Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 413 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11339 Week
» 104573 Month
» 564514 Year
» 5003951 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Chief Mechanical Engineers
Name Date of Birth Date of Death Role Company From To Loco Classes Bio
Barton Wright, William 13/11/1828 07/05/1915 CME LYR 01/11/1875 23/06/1886 LYR 568 0-6-0 (1876)
LYR 141 0-6-2T (1880)
LYR 629 4-4-0 (1880)
LYR 243 0-6-2T (1881)
LYR 209 4-4-0 (1887)
Link