Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1063 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14469 Week
» 67485 Month
» 187012 Year
» 3213865 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78528 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3090 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63090 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90090 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
31/03/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78528 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25426 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3090 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63090 but not taken up |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90090 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
30/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90090 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|