Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 27 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 27 Week
» 18079 Month
» 250999 Year
» 1916375 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Ashford Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
SER O 0-6-0 314   08/1882 01/1914
SER O 0-6-0 315   08/1882 08/1908
SER O 0-6-0 316   09/1882 09/1951
SER O 0-6-0 317   09/1882 12/1906
SER O 0-6-0 318   10/1882 06/1912
SER O 0-6-0 119   05/1883 03/1925
SER O 0-6-0 120   05/1883 03/1910
SER O 0-6-0 121   06/1883 06/1912
SER O 0-6-0 122   06/1883 12/1911
SER O 0-6-0 55   11/1884 06/1910
SER O 0-6-0 171   11/1884 06/1923
SER O 0-6-0 131   11/1884 12/1912
SER O 0-6-0 207   12/1884 01/1913
SER O 0-6-0 299   12/1884 04/1910
SER O 0-6-0 300   12/1884 04/1914
SER O 0-6-0 301   12/1884 10/1911
SER O 0-6-0 331   02/1886 10/1913
SER O 0-6-0 332   03/1886 12/1923
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1002   11/1886 06/1948
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1078   12/1886 03/1949
SER O 0-6-0 333   07/1887 11/1926
SER O 0-6-0 334   07/1887 04/1913
SR R1 0-6-0T 1335   06/1888 02/07/1955
SR R1 0-6-0T 1337   06/1888 02/1960
SR R1 0-6-0T 1339   02/1889 14/06/1958
SR R1 0-6-0T 1340   03/1889 02/1959
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1028   12/1889 05/1948
SER O 0-6-0 1   06/1890 06/1925
SER O 0-6-0 15   06/1890 04/1925
SER O 0-6-0 144   07/1890 09/1925
SR R1 0-6-0T 1147   11/1890 09/1958
SR R1 0-6-0T 1010   12/1890 08/08/1959
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1215   10/1891 05/1948
SR R1 0-6-0T 1154   07/1892 09/1955
SR R1 0-6-0T 1128   10/1892 08/08/1959
SR R1 0-6-0T 1174   10/1892 08/08/1959
SER O 0-6-0 14   06/1893 06/1948
SER O 0-6-0 41   06/1893 05/1951
SER O 0-6-0 238   06/1893 07/1949
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1231   10/1893 03/1949
SER O 0-6-0 48   12/1893 15/10/1960
SER O 0-6-0 167   12/1893 01/1928
SER O 0-6-0 170   12/1893 09/1927
SER O 0-6-0 106   05/1894 01/1949
SER O 0-6-0 258   05/1894 06/1949
SER O 0-6-0 46   06/1894 10/1948
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1031   09/1894 05/1948
SR R1 0-6-0T 1047   08/1895 03/1960
SR R1 0-6-0T 1127   08/1895 01/1949
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1042   03/1896 02/1948
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1105   03/1896 02/1949
SER O 0-6-0 3   05/1896 01/1949
SER O 0-6-0 109   05/1896 01/1949
SER O 0-6-0 123   05/1896 01/1950
SER O 0-6-0 248   05/1896 06/1951
SER O 0-6-0 96   08/1896 08/1926
SER O 0-6-0 111   08/1896 11/1929
SER O 0-6-0 65   09/1896 24/06/1961
SER O 0-6-0 142   09/1896 09/1926
SER O 0-6-0 52   10/1896 10/1927
SER O 0-6-0 64   11/1896 24/05/1958
SER O 0-6-0 251   11/1896 02/1961
SER O 0-6-0 39   06/1897 08/1949
SER O 0-6-0 66   06/1897 06/1951
SER O 0-6-0 80   06/1897 08/1949
SER O 0-6-0 108   06/1897 07/1951
SER O 0-6-0 93   11/1897 05/1951
SR R1 0-6-0T 1069   06/1898 07/06/1958
SR R1 0-6-0T 1107   06/1898 08/08/1959
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1013   10/1898 09/1948
SR Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1217   10/1898 06/1950
SER O 0-6-0 44   12/1898 06/1951
SER O 0-6-0 49   12/1898 02/1929
SER O 0-6-0 51   12/1898 08/1948
SER O 0-6-0 254   12/1898 10/1925
SER O 0-6-0 7   08/1899 05/1949
SER O 0-6-0 8   09/1899 08/1928
SER O 0-6-0 98   09/1899 10/1929
SER O 0-6-0 99   09/1899 05/1927
SER O 0-6-0 100   09/1899 08/1926
SR Jumbos 4-4-0 1151   10/1899 12/03/1949
SR C 0-6-0 1229   01/1900 10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1255   06/1900 30/09/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1256   06/1900 29/07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1257   06/1900 08/1949
SR C 0-6-0 1063   07/1900 04/1956
SR C 0-6-0 1191   07/1900 09/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1086   09/1900 22/10/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1102   09/1900 05/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1112   09/1900 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1018   10/1900 10/01/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1033   10/1900 19/03/1960
SR R1 0-4-4T 1696   11/1900 03/03/1951
SR R1 0-4-4T 1697   11/1900 03/1953
SR R1 0-4-4T 1698   11/1900 15/10/1955
SR R1 0-4-4T 1699   11/1900 01/1950
SR R1 0-4-4T 1700   11/1900 10/1952
SR R1 0-4-4T 1703   11/1900 03/1954
SR R1 0-4-4T 1704   11/1900 14/04/1956
SR R1 0-4-4T 1705   11/1900 09/06/1951
SR C 0-6-0 1218   12/1900 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1219   12/1900 10/10/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1225   12/1900 04/06/1955
SR C 0-6-0 1227   12/1900 24/10/1959
SR R1 0-4-4T 1706   12/1900 12/1952
SR R1 0-4-4T 1707   12/1900 02/1949
SR R1 0-4-4T 1708   12/1900 11/10/1952
SR R1 0-4-4T 1709   12/1900 10/1949
SR R1 0-4-4T 1710   12/1900 06/1951
SR D1 4-4-0 1739   02/1901 11/11/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1037   03/1901 25/02/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1054   03/1901 20/08/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1221   03/1901 15/08/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1223   03/1901 14/05/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1234   04/1901 08/08/1953
SR C 0-6-0 1004   07/1901 11/11/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1038   07/1901 03/1954
SR C 0-6-0 1061   07/1901 29/07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1071   07/1901 09/1959
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1737   11/1901 10/1956
SR D1 4-4-0 1736   12/1901 30/12/1950
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1738   12/1901 10/1950
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1740   12/1901 03/03/1951
SR C 0-6-0 1113   03/1902 15/07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1242   04/1902 30/09/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1243   04/1902 10/10/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1244   04/1902 21/10/1961
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1057   06/1902 07/04/1951
SR D1 4-4-0 1246   06/1902 11/03/1961
SR D1 4-4-0 1487   07/1902 25/02/1961
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1488   07/1902 04/02/1956
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1490   08/1902 09/1951
SR C 0-6-0 1059   11/1902 22/02/1958
SR C 0-6-0 1150   11/1902 21/10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1245   12/1902 08/08/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1252   12/1902 07/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1068   01/1903 10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1090   01/1903 08/08/1953
SR C 0-6-0 1253   01/1903 17/10/1959
SR D1 4-4-0 1247   04/1903 22/07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1576   05/1903 07/11/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1581   05/1903 12/03/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1582   06/1903 07/06/1958
SR C 0-6-0 1584   06/1903 17/02/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1585   06/1903 14/02/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1572   09/1903 03/1954
SR C 0-6-0 1573   09/1903 18/11/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1575   09/1903 22/07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1578   10/1903 24/06/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1579   10/1903 07/10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1267   01/1904 30/06/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1268   02/1904 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1272   02/1904 08/08/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1277   02/1904 09/1955
SR C 0-6-0 1270   06/1904 20/06/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1495   06/1904 11/03/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1498   06/1904 29/07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1508   07/1904 28/09/1957
SR C 0-6-0 1510   07/1904 30/06/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1260   08/1904 05/1953
SR H 0-4-4T 1540   11/1904 27/02/1960
SR H 0-4-4T 1541   11/1904 07/04/1951
SR H 0-4-4T 1542   11/1904 17/11/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1544   11/1904 15/09/1963
SR H 0-4-4T 1546   11/1904 02/1951
SR H 0-4-4T 1550   11/1904 25/02/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1271   12/1904 07/1963
SR H 0-4-4T 1548   12/1904 08/08/1959
SR H 0-4-4T 1551   01/1905 05/01/1964
SR H 0-4-4T 1552   01/1905 11/11/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1553   02/1905 06/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1263   05/1905 05/01/1964
SR H 0-4-4T 1265   05/1905 06/08/1960
SR H 0-4-4T 1266   05/1905 01/10/1960
SR H 0-4-4T 1274   06/1905 11/1957
SR H 0-4-4T 1276   06/1905 25/02/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1278   07/1905 06/10/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1530   07/1905 24/03/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1531   07/1905 04/1955
SR H 0-4-4T 1532   07/1905 03/03/1951
SR H 0-4-4T 1533   07/1905 15/09/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1259   11/1905 11/1959
SR H 0-4-4T 1261   11/1905 07/10/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1269   11/1905 12/12/1959
SR H 0-4-4T 1500   11/1905 10/06/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1503   12/1905 08/08/1959
SR E1A 4-4-0 1504   12/1905 15/02/1958
SR E1A 4-4-0 1506   12/1905 09/1958
SR E1A 4-4-0 1511   12/1905 30/12/1950
SR E 4-4-0 1273   02/1906 12/1951
SR E 4-4-0 1275   02/1906 03/1951
SR H 0-4-4T 1305   05/1906 17/11/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1306   05/1906 30/12/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1308   06/1906 23/12/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1309   06/1906 06/1955
SR H 0-4-4T 1310   06/1906 05/1960
SR D1 4-4-0 1470   08/1906 06/1959
SR D1 4-4-0 1545   09/1906 11/03/1961
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1549   09/1906 20/10/1956
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1577   09/1906 08/12/1956
SR H 0-4-4T 1307   12/1906 26/08/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1321   12/1906 11/1957
SR H 0-4-4T 1326   12/1906 10/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1328   12/1906 25/02/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1329   12/1906 14/11/1959
SR D1 4-4-0 1505   02/1907 30/09/1961
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1574   02/1907 06/10/1956
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1586   02/1907 09/1955
SR E 4-4-0 1587   02/1907 28/07/1951
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1477   03/1907 02/1951
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1496   03/1907 09/1955
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1591   03/1907 06/1955
SR H 0-4-4T 1005   05/1907 15/09/1963
SR H 0-4-4T 1311   05/1907 06/11/1954
SR H 0-4-4T 1320   05/1907 17/12/1955
SR H 0-4-4T 1324   05/1907 28/07/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1327   06/1907 07/11/1959
SR E1A 4-4-0 1160   07/1907 02/1951
SR E 4-4-0 1166   07/1907 21/05/1955
SR E 4-4-0 1491   07/1907 02/1953
SR E1A 4-4-0 1497   09/1907 22/10/1960
SR E 4-4-0 1515   09/1907 21/07/1951
SR E 4-4-0 1157   12/1907 03/1951
SR E1A 4-4-0 1165   12/1907 02/05/1959
SR E 4-4-0 1176   12/1907 10/1951
SR E 4-4-0 1514   12/1907 12/1951
SR C 0-6-0 1280   02/1908 07/1963
SR C 0-6-0 1291   02/1908 05/1953
SR C 0-6-0 1298   03/1908 11/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1317   03/1908 24/02/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1588   03/1908 23/06/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1589   03/1908 11/11/1961
SR E 4-4-0 1516   04/1908 06/10/1951
SR C 0-6-0 1287   05/1908 08/10/1960
SR C 0-6-0 1293   06/1908 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1294   06/1908 10/1955
SR C 0-6-0 1297   06/1908 12/09/1959
SR C 0-6-0 1513   06/1908 03/1955
SR E1A 4-4-0 1019   07/1908 29/04/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1590   07/1908 11/02/1961
SR E1A 4-4-0 1067   08/1908 11/11/1961
SR E 4-4-0 1175   08/1908 10/1951
SR E1A 4-4-0 1507   09/1908 22/07/1961
SR D1 4-4-0 1509   09/1908 07/05/1960
SR E 4-4-0 1547   09/1908 02/1951
SR E 4-4-0 1159   11/1908 12/1951
SR E1A 4-4-0 1179   11/1908 10/1950
SR E 4-4-0 1036   12/1908 10/03/1951
SR H 0-4-4T 1512   01/1909 10/06/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1517   01/1909 05/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1543   01/1909 07/07/1963
SR H 0-4-4T 1164   02/1909 24/10/1959
SR P 0-6-0T 1556   02/1909 24/06/1961
SR P 0-6-0T 1557   02/1909 21/09/1957
SR H 0-4-4T 1162   03/1909 07/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1177   03/1909 07/10/1961
SR E1A 4-4-0 1163   04/1909 05/1949
SR E 4-4-0 1315   04/1909 20/03/1954
SR H 0-4-4T 1161   06/1909 11/11/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1182   06/1909 07/07/1951
SR H 0-4-4T 1322   06/1909 22/04/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1520   06/1909 08/1960
SR H 0-4-4T 1518   07/1909 05/01/1964
SR H 0-4-4T 1519   07/1909 02/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1521   08/1909 19/05/1962
SR H 0-4-4T 1522   08/1909 27/01/1963
SR H 0-4-4T 1523   09/1909 10/01/1959
SR H 0-4-4T 1239   11/1909 09/01/1960
SR H 0-4-4T 1279   11/1909 09/1959
SR H 0-4-4T 1158   12/1909 16/04/1955
SR H 0-4-4T 1193   12/1909 25/03/1961
SR H 0-4-4T 1295   12/1909 30/05/1959
SR H 0-4-4T 1319   12/1909 30/01/1960
SR H 0-4-4T 1554   12/1909 30/05/1959
SR P 0-6-0T 1027   02/1910 25/03/1961
SR P 0-6-0T 1178   02/1910 07/06/1958
SR P 0-6-0T 1555   06/1910 05/02/1955
SR P 0-6-0T 1558   06/1910 06/02/1960
SR P 0-6-0T 1323   07/1910 09/07/1960
SR P 0-6-0T 1325   07/1910 19/03/1960
SR J 0-6-4T 129   10/1913 05/1951
SR J 0-6-4T 207   10/1913 10/1951
SR J 0-6-4T 597   11/1913 11/1950
SR J 0-6-4T 611   11/1913 12/1950
SR J 0-6-4T 614   12/1913 29/10/1949
SR H 0-4-4T 1184   04/1915 08/03/1958
SR H 0-4-4T 1016   07/1915 07/07/1951
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1810   06/1917 29/03/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1811   06/1920 04/07/1965
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1812   08/1920 24/07/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1813   09/1920 20/10/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1814   11/1920 26/07/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1815   12/1920 26/05/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1816   01/1922 09/01/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1817   01/1922 12/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1818   03/1922 01/09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1819   05/1922 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1820   08/1922 09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1821   10/1922 14/05/1964
SR N1 2-6-0 1876   03/1923 17/11/1962
SR N1 2-6-0 1822   05/1923 17/11/1962
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1823   08/1923 15/09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1824   12/1923 20/10/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1826   05/1924 09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1825   06/1924 09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1827   06/1924 14/06/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1829   06/1924 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1830   06/1924 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1828   07/1924 06/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1831   07/1924 25/04/1965
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1832   07/1924 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1833   07/1924 23/02/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1834   07/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1835   07/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1836   07/1924 28/12/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1837   07/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1838   07/1924 14/02/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1839   08/1924 28/12/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1840   08/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1841   08/1924 20/03/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1842   08/1924 05/09/1965
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1843   08/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1844   08/1924 28/12/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1845   09/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1846   09/1924 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1847   01/1925 05/10/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1848   02/1925 14/02/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1849   02/1925 13/07/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1850   02/1925 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1851   02/1925 09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1852   03/1925 15/09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1854   03/1925 15/06/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1855   03/1925 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1856   03/1925 13/07/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1853   04/1925 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1857   04/1925 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1859   04/1925 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1860   04/1925 02/11/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1858   05/1925 26/12/1965
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1862   05/1925 11/04/1965
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1863   05/1925 07/07/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1866   05/1925 09/01/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1861   06/1925 05/05/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1864   06/1925 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1865   06/1925 09/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1867   06/1925 07/07/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1868   07/1925 05/01/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1869   07/1925 02/08/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1870   07/1925 05/04/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1871   07/1925 11/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1872   08/1925 26/05/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1875   08/1925 10/08/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1873   09/1925 23/01/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1874   09/1925 17/03/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1805   03/1928 03/08/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1890   06/1928 30/06/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1797   07/1928 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1799   07/1928 07/02/1965
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1801   07/1928 14/06/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1802   07/1928 07/09/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1798   08/1928 07/09/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1620   11/1928 04/04/1965
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1621   12/1928 14/06/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1800   12/1928 03/10/1965
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1622   01/1929 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1623   01/1929 01/12/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1624   02/1929 14/06/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1625   03/1929 12/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1626   03/1929 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1627   04/1929 03/10/1965
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1628   04/1929 14/06/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1629   12/1929 05/01/1964
SR N1 2-6-0 1877   04/1930 17/11/1962
SR N1 2-6-0 1878   04/1930 17/11/1962
SR N1 2-6-0 1879   04/1930 17/11/1962
SR N1 2-6-0 1880   11/1930 17/11/1962
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1630   02/1931 17/11/1962
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1631   03/1931 29/09/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1632   03/1931 07/09/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1633   03/1931 22/12/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1634   04/1931 29/12/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1635   04/1931 01/12/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1636   04/1931 09/06/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1637   05/1931 21/09/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1638   05/1931 12/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1639   05/1931 05/06/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1400   07/1932 14/06/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1401   08/1932 18/07/1965
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1402   08/1932 25/08/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1403   08/1932 30/06/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1407   08/1932 07/07/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1404   10/1932 01/12/1963
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1405   11/1932 05/06/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1406   01/1933 07/09/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1408   09/1933 05/06/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1409   10/1933 17/11/1962
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1410   11/1933 01/11/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1411   11/1933 24/04/1966
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1412   12/1933 09/08/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1413   01/1934 14/06/1964
SR Mongolipers 2-6-0 1414   01/1934 24/11/1962
SR W 2-6-4T 1916   04/1935 20/07/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1917   04/1935 05/01/1964
SR W 2-6-4T 1918   06/1935 25/08/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1919   07/1935 10/11/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1920   08/1935 07/07/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1921   10/1935 23/06/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1922   11/1935 25/08/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1923   01/1936 02/02/1963
SR W 2-6-4T 1924   02/1936 26/07/1964
SR W 2-6-4T 1925   04/1936 03/11/1963
  D3/12 0-6-0 1   30/09/1937 29/11/1964
  D3/12 0-6-0 2   30/09/1937 13/12/1964
  D3/12 0-6-0 3   31/10/1937 29/11/1964
  70 C-C CC1   26/07/1941 01/1969
SR Q1 0-6-0 C18   04/1942 04/07/1965
SR Q1 0-6-0 C17   05/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C19   05/1942 01/12/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C20   05/1942 09/01/1966
SR Q1 0-6-0 C21   05/1942 18/08/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C22   06/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C23   06/1942 14/06/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C24   06/1942 25/08/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C25   07/1942 07/07/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C26   07/1942 26/09/1965
SR Q1 0-6-0 C27   07/1942 09/01/1966
SR Q1 0-6-0 C28   08/1942 03/02/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C29   09/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C30   09/1942 14/06/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C31   10/1942 29/09/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C32   10/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C33   11/1942 14/06/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C34   11/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C35   11/1942 14/06/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C36   12/1942 28/06/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8610   04/1943 07/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8611   05/1943 05/12/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8612   07/1943 29/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8618   09/1943 23/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8619   10/1943 26/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8620   11/1943 29/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8621   11/1943 30/07/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8622   11/1943 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8623   12/1943 08/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8624   12/1943 24/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8671   12/1943 05/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8672   01/1944 12/11/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8674   03/1944 23/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8673   05/1944 04/11/1967
  70 C-C CC2   09/1945 12/1968
  12 0-6-0 15211   02/04/1949 31/12/1971
  12 0-6-0 15212   09/04/1949 31/12/1971
  12 0-6-0 15213   16/04/1949 03/11/1968
  12 0-6-0 15214   07/05/1949 10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15215   07/05/1949 03/1968
  12 0-6-0 15216   04/06/1949 28/04/1969
  12 0-6-0 15217   18/06/1949 08/1970
  12 0-6-0 15218   02/07/1949 31/01/1970
  12 0-6-0 15219   09/07/1949 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15220   23/07/1949 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15221   20/08/1949 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15222   03/09/1949 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15223   01/10/1949 09/06/1969
  12 0-6-0 15224   22/10/1949 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15225   09/11/1949 31/10/1971
  BULL1 0-6-0 11001   01/02/1950 08/08/1959
  D16/2 1Co-Co1 10201   30/12/1950 07/12/1963
  12 0-6-0 15226   30/12/1950 28/04/1969
  12 0-6-0 15227   03/02/1951 30/04/1970
  12 0-6-0 15228   28/04/1951 06/01/1969
  12 0-6-0 15229   28/07/1951 31/10/1971
  D16/2 1Co-Co1 10202   15/09/1951 07/12/1963
  12 0-6-0 15230   22/09/1951 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15231   20/10/1951 31/10/1971
  12 0-6-0 15232   10/11/1951 30/04/1971
  12 0-6-0 15233   24/11/1951 07/05/1969
  12 0-6-0 15234   01/12/1951 22/12/1968
  12 0-6-0 15235   15/12/1951 31/05/1971
  12 0-6-0 15236   19/01/1952 22/12/1968