Manufacturer: Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1541 | W82 | 135 | 06/1920 | 01/01/1957 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1542 | W82 | 136 | 07/1920 | 14/07/1958 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1543 | W82 | 137 | 07/1920 | 19/06/1953 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1544 | W82 | 138 | 07/1920 | 09/1947 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1545 | W82 | 139 | 08/1920 | 01/01/1957 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1546 | W82 | 140 | 09/1920 | 11/05/1959 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1547 | W82 | 141 | 09/1920 | 13/10/1958 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1550 | W82 | 142 | 10/1920 | 01/01/1957 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1551 | W82 | 145 | 10/1920 | 01/1947 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1552 | W82 | 146 | 12/1920 | 17/07/1952 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1553 | W82 | 147 | 12/1920 | 25/08/1958 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1554 | W82 | 148 | 01/1921 | 15/09/1958 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1555 | W82 | 149 | 01/1921 | 07/10/1957 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1556 | W82 | 150 | 02/1921 | 23/12/1957 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1557 | W82 | 151 | 02/1921 | 01/01/1957 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1558 | W82 | 152 | 02/1921 | 13/04/1959 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1559 | W82 | 153 | 02/1921 | 03/09/1951 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1560 | W82 | 154 | 04/1921 | 09/05/1952 |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1548 | W82 | 143 | 05/1921 | 12/1946 |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 120 | 174 | 06/1921 | 11/1934 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1549 | W82 | 144 | 06/1921 | 01/01/1959 |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 123 | 175 | 08/1921 | 12/1938 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 125 | 176 | 08/1921 | 09/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 129 | 177 | 08/1921 | 11/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 135 | 178 | 08/1921 | 06/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 140 | 179 | 08/1921 | 10/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 141 | 180 | 08/1921 | 12/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 142 | 181 | 08/1921 | 04/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 145 | 182 | 08/1921 | 09/1939 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 148 | 183 | 08/1921 | 06/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 224 | 184 | 08/1921 | 12/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 227 | 185 | 08/1921 | 08/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 232 | 186 | 09/1921 | 06/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 237 | 187 | 09/1921 | 04/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 239 | 188 | 09/1921 | 01/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 240 | 189 | 09/1921 | 04/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 241 | 190 | 09/1921 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 242 | 191 | 09/1921 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 243 | 192 | 09/1921 | 05/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 244 | 193 | 09/1921 | 10/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 246 | 194 | 09/1921 | 11/1947 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 247 | 195 | 09/1921 | 02/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 248 | 196 | 09/1921 | 03/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 249 | 197 | 10/1921 | 09/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 251 | 198 | 10/1921 | 06/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 252 | 199 | 10/1921 | 06/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 258 | 200 | 10/1921 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 259 | 201 | 10/1921 | 12/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 261 | 202 | 10/1921 | 12/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 266 | 203 | 10/1921 | 08/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 394 | 204 | 10/1921 | 05/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 267 | 205 | 10/1921 | 05/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 268 | 206 | 10/1921 | 12/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 269 | 207 | 10/1921 | 29/05/1948 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 270 | 208 | 11/1921 | 04/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 272 | 209 | 11/1921 | 03/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 273 | 210 | 11/1921 | 10/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 274 | 211 | 11/1921 | 12/1947 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 277 | 212 | 11/1921 | 05/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 281 | 213 | 11/1921 | 12/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 292 | 214 | 11/1921 | 07/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 293 | 215 | 11/1921 | 06/1947 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 296 | 216 | 11/1921 | 06/1945 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 284 | 234 | 11/1921 | 01/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 313 | 217 | 11/1921 | 07/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 324 | 218 | 11/1921 | 04/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 325 | 219 | 12/1921 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 331 | 220 | 12/1921 | 03/1947 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 355 | 221 | 12/1921 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 357 | 222 | 12/1921 | 02/1946 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 359 | 223 | 12/1921 | 06/1945 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 435 | 224 | 12/1921 | 10/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 436 | 225 | 12/1921 | 11/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 438 | 226 | 12/1921 | 04/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 440 | 227 | 12/1921 | 11/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 442 | 228 | 12/1921 | 05/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 443 | 229 | 12/1921 | 01/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 452 | 230 | 12/1921 | 12/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 483 | 231 | 12/1921 | 05/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 489 | 232 | 12/1921 | 02/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 490 | 233 | 12/1921 | 07/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 491 | 235 | 01/1922 | 03/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 557 | 236 | 01/1922 | 06/03/1948 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 493 | 237 | 01/1922 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 17 | 238 | 02/1922 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 549 | 239 | 02/1922 | 02/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 551 | 240 | 02/1922 | 11/1934 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 554 | 241 | 02/1922 | 12/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 492 | 242 | 02/1922 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 558 | 243 | 02/1922 | 11/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 518 | 244 | 02/1922 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 153 | 245 | 02/1922 | 08/1946 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 198 | 246 | 02/1922 | 02/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 354 | 247 | 02/1922 | 04/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 778 | 248 | 03/1922 | 01/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1099 | 249 | 03/1922 | 08/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1179 | 250 | 03/1922 | 05/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1316 | 251 | 03/1922 | 10/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1339 | 252 | 03/1922 | 06/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1349 | 253 | 03/1922 | 01/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 53 | 254 | 03/1922 | 10/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 197 | 255 | 03/1922 | 01/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 433 | 256 | 04/1922 | 03/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 614 | 257 | 04/1922 | 03/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1083 | 258 | 04/1922 | 05/1935 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1320 | 259 | 04/1922 | 01/1937 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1323 | 260 | 04/1922 | 13/09/1947 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1344 | 261 | 04/1922 | 06/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1742 | 262 | 04/1922 | 08/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 2043 | 263 | 04/1922 | 09/1936 | |
LNWR | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 5845 | 02/1924 | 11/1947 | ||
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2642 | 305 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2643 | 306 | 07/1927 | 15/02/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2644 | 307 | 07/1927 | 29/08/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2645 | 308 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2646 | 309 | 07/1927 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2647 | 310 | 07/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2648 | 311 | 07/1927 | 24/11/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2649 | 312 | 08/1927 | 25/03/1957 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2650 | 313 | 08/1927 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2651 | 314 | 08/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2652 | 315 | 08/1927 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2653 | 316 | 08/1927 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2654 | 317 | 08/1927 | 24/11/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2655 | 318 | 08/1927 | 01/12/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2656 | 319 | 08/1927 | 27/04/1961 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2657 | 320 | 09/1927 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2658 | 321 | 09/1927 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2659 | 322 | 09/1927 | 24/11/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2660 | 323 | 09/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 2661 | 324 | 09/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16600 | 51 | 325 | 02/1928 | 27/06/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16601 | 51 | 326 | 02/1928 | 26/10/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16602 | 51 | 327 | 02/1928 | 09/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16603 | 51 | 328 | 02/1928 | 27/11/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16604 | 51 | 329 | 02/1928 | 08/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16605 | 51 | 330 | 02/1928 | 04/08/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16606 | 51 | 331 | 02/1928 | 12/11/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16607 | 51 | 332 | 03/1928 | 26/09/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16608 | 51 | 333 | 03/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16609 | 51 | 334 | 03/1928 | 01/12/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16610 | 51 | 335 | 03/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16611 | 51 | 336 | 03/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16612 | 51 | 337 | 03/1928 | 21/10/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16613 | 51 | 338 | 03/1928 | 08/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16614 | 51 | 339 | 03/1928 | 04/02/1967 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16615 | 51 | 340 | 04/1928 | 30/03/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16616 | 51 | 341 | 04/1928 | 26/11/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16617 | 51 | 342 | 04/1928 | 25/03/1967 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16618 | 51 | 343 | 04/1928 | 22/01/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16619 | 51 | 344 | 04/1928 | 11/06/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16620 | 51 | 345 | 04/1928 | 09/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16621 | 51 | 346 | 04/1928 | 10/06/1959 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16622 | 51 | 347 | 04/1928 | 08/02/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16623 | 51 | 348 | 04/1928 | 15/04/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16624 | 51 | 349 | 04/1928 | 16/06/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16685 | 60 | 350 | 09/1928 | 08/01/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16686 | 60 | 351 | 09/1928 | 12/11/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16687 | 60 | 352 | 09/1928 | 04/08/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16688 | 60 | 353 | 10/1928 | 13/05/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16689 | 60 | 354 | 10/1928 | 19/06/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16690 | 60 | 355 | 10/1928 | 30/01/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16691 | 60 | 356 | 10/1928 | 01/12/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16692 | 60 | 357 | 10/1928 | 25/01/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16693 | 60 | 358 | 10/1928 | 04/08/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16694 | 60 | 359 | 10/1928 | 14/05/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16695 | 60 | 360 | 10/1928 | 24/12/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16696 | 60 | 361 | 10/1928 | 1940 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16697 | 60 | 362 | 11/1928 | 24/07/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16698 | 60 | 363 | 11/1928 | 08/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16699 | 60 | 364 | 11/1928 | 09/01/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16700 | 60 | 365 | 11/1928 | 1940 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16701 | 60 | 366 | 11/1928 | 10/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16702 | 60 | 367 | 11/1928 | 17/03/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16703 | 60 | 368 | 11/1928 | 09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16704 | 60 | 369 | 11/1928 | 12/05/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16705 | 60 | 370 | 11/1928 | 11/07/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16706 | 60 | 371 | 11/1928 | 08/04/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16707 | 60 | 372 | 11/1928 | 09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16708 | 60 | 373 | 11/1928 | 09/05/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16709 | 60 | 374 | 11/1928 | 05/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16710 | 60 | 375 | 11/1928 | 09/04/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16711 | 60 | 376 | 12/1928 | 08/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16712 | 60 | 377 | 12/1928 | 07/10/1967 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16713 | 60 | 378 | 12/1928 | 02/08/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16714 | 60 | 379 | 12/1928 | 06/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16715 | 60 | 380 | 12/1928 | 26/09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16716 | 60 | 381 | 12/1928 | 08/09/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16717 | 60 | 382 | 12/1928 | 26/09/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16718 | 60 | 383 | 12/1928 | 12/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16719 | 60 | 384 | 12/1928 | 09/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16720 | 60 | 385 | 12/1928 | 05/1961 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16721 | 60 | 386 | 12/1928 | 06/07/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16722 | 60 | 387 | 12/1928 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16723 | 60 | 388 | 12/1928 | 09/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16724 | 60 | 389 | 01/1929 | 31/12/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16725 | 60 | 390 | 01/1929 | 19/05/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16726 | 60 | 391 | 01/1929 | 10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16727 | 60 | 392 | 01/1929 | 24/11/1962 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16728 | 60 | 393 | 02/1929 | 24/04/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16729 | 60 | 394 | 02/1929 | 07/08/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16730 | 60 | 395 | 02/1929 | 08/05/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16731 | 60 | 396 | 02/1929 | 18/04/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16732 | 60 | 397 | 02/1929 | 08/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16733 | 60 | 398 | 02/1929 | 19/03/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16734 | 60 | 399 | 02/1929 | 07/12/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16735 | 60 | 400 | 03/1929 | 07/1960 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16736 | 60 | 401 | 03/1929 | 24/10/1964 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16737 | 60 | 402 | 03/1929 | 23/02/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16738 | 60 | 403 | 03/1929 | 13/11/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16739 | 60 | 404 | 03/1929 | 25/12/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16740 | 60 | 405 | 03/1929 | 19/10/1963 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16741 | 60 | 406 | 03/1929 | 08/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16742 | 60 | 407 | 03/1929 | 26/11/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16743 | 60 | 408 | 03/1929 | 01/01/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16744 | 60 | 409 | 03/1929 | 08/10/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16745 | 60 | 410 | 03/1929 | 29/01/1966 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16746 | 60 | 411 | 04/1929 | 1940 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16747 | 60 | 412 | 04/1929 | 23/01/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16748 | 60 | 413 | 04/1929 | 17/07/1965 |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16749 | 60 | 414 | 04/1929 | 09/1965 |