Manufacturer: Armstrong Whitworth
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2253 | E4 | 1 | 11/1919 | 05/06/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2254 | E4 | 2 | 12/1919 | 06/04/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2255 | E4 | 3 | 12/1919 | 11/07/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2262 | E4 | 10 | 02/1920 | 07/06/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2256 | E4 | 4 | 02/1920 | 23/01/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2257 | E4 | 5 | 02/1920 | 17/05/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2258 | E4 | 6 | 02/1920 | 15/04/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2259 | E4 | 7 | 02/1920 | 15/07/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2260 | E4 | 8 | 02/1920 | 13/02/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2261 | E4 | 9 | 02/1920 | 15/07/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2263 | E4 | 11 | 03/1920 | 05/02/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2264 | E4 | 12 | 03/1920 | 05/06/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2265 | E4 | 13 | 03/1920 | 18/05/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2266 | E4 | 14 | 03/1920 | 16/11/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2267 | E4 | 15 | 03/1920 | 13/01/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2268 | E4 | 16 | 03/1920 | 15/04/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2269 | E4 | 17 | 04/1920 | 22/06/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2270 | E4 | 18 | 04/1920 | 14/06/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2271 | E4 | 19 | 04/1920 | 29/04/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2272 | E4 | 20 | 05/1920 | 01/07/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2273 | E4 | 21 | 05/1920 | 29/04/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2274 | E4 | 22 | 05/1920 | 07/08/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2275 | E4 | 23 | 05/1920 | 17/05/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2276 | E4 | 24 | 05/1920 | 30/09/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2277 | E4 | 25 | 05/1920 | 25/09/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2278 | E4 | 26 | 05/1920 | 05/06/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2279 | E4 | 27 | 06/1920 | 24/04/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2280 | E4 | 28 | 06/1920 | 05/06/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2281 | E4 | 29 | 06/1920 | 12/11/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2282 | E4 | 30 | 06/1920 | 07/04/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2283 | E4 | 31 | 06/1920 | 31/12/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2284 | E4 | 32 | 07/1920 | 23/12/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2285 | E4 | 33 | 07/1920 | 15/07/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2286 | E4 | 34 | 07/1920 | 18/10/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2287 | E4 | 35 | 08/1920 | 17/05/1965 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2288 | E4 | 36 | 09/1920 | 26/06/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2289 | E4 | 37 | 09/1920 | 05/06/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2290 | E4 | 38 | 10/1920 | 29/04/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2291 | E4 | 39 | 10/1920 | 08/11/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2292 | E4 | 40 | 10/1920 | 15/07/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2293 | E4 | 41 | 11/1920 | 31/12/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2294 | E4 | 42 | 11/1920 | 01/01/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2295 | E4 | 43 | 11/1920 | 29/04/1963 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2296 | E4 | 44 | 12/1920 | 02/10/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2297 | E4 | 45 | 12/1920 | 05/06/1966 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2298 | E4 | 46 | 12/1920 | 22/06/1967 |
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3937 | 1921 | 20/07/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3938 | 1921 | 07/04/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3939 | 1921 | 13/06/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3940 | 1921 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3941 | 1921 | 07/09/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3942 | 1921 | 28/12/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3943 | 1921 | 29/09/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3944 | 1921 | 15/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3945 | 1921 | 06/04/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3946 | 1921 | 07/02/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3947 | 1921 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3948 | 1921 | 08/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3949 | 1921 | 26/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3950 | 1921 | 16/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3951 | 1921 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3952 | 1921 | 20/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3953 | 1921 | 06/11/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3954 | 1921 | 21/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3955 | 1921 | 04/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3956 | 1921 | 12/05/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3957 | 1921 | 02/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3958 | 1921 | 05/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3959 | 1921 | 05/01/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3960 | 1921 | 14/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3961 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3962 | 1921 | 20/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3963 | 1921 | 21/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3964 | 1921 | 11/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3965 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | ||
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2299 | E4 | 47 | 01/1921 | 15/12/1964 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2300 | E4 | 48 | 01/1921 | 18/12/1961 |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 82 | 111 | 02/1921 | 29/03/1961 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 83 | 112 | 03/1921 | 02/02/1961 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 84 | 113 | 03/1921 | 04/12/1961 | |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2301 | E4 | 49 | 03/1921 | 01/07/1967 |
NER | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2302 | E4 | 50 | 03/1921 | 30/10/1966 |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 85 | 114 | 04/1921 | 27/05/1960 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 86 | 115 | 04/1921 | 04/12/1961 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 87 | 116 | 04/1921 | 27/11/1961 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 88 | 117 | 05/1921 | 27/11/1961 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 89 | 118 | 05/1921 | 24/08/1960 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 90 | 119 | 06/1921 | 12/03/1962 | |
CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 91 | 120 | 06/1921 | 20/10/1959 | |
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3966 | 12/1921 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3968 | 1922 | 11/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3969 | 1922 | 14/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3970 | 1922 | 14/02/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3971 | 1922 | 28/03/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3972 | 1922 | 14/03/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3973 | 1922 | 09/07/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3974 | 1922 | 14/07/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3975 | 1922 | 16/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3976 | 1922 | 11/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3977 | 1922 | 09/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3978 | 1922 | 18/01/1958 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3979 | 1922 | 14/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3980 | 1922 | 06/07/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3981 | 1922 | 07/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3982 | 1922 | 26/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3983 | 1922 | 09/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3984 | 1922 | 17/01/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3985 | 1922 | 31/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3986 | 1922 | 22/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3967 | 01/1922 | 28/08/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4560 | 04/1922 | 25/08/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4557 | 04/1922 | 15/09/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4558 | 04/1922 | 14/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4559 | 04/1922 | 11/01/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4561 | 04/1922 | 05/04/1962 | ||
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2313 | 391 | 04/1922 | 26/09/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2314 | 392 | 04/1922 | 21/08/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2315 | 393 | 04/1922 | 29/02/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2316 | 394 | 04/1922 | 23/09/1963 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2317 | 395 | 04/1922 | 19/12/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2318 | 396 | 04/1922 | 04/04/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2319 | 397 | 04/1922 | 20/06/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2320 | 398 | 04/1922 | 27/02/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2321 | 399 | 04/1922 | 02/10/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2322 | 400 | 04/1922 | 16/10/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2323 | 401 | 05/1922 | 07/11/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2324 | 402 | 05/1922 | 09/05/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2325 | 403 | 05/1922 | 16/10/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2326 | 404 | 05/1922 | 16/07/1962 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2327 | 405 | 05/1922 | 02/10/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2328 | 406 | 05/1922 | 22/10/1958 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2329 | 407 | 06/1922 | 07/10/1963 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2330 | 408 | 06/1922 | 23/08/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2331 | 409 | 06/1922 | 23/11/1960 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2332 | 410 | 06/1922 | 24/08/1959 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2333 | 411 | 06/1922 | 31/07/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2334 | 412 | 08/1922 | 22/06/1959 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2335 | 413 | 08/1922 | 16/10/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2336 | 414 | 09/1922 | 02/10/1961 | |
NER | J72 | 0-6-0T | 2337 | 415 | 10/1922 | 28/09/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6390 | 605 | 10/1924 | 17/09/1958 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6391 | 606 | 10/1924 | 29/10/1959 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6392 | 607 | 10/1924 | 15/01/1962 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6393 | 608 | 10/1924 | 28/07/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6394 | 609 | 10/1924 | 02/08/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6395 | 610 | 11/1924 | 28/07/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6396 | 611 | 11/1924 | 13/07/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6397 | 612 | 11/1924 | 13/07/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6398 | 613 | 11/1924 | 20/11/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6399 | 614 | 11/1924 | 16/11/1959 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6400 | 615 | 11/1924 | 20/11/1961 | |
GCR | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 6401 | 616 | 11/1924 | 16/11/1959 | |
MET | L2 | 2-6-4T | 111 | 702 | 21/03/1925 | 22/10/1948 | |
MET | L2 | 2-6-4T | 112 | 703 | 21/03/1925 | 02/01/1943 | |
MET | L2 | 2-6-4T | 113 | 704 | 23/03/1925 | 06/10/1948 | |
MET | L2 | 2-6-4T | 114 | 705 | 23/03/1925 | 26/05/1943 | |
MET | L2 | 2-6-4T | 115 | 706 | 28/03/1925 | 26/01/1946 | |
MET | L2 | 2-6-4T | 116 | 707 | 28/03/1925 | 12/05/1945 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7775 | 1131 | 11/1930 | 09/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7776 | 1132 | 11/1930 | 12/01/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7777 | 1133 | 11/1930 | 09/11/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7778 | 1134 | 11/1930 | 07/12/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7779 | 1135 | 11/1930 | 10/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7780 | 1136 | 11/1930 | 26/06/1963 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7781 | 1137 | 11/1930 | 18/07/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7782 | 1138 | 11/1930 | 19/10/1964 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7783 | 1139 | 11/1930 | 12/09/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7784 | 1140 | 11/1930 | 05/03/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7785 | 1141 | 12/1930 | 21/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7786 | 1142 | 12/1930 | 14/05/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7787 | 1143 | 12/1930 | 22/06/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7788 | 1144 | 12/1930 | 13/07/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7789 | 1145 | 12/1930 | 09/11/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7790 | 1146 | 12/1930 | 05/11/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7791 | 1147 | 12/1930 | 07/12/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7792 | 1148 | 12/1930 | 18/11/1957 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7793 | 1149 | 12/1930 | 25/04/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7794 | 1150 | 12/1930 | 24/10/1960 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7795 | 1151 | 12/1930 | 03/02/1958 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7796 | 1152 | 01/1931 | 13/02/1962 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7797 | 1153 | 01/1931 | 19/10/1959 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7798 | 1154 | 01/1931 | 30/05/1961 | |
GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7799 | 1155 | 01/1931 | 22/05/1962 | |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1100 | L86 | 1111 | 03/1931 | 18/12/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1101 | L86 | 1112 | 03/1931 | 04/03/1960 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1102 | L86 | 1113 | 03/1931 | 27/12/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1106 | L86 | 1114 | 03/1931 | 03/07/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1117 | L86 | 1116 | 03/1931 | 05/06/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1118 | L86 | 1117 | 03/1931 | 04/11/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1108 | L86 | 1115 | 04/1931 | 23/11/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1119 | L86 | 1118 | 04/1931 | 17/12/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1121 | L86 | 1119 | 04/1931 | 16/09/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1125 | L86 | 1120 | 04/1931 | 19/01/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1133 | L86 | 1121 | 04/1931 | 01/04/1960 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1135 | L86 | 1122 | 04/1931 | 21/07/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1137 | L86 | 1123 | 05/1931 | 30/11/1959 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1141 | L86 | 1124 | 05/1931 | 16/09/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1154 | L86 | 1125 | 05/1931 | 17/02/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1156 | L86 | 1126 | 05/1931 | 23/08/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1158 | L86 | 1127 | 05/1931 | 16/09/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1162 | L86 | 1128 | 05/1931 | 31/12/1960 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1164 | L86 | 1129 | 05/1931 | 26/11/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1166 | L86 | 1130 | 06/1931 | 28/03/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1302 | L88 | 1156 | 07/1934 | 29/06/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1304 | L88 | 1157 | 07/1934 | 18/09/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1308 | L88 | 1158 | 07/1934 | 25/07/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1310 | L88 | 1159 | 08/1934 | 07/05/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1324 | L88 | 1160 | 08/1934 | 30/04/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1306 | L88 | 1161 | 09/1934 | 20/12/1960 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2934 | L88 | 1162 | 09/1934 | 24/07/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2935 | L88 | 1163 | 09/1934 | 10/04/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2936 | L88 | 1164 | 01/1935 | 17/07/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2937 | L88 | 1165 | 01/1935 | 05/02/1960 |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5125 | 1166 | 05/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5126 | 1167 | 05/1935 | 20/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5127 | 1168 | 05/1935 | 19/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5128 | 1169 | 05/1935 | 10/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5129 | 1170 | 05/1935 | 17/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5130 | 1171 | 05/1935 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5131 | 1172 | 05/1935 | 20/04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5132 | 1173 | 05/1935 | 04/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5133 | 1174 | 05/1935 | 03/02/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5134 | 1175 | 05/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5135 | 1176 | 05/1935 | 07/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5136 | 1177 | 05/1935 | 30/10/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5137 | 1178 | 06/1935 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5138 | 1179 | 06/1935 | 09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5139 | 1180 | 06/1935 | 19/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5140 | 1181 | 06/1935 | 09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5141 | 1182 | 06/1935 | 11/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5142 | 1183 | 06/1935 | 24/04/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5144 | 1185 | 06/1935 | 13/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5146 | 1187 | 06/1935 | 19/06/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5147 | 1188 | 06/1935 | 20/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5148 | 1189 | 06/1935 | 25/12/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5149 | 1190 | 06/1935 | 22/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5150 | 1191 | 06/1935 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5151 | 1192 | 06/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5152 | 1193 | 06/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5153 | 1194 | 06/1935 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5154 | 1195 | 06/1935 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5143 | 1184 | 14/06/1935 | 11/12/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5145 | 1186 | 14/06/1935 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5155 | 1196 | 07/1935 | 12/11/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5156 | 1197 | 07/1935 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5157 | 1198 | 07/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5158 | 1199 | 07/1935 | 23/07/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5159 | 1200 | 07/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5160 | 1201 | 07/1935 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5161 | 1202 | 07/1935 | 29/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5162 | 1203 | 08/1935 | 19/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5163 | 1204 | 08/1935 | 15/05/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5164 | 1205 | 08/1935 | 09/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5165 | 1206 | 08/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5166 | 1207 | 08/1935 | 16/09/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5167 | 1208 | 08/1935 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5168 | 1209 | 08/1935 | 26/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5169 | 1210 | 08/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5170 | 1211 | 08/1935 | 31/03/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5171 | 1212 | 08/1935 | 29/10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5172 | 1213 | 08/1935 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5173 | 1214 | 08/1935 | 23/07/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5174 | 1215 | 08/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5175 | 1216 | 08/1935 | 26/07/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5176 | 1217 | 08/1935 | 17/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5177 | 1218 | 09/1935 | 14/07/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5178 | 1219 | 09/1935 | 30/01/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5179 | 1220 | 09/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5180 | 1221 | 09/1935 | 25/09/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5181 | 1222 | 09/1935 | 15/01/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5182 | 1223 | 09/1935 | 12/03/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5183 | 1224 | 09/1935 | 30/10/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5184 | 1225 | 09/1935 | 18/09/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5185 | 1226 | 09/1935 | 06/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5186 | 1227 | 09/1935 | 09/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5187 | 1228 | 09/1935 | 06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5188 | 1229 | 09/1935 | 22/07/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5189 | 1230 | 09/1935 | 13/07/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5190 | 1231 | 10/1935 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5191 | 1232 | 10/1935 | 22/07/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5192 | 1233 | 10/1935 | 21/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5193 | 1234 | 10/1935 | 08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5194 | 1235 | 10/1935 | 24/04/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5195 | 1236 | 10/1935 | 30/07/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5196 | 1237 | 10/1935 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5197 | 1238 | 10/1935 | 14/01/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5198 | 1239 | 10/1935 | 30/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5199 | 1240 | 10/1935 | 09/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5200 | 1241 | 10/1935 | 20/07/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5201 | 1242 | 10/1935 | 05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5202 | 1243 | 10/1935 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5203 | 1244 | 11/1935 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5204 | 1245 | 11/1935 | 09/01/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5205 | 1246 | 11/1935 | 29/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5206 | 1247 | 11/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5207 | 1248 | 11/1935 | 11/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5208 | 1249 | 11/1935 | 01/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5209 | 1250 | 11/1935 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5210 | 1251 | 11/1935 | 02/04/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5211 | 1252 | 11/1935 | 17/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5212 | 1253 | 11/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5213 | 1254 | 11/1935 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5214 | 1255 | 11/1935 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5215 | 1256 | 11/1935 | 07/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5216 | 1257 | 11/1935 | 12/02/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5217 | 1258 | 11/1935 | 26/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5218 | 1259 | 11/1935 | 16/04/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5219 | 1260 | 11/1935 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5220 | 1261 | 11/1935 | 09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5221 | 1262 | 11/1935 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5222 | 1263 | 12/1935 | 11/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5223 | 1264 | 12/1935 | 10/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5224 | 1265 | 12/1935 | 12/11/1966 | |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2417 | L92 | 1270 | 05/1936 | 13/11/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2429 | L92 | 1271 | 05/1936 | 16/09/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2445 | L92 | 1272 | 05/1936 | 02/10/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2446 | L92 | 1273 | 05/1936 | 19/12/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2453 | L92 | 1274 | 06/1936 | 16/09/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2455 | L92 | 1275 | 06/1936 | 07/07/1961 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2458 | L92 | 1276 | 06/1936 | 03/12/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2465 | L92 | 1277 | 06/1936 | 19/02/1962 |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2471 | L92 | 1278 | 07/1936 | 03/04/1961 |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5225 | 1280 | 08/1936 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5226 | 1281 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5227 | 1282 | 08/1936 | 13/01/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5228 | 1283 | 08/1936 | 18/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5229 | 1284 | 08/1936 | 04/09/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5230 | 1285 | 08/1936 | 14/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5231 | 1286 | 08/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5232 | 1287 | 08/1936 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5233 | 1288 | 08/1936 | 07/05/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5234 | 1289 | 08/1936 | 09/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5235 | 1290 | 08/1936 | 15/01/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5236 | 1291 | 08/1936 | 23/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5237 | 1292 | 08/1936 | 25/09/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5238 | 1293 | 08/1936 | 24/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5239 | 1294 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5240 | 1295 | 08/1936 | 21/01/1967 | |
GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 2472 | L92 | 1279 | 08/1936 | 23/10/1961 |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5241 | 1296 | 09/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5242 | 1297 | 09/1936 | 03/06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5243 | 1298 | 09/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5244 | 1299 | 09/1936 | 03/08/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5245 | 1300 | 09/1936 | 28/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5246 | 1301 | 09/1936 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5247 | 1302 | 09/1936 | 08/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5248 | 1303 | 09/1936 | 26/02/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5249 | 1304 | 09/1936 | 10/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5250 | 1305 | 09/1936 | 11/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5251 | 1306 | 09/1936 | 28/12/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5252 | 1307 | 09/1936 | 26/03/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5253 | 1308 | 09/1936 | 04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5254 | 1309 | 09/1936 | 05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5255 | 1310 | 10/1936 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5256 | 1311 | 10/1936 | 06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5257 | 1312 | 10/1936 | 10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5258 | 1313 | 10/1936 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5259 | 1314 | 10/1936 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5260 | 1315 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5261 | 1316 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5262 | 1317 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5263 | 1318 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5264 | 1319 | 10/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5265 | 1320 | 10/1936 | 19/05/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5266 | 1321 | 10/1936 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5267 | 1322 | 10/1936 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5268 | 1323 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5269 | 1324 | 11/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5270 | 1325 | 11/1936 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5271 | 1326 | 11/1936 | 23/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5272 | 1327 | 11/1936 | 09/10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5273 | 1328 | 11/1936 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5274 | 1329 | 11/1936 | 13/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5275 | 1330 | 11/1936 | 21/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5276 | 1331 | 11/1936 | 21/01/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5277 | 1332 | 11/1936 | 25/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5278 | 1333 | 11/1936 | 10/06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5279 | 1334 | 11/1936 | 23/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5280 | 1335 | 11/1936 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5281 | 1336 | 11/1936 | 11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5282 | 1337 | 11/1936 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5283 | 1338 | 11/1936 | 21/01/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5284 | 1339 | 12/1936 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5285 | 1340 | 12/1936 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5286 | 1341 | 12/1936 | 13/03/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5287 | 1342 | 12/1936 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5288 | 1343 | 12/1936 | 11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5289 | 1344 | 12/1936 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5290 | 1345 | 12/1936 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5291 | 1346 | 12/1936 | 23/10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5292 | 1347 | 12/1936 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5299 | 1354 | 01/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5300 | 1355 | 01/1937 | 12/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5301 | 1356 | 01/1937 | 10/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5302 | 1357 | 01/1937 | 22/07/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5303 | 1358 | 01/1937 | 10/06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5304 | 1359 | 01/1937 | 26/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5305 | 1360 | 01/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5306 | 1361 | 01/1937 | 30/01/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5307 | 1362 | 01/1937 | 07/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5308 | 1363 | 01/1937 | 12/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5309 | 1364 | 01/1937 | 26/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5310 | 1365 | 01/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5311 | 1366 | 02/1937 | 29/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5312 | 1367 | 02/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5313 | 1368 | 02/1937 | 06/02/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5314 | 1369 | 02/1937 | 10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5315 | 1370 | 02/1937 | 31/08/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5316 | 1371 | 02/1937 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5317 | 1372 | 02/1937 | 23/11/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5318 | 1373 | 02/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5319 | 1374 | 02/1937 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5320 | 1375 | 02/1937 | 28/10/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5321 | 1376 | 02/1937 | 07/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5322 | 1377 | 02/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5323 | 1378 | 02/1937 | 30/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5324 | 1379 | 02/1937 | 12/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5325 | 1380 | 03/1937 | 20/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5326 | 1381 | 03/1937 | 11/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5327 | 1382 | 03/1937 | 23/01/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5328 | 1383 | 03/1937 | 23/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5329 | 1384 | 03/1937 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5330 | 1385 | 03/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5331 | 1386 | 03/1937 | 11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5332 | 1387 | 03/1937 | 19/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5333 | 1388 | 03/1937 | 06/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5334 | 1389 | 03/1937 | 07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5335 | 1390 | 03/1937 | 10/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5336 | 1391 | 03/1937 | 14/01/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5337 | 1392 | 04/1937 | 06/02/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5338 | 1393 | 04/1937 | 15/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5339 | 1394 | 04/1937 | 06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5340 | 1395 | 04/1937 | 22/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5341 | 1396 | 04/1937 | 07/01/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5342 | 1397 | 04/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5343 | 1398 | 04/1937 | 24/06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5344 | 1399 | 04/1937 | 20/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5345 | 1400 | 04/1937 | 06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5346 | 1401 | 04/1937 | 06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5347 | 1402 | 04/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5348 | 1403 | 04/1937 | 13/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5349 | 1404 | 05/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5350 | 1405 | 05/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5351 | 1406 | 05/1937 | 07/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5352 | 1407 | 05/1937 | 08/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5353 | 1408 | 05/1937 | 20/07/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5354 | 1409 | 05/1937 | 10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5355 | 1410 | 05/1937 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5356 | 1411 | 05/1937 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5357 | 1412 | 05/1937 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5358 | 1413 | 05/1937 | 28/12/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5359 | 1414 | 05/1937 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5360 | 1415 | 05/1937 | 03/09/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5361 | 1416 | 05/1937 | 13/02/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5362 | 1417 | 05/1937 | 29/10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5363 | 1418 | 06/1937 | 28/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5364 | 1419 | 06/1937 | 13/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5365 | 1420 | 06/1937 | 10/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5366 | 1421 | 06/1937 | 17/04/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5367 | 1422 | 06/1937 | 29/11/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5368 | 1423 | 06/1937 | 11/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5369 | 1424 | 06/1937 | 04/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5370 | 1425 | 06/1937 | 13/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5371 | 1426 | 06/1937 | 15/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5372 | 1427 | 06/1937 | 26/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5373 | 1428 | 06/1937 | 23/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5374 | 1429 | 06/1937 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5375 | 1430 | 06/1937 | 27/01/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5376 | 1431 | 06/1937 | 04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5377 | 1432 | 06/1937 | 09/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5378 | 1433 | 07/1937 | 06/03/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5379 | 1434 | 07/1937 | 31/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5380 | 1435 | 07/1937 | 27/03/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5381 | 1436 | 07/1937 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5382 | 1437 | 07/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5383 | 1438 | 07/1937 | 11/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5384 | 1439 | 07/1937 | 29/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5385 | 1440 | 07/1937 | 10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5386 | 1441 | 07/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5387 | 1442 | 07/1937 | 13/03/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5388 | 1443 | 07/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5389 | 1444 | 07/1937 | 08/10/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5390 | 1445 | 08/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5391 | 1446 | 08/1937 | 03/02/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5392 | 1447 | 08/1937 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5393 | 1448 | 08/1937 | 17/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5394 | 1449 | 08/1937 | 20/07/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5395 | 1450 | 08/1937 | 23/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5396 | 1451 | 08/1937 | 01/02/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5397 | 1452 | 08/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5398 | 1453 | 08/1937 | 09/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5399 | 1454 | 08/1937 | 24/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5400 | 1455 | 08/1937 | 04/05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5401 | 1456 | 08/1937 | 11/11/1961 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5402 | 1457 | 08/1937 | 22/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5403 | 1458 | 08/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5404 | 1459 | 08/1937 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5405 | 1460 | 09/1937 | 26/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5406 | 1461 | 09/1937 | 08/07/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5407 | 1462 | 09/1937 | 10/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5408 | 1463 | 09/1937 | 26/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5409 | 1464 | 09/1937 | 12/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5410 | 1465 | 09/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5411 | 1466 | 09/1937 | 06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5412 | 1467 | 09/1937 | 05/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5413 | 1468 | 09/1937 | 19/09/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5414 | 1469 | 10/1937 | 06/02/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5415 | 1470 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5416 | 1471 | 10/1937 | 10/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5417 | 1472 | 10/1937 | 22/07/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5418 | 1473 | 10/1937 | 12/02/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5419 | 1474 | 10/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5420 | 1475 | 10/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5421 | 1476 | 10/1937 | 10/02/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5422 | 1477 | 10/1937 | 10/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5423 | 1478 | 10/1937 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5424 | 1479 | 10/1937 | 20/04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5425 | 1480 | 10/1937 | 21/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5426 | 1481 | 10/1937 | 23/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5427 | 1482 | 10/1937 | 20/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5428 | 1483 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5429 | 1484 | 11/1937 | 07/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5430 | 1485 | 11/1937 | 09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5431 | 1486 | 11/1937 | 02/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5432 | 1487 | 11/1937 | 19/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5433 | 1488 | 11/1937 | 03/03/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5434 | 1489 | 11/1937 | 08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5435 | 1490 | 11/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5436 | 1491 | 11/1937 | 13/04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5437 | 1492 | 11/1937 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5438 | 1493 | 11/1937 | 08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5439 | 1494 | 11/1937 | 11/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5440 | 1495 | 11/1937 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5293 | 1348 | 12/1937 | 21/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5294 | 1349 | 12/1937 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5295 | 1350 | 12/1937 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5296 | 1351 | 12/1937 | 10/02/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5297 | 1352 | 12/1937 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5298 | 1353 | 12/1937 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5441 | 1496 | 12/1937 | 04/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5442 | 1497 | 12/1937 | 27/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5443 | 1498 | 12/1937 | 28/08/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5444 | 1499 | 12/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5445 | 1500 | 12/1937 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5446 | 1501 | 12/1937 | 11/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5447 | 1502 | 12/1937 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5448 | 1503 | 12/1937 | 26/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5449 | 1504 | 12/1937 | 11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5450 | 1505 | 12/1937 | 18/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5451 | 1506 | 12/1937 | 12/11/1966 |