Name | Date of Birth | Date of Death | Role | Company | From | To | Loco Classes | Bio |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peppercorn, Arthur Henry | 29/01/1889 | 03/03/1951 | CME | LNER | 01/07/1946 | 31/12/1947 | LNER A2 4-6-2 (1947) LNER A1 4-6-2 (1948) LNER K1 2-6-0 (1949) |
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
![]() |
» 11 Online » 60 Today » 1521 Yesterday » 60 Week » 5404 Month » 575333 Year » 2975797 Total |
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023) (Free MySQL Counter) |
Name | Date of Birth | Date of Death | Role | Company | From | To | Loco Classes | Bio |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peppercorn, Arthur Henry | 29/01/1889 | 03/03/1951 | CME | LNER | 01/07/1946 | 31/12/1947 | LNER A2 4-6-2 (1947) LNER A1 4-6-2 (1948) LNER K1 2-6-0 (1949) |