report | Headcode | Reference |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport | On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. | Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/08/1947 | Stratton Park | The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. | SLS/194709 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7399 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25269 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77399 | ||
05/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90278 | ||
01/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (27B) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90278 | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich |