Manufacturer: Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
26 | Bo-Bo | D5300 | 30/07/1958 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5301 | 12/09/1958 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5302 | 02/10/1958 | 09/10/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5303 | 17/10/1958 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5304 | 31/10/1958 | 24/11/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5305 | 14/11/1958 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5306 | 28/11/1958 | 06/09/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5307 | 05/12/1958 | 04/02/1977 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5308 | 12/12/1958 | 12/03/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5309 | 19/12/1958 | 27/01/1977 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5310 | 06/01/1959 | 04/12/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5311 | 09/01/1959 | 24/11/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5312 | 16/01/1959 | 31/01/1982 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5313 | 23/01/1959 | 18/03/1985 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5314 | 30/01/1959 | 09/10/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5317 | 27/02/1959 | 29/08/1977 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5318 | 06/03/1959 | 31/01/1982 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5315 | 13/03/1959 | 23/06/1991 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5319 | 13/03/1959 | 18/03/1985 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5316 | 20/03/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5320 | 10/04/1959 | 02/10/1991 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5321 | 17/04/1959 | 01/10/1991 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5322 | 24/04/1959 | 01/02/1981 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5323 | 01/05/1959 | 21/09/1990 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5324 | 08/05/1959 | 09/10/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5325 | 14/05/1959 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5326 | 22/05/1959 | 24/11/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5327 | 06/06/1959 | 26/07/1991 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5328 | 12/06/1959 | 18/07/1972 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5329 | 12/06/1959 | 13/10/1988 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5330 | 19/06/1959 | 18/03/1985 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5331 | 26/06/1959 | 04/10/1989 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5332 | 02/07/1959 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5333 | 10/07/1959 | 18/03/1985 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5334 | 17/07/1959 | 08/09/1989 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5335 | 24/07/1959 | 10/12/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5336 | 14/08/1959 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5337 | 20/08/1959 | 04/10/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5338 | 28/08/1959 | 19/10/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5339 | 04/09/1959 | 18/10/1990 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5340 | 11/09/1959 | 04/12/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5341 | 18/09/1959 | 24/11/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5342 | 25/09/1959 | 09/10/1992 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5343 | 02/10/1959 | 19/01/1993 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5344 | 09/10/1959 | 17/01/1984 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5345 | 23/10/1959 | 04/07/1983 | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5346 | 30/10/1959 | 19/04/1991 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | 1083 | 04/11/1959 | 29/07/1984 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3002 | 1084 | 29/01/1960 | 02/11/1968 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6500 | 30/01/1960 | 17/03/1988 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3003 | 1085 | 27/02/1960 | 01/10/1990 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6501 | 27/02/1960 | 01/09/1996 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6502 | 12/03/1960 | 17/05/1964 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6503 | 19/03/1960 | 05/08/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6504 | 26/03/1960 | 21/06/1991 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3004 | 1086 | 30/03/1960 | 30/03/1988 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6505 | 09/04/1960 | 25/06/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6506 | 23/04/1960 | 06/08/1991 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3005 | 1087 | 04/05/1960 | 30/04/1990 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6507 | 04/05/1960 | 10/12/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6508 | 21/05/1960 | 01/02/1996 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6509 | 21/05/1960 | 13/03/1993 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6510 | 04/06/1960 | 18/04/1988 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6511 | 04/06/1960 | 24/05/1993 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6512 | 18/06/1960 | 23/03/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6513 | 25/06/1960 | 06/11/1992 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6514 | 02/07/1960 | ||||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3006 | 1088 | 08/07/1960 | 20/02/1989 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6515 | 08/07/1960 | 01/02/1997 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6516 | 15/07/1960 | 16/12/1985 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3007 | 1089 | 21/07/1960 | 03/10/1988 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6517 | 22/07/1960 | 27/10/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6518 | 19/08/1960 | 14/03/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6519 | 27/08/1960 | 16/11/1990 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6520 | 03/09/1960 | 16/05/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6521 | 11/09/1960 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6522 | 17/09/1960 | 17/02/1986 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3008 | 1090 | 23/09/1960 | 14/12/1989 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6523 | 24/09/1960 | 28/07/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6524 | 01/10/1960 | 04/10/1989 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3009 | 1091 | 07/10/1960 | 24/08/1968 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6525 | 08/10/1960 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6526 | 15/10/1960 | 05/01/1988 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3010 | 1092 | 22/10/1960 | 30/03/1988 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6527 | 22/10/1960 | 01/09/1992 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6528 | 29/10/1960 | 24/06/1991 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6529 | 05/11/1960 | 11/11/1988 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3011 | 1093 | 11/11/1960 | 17/12/1990 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6530 | 12/11/1960 | 01/02/1988 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3012 | 1094 | 18/11/1960 | 23/05/1990 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6532 | 19/11/1960 | 01/02/1993 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6531 | 22/11/1960 | 09/10/1992 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3013 | 1095 | 02/12/1960 | 05/04/1989 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6533 | 03/12/1960 | 10/05/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6534 | 03/12/1960 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6535 | 10/12/1960 | ||||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3014 | 1096 | 16/12/1960 | 22/07/1991 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6536 | 17/12/1960 | 01/05/1993 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3015 | 1097 | 30/12/1960 | 01/11/1989 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6537 | 31/12/1960 | 20/04/1993 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6538 | 07/01/1961 | 16/04/1993 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6539 | 14/01/1961 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6540 | 21/01/1961 | 24/12/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6541 | 28/01/1961 | 31/05/2005 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6542 | 04/02/1961 | 17/02/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6543 | 10/02/1961 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6544 | 25/02/1961 | 31/08/2003 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3016 | 1098 | 08/03/1961 | 30/03/1988 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6545 | 08/03/1961 | 05/07/1991 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6546 | 18/03/1961 | 05/10/1988 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3018 | 1100 | 23/03/1961 | 11/07/1983 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6547 | 25/03/1961 | ||||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3019 | 1101 | 30/03/1961 | 18/07/1971 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6548 | 01/04/1961 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6549 | 01/04/1961 | 06/02/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6550 | 13/04/1961 | 25/03/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6551 | 20/04/1961 | 17/05/1993 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6552 | 24/04/1961 | 25/01/1988 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3020 | 1102 | 27/04/1961 | 15/07/1991 | ||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3017 | 1099 | 05/05/1961 | 17/12/1984 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6553 | 06/05/1961 | 01/10/1996 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6554 | 13/05/1961 | 28/02/2007 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6555 | 20/05/1961 | 23/09/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6556 | 01/06/1961 | 05/10/1988 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6557 | 03/06/1961 | 18/05/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6558 | 10/06/1961 | 14/05/1993 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3021 | 1103 | 13/06/1961 | 20/01/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6559 | 24/06/1961 | 30/11/1975 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5347 | 30/06/1961 | 08/07/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6561 | 08/07/1961 | 23/09/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6560 | 15/07/1961 | 08/10/1996 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6562 | 15/07/1961 | 11/09/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5348 | DEL191 | 17/07/1961 | 06/01/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6563 | DEL155 | 22/07/1961 | 30/10/1987 | ||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5349 | DEL192 | 28/07/1961 | 16/01/1987 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6564 | 29/07/1961 | 31/03/2007 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6565 | 19/08/1961 | 12/02/1993 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5350 | DEL193 | 23/08/1961 | 12/05/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6566 | 26/08/1961 | 13/02/1997 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5351 | DEL194 | 30/08/1961 | 10/07/1987 | ||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5352 | DEL195 | 06/09/1961 | 21/01/1976 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6567 | 09/09/1961 | 28/03/1988 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6568 | 09/09/1961 | 14/05/1993 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5353 | DEL196 | 13/09/1961 | 28/01/1985 | ||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3022 | 1104 | 14/09/1961 | 03/01/1989 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6569 | 16/09/1961 | 31/08/2003 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5354 | DEL197 | 20/09/1961 | 18/08/1987 | ||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5355 | DEL198 | 28/09/1961 | 27/07/1980 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6570 | 30/09/1961 | 13/02/1997 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5356 | DEL199 | 11/10/1961 | 20/04/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6571 | 14/10/1961 | 01/01/1995 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6572 | 14/10/1961 | 17/12/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5357 | DEL200 | 18/10/1961 | 30/03/1981 | ||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5358 | DEL201 | 25/10/1961 | 11/05/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6574 | 28/10/1961 | 04/02/1991 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5359 | DEL202 | 01/11/1961 | 13/07/1976 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6573 | 04/11/1961 | 24/12/1989 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6575 | 04/11/1961 | 31/08/2005 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6576 | 11/11/1961 | 03/11/1968 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5360 | DEL203 | 18/11/1961 | 08/09/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6577 | 18/11/1961 | 21/06/1991 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5361 | DEL204 | 22/11/1961 | 27/01/1977 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6578 | 25/11/1961 | 27/09/1988 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5362 | DEL205 | 30/11/1961 | 09/04/1984 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6579 | 02/12/1961 | 29/10/1990 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5363 | DEL206 | 07/12/1961 | 12/05/1986 | ||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6580 | 09/12/1961 | 26/10/1989 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5364 | 13/12/1961 | 12/05/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6581 | 16/12/1961 | 25/06/1987 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6582 | 23/12/1961 | 23/09/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5365 | 30/12/1961 | 28/05/1984 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5366 | 04/01/1962 | 20/04/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5367 | 04/01/1962 | 03/06/1985 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6583 | 06/01/1962 | 13/02/1997 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5368 | 11/01/1962 | 28/01/1985 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6584 | 13/01/1962 | 15/10/1994 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6585 | 13/01/1962 | 13/02/1997 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5369 | 17/01/1962 | 12/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5370 | 17/01/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5372 | 24/01/1962 | 06/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5371 | 29/01/1962 | 18/06/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5373 | 31/01/1962 | 13/06/1983 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6586 | 02/02/1962 | 01/10/1993 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3023 | 1105 | 05/02/1962 | 09/09/1987 | ||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5374 | 07/02/1962 | 01/05/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6587 | 09/02/1962 | 01/09/2007 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5375 | 14/02/1962 | 19/08/1984 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6588 | 16/02/1962 | 19/04/1991 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5376 | 21/02/1962 | 09/01/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6589 | 23/02/1962 | 13/02/1997 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6590 | 23/02/1962 | 27/07/1992 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5377 | 28/02/1962 | 20/04/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5378 | 07/03/1962 | 06/05/1978 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6591 | 09/03/1962 | 08/10/1996 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6592 | 16/03/1962 | ||||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6593 | 23/03/1962 | 01/02/1997 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5379 | 27/03/1962 | 27/05/1985 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6594 | 30/03/1962 | 02/12/1988 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5380 | 06/04/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5381 | 06/04/1962 | 24/02/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6595 | 13/04/1962 | 05/08/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5382 | 18/04/1962 | 22/07/1984 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5383 | 26/04/1962 | 15/01/1966 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6596 | 27/04/1962 | 01/10/1993 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5384 | 01/05/1962 | 29/09/1976 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5385 | 07/05/1962 | 20/04/1986 | |||
33 | Bo-Bo | D6597 | 11/05/1962 | 11/09/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5386 | 18/05/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5387 | 21/05/1962 | 01/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5388 | 28/05/1962 | 01/04/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5389 | 28/05/1962 | 24/03/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5390 | 04/06/1962 | 10/02/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5391 | 04/06/1962 | 01/01/1979 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5392 | 12/06/1962 | 01/08/1980 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5393 | 12/06/1962 | 01/05/1983 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5394 | 20/06/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5395 | 20/06/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5396 | 27/06/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5398 | 03/07/1962 | 05/10/1975 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5399 | 03/07/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5400 | 10/07/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5401 | 10/07/1962 | 01/02/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5402 | 12/07/1962 | 27/01/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5403 | 17/07/1962 | 01/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5404 | 19/07/1962 | 01/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5405 | 24/07/1962 | 11/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5406 | 31/07/1962 | 06/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5407 | 02/08/1962 | 01/02/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5397 | 10/08/1962 | 01/05/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5409 | 10/08/1962 | 01/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5408 | 15/08/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5410 | 30/08/1962 | 01/07/1987 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5412 | 03/09/1962 | 01/03/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5411 | 10/09/1962 | 01/05/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5413 | 13/09/1962 | 01/04/1986 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5414 | 18/09/1962 | 21/04/1980 | |||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5415 | 06/10/1962 | 14/07/1980 | |||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3301 | 1106 | 04/10/1963 | 28/04/1987 | ||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3097 | 1107 | 27/01/1964 | 10/07/1987 |