Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 417 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11343 Week
» 104577 Month
» 564518 Year
» 5003955 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Chief Mechanical Engineers
Name Date of Birth Date of Death Role Company From To Loco Classes Bio
Wainwright, Harry Smith 16/11/1864 19/09/1925 CME SECR 27/09/1898 30/11/1913 SECR F1 4-4-0 'Jumbos' (1886)
SECR C 0-6-0 (1900)
SECR G 4-4-0 (1900)
SECR R1 0-4-4T (1900)
SECR S 0-6-0ST (1900)
SECR E 4-4-0 (1906)
SECR P 0-6-0T (1909)