LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1201 |
|
1469 |
04/1872 |
04/1905 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1202 |
|
1470 |
04/1872 |
12/1904 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1203 |
|
1471 |
04/1872 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1204 |
|
1472 |
04/1872 |
10/1930 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1205 |
|
1473 |
04/1872 |
12/1872 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1206 |
|
1474 |
04/1872 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1207 |
|
1475 |
04/1872 |
05/1904 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1208 |
|
1476 |
04/1872 |
03/1904 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1209 |
|
1477 |
04/1872 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
1210 |
|
1478 |
04/1872 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1290 |
|
1642 |
1873 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1291 |
|
1643 |
1873 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1292 |
|
1644 |
1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1293 |
|
1645 |
1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1294 |
|
1646 |
1873 |
11/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1295 |
|
1647 |
1873 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1296 |
|
1648 |
1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1297 |
|
1649 |
1873 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1298 |
|
1650 |
1873 |
08/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1299 |
|
1651 |
1873 |
10/1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1300 |
|
1652 |
1873 |
01/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
944 |
|
1622 |
02/1873 |
01/08/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
188 |
|
1623 |
03/1873 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
495 |
|
1624 |
03/1873 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
496 |
|
1625 |
03/1873 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
497 |
|
1626 |
03/1873 |
05/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
500 |
|
1627 |
03/1873 |
10/1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
501 |
|
1628 |
03/1873 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
502 |
|
1629 |
03/1873 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
929 |
|
1630 |
03/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
931 |
|
1631 |
03/1873 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
932 |
|
1632 |
03/1873 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
933 |
|
1633 |
03/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
936 |
|
1634 |
03/1873 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
937 |
|
1635 |
03/1873 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
939 |
|
1636 |
03/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
940 |
|
1637 |
03/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
433 |
|
1638 |
04/1873 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1130 |
|
1639 |
04/1873 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
745 |
|
1640 |
04/1873 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1205 |
|
1641 |
04/1873 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2071 |
|
1653 |
05/1873 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2072 |
|
1654 |
05/1873 |
31/01/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2073 |
|
1655 |
05/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2074 |
|
1656 |
05/1873 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2075 |
|
1657 |
05/1873 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2076 |
|
1658 |
05/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2077 |
|
1659 |
05/1873 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2078 |
|
1660 |
05/1873 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2079 |
|
1661 |
05/1873 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2080 |
|
1662 |
05/1873 |
01/1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2081 |
|
1663 |
05/1873 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2082 |
|
1664 |
05/1873 |
21/02/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2083 |
|
1665 |
05/1873 |
08/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2084 |
|
1666 |
05/1873 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2085 |
|
1667 |
05/1873 |
24/07/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2086 |
|
1668 |
05/1873 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2087 |
|
1669 |
05/1873 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2088 |
|
1670 |
06/1873 |
19/01/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2089 |
|
1671 |
06/1873 |
08/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
107 |
|
1762 |
01/1874 |
06/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
113 |
|
1763 |
01/1874 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
734 |
|
1764 |
01/1874 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
976 |
|
1765 |
01/1874 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
982 |
|
1766 |
01/1874 |
03/1916 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
983 |
|
1767 |
01/1874 |
06/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
984 |
|
1768 |
01/1874 |
10/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
985 |
|
1769 |
01/1874 |
02/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
986 |
|
1770 |
01/1874 |
02/05/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
987 |
|
1771 |
01/1874 |
06/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
988 |
|
1772 |
02/1874 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
601 |
|
1773 |
02/1874 |
05/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
606 |
|
1774 |
02/1874 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
616 |
|
1775 |
02/1874 |
07/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
688 |
|
1776 |
02/1874 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
695 |
|
1777 |
02/1874 |
1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
741 |
|
1778 |
02/1874 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
778 |
|
1779 |
03/1874 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
784 |
|
1780 |
03/1874 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
811 |
|
1781 |
03/1874 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1019 |
|
1782 |
03/1874 |
07/08/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1021 |
|
1783 |
03/1874 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
316 |
|
1784 |
03/1874 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
405 |
|
1785 |
03/1874 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
412 |
|
1786 |
03/1874 |
1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2110 |
|
1787 |
03/1874 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2111 |
|
1788 |
03/1874 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2112 |
|
1789 |
03/1874 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2113 |
|
1790 |
03/1874 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2114 |
|
1791 |
03/1874 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2115 |
|
1792 |
03/1874 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2116 |
|
1793 |
03/1874 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2117 |
|
1794 |
03/1874 |
28/08/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2118 |
|
1795 |
03/1874 |
09/1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2119 |
|
1796 |
04/1874 |
25/04/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2120 |
|
1797 |
04/1874 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2121 |
|
1798 |
04/1874 |
08/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2122 |
|
1799 |
04/1874 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2123 |
|
1800 |
04/1874 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2124 |
|
1801 |
04/1874 |
02/1913 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
2145 |
|
1802 |
04/1874 |
03/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
2146 |
|
1803 |
08/1874 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
2147 |
|
1804 |
08/1874 |
11/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
2148 |
|
1805 |
08/1874 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
2149 |
|
1806 |
08/1874 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1143 |
|
1807 |
08/1874 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1144 |
|
1808 |
08/1874 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1145 |
|
1809 |
09/1874 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1152 |
|
1810 |
09/1874 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1153 |
|
1811 |
09/1874 |
08/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1154 |
|
1812 |
09/1874 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1155 |
|
1813 |
09/1874 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
402 |
|
1814 |
09/1874 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
406 |
|
1815 |
09/1874 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
408 |
|
1816 |
09/1874 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
409 |
|
1817 |
10/1874 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
413 |
|
1818 |
10/1874 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
425 |
|
1819 |
10/1874 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
426 |
|
1820 |
10/1874 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
427 |
|
1821 |
10/1874 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2160 |
|
1862 |
12/1874 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2161 |
|
1863 |
12/1874 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2162 |
|
1864 |
12/1874 |
08/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2163 |
|
1865 |
12/1874 |
06/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2164 |
|
1866 |
12/1874 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2165 |
|
1867 |
12/1874 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2166 |
|
1868 |
12/1874 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2167 |
|
1869 |
12/1874 |
17/08/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2168 |
|
1870 |
12/1874 |
01/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2169 |
|
1871 |
12/1874 |
08/1904 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2175 |
|
1902 |
12/1874 |
11/1894 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2220 |
|
2004 |
1875 |
08/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
653 |
|
1872 |
01/1875 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
684 |
|
1873 |
01/1875 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
716 |
|
1874 |
01/1875 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
807 |
|
1875 |
01/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1121 |
|
1876 |
01/1875 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1122 |
|
1877 |
01/1875 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1123 |
|
1878 |
01/1875 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1124 |
|
1879 |
01/1875 |
02/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1125 |
|
1880 |
01/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1126 |
|
1881 |
01/1875 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1127 |
|
1882 |
01/1875 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1128 |
|
1883 |
01/1875 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1129 |
|
1884 |
01/1875 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1131 |
|
1885 |
01/1875 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1133 |
|
1886 |
01/1875 |
06/1925 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2176 |
|
1903 |
02/1875 |
02/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2177 |
|
1904 |
03/1875 |
08/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2178 |
|
1905 |
03/1875 |
01/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2179 |
|
1906 |
03/1875 |
05/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2180 |
|
1907 |
03/1875 |
03/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2181 |
|
1908 |
03/1875 |
07/1907 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2184 |
|
1909 |
03/1875 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2183 |
|
1910 |
03/1875 |
05/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2184 |
|
1911 |
03/1875 |
05/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2185 |
|
1912 |
04/1875 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2186 |
|
1913 |
04/1875 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2187 |
|
1914 |
04/1875 |
12/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2188 |
|
1915 |
04/1875 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2189 |
|
1916 |
04/1875 |
07/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2190 |
|
1917 |
04/1875 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2191 |
|
1918 |
04/1875 |
14/11/1934 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2192 |
|
1919 |
04/1875 |
01/1894 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1134 |
|
1887 |
05/1875 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1135 |
|
1888 |
05/1875 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1136 |
|
1889 |
05/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1137 |
|
1890 |
05/1875 |
01/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
122 |
|
1891 |
05/1875 |
10/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
170 |
|
1892 |
05/1875 |
1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
172 |
|
1893 |
05/1875 |
05/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
175 |
|
1894 |
05/1875 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
964 |
|
1895 |
05/1875 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1196 |
|
1896 |
05/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2170 |
|
1897 |
05/1875 |
02/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2171 |
|
1898 |
05/1875 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2172 |
|
1899 |
05/1875 |
16/10/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2173 |
|
1900 |
05/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2174 |
|
1901 |
05/1875 |
03/1947 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2193 |
|
1920 |
05/1875 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2194 |
|
1921 |
05/1875 |
10/1896 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
181 |
|
1922 |
06/1875 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
203 |
|
1923 |
06/1875 |
14/03/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
37 |
|
1924 |
06/1875 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
41 |
|
1925 |
06/1875 |
1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
46 |
|
1926 |
06/1875 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
55 |
|
1927 |
06/1875 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
58 |
|
1928 |
06/1875 |
12/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
78 |
|
1929 |
06/1875 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
82 |
|
1930 |
06/1875 |
01/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
83 |
|
1931 |
06/1875 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
89 |
|
1932 |
07/1875 |
03/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
100 |
|
1933 |
07/1875 |
04/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
101 |
|
1934 |
07/1875 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
105 |
|
1935 |
07/1875 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
106 |
|
1936 |
07/1875 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
108 |
|
1937 |
07/1875 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
112 |
|
1938 |
07/1875 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
171 |
|
1939 |
07/1875 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
174 |
|
1940 |
07/1875 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
877 |
|
1941 |
07/1875 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2195 |
|
1964 |
08/1875 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2196 |
|
1965 |
08/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2197 |
|
1966 |
08/1875 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2198 |
|
1967 |
08/1875 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2199 |
|
1968 |
08/1875 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2200 |
|
1969 |
08/1875 |
04/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2201 |
|
1970 |
08/1875 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2202 |
|
1971 |
08/1875 |
1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2203 |
|
1972 |
08/1875 |
06/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2204 |
|
1973 |
09/1875 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2205 |
|
1974 |
09/1875 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2206 |
|
1975 |
09/1875 |
03/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2207 |
|
1976 |
09/1875 |
02/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2208 |
|
1977 |
09/1875 |
11/1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2209 |
|
1978 |
09/1875 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2210 |
|
1979 |
09/1875 |
07/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2211 |
|
1980 |
09/1875 |
03/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2212 |
|
1981 |
09/1875 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2213 |
|
1982 |
09/1875 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2214 |
|
1983 |
09/1875 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2221 |
|
2005 |
11/1875 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2222 |
|
2006 |
11/1875 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2223 |
|
2007 |
11/1875 |
02/1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2224 |
|
2008 |
11/1875 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2231 |
|
2015 |
1876 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2225 |
|
2009 |
02/1876 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2226 |
|
2010 |
02/1876 |
1945 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2227 |
|
2011 |
02/1876 |
08/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2228 |
|
2012 |
02/1876 |
02/1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2229 |
|
2013 |
02/1876 |
11/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2230 |
|
2014 |
02/1876 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
62 |
|
2016 |
03/1876 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
225 |
|
2017 |
03/1876 |
06/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1114 |
|
2018 |
03/1876 |
08/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1119 |
|
2019 |
03/1876 |
07/1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
775 |
|
2020 |
03/1876 |
06/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
650 |
|
2021 |
03/1876 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1161 |
|
2022 |
03/1876 |
05/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1195 |
|
2023 |
04/1876 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
878 |
|
2078 |
06/1876 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2233 |
|
2000 |
08/1876 |
11/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2234 |
|
1984 |
09/1876 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2235 |
|
1985 |
09/1876 |
11/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2236 |
|
1986 |
09/1876 |
11/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2237 |
|
1987 |
09/1876 |
11/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2238 |
|
1988 |
09/1876 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2239 |
|
1989 |
10/1876 |
01/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2240 |
|
1990 |
10/1876 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2241 |
|
1991 |
10/1876 |
01/1897 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
370 |
|
2054 |
11/1876 |
08/1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
856 |
|
2055 |
11/1876 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
884 |
|
2056 |
11/1876 |
12/1908 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
918 |
|
2057 |
11/1876 |
02/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
962 |
|
2058 |
11/1876 |
03/1920 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1006 |
|
2059 |
11/1876 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1110 |
|
2060 |
11/1876 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1142 |
|
2061 |
11/1876 |
03/10/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1179 |
|
2062 |
11/1876 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
12 |
|
2063 |
11/1876 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
18 |
|
2064 |
11/1876 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
40 |
|
2065 |
11/1876 |
03/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
920 |
|
2066 |
11/1876 |
02/1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
924 |
|
2067 |
11/1876 |
05/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2253 |
|
2068 |
11/1876 |
10/1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2254 |
|
2069 |
11/1876 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2255 |
|
2070 |
11/1876 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2256 |
|
2071 |
11/1876 |
08/11/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2257 |
|
2072 |
11/1876 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2258 |
|
2073 |
11/1876 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2242 |
|
1992 |
11/1876 |
10/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2243 |
|
1993 |
11/1876 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2244 |
|
1994 |
11/1876 |
07/1930 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2245 |
|
1995 |
11/1876 |
07/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2246 |
|
1996 |
12/1876 |
04/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2247 |
|
1997 |
12/1876 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2248 |
|
1998 |
12/1876 |
1925 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2249 |
|
1999 |
12/1876 |
12/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2250 |
|
2001 |
12/1876 |
01/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2251 |
|
2002 |
12/1876 |
03/1896 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
881 |
|
2081 |
1877 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
882 |
|
2082 |
1877 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
911 |
|
2083 |
1877 |
08/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2268 |
|
2084 |
1877 |
08/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2269 |
|
2085 |
1877 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2270 |
|
2086 |
1877 |
10/1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2271 |
|
2087 |
1877 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2272 |
|
2088 |
1877 |
10/1903 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2252 |
|
2003 |
01/1877 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2273 |
|
2089 |
03/1877 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2274 |
|
2090 |
03/1877 |
01/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2275 |
|
2091 |
03/1877 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2276 |
|
2092 |
03/1877 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2277 |
|
2093 |
03/1877 |
01/1915 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
890 |
|
2034 |
04/1877 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1177 |
|
2035 |
04/1877 |
03/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
857 |
|
2036 |
04/1877 |
07/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
858 |
|
2037 |
05/1877 |
05/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
860 |
|
2038 |
05/1877 |
11/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
861 |
|
2039 |
05/1877 |
09/1901 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
862 |
|
2040 |
05/1877 |
07/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
863 |
|
2041 |
05/1877 |
10/1907 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
864 |
|
2042 |
05/1877 |
03/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
865 |
|
2043 |
05/1877 |
07/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
866 |
|
2044 |
05/1877 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1189 |
|
2045 |
05/1877 |
06/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
883 |
|
2046 |
05/1877 |
08/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1105 |
|
2047 |
05/1877 |
12/1897 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
858 |
|
3745 |
05/1877 |
07/1912 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
873 |
|
2074 |
06/1877 |
10/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
874 |
|
2075 |
06/1877 |
08/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
875 |
|
2076 |
06/1877 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
876 |
|
2077 |
06/1877 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
879 |
|
2079 |
06/1877 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
867 |
|
2048 |
06/1877 |
07/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
868 |
|
2049 |
06/1877 |
10/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
869 |
|
2050 |
06/1877 |
11/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
870 |
|
2051 |
06/1877 |
03/1898 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
871 |
|
2052 |
06/1877 |
05/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
872 |
|
2053 |
06/1877 |
08/1895 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
880 |
|
2080 |
07/1877 |
08/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
862 |
|
3779 |
07/1877 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1184 |
|
2114 |
09/1877 |
09/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1185 |
|
2115 |
09/1877 |
04/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
951 |
|
2116 |
09/1877 |
09/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1167 |
|
2117 |
09/1877 |
12/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1176 |
|
2118 |
09/1877 |
02/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
681 |
|
2119 |
09/1877 |
02/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
896 |
|
2120 |
09/1877 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
892 |
|
2121 |
09/1877 |
04/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
842 |
|
2122 |
10/1877 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2279 |
|
2124 |
10/1877 |
04/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2280 |
|
2125 |
10/1877 |
06/1924 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2281 |
|
2126 |
12/1877 |
12/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2282 |
|
2127 |
12/1877 |
08/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2283 |
|
2128 |
12/1877 |
12/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2284 |
|
2129 |
12/1877 |
05/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2285 |
|
2130 |
12/1877 |
11/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2286 |
|
2131 |
12/1877 |
05/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2287 |
|
2132 |
12/1877 |
02/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
2288 |
|
2133 |
12/1877 |
01/1898 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1186 |
|
2149 |
1878 |
03/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
916 |
|
2151 |
1878 |
10/1903 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1138 |
|
2152 |
1878 |
03/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1140 |
|
2153 |
1878 |
06/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2290 |
|
2135 |
01/1878 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2291 |
|
2136 |
01/1878 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2292 |
|
2137 |
01/1878 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2293 |
|
2138 |
01/1878 |
05/1919 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2294 |
|
2139 |
01/1878 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2295 |
|
2140 |
01/1878 |
06/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2296 |
|
2141 |
01/1878 |
11/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2297 |
|
2142 |
01/1878 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2298 |
|
2143 |
01/1878 |
14/02/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2299 |
|
2144 |
02/1878 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2300 |
|
2145 |
02/1878 |
03/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2301 |
|
2146 |
02/1878 |
10/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2302 |
|
2147 |
02/1878 |
11/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1172 |
|
2148 |
02/1878 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
915 |
|
2150 |
02/1878 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1173 |
|
2219 |
08/1878 |
01/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1193 |
|
2220 |
08/1878 |
08/1896 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1149 |
|
2231 |
09/1878 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1194 |
|
2221 |
09/1878 |
12/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
749 |
|
2222 |
09/1878 |
05/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
517 |
|
2223 |
09/1878 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1170 |
|
2224 |
09/1878 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
919 |
|
2225 |
09/1878 |
12/1893 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
193 |
|
2226 |
09/1878 |
03/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1183 |
|
2227 |
09/1878 |
08/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1187 |
|
2228 |
09/1878 |
07/1896 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1147 |
|
2229 |
10/1878 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1148 |
|
2230 |
10/1878 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1150 |
|
2232 |
10/1878 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1151 |
|
2233 |
10/1878 |
05/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1169 |
|
2235 |
10/1878 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1174 |
|
2236 |
10/1878 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
697 |
|
2237 |
10/1878 |
04/1894 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
847 |
|
2238 |
10/1878 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1165 |
|
2234 |
11/1878 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
155 |
|
2333 |
12/1878 |
17/08/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2336 |
|
2261 |
1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2337 |
|
2262 |
1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2344 |
|
2269 |
1879 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1158 |
|
2273 |
1879 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1159 |
|
2274 |
1879 |
06/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
968 |
|
2259 |
01/1879 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
614 |
|
2260 |
01/1879 |
03/1952 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
431 |
|
2249 |
01/1879 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
838 |
|
2250 |
01/1879 |
09/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
481 |
|
2251 |
01/1879 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
626 |
|
2252 |
01/1879 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
255 |
|
2253 |
01/1879 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
680 |
|
2254 |
01/1879 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
668 |
|
2240 |
01/1879 |
04/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
669 |
|
2241 |
01/1879 |
09/1895 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
351 |
|
2242 |
01/1879 |
06/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1181 |
|
2243 |
01/1879 |
03/1898 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
841 |
|
2244 |
01/1879 |
11/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1178 |
|
2245 |
01/1879 |
04/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1188 |
|
2246 |
01/1879 |
12/1897 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1191 |
|
2247 |
01/1879 |
08/1896 |
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
1192 |
|
2248 |
01/1879 |
10/1895 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
71 |
|
2239 |
01/1879 |
12/1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2338 |
|
2263 |
02/1879 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2339 |
|
2264 |
02/1879 |
09/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2340 |
|
2265 |
02/1879 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2341 |
|
2266 |
02/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2342 |
|
2267 |
02/1879 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2343 |
|
2268 |
02/1879 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
338 |
|
2255 |
02/1879 |
12/1892 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
718 |
|
2256 |
02/1879 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
779 |
|
2257 |
02/1879 |
06/1893 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
2-4-0 |
1180 |
|
2258 |
02/1879 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2345 |
|
2270 |
03/1879 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
713 |
|
2271 |
03/1879 |
08/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
670 |
|
2272 |
03/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2346 |
|
2275 |
04/1879 |
01/08/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2347 |
|
2276 |
04/1879 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2348 |
|
2277 |
04/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2349 |
|
2278 |
04/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
849 |
|
2319 |
10/1879 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
17 |
|
2320 |
10/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
21 |
|
2321 |
10/1879 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
24 |
|
2322 |
10/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
27 |
|
2323 |
10/1879 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
138 |
|
2324 |
11/1879 |
07/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
72 |
|
2325 |
11/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
116 |
|
2326 |
11/1879 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
126 |
|
2327 |
12/1879 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
137 |
|
2328 |
12/1879 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
143 |
|
2329 |
12/1879 |
04/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
146 |
|
2330 |
12/1879 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
153 |
|
2331 |
12/1879 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
154 |
|
2332 |
12/1879 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
159 |
|
2334 |
12/1879 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
160 |
|
2335 |
12/1879 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
162 |
|
2336 |
12/1879 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2382 |
|
2375 |
1880 |
06/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
163 |
|
2337 |
01/1880 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
176 |
|
2338 |
01/1880 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
361 |
|
2309 |
03/1880 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
228 |
|
2310 |
04/1880 |
01/1911 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2360 |
|
2214 |
05/1880 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2361 |
|
2215 |
05/1880 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2362 |
|
2216 |
05/1880 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2363 |
|
2217 |
05/1880 |
02/1926 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2364 |
|
2218 |
05/1880 |
1942 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
677 |
|
2311 |
05/1880 |
12/1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
979 |
|
2312 |
05/1880 |
01/1914 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2365 |
|
2379 |
06/1880 |
07/04/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2366 |
|
2359 |
06/1880 |
06/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2367 |
|
2360 |
06/1880 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2368 |
|
2361 |
06/1880 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2369 |
|
2362 |
06/1880 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2370 |
|
2363 |
06/1880 |
1945 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2371 |
|
2364 |
06/1880 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2372 |
|
2365 |
06/1880 |
10/1919 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
917 |
|
2313 |
06/1880 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
322 |
|
2314 |
06/1880 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
326 |
|
2315 |
06/1880 |
01/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
327 |
|
2316 |
06/1880 |
09/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
328 |
|
2317 |
06/1880 |
11/1912 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2373 |
|
2366 |
07/1880 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2374 |
|
2367 |
07/1880 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2375 |
|
2368 |
07/1880 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2376 |
|
2369 |
07/1880 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2377 |
|
2370 |
07/1880 |
02/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2378 |
|
2371 |
07/1880 |
08/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2379 |
|
2372 |
07/1880 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2380 |
|
2373 |
07/1880 |
05/06/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2381 |
|
2374 |
07/1880 |
|
LNWR |
2234 |
2-4-0T |
329 |
|
2318 |
07/1880 |
02/1898 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
226 |
|
2376 |
08/1880 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
352 |
|
2377 |
08/1880 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
354 |
|
2378 |
08/1880 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
360 |
|
2380 |
08/1880 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
362 |
|
2381 |
08/1880 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
375 |
|
2382 |
08/1880 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
376 |
|
2383 |
08/1880 |
03/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2383 |
|
2384 |
08/1880 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2384 |
|
2385 |
08/1880 |
05/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2385 |
|
2386 |
08/1880 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2386 |
|
2387 |
08/1880 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2387 |
|
2388 |
08/1880 |
12/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2388 |
|
2389 |
08/1880 |
07/1901 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2389 |
|
2390 |
08/1880 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
619 |
|
2400 |
10/1880 |
02/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
789 |
|
2401 |
10/1880 |
07/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
477 |
|
2402 |
11/1880 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
478 |
|
2403 |
11/1880 |
08/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
480 |
|
2404 |
11/1880 |
02/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
482 |
|
2405 |
11/1880 |
01/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
506 |
|
2406 |
11/1880 |
07/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
512 |
|
2407 |
11/1880 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
514 |
|
2408 |
11/1880 |
10/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
945 |
|
2409 |
11/1880 |
05/1895 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2390 |
|
2391 |
12/1880 |
03/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2391 |
|
2392 |
12/1880 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2392 |
|
2393 |
12/1880 |
05/1915 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2393 |
|
2394 |
12/1880 |
09/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2394 |
|
2395 |
12/1880 |
10/1940 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2395 |
|
2396 |
12/1880 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2396 |
|
2397 |
12/1880 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2397 |
|
2398 |
12/1880 |
29/05/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2398 |
|
2399 |
12/1880 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2399 |
|
2410 |
12/1880 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2400 |
|
2411 |
12/1880 |
04/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2401 |
|
2412 |
12/1880 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2402 |
|
2413 |
12/1880 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
233 |
|
2414 |
12/1880 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
700 |
|
2415 |
12/1880 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
720 |
|
2416 |
12/1880 |
09/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
993 |
|
2417 |
12/1880 |
1933 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
238 |
|
2431 |
1881 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
250 |
|
2432 |
1881 |
08/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
56 |
|
2433 |
1881 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2359 |
|
2434 |
1881 |
08/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1108 |
|
2435 |
1881 |
10/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
783 |
|
2436 |
1881 |
04/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
963 |
|
2437 |
1881 |
09/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
289 |
|
2438 |
1881 |
01/1912 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
845 |
|
2418 |
01/1881 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1010 |
|
2419 |
01/1881 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1103 |
|
2420 |
01/1881 |
03/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
43 |
|
2421 |
01/1881 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
45 |
|
2422 |
01/1881 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
48 |
|
2423 |
01/1881 |
07/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
53 |
|
2424 |
01/1881 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
704 |
|
2425 |
01/1881 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
714 |
|
2426 |
01/1881 |
04/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
961 |
|
2427 |
01/1881 |
01/1919 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
851 |
|
2428 |
01/1881 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
750 |
|
2429 |
01/1881 |
1933 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
956 |
|
2430 |
03/1881 |
04/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2403 |
|
2440 |
05/1881 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2404 |
|
2441 |
05/1881 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2405 |
|
2442 |
05/1881 |
03/10/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2406 |
|
2443 |
05/1881 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2407 |
|
2444 |
05/1881 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2408 |
|
2445 |
05/1881 |
05/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2409 |
|
2446 |
05/1881 |
08/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2410 |
|
2447 |
05/1881 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2411 |
|
2448 |
05/1881 |
06/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2412 |
|
2449 |
05/1881 |
24/04/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2413 |
|
2450 |
05/1881 |
04/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2414 |
|
2451 |
05/1881 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2415 |
|
2452 |
05/1881 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2416 |
|
2453 |
05/1881 |
24/01/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2417 |
|
2454 |
05/1881 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2418 |
|
2455 |
05/1881 |
|
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
57 |
|
2439 |
05/1881 |
03/1919 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2419 |
|
2456 |
06/1881 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2420 |
|
2457 |
06/1881 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2421 |
|
2458 |
06/1881 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2422 |
|
2459 |
06/1881 |
17/08/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2423 |
|
2460 |
06/1881 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2424 |
|
2461 |
06/1881 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2425 |
|
2462 |
06/1881 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2426 |
|
2463 |
06/1881 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2427 |
|
2464 |
06/1881 |
04/1918 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2428 |
|
2465 |
06/1881 |
05/1913 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2429 |
|
2466 |
06/1881 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2430 |
|
2467 |
06/1881 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2431 |
|
2468 |
06/1881 |
03/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2432 |
|
2469 |
06/1881 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
602 |
|
2470 |
09/1881 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
627 |
|
2471 |
09/1881 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
971 |
|
2472 |
09/1881 |
01/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
703 |
|
2473 |
09/1881 |
08/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
957 |
|
2474 |
09/1881 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
766 |
|
2475 |
09/1881 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1060 |
|
2476 |
09/1881 |
12/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
102 |
|
2477 |
09/1881 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
119 |
|
2478 |
09/1881 |
02/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
141 |
|
2479 |
09/1881 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
313 |
|
2480 |
10/1881 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
205 |
|
2481 |
10/1881 |
31/12/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
207 |
|
2482 |
10/1881 |
02/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
208 |
|
2483 |
10/1881 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
227 |
|
2484 |
10/1881 |
11/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
68 |
|
2485 |
10/1881 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
850 |
|
2486 |
10/1881 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
232 |
|
2487 |
10/1881 |
13/11/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
239 |
|
2488 |
11/1881 |
18/09/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
241 |
|
2489 |
11/1881 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
242 |
|
2490 |
11/1881 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
243 |
|
2491 |
11/1881 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
244 |
|
2492 |
11/1881 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
246 |
|
2493 |
12/1881 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
247 |
|
2494 |
12/1881 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
248 |
|
2495 |
12/1881 |
04/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
249 |
|
2496 |
12/1881 |
08/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
251 |
|
2497 |
12/1881 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
252 |
|
2498 |
12/1881 |
09/04/1955 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
142 |
|
2499 |
12/1881 |
07/1922 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
621 |
|
2516 |
1882 |
08/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
630 |
|
2517 |
1882 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
67 |
|
2518 |
1882 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
705 |
|
2521 |
1882 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1011 |
|
2522 |
1882 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1071 |
|
2524 |
1882 |
04/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
217 |
|
2525 |
1882 |
01/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
888 |
|
2526 |
1882 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
131 |
|
2527 |
1882 |
03/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
132 |
|
2528 |
1882 |
03/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
136 |
|
2529 |
1882 |
06/1915 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1002 |
|
2530 |
1882 |
12/1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
887 |
|
2531 |
1882 |
1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
707 |
|
2532 |
1882 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
524 |
|
2533 |
1882 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
674 |
|
2534 |
1882 |
07/1912 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2453 |
|
2511 |
01/1882 |
1942 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2454 |
|
2512 |
01/1882 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2455 |
|
2513 |
01/1882 |
08/1926 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2456 |
|
2514 |
01/1882 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
2360 |
0-4-0WT |
2457 |
|
2515 |
01/1882 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
66 |
|
2500 |
01/1882 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
253 |
|
2501 |
01/1882 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
254 |
|
2502 |
01/1882 |
02/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
256 |
|
2503 |
01/1882 |
08/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
257 |
|
2504 |
01/1882 |
04/1915 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
260 |
|
2505 |
01/1882 |
10/1895 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
262 |
|
2506 |
01/1882 |
01/1897 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
264 |
|
2507 |
01/1882 |
01/1896 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
265 |
|
2508 |
01/1882 |
07/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
364 |
|
2509 |
02/1882 |
08/1894 |
LNWR |
Precedent |
2-4-0 |
955 |
|
2510 |
02/1882 |
10/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
798 |
|
2519 |
03/1882 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
965 |
|
2520 |
03/1882 |
04/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
969 |
|
2523 |
04/1882 |
1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2433 |
|
2536 |
07/1882 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2434 |
|
2537 |
07/1882 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2435 |
|
2538 |
07/1882 |
21/01/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2436 |
|
2539 |
07/1882 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2437 |
|
2540 |
07/1882 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2438 |
|
2541 |
07/1882 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2439 |
|
2542 |
07/1882 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2440 |
|
2543 |
07/1882 |
14/04/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2441 |
|
2544 |
07/1882 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2442 |
|
2545 |
07/1882 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2443 |
|
2546 |
07/1882 |
01/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2444 |
|
2547 |
07/1882 |
10/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2445 |
|
2548 |
07/1882 |
1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2446 |
|
2549 |
07/1882 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2447 |
|
2550 |
07/1882 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2448 |
|
2551 |
07/1882 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2449 |
|
2552 |
07/1882 |
1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1107 |
|
2535 |
07/1882 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2458 |
|
2556 |
08/1882 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2459 |
|
2557 |
08/1882 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2460 |
|
2558 |
08/1882 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2461 |
|
2559 |
08/1882 |
07/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2462 |
|
2560 |
08/1882 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2463 |
|
2561 |
08/1882 |
30/09/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
996 |
|
2562 |
08/1882 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
991 |
|
2563 |
08/1882 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
701 |
|
2564 |
08/1882 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
770 |
|
2565 |
08/1882 |
30/04/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
605 |
|
2566 |
08/1882 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
611 |
|
2567 |
09/1882 |
08/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
682 |
|
2568 |
09/1882 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
292 |
|
2569 |
09/1882 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
679 |
|
2570 |
09/1882 |
31/08/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
717 |
|
2571 |
09/1882 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
140 |
|
2572 |
09/1882 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
157 |
|
2573 |
09/1882 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
158 |
|
2574 |
09/1882 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
267 |
|
2575 |
09/1882 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
693 |
|
2585 |
09/1882 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
997 |
|
2586 |
09/1882 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
268 |
|
2587 |
09/1882 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
269 |
|
2588 |
09/1882 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
270 |
|
2589 |
09/1882 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2464 |
|
2576 |
10/1882 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2465 |
|
2577 |
11/1882 |
24/02/1951 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2466 |
|
2578 |
11/1882 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2467 |
|
2579 |
11/1882 |
17/05/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2468 |
|
2580 |
11/1882 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2469 |
|
2581 |
11/1882 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2470 |
|
2582 |
11/1882 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2471 |
|
2583 |
11/1882 |
09/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2472 |
|
2584 |
11/1882 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2450 |
|
2553 |
11/1882 |
05/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2451 |
|
2554 |
11/1882 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2452 |
|
2555 |
11/1882 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2494 |
|
2675 |
1883 |
08/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2495 |
|
2676 |
1883 |
04/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2496 |
|
2677 |
1883 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2497 |
|
2678 |
1883 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2498 |
|
2679 |
1883 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2499 |
|
2680 |
1883 |
02/1920 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2512 |
|
2693 |
1883 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
272 |
|
2590 |
01/1883 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
273 |
|
2591 |
01/1883 |
11/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
274 |
|
2592 |
01/1883 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
277 |
|
2593 |
01/1883 |
08/1955 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
281 |
|
2594 |
01/1883 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
673 |
|
2595 |
01/1883 |
06/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
797 |
|
2596 |
01/1883 |
11/1944 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1009 |
|
2597 |
01/1883 |
16/10/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
629 |
|
2598 |
02/1883 |
11/1944 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
747 |
|
2599 |
02/1883 |
24/05/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1015 |
|
2600 |
02/1883 |
09/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
671 |
|
2601 |
02/1883 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
607 |
|
2602 |
02/1883 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
690 |
|
2603 |
02/1883 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
615 |
|
2604 |
02/1883 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2473 |
|
2605 |
02/1883 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2474 |
|
2606 |
02/1883 |
05/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2475 |
|
2607 |
02/1883 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2476 |
|
2608 |
02/1883 |
09/1944 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2477 |
|
2609 |
02/1883 |
07/1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2478 |
|
2610 |
02/1883 |
06/1926 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
300 |
|
2625 |
02/1883 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2479 |
|
2611 |
03/1883 |
05/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2480 |
|
2612 |
03/1883 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2481 |
|
2613 |
03/1883 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2482 |
|
2614 |
03/1883 |
03/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2483 |
|
2615 |
03/1883 |
07/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2484 |
|
2616 |
03/1883 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2485 |
|
2617 |
03/1883 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2486 |
|
2618 |
03/1883 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2487 |
|
2619 |
03/1883 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
301 |
|
2626 |
03/1883 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2488 |
|
2620 |
04/1883 |
07/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2489 |
|
2621 |
04/1883 |
04/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2490 |
|
2622 |
04/1883 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2491 |
|
2623 |
04/1883 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2492 |
|
2624 |
04/1883 |
09/1926 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
302 |
|
2627 |
04/1883 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
303 |
|
2628 |
04/1883 |
01/1905 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
691 |
|
2629 |
05/1883 |
10/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1014 |
|
2630 |
05/1883 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
891 |
|
2631 |
05/1883 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
894 |
|
2632 |
05/1883 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
686 |
|
2633 |
05/1883 |
06/1919 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1059 |
|
2634 |
05/1883 |
11/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
769 |
|
2635 |
05/1883 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
282 |
|
2636 |
05/1883 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
284 |
|
2637 |
05/1883 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
286 |
|
2638 |
05/1883 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
287 |
|
2639 |
05/1883 |
1933 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
288 |
|
2640 |
05/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
294 |
|
2641 |
06/1883 |
01/1925 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
297 |
|
2642 |
06/1883 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
298 |
|
2643 |
06/1883 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
299 |
|
2644 |
06/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
952 |
|
2649 |
07/1883 |
10/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
953 |
|
2650 |
07/1883 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
617 |
|
2651 |
07/1883 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
678 |
|
2652 |
07/1883 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
518 |
|
2653 |
07/1883 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
694 |
|
2654 |
07/1883 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
692 |
|
2655 |
07/1883 |
10/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
698 |
|
2656 |
07/1883 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
780 |
|
2657 |
07/1883 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
959 |
|
2658 |
07/1883 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1004 |
|
2659 |
07/1883 |
09/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
42 |
|
2660 |
07/1883 |
07/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
110 |
|
2661 |
07/1883 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
148 |
|
2662 |
07/1883 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
305 |
|
2669 |
07/1883 |
06/1904 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
306 |
|
2670 |
07/1883 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
307 |
|
2671 |
07/1883 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
520 |
|
2672 |
07/1883 |
04/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
519 |
|
2673 |
07/1883 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
§21 |
|
2645 |
07/1883 |
01/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
522 |
|
2646 |
07/1883 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
523 |
|
2647 |
07/1883 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
529 |
|
2648 |
07/1883 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
150 |
|
2663 |
08/1883 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
169 |
|
2664 |
08/1883 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
178 |
|
2665 |
08/1883 |
01/1920 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
179 |
|
2666 |
08/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
223 |
|
2667 |
08/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
259 |
|
2668 |
08/1883 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2493 |
|
2674 |
09/1883 |
05/1925 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1106 |
|
2694 |
10/1883 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1109 |
|
2695 |
10/1883 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2500 |
|
2681 |
10/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2501 |
|
2682 |
10/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2502 |
|
2683 |
10/1883 |
1902 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2503 |
|
2684 |
10/1883 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2504 |
|
2685 |
10/1883 |
06/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2505 |
|
2686 |
10/1883 |
1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2506 |
|
2687 |
10/1883 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2507 |
|
2688 |
10/1883 |
11/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2508 |
|
2689 |
10/1883 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2509 |
|
2690 |
10/1883 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2510 |
|
2691 |
10/1883 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2511 |
|
2692 |
10/1883 |
02/1920 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
324 |
|
2696 |
11/1883 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
848 |
|
2697 |
11/1883 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1101 |
|
2698 |
11/1883 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1112 |
|
2699 |
11/1883 |
10/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
373 |
|
2700 |
11/1883 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1118 |
|
2701 |
11/1883 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
981 |
|
2702 |
11/1883 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
491 |
|
2703 |
11/1883 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
149 |
|
2704 |
12/1883 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1013 |
|
2705 |
12/1883 |
02/10/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
367 |
|
2706 |
12/1883 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
489 |
|
2707 |
12/1883 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
490 |
|
2708 |
12/1883 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
492 |
|
2709 |
12/1883 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
3 |
|
2732 |
1884 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
925 |
|
2710 |
01/1884 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
926 |
|
2711 |
01/1884 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
927 |
|
2712 |
01/1884 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
928 |
|
2713 |
01/1884 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
311 |
|
2734 |
01/1884 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
315 |
|
2735 |
02/1884 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
321 |
|
2736 |
02/1884 |
01/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
323 |
|
2737 |
02/1884 |
03/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
333 |
|
2738 |
02/1884 |
11/1904 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
353 |
|
2739 |
02/1884 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
363 |
|
2740 |
02/1884 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
365 |
|
2741 |
03/1884 |
04/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
366 |
|
2742 |
03/1884 |
05/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
310 |
|
2743 |
03/1884 |
11/1904 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
880 |
|
2725 |
03/1884 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1017 |
|
2726 |
03/1884 |
08/1902 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
708 |
|
2727 |
03/1884 |
02/1925 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
6 |
|
2779 |
04/1884 |
08/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
8 |
|
2780 |
04/1884 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
23 |
|
2781 |
04/1884 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
30 |
|
2782 |
04/1884 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
32 |
|
2783 |
04/1884 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
768 |
|
2728 |
04/1884 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1073 |
|
2729 |
04/1884 |
06/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1056 |
|
2730 |
04/1884 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
946 |
|
2731 |
04/1884 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1102 |
|
2744 |
05/1884 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2513 |
|
2714 |
05/1884 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2514 |
|
2715 |
05/1884 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2515 |
|
2716 |
05/1884 |
06/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2516 |
|
2717 |
05/1884 |
1919 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2517 |
|
2718 |
05/1884 |
08/1922 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2518 |
|
2719 |
05/1884 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2519 |
|
2720 |
05/1884 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2520 |
|
2721 |
05/1884 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2521 |
|
2722 |
05/1884 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2522 |
|
2723 |
05/1884 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2523 |
|
2724 |
05/1884 |
05/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
5 |
|
2733 |
05/1884 |
01/1927 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1120 |
|
2745 |
06/1884 |
12/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1104 |
|
2746 |
06/1884 |
01/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1113 |
|
2747 |
06/1884 |
08/1904 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1111 |
|
2748 |
06/1884 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1057 |
|
2774 |
07/1884 |
07/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
948 |
|
2775 |
07/1884 |
07/1927 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1115 |
|
2749 |
07/1884 |
03/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1116 |
|
2750 |
07/1884 |
08/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1117 |
|
2751 |
07/1884 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
372 |
|
2752 |
07/1884 |
06/1905 |
LNWR |
Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 |
2-(2-2)-0 |
374 |
|
2753 |
07/1884 |
09/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
751 |
|
2777 |
08/1884 |
04/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
152 |
|
2776 |
09/1884 |
1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
994 |
|
2778 |
09/1884 |
07/1922 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
63 |
|
2784 |
09/1884 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
145 |
|
2785 |
09/1884 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
186 |
|
2786 |
09/1884 |
10/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
161 |
|
2787 |
09/1884 |
03/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
258 |
|
2788 |
09/1884 |
07/1927 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
503 |
|
2795 |
09/1884 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1005 |
|
2789 |
10/1884 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
947 |
|
2790 |
10/1884 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
949 |
|
2791 |
10/1884 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
950 |
|
2792 |
10/1884 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
483 |
|
2793 |
10/1884 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
508 |
|
2796 |
10/1884 |
02/1904 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
603 |
|
2754 |
11/1884 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
740 |
|
2755 |
11/1884 |
01/1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
765 |
|
2756 |
11/1884 |
1933 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
977 |
|
2757 |
11/1884 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
978 |
|
2758 |
11/1884 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
980 |
|
2759 |
11/1884 |
02/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
893 |
|
2760 |
11/1884 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
895 |
|
2761 |
11/1884 |
06/1922 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
989 |
|
2762 |
11/1884 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
990 |
|
2763 |
11/1884 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1003 |
|
2764 |
11/1884 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
998 |
|
2765 |
11/1884 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
999 |
|
2766 |
11/1884 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1060 |
|
2767 |
11/1884 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1001 |
|
2768 |
11/1884 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
992 |
|
2769 |
11/1884 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1008 |
|
2770 |
11/1884 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1058 |
|
2771 |
11/1884 |
07/1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1072 |
|
2772 |
11/1884 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1074 |
|
2773 |
11/1884 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
484 |
|
2805 |
12/1884 |
02/1920 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
652 |
|
2806 |
12/1884 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
699 |
|
2807 |
12/1884 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
771 |
|
2808 |
12/1884 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
782 |
|
2809 |
12/1884 |
11/1922 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
796 |
|
2810 |
12/1884 |
31/12/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
958 |
|
2811 |
12/1884 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1357 |
|
2825 |
1885 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1359 |
|
2827 |
1885 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1360 |
|
2828 |
1885 |
08/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1361 |
|
2829 |
1885 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1366 |
|
2834 |
1885 |
01/1911 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
966 |
|
2812 |
01/1885 |
19/06/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
970 |
|
2813 |
01/1885 |
07/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1012 |
|
2814 |
01/1885 |
07/1922 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1016 |
|
2815 |
01/1885 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1075 |
|
2816 |
01/1885 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1201 |
|
2817 |
01/1885 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1202 |
|
2818 |
01/1885 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1203 |
|
2819 |
01/1885 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1204 |
|
2820 |
01/1885 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1206 |
|
2821 |
01/1885 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1207 |
|
2822 |
01/1885 |
30/09/1955 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1208 |
|
2823 |
01/1885 |
28/08/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1209 |
|
2824 |
01/1885 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1358 |
|
2826 |
01/1885 |
01/1927 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
504 |
|
2797 |
02/1885 |
08/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
507 |
|
2798 |
03/1885 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
509 |
|
2799 |
03/1885 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1362 |
|
2830 |
03/1885 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1363 |
|
2831 |
03/1885 |
1905 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1364 |
|
2832 |
03/1885 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1365 |
|
2833 |
03/1885 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2362 |
|
2868 |
04/1885 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
510 |
|
2800 |
04/1885 |
05/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
511 |
|
2801 |
05/1885 |
08/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
513 |
|
2802 |
05/1885 |
03/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
515 |
|
2803 |
05/1885 |
11/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
685 |
|
2804 |
05/1885 |
09/1904 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1437 |
|
2835 |
07/1885 |
1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1438 |
|
2836 |
07/1885 |
12/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1439 |
|
2837 |
07/1885 |
1905 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1440 |
|
2838 |
07/1885 |
01/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1441 |
|
2839 |
07/1885 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1442 |
|
2840 |
07/1885 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1443 |
|
2841 |
07/1885 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1444 |
|
2842 |
07/1885 |
11/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1445 |
|
2843 |
07/1885 |
01/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1446 |
|
2844 |
07/1885 |
03/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
383 |
|
2845 |
07/1885 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
384 |
|
2846 |
07/1885 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
385 |
|
2847 |
07/1885 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
386 |
|
2848 |
07/1885 |
04/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
387 |
|
2849 |
07/1885 |
12/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
388 |
|
2850 |
07/1885 |
1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2065 |
|
2851 |
07/1885 |
1933 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2066 |
|
2852 |
07/1885 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2067 |
|
2853 |
07/1885 |
04/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2068 |
|
2854 |
07/1885 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2069 |
|
2855 |
07/1885 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2070 |
|
2856 |
07/1885 |
1902 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
389 |
|
2857 |
07/1885 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
390 |
|
2858 |
07/1885 |
02/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
391 |
|
2859 |
07/1885 |
1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
392 |
|
2860 |
07/1885 |
1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
835 |
|
2861 |
07/1885 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
216 |
|
2920 |
08/1885 |
06/1952 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
839 |
|
2862 |
08/1885 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
844 |
|
2863 |
08/1885 |
02/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
846 |
|
2864 |
08/1885 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
687 |
2-(2-2)-2T |
687 |
|
2885 |
10/1885 |
11/1901 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2055 |
|
2886 |
12/1885 |
01/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2056 |
|
2887 |
12/1885 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2057 |
|
2888 |
12/1885 |
07/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2058 |
|
2889 |
12/1885 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2059 |
|
2890 |
12/1885 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2060 |
|
2891 |
12/1885 |
07/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2061 |
|
2892 |
12/1885 |
04/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2062 |
|
2893 |
12/1885 |
07/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2063 |
|
2894 |
12/1885 |
09/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2064 |
|
2895 |
12/1885 |
03/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
173 |
|
2896 |
03/1886 |
08/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
2 |
|
2897 |
03/1886 |
06/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1210 |
|
2865 |
04/1886 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2360 |
|
2866 |
04/1886 |
08/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2361 |
|
2867 |
04/1886 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2363 |
|
2869 |
04/1886 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2364 |
|
2870 |
04/1886 |
12/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2453 |
|
2871 |
04/1886 |
01/1944 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2454 |
|
2872 |
04/1886 |
13/11/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2455 |
|
2873 |
04/1886 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2456 |
|
2874 |
04/1886 |
05/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2457 |
|
2875 |
04/1886 |
02/10/1948 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1539 |
|
2898 |
06/1886 |
07/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
410 |
|
2899 |
06/1886 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1353 |
|
2900 |
06/1886 |
07/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1370 |
|
2901 |
06/1886 |
01/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1395 |
|
2902 |
06/1886 |
03/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1379 |
|
2903 |
06/1886 |
02/1905 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
355 |
|
2876 |
07/1886 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
357 |
|
2877 |
07/1886 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
359 |
|
2878 |
07/1886 |
10/11/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
240 |
|
2879 |
07/1886 |
05/07/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
210 |
|
2880 |
07/1886 |
12/06/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
369 |
|
2881 |
07/1886 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
436 |
|
2882 |
07/1886 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
452 |
|
2883 |
07/1886 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
438 |
|
2884 |
07/1886 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
545 |
|
2904 |
07/1886 |
12/1903 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
659 |
|
2905 |
07/1886 |
05/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
120 |
|
2906 |
08/1886 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
261 |
|
2907 |
08/1886 |
28/08/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
266 |
|
2908 |
08/1886 |
30/09/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
215 |
|
2909 |
08/1886 |
16/12/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
293 |
|
2910 |
08/1886 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
296 |
|
2911 |
08/1886 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
192 |
|
2912 |
08/1886 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
211 |
|
2913 |
08/1886 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
220 |
|
2914 |
08/1886 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
440 |
|
2915 |
08/1886 |
09/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
221 |
|
2916 |
08/1886 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
237 |
|
2917 |
08/1886 |
09/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
123 |
|
2918 |
08/1886 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
183 |
|
2919 |
08/1886 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
407 |
|
2921 |
08/1886 |
31/03/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1338 |
|
2922 |
12/1886 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2010 |
|
2923 |
12/1886 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
442 |
|
2924 |
12/1886 |
05/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
429 |
|
2925 |
12/1886 |
02/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
411 |
|
2936 |
12/1886 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
417 |
|
2937 |
12/1886 |
07/10/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
224 |
|
2938 |
12/1886 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
549 |
|
2939 |
12/1886 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
551 |
|
2940 |
12/1886 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1220 |
|
2998 |
1887 |
03/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1487 |
|
2999 |
1887 |
04/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1670 |
|
3001 |
1887 |
12/1905 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
147 |
|
2926 |
02/1887 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
554 |
|
2941 |
02/1887 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
557 |
|
2942 |
02/1887 |
12/1944 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
558 |
|
2943 |
02/1887 |
24/04/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
579 |
|
2944 |
02/1887 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
567 |
|
2945 |
02/1887 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
568 |
|
2946 |
02/1887 |
1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
569 |
|
2947 |
02/1887 |
04/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
570 |
|
2948 |
02/1887 |
20/12/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
571 |
|
2949 |
02/1887 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
572 |
|
2950 |
02/1887 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
573 |
|
2951 |
02/1887 |
12/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
974 |
|
2952 |
02/1887 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
575 |
|
2953 |
02/1887 |
09/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
576 |
|
2954 |
02/1887 |
09/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
578 |
|
2955 |
02/1887 |
02/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1475 |
|
2927 |
03/1887 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1382 |
|
2928 |
03/1887 |
06/1951 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
343 |
|
2929 |
03/1887 |
07/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
34 |
|
2930 |
04/1887 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
532 |
|
2931 |
04/1887 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
598 |
|
2932 |
04/1887 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1026 |
|
2933 |
05/1887 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1022 |
|
2934 |
05/1887 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1025 |
|
2935 |
05/1887 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
129 |
|
2956 |
05/1887 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
443 |
|
2957 |
05/1887 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
135 |
|
2958 |
05/1887 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
580 |
|
2959 |
05/1887 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
582 |
|
2960 |
05/1887 |
14/08/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
584 |
|
2961 |
05/1887 |
1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
585 |
|
2962 |
05/1887 |
21/08/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
435 |
|
2963 |
05/1887 |
10/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
125 |
|
2964 |
05/1887 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
588 |
|
2965 |
05/1887 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
589 |
|
2966 |
05/1887 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
590 |
|
2967 |
06/1887 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
591 |
|
2968 |
06/1887 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
592 |
|
2969 |
06/1887 |
30/09/1954 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
594 |
|
2970 |
06/1887 |
11/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
595 |
|
2971 |
06/1887 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
596 |
|
2972 |
06/1887 |
30/09/1955 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
597 |
|
2973 |
06/1887 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
493 |
|
2974 |
06/1887 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
600 |
2-(2-2)-2T |
600 |
|
3000 |
06/1887 |
12/1901 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
271 |
|
2996 |
06/1887 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1132 |
|
2997 |
06/1887 |
05/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
325 |
|
2975 |
07/1887 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1027 |
|
3002 |
11/1887 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1028 |
|
3003 |
11/1887 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1029 |
|
3004 |
11/1887 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1030 |
|
3005 |
11/1887 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
777 |
2-(2-4)-0T |
777 |
|
2794 |
11/1887 |
11/1901 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
930 |
|
3006 |
12/1887 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
822 |
|
3007 |
12/1887 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
831 |
|
3008 |
12/1887 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
836 |
|
3009 |
12/1887 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
722 |
|
3010 |
12/1887 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
726 |
|
3011 |
12/1887 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1485 |
|
3022 |
12/1887 |
05/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1749 |
|
3023 |
01/1888 |
05/1915 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
275 |
|
3024 |
01/1888 |
12/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1522 |
|
3025 |
01/1888 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1679 |
|
3026 |
01/1888 |
12/1913 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1219 |
|
3027 |
01/1888 |
02/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1681 |
|
3028 |
02/1888 |
08/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1528 |
|
3029 |
02/1888 |
02/1916 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1527 |
|
3030 |
02/1888 |
05/1925 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
637 |
|
3012 |
03/1888 |
08/1904 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1669 |
|
3031 |
03/1888 |
01/1906 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
638 |
|
3013 |
04/1888 |
11/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
639 |
|
3014 |
05/1888 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
640 |
|
3015 |
05/1888 |
01/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
641 |
|
3016 |
05/1888 |
02/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
643 |
|
3017 |
05/1888 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
706 |
|
2976 |
06/1888 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
644 |
|
3018 |
06/1888 |
07/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
645 |
|
3019 |
06/1888 |
01/1905 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
647 |
|
3020 |
06/1888 |
04/1904 |
LNWR |
Dreadnought |
2-(2-2)-0 |
648 |
|
3021 |
06/1888 |
10/1904 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
753 |
|
2977 |
07/1888 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1053 |
|
2978 |
09/1888 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1054 |
|
2979 |
09/1888 |
31/10/1958 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1062 |
|
2980 |
09/1888 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1063 |
|
2981 |
09/1888 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1067 |
|
2982 |
09/1888 |
10/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1068 |
|
2983 |
09/1888 |
27/01/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1069 |
|
2984 |
09/1888 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1076 |
|
2985 |
09/1888 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1031 |
|
2986 |
09/1888 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
941 |
|
3042 |
10/1888 |
04/1925 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1481 |
|
3043 |
10/1888 |
05/1913 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
379 |
|
3044 |
10/1888 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1517 |
|
3045 |
11/1888 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1216 |
|
3046 |
11/1888 |
03/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1480 |
|
3047 |
11/1888 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1685 |
|
3048 |
11/1888 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1212 |
|
3049 |
11/1888 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1211 |
|
3050 |
11/1888 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1141 |
|
3051 |
11/1888 |
02/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1488 |
|
3052 |
11/1888 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
276 |
|
3053 |
11/1888 |
07/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
696 |
|
3054 |
11/1888 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1530 |
|
3055 |
11/1888 |
11/1921 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1046 |
|
2987 |
12/1888 |
01/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1048 |
|
2988 |
12/1888 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1049 |
|
2989 |
12/1888 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1050 |
|
2990 |
12/1888 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1052 |
|
2991 |
12/1888 |
1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1077 |
|
2992 |
12/1888 |
01/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1078 |
|
2993 |
12/1888 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1079 |
|
2994 |
12/1888 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1080 |
|
2995 |
12/1888 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1301 |
|
3102 |
03/1889 |
10/1905 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
712 |
|
3032 |
03/1889 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1302 |
|
3103 |
05/1889 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1303 |
|
3104 |
06/1889 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
781 |
|
3033 |
06/1889 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
756 |
|
3034 |
06/1889 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
760 |
|
3035 |
06/1889 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
761 |
|
3036 |
06/1889 |
04/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
721 |
|
3037 |
06/1889 |
11/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
785 |
|
3038 |
06/1889 |
06/1925 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
786 |
|
3039 |
06/1889 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
788 |
|
3040 |
06/1889 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
791 |
|
3041 |
06/1889 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1748 |
|
3056 |
07/1889 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
808 |
|
3099 |
09/1889 |
03/1938 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1529 |
|
3060 |
09/1889 |
12/1912 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1521 |
|
3061 |
09/1889 |
03/1926 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
1045 |
|
3113 |
09/1889 |
02/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1081 |
|
3082 |
10/1889 |
14/03/1953 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1082 |
|
3083 |
10/1889 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1083 |
|
3084 |
10/1889 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1084 |
|
3085 |
10/1889 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1085 |
|
3086 |
10/1889 |
09/10/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1086 |
|
3087 |
10/1889 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1087 |
|
3088 |
10/1889 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1089 |
|
3089 |
10/1889 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1090 |
|
3090 |
10/1889 |
12/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1092 |
|
3091 |
10/1889 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
809 |
|
3100 |
10/1889 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
810 |
|
3101 |
10/1889 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1093 |
|
3092 |
11/1889 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1095 |
|
3093 |
11/1889 |
11/1906 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1096 |
|
3094 |
11/1889 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1097 |
|
3095 |
11/1889 |
10/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1098 |
|
3096 |
11/1889 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1099 |
|
3097 |
11/1889 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1100 |
|
3098 |
11/1889 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
748 |
|
3112 |
11/1889 |
04/1925 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
731 |
|
3114 |
11/1889 |
01/1923 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
738 |
|
3118 |
1890 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
419 |
|
3119 |
1890 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
635 |
|
3120 |
1890 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1482 |
|
3057 |
01/1890 |
07/1908 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1677 |
|
3058 |
01/1890 |
10/1922 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1526 |
|
3059 |
01/1890 |
08/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
974 |
|
3062 |
01/1890 |
03/1919 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
830 |
|
3115 |
01/1890 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
733 |
|
3116 |
01/1890 |
09/1926 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
814 |
|
3117 |
01/1890 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
758 |
|
3121 |
01/1890 |
08/1922 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
729 |
|
3072 |
01/1890 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1746 |
|
3063 |
02/1890 |
07/1912 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1513 |
|
3064 |
02/1890 |
04/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1672 |
|
3065 |
02/1890 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
730 |
|
3073 |
02/1890 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
816 |
|
3074 |
02/1890 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
820 |
|
3075 |
02/1890 |
01/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
663 |
|
3076 |
02/1890 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1304 |
|
3105 |
03/1890 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1486 |
|
3066 |
03/1890 |
04/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1524 |
|
3067 |
03/1890 |
07/1908 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1483 |
|
3068 |
03/1890 |
01/1909 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1305 |
|
3106 |
05/1890 |
06/1906 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1515 |
|
3069 |
05/1890 |
11/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
382 |
|
3070 |
05/1890 |
11/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
308 |
|
3071 |
05/1890 |
10/1922 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1306 |
|
3107 |
06/1890 |
12/1905 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1307 |
|
3108 |
06/1890 |
12/1905 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1309 |
|
3109 |
06/1890 |
07/1907 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1311 |
|
3110 |
06/1890 |
03/1906 |
LNWR |
Teutonic |
2-(2-2)-0 |
1312 |
|
3111 |
06/1890 |
03/1906 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
632 |
|
3122 |
06/1890 |
03/1911 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
231 |
|
3123 |
06/1890 |
08/1922 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
828 |
|
3124 |
07/1890 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
642 |
|
3125 |
08/1890 |
01/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
975 |
|
3077 |
08/1890 |
1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
910 |
|
3152 |
09/1890 |
05/12/1953 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
825 |
|
3078 |
09/1890 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
430 |
|
3079 |
09/1890 |
1931 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
907 |
|
3080 |
09/1890 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
908 |
|
3081 |
09/1890 |
09/1924 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
901 |
|
3126 |
10/1890 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
35 |
|
3127 |
10/1890 |
11/1909 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
36 |
|
3128 |
10/1890 |
07/1922 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
444 |
|
3129 |
10/1890 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2006 |
|
3142 |
11/1890 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1514 |
|
3143 |
11/1890 |
11/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1214 |
|
3144 |
11/1890 |
04/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1218 |
|
3145 |
11/1890 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1674 |
|
3146 |
11/1890 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2001 |
|
3147 |
11/1890 |
01/1912 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1531 |
|
3148 |
11/1890 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1484 |
|
3149 |
11/1890 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
468 |
|
3130 |
11/1890 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
604 |
|
3131 |
11/1890 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1313 |
|
3172 |
12/1890 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1314 |
|
3173 |
12/1890 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1315 |
|
3174 |
12/1890 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1316 |
|
3175 |
12/1890 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1317 |
|
3176 |
12/1890 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1319 |
|
3177 |
12/1890 |
18/12/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1320 |
|
3178 |
12/1890 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1321 |
|
3179 |
12/1890 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1323 |
|
3180 |
12/1890 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1324 |
|
3181 |
12/1890 |
|
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
465 |
|
3155 |
01/1891 |
20/08/1955 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
466 |
|
3156 |
01/1891 |
22/05/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
655 |
|
3157 |
01/1891 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
546 |
|
3158 |
01/1891 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
657 |
|
3159 |
01/1891 |
09/1924 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
658 |
|
3160 |
01/1891 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1326 |
|
3182 |
02/1891 |
11/12/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1327 |
|
3183 |
02/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1330 |
|
3184 |
02/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1331 |
|
3185 |
02/1891 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1332 |
|
3186 |
02/1891 |
10/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1333 |
|
3187 |
02/1891 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1334 |
|
3188 |
02/1891 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1335 |
|
3189 |
02/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1336 |
|
3190 |
02/1891 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1337 |
|
3191 |
02/1891 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
214 |
|
3153 |
02/1891 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
459 |
|
3154 |
02/1891 |
21/07/1951 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
660 |
|
3161 |
02/1891 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
661 |
|
3162 |
02/1891 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
662 |
|
3163 |
03/1891 |
30/09/1955 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
613 |
|
3164 |
03/1891 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
608 |
|
3165 |
03/1891 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
897 |
|
3166 |
03/1891 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
900 |
|
3167 |
03/1891 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1683 |
|
3150 |
04/1891 |
01/1908 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
133 |
|
3168 |
04/1891 |
06/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
199 |
|
3169 |
04/1891 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
921 |
|
3170 |
04/1891 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
922 |
|
3171 |
04/1891 |
02/1953 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
396 |
|
3151 |
05/1891 |
11/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1675 |
|
3192 |
05/1891 |
09/1926 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1747 |
|
3193 |
05/1891 |
12/1905 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1673 |
|
3194 |
05/1891 |
03/1919 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1525 |
|
3195 |
05/1891 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1668 |
|
3196 |
05/1891 |
02/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1676 |
|
3197 |
05/1891 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2004 |
|
3198 |
05/1891 |
07/1912 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1020 |
|
3199 |
05/1891 |
01/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1518 |
|
3200 |
05/1891 |
01/1926 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1520 |
|
3201 |
05/1891 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
380 |
|
3242 |
06/1891 |
10/1922 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1666 |
|
3243 |
06/1891 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1680 |
|
3244 |
06/1891 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1217 |
|
3245 |
06/1891 |
11/1915 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2003 |
|
3246 |
06/1891 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2002 |
|
3247 |
06/1891 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1516 |
|
3248 |
06/1891 |
07/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1684 |
|
3249 |
06/1891 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1671 |
|
3250 |
06/1891 |
08/1906 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1519 |
|
3251 |
06/1891 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1339 |
|
3202 |
09/1891 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1340 |
|
3203 |
09/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1343 |
|
3204 |
09/1891 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1344 |
|
3205 |
09/1891 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1345 |
|
3206 |
09/1891 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1346 |
|
3207 |
09/1891 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1347 |
|
3208 |
09/1891 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1348 |
|
3209 |
09/1891 |
01/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
1349 |
|
3210 |
10/1891 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2049 |
|
3211 |
10/1891 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2050 |
|
3212 |
10/1891 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2454 |
|
3213 |
10/1891 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2040 |
|
3214 |
10/1891 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2526 |
|
3215 |
10/1891 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2527 |
|
3216 |
10/1891 |
1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2528 |
|
3217 |
10/1891 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2529 |
|
3218 |
10/1891 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2530 |
|
3219 |
10/1891 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2531 |
|
3220 |
10/1891 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2532 |
|
3221 |
10/1891 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
2525 |
|
3292 |
10/1891 |
07/1907 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2536 |
|
3222 |
11/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1750 |
|
3223 |
12/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1751 |
|
3224 |
12/1891 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1752 |
|
3225 |
12/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1753 |
|
3226 |
12/1891 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1754 |
|
3227 |
12/1891 |
1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1755 |
|
3228 |
12/1891 |
09/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1756 |
|
3229 |
12/1891 |
07/1951 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1757 |
|
3230 |
12/1891 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1758 |
|
3231 |
12/1891 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1759 |
|
3232 |
12/1891 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
736 |
|
3132 |
01/1892 |
02/1915 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
735 |
|
3133 |
01/1892 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
757 |
|
3134 |
01/1892 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
633 |
|
3135 |
01/1892 |
01/1913 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
821 |
|
3136 |
01/1892 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
81 |
|
3137 |
01/1892 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
829 |
|
3138 |
01/1892 |
1909 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1760 |
|
3233 |
01/1892 |
06/1950 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1761 |
|
3234 |
01/1892 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1762 |
|
3235 |
01/1892 |
05/1925 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1763 |
|
3236 |
01/1892 |
01/04/1950 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1764 |
|
3237 |
01/1892 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1765 |
|
3238 |
01/1892 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1766 |
|
3239 |
01/1892 |
17/09/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1767 |
|
3240 |
01/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1768 |
|
3241 |
01/1892 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
934 |
|
3139 |
03/1892 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
752 |
|
3140 |
03/1892 |
02/1913 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
479 |
|
3141 |
03/1892 |
12/1913 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1744 |
|
3282 |
04/1892 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1745 |
|
3283 |
04/1892 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
790 |
|
3286 |
04/1892 |
02/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1213 |
|
3287 |
04/1892 |
02/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
403 |
|
3288 |
04/1892 |
09/1922 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1678 |
|
3289 |
04/1892 |
02/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
499 |
|
3293 |
05/1892 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
85 |
|
3294 |
05/1892 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
86 |
|
3295 |
05/1892 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
91 |
|
3296 |
05/1892 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
92 |
|
3297 |
05/1892 |
03/07/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
93 |
|
3298 |
05/1892 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
94 |
|
3299 |
05/1892 |
06/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
95 |
|
3300 |
05/1892 |
1933 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
96 |
|
3301 |
05/1892 |
13/11/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
98 |
|
3302 |
05/1892 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
99 |
|
3303 |
05/1892 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
185 |
|
3304 |
05/1892 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
943 |
|
3305 |
05/1892 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
103 |
|
3306 |
05/1892 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
104 |
|
3307 |
05/1892 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
88 |
|
3308 |
05/1892 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
186 |
|
3309 |
05/1892 |
|
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1260 |
|
3272 |
06/1892 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1261 |
|
3273 |
06/1892 |
11/1918 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1262 |
|
3274 |
06/1892 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1263 |
|
3275 |
06/1892 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1264 |
|
3276 |
06/1892 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1265 |
|
3277 |
06/1892 |
07/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1266 |
|
3278 |
06/1892 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1532 |
|
3284 |
06/1892 |
04/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
304 |
|
3285 |
06/1892 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
395 |
|
3290 |
06/1892 |
11/1919 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1682 |
|
3291 |
06/1892 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1267 |
|
3279 |
07/1892 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1268 |
|
3280 |
07/1892 |
21/03/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1269 |
|
3281 |
07/1892 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
197 |
|
3310 |
07/1892 |
07/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
198 |
|
3311 |
07/1892 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
201 |
|
3312 |
07/1892 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1250 |
|
3313 |
07/1892 |
18/09/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1251 |
|
3314 |
07/1892 |
11/1926 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1252 |
|
3315 |
07/1892 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1253 |
|
3316 |
07/1892 |
04/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1254 |
|
3317 |
07/1892 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1255 |
|
3318 |
07/1892 |
27/03/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1256 |
|
3319 |
07/1892 |
06/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1257 |
|
3320 |
07/1892 |
01/1920 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1258 |
|
3321 |
07/1892 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1259 |
|
3322 |
07/1892 |
05/1945 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2090 |
|
3323 |
10/1892 |
06/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2091 |
|
3324 |
10/1892 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2092 |
|
3325 |
10/1892 |
12/06/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2093 |
|
3326 |
10/1892 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2094 |
|
3327 |
10/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2095 |
|
3328 |
10/1892 |
06/1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2096 |
|
3329 |
10/1892 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2097 |
|
3330 |
10/1892 |
04/1952 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2098 |
|
3331 |
10/1892 |
25/09/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2099 |
|
3332 |
10/1892 |
09/1939 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2100 |
|
3333 |
10/1892 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2101 |
|
3334 |
10/1892 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2102 |
|
3335 |
10/1892 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2103 |
|
3336 |
10/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2104 |
|
3337 |
10/1892 |
18/09/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2105 |
|
3338 |
10/1892 |
|
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2106 |
|
3339 |
10/1892 |
06/1924 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2107 |
|
3340 |
10/1892 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2108 |
|
3341 |
10/1892 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2109 |
|
3342 |
10/1892 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
2524 |
0-8-0 |
2524 |
|
|
10/1892 |
31/12/1949 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2525 |
|
3262 |
11/1892 |
10/1905 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2125 |
|
3262 |
11/1892 |
10/1905 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2126 |
|
3263 |
11/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2526 |
|
3263 |
11/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2527 |
|
3264 |
11/1892 |
12/1929 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2127 |
|
3264 |
11/1892 |
12/1929 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2528 |
|
3265 |
11/1892 |
11/1904 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2128 |
|
3265 |
11/1892 |
11/1904 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2529 |
|
3266 |
11/1892 |
01/1932 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2129 |
|
3266 |
11/1892 |
01/1932 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2130 |
|
3267 |
11/1892 |
08/1914 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2530 |
|
3267 |
11/1892 |
08/1914 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2531 |
|
3268 |
11/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2131 |
|
3268 |
11/1892 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2132 |
|
3269 |
11/1892 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2532 |
|
3269 |
11/1892 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2133 |
|
3270 |
11/1892 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2533 |
|
3270 |
11/1892 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2534 |
|
3271 |
11/1892 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
835 |
0-4-0ST |
2134 |
|
3271 |
11/1892 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1144 |
|
3252 |
12/1892 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
406 |
|
3253 |
12/1892 |
09/1945 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1154 |
|
3254 |
12/1892 |
1921 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
431 |
|
3255 |
12/1892 |
01/1953 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1152 |
|
3256 |
12/1892 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
481 |
|
3257 |
12/1892 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
338 |
|
3258 |
12/1892 |
1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
409 |
|
3259 |
12/1892 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1165 |
|
3260 |
12/1892 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1169 |
|
3261 |
12/1892 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
634 |
|
3354 |
03/1893 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
485 |
|
3355 |
03/1893 |
01/1932 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
724 |
|
3356 |
03/1893 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
763 |
|
3357 |
03/1893 |
04/1930 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
764 |
|
3358 |
03/1893 |
02/1926 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
819 |
|
3359 |
03/1893 |
10/1911 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
742 |
|
3360 |
03/1893 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
285 |
|
3361 |
03/1893 |
1906 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
418 |
|
3362 |
03/1893 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
124 |
|
3363 |
03/1893 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1489 |
|
3343 |
04/1893 |
04/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
394 |
|
3344 |
04/1893 |
09/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
942 |
|
3345 |
04/1893 |
01/1916 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
393 |
|
3346 |
04/1893 |
03/1907 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1667 |
|
3347 |
04/1893 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
295 |
|
3348 |
04/1893 |
03/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1523 |
|
3349 |
04/1893 |
02/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
381 |
|
3350 |
04/1893 |
12/0002 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
787 |
|
3351 |
04/1893 |
07/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1215 |
|
3352 |
04/1893 |
03/1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
628 |
|
3365 |
04/1893 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
445 |
|
3366 |
04/1893 |
01/1911 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
817 |
|
3367 |
04/1893 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
609 |
|
3368 |
04/1893 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
739 |
|
3369 |
04/1893 |
01/1923 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
636 |
|
3370 |
04/1893 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
935 |
|
3371 |
04/1893 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
902 |
|
3372 |
04/1893 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
832 |
|
3373 |
04/1893 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
446 |
|
3374 |
04/1893 |
06/1915 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
434 |
|
3375 |
04/1893 |
06/1912 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
805 |
|
3376 |
04/1893 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
3435 |
|
3435 |
05/1893 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2125 |
|
3395 |
05/1893 |
1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2126 |
|
3396 |
05/1893 |
02/08/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2127 |
|
3397 |
05/1893 |
1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2128 |
|
3398 |
05/1893 |
08/1946 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
824 |
|
3377 |
06/1893 |
04/1929 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
1162 |
|
3378 |
06/1893 |
05/1912 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2150 |
|
3379 |
06/1893 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2153 |
|
3380 |
06/1893 |
11/1914 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
795 |
|
3381 |
06/1893 |
03/1914 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
469 |
|
3382 |
06/1893 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
486 |
|
3383 |
06/1893 |
12/1926 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
792 |
|
3384 |
06/1893 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
425 |
|
3386 |
06/1893 |
06/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2148 |
|
3387 |
06/1893 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
718 |
|
3388 |
06/1893 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
413 |
|
3389 |
06/1893 |
20/09/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
779 |
|
3390 |
06/1893 |
16/07/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1150 |
|
3391 |
06/1893 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1174 |
|
3392 |
06/1893 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2146 |
|
3393 |
06/1893 |
19/06/1954 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2149 |
|
3394 |
06/1893 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
402 |
|
3391 |
06/1893 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2135 |
|
3405 |
07/1893 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2136 |
|
3406 |
07/1893 |
07/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2137 |
|
3407 |
07/1893 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2138 |
|
3408 |
07/1893 |
1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2139 |
|
3409 |
07/1893 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2140 |
|
3410 |
07/1893 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2141 |
|
3411 |
07/1893 |
01/1953 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2142 |
|
3412 |
07/1893 |
12/06/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2143 |
|
3413 |
07/1893 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2144 |
|
3414 |
07/1893 |
28/02/1953 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1157 |
|
3415 |
08/1893 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1197 |
|
3416 |
08/1893 |
24/04/1948 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
50 |
|
3471 |
09/1893 |
08/12/1962 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2129 |
|
3399 |
09/1893 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2130 |
|
3400 |
09/1893 |
12/09/1953 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2131 |
|
3401 |
09/1893 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2132 |
|
3402 |
09/1893 |
02/1952 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2133 |
|
3403 |
09/1893 |
02/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2134 |
|
3404 |
09/1893 |
09/12/1950 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2215 |
|
3417 |
09/1893 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2216 |
|
3418 |
09/1893 |
16/08/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2217 |
|
3419 |
09/1893 |
22/05/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2218 |
|
3420 |
09/1893 |
24/12/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2219 |
|
3421 |
09/1893 |
04/1951 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
919 |
|
3490 |
12/1893 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2159 |
|
3444 |
1894 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2152 |
|
3446 |
1894 |
02/1914 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
90 |
|
3447 |
1894 |
09/1915 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
401 |
|
3448 |
1894 |
06/1915 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2005 |
|
3353 |
01/1894 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2178 |
|
3491 |
01/1894 |
09/1922 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1173 |
|
3492 |
01/1894 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
482 |
|
3493 |
01/1894 |
10/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2192 |
|
3494 |
01/1894 |
07/1927 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
886 |
|
3422 |
01/1894 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
20 |
|
3505 |
02/1894 |
04/1910 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
202 |
|
3423 |
02/1894 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
204 |
|
3424 |
02/1894 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
404 |
|
3442 |
03/1894 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2154 |
|
3443 |
03/1894 |
02/1913 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
2051 |
|
3472 |
04/1894 |
07/1907 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
408 |
|
3425 |
04/1894 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1143 |
|
3426 |
04/1894 |
27/03/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1148 |
|
3428 |
04/1894 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
697 |
|
3429 |
04/1894 |
04/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1149 |
|
3429 |
04/1894 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
427 |
|
3430 |
04/1894 |
08/11/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1147 |
|
3431 |
04/1894 |
02/1934 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1145 |
|
3432 |
04/1894 |
20/03/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1155 |
|
3433 |
04/1894 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2145 |
|
3434 |
04/1894 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
2052 |
|
3473 |
05/1894 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
525 |
|
3474 |
05/1894 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
526 |
|
3475 |
05/1894 |
03/1906 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
527 |
|
3476 |
05/1894 |
01/1907 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
528 |
|
3477 |
05/1894 |
03/1906 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
767 |
|
3478 |
05/1894 |
09/1906 |
LNWR |
Greater Britain |
2-(2-2)-2 |
772 |
|
3479 |
05/1894 |
04/1906 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
871 |
|
3506 |
05/1894 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
7137 |
|
3441 |
05/1894 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
793 |
|
3445 |
05/1894 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
1168 |
|
3449 |
06/1894 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
746 |
|
3450 |
06/1894 |
1908 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
50 |
|
3480 |
06/1894 |
11/1945 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
31 |
|
3481 |
06/1894 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
290 |
|
3482 |
06/1894 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
342 |
|
3483 |
06/1894 |
28/02/1953 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
923 |
|
3484 |
06/1894 |
20/09/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1018 |
|
3485 |
06/1894 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2232 |
|
3486 |
06/1894 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
960 |
|
3487 |
06/1894 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
620 |
|
3488 |
06/1894 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
649 |
|
3489 |
06/1894 |
08/1947 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
265 |
|
3507 |
07/1894 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
789 |
|
3508 |
07/1894 |
12/1914 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
865 |
|
3509 |
07/1894 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
867 |
|
3510 |
07/1894 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
883 |
|
3532 |
08/1894 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
256 |
|
3533 |
08/1894 |
02/1923 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
364 |
|
3531 |
10/1894 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Crane Tank |
0-4-2WT |
853 |
|
3436 |
11/1894 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
Crane Tank |
0-4-2WT |
144 |
|
3437 |
11/1894 |
03/1929 |
LNWR |
Crane Tank |
0-4-2WT |
195 |
|
3438 |
11/1894 |
0000 |
LNWR |
Crane Tank |
0-4-2WT |
151 |
|
3439 |
11/1894 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Crane Tank |
0-4-2WT |
187 |
|
3440 |
11/1894 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2526 |
|
3546 |
11/1894 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2527 |
|
3547 |
11/1894 |
15/02/1957 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2528 |
|
3548 |
11/1894 |
21/11/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2529 |
|
3549 |
11/1894 |
16/07/1949 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2175 |
|
3534 |
11/1894 |
04/1915 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
860 |
|
3535 |
11/1894 |
06/1933 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
263 |
|
3451 |
1895 |
1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2155 |
|
3455 |
1895 |
11/1910 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
852 |
|
3457 |
1895 |
1908 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
1163 |
|
3458 |
1895 |
01/1912 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
1164 |
|
3459 |
1895 |
1909 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
995 |
|
3460 |
1895 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
669 |
|
3601 |
1895 |
08/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1192 |
|
3602 |
1895 |
1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
896 |
|
3603 |
1895 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
794 |
|
3452 |
01/1895 |
01/1931 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2158 |
|
3453 |
01/1895 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
732 |
|
3454 |
01/1895 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2530 |
|
3550 |
02/1895 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2531 |
|
3551 |
02/1895 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2532 |
|
3552 |
02/1895 |
13/05/1950 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2533 |
|
3553 |
02/1895 |
10/1929 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2534 |
|
3554 |
02/1895 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2535 |
|
3555 |
02/1895 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
253 |
|
3556 |
02/1895 |
08/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2188 |
|
3557 |
02/1895 |
07/1908 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
254 |
|
3558 |
02/1895 |
07/1908 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
890 |
|
3559 |
02/1895 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2182 |
|
3560 |
02/1895 |
05/1922 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2156 |
|
3456 |
02/1895 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
626 |
|
3495 |
02/1895 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
255 |
|
3496 |
02/1895 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
680 |
|
3497 |
02/1895 |
05/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
847 |
|
3498 |
02/1895 |
14/08/1954 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
426 |
|
3499 |
02/1895 |
1935 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1180 |
|
3500 |
02/1895 |
09/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
853 |
|
3511 |
03/1895 |
12/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
144 |
|
3512 |
03/1895 |
1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
151 |
|
3513 |
03/1895 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
187 |
|
3514 |
03/1895 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
340 |
|
3515 |
03/1895 |
24/01/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
341 |
|
3516 |
03/1895 |
1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
344 |
|
3517 |
04/1895 |
05/1922 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1156 |
|
3518 |
04/1895 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
70 |
|
3519 |
04/1895 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
371 |
|
3520 |
04/1895 |
1935 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2259 |
|
3521 |
04/1895 |
01/1934 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2260 |
|
3522 |
04/1895 |
12/1952 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2261 |
|
3523 |
04/1895 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
749 |
|
3571 |
05/1895 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2183 |
|
3572 |
05/1895 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1151 |
|
3501 |
05/1895 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2262 |
|
3524 |
05/1895 |
08/11/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2263 |
|
3525 |
05/1895 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2264 |
|
3526 |
05/1895 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2265 |
|
3527 |
05/1895 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2266 |
|
3528 |
05/1895 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2267 |
|
3529 |
05/1895 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
516 |
|
3530 |
05/1895 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
945 |
|
3573 |
06/1895 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
773 |
|
3463 |
07/1895 |
12/1924 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
424 |
|
3464 |
07/1895 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1580 |
|
3536 |
08/1895 |
05/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
195 |
|
3537 |
08/1895 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
623 |
|
3538 |
08/1895 |
04/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
666 |
|
3539 |
08/1895 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
676 |
|
3540 |
08/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
689 |
|
3541 |
08/1895 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
854 |
|
3542 |
08/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
855 |
|
3543 |
08/1895 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
872 |
|
3574 |
08/1895 |
05/1922 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2177 |
|
3575 |
08/1895 |
06/1911 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
209 |
|
3461 |
08/1895 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
487 |
|
3462 |
08/1895 |
08/1919 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1153 |
|
3502 |
08/1895 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
838 |
|
3503 |
08/1895 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
967 |
|
3544 |
09/1895 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1007 |
|
3545 |
09/1895 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1160 |
|
3561 |
09/1895 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1171 |
|
3562 |
09/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1182 |
|
3563 |
09/1895 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
672 |
|
3564 |
09/1895 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
840 |
|
3565 |
09/1895 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
912 |
|
3566 |
09/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
913 |
|
3567 |
09/1895 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
914 |
|
3568 |
10/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1146 |
|
3569 |
10/1895 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
505 |
|
3570 |
10/1895 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
600 |
|
3576 |
10/1895 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
687 |
|
3577 |
10/1895 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
777 |
|
3578 |
10/1895 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2303 |
|
3579 |
10/1895 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2304 |
|
3580 |
10/1895 |
12/1948 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
514 |
|
3596 |
10/1895 |
08/1926 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2305 |
|
3581 |
11/1895 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2306 |
|
3582 |
11/1895 |
09/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2307 |
|
3583 |
11/1895 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2308 |
|
3584 |
11/1895 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
2147 |
|
3504 |
11/1895 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2309 |
|
3585 |
12/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2310 |
|
3586 |
12/1895 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2311 |
|
3587 |
12/1895 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2312 |
|
3588 |
12/1895 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2151 |
|
3465 |
12/1895 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
260 |
|
3597 |
1896 |
08/1914 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
414 |
|
3468 |
1896 |
12/1906 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
631 |
|
3470 |
1896 |
12/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
842 |
|
3604 |
1896 |
05/1902 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2251 |
|
3605 |
1896 |
08/1902 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
892 |
|
3606 |
1896 |
10/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1191 |
|
3607 |
1896 |
05/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1184 |
|
3609 |
1896 |
09/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
841 |
|
3610 |
1896 |
10/1912 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2313 |
|
3589 |
01/1896 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2314 |
|
3590 |
01/1896 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2315 |
|
3591 |
01/1896 |
04/1950 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
866 |
|
3598 |
01/1896 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2186 |
|
3599 |
01/1896 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
517 |
|
3611 |
01/1896 |
04/1921 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2185 |
|
3612 |
01/1896 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
264 |
|
3657 |
01/1896 |
04/1907 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
885 |
|
3466 |
01/1896 |
03/1916 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
1166 |
|
3467 |
01/1896 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2316 |
|
3592 |
02/1896 |
08/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2317 |
|
3593 |
02/1896 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2318 |
|
3594 |
02/1896 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2319 |
|
3595 |
02/1896 |
10/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2320 |
|
3616 |
02/1896 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2321 |
|
3617 |
02/1896 |
12/02/1955 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2322 |
|
3618 |
02/1896 |
10/1933 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2193 |
|
3600 |
02/1896 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
477 |
|
3613 |
02/1896 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
619 |
|
3614 |
02/1896 |
05/1926 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2323 |
|
3619 |
03/1896 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2324 |
|
3620 |
03/1896 |
09/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2325 |
|
3621 |
03/1896 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2326 |
|
3622 |
03/1896 |
10/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2327 |
|
3623 |
03/1896 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2328 |
|
3624 |
03/1896 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2329 |
|
3625 |
03/1896 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2330 |
|
3626 |
03/1896 |
26/03/1955 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1177 |
|
3656 |
03/1896 |
02/1920 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2331 |
|
3627 |
04/1896 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2332 |
|
3628 |
04/1896 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2333 |
|
3629 |
04/1896 |
07/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2334 |
|
3630 |
04/1896 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2335 |
|
3631 |
04/1896 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
625 |
|
3632 |
04/1896 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
651 |
|
3633 |
04/1896 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
715 |
|
3634 |
04/1896 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
799 |
|
3635 |
04/1896 |
08/1947 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2176 |
|
3615 |
04/1896 |
06/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
864 |
|
3658 |
06/1896 |
07/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1187 |
|
3659 |
07/1896 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
506 |
|
3660 |
07/1896 |
02/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2536 |
|
3661 |
08/1896 |
10/12/1957 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2537 |
|
3662 |
08/1896 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2538 |
|
3663 |
08/1896 |
12/1948 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2539 |
|
3664 |
08/1896 |
05/1951 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2540 |
|
3665 |
08/1896 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2541 |
|
3666 |
08/1896 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2542 |
|
3667 |
08/1896 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2543 |
|
3668 |
08/1896 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2544 |
|
3669 |
08/1896 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2545 |
|
3670 |
08/1896 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1183 |
|
3681 |
08/1896 |
01/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1193 |
|
3682 |
08/1896 |
03/1913 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
478 |
|
3683 |
08/1896 |
09/1926 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2282 |
|
3608 |
08/1896 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2546 |
|
3671 |
09/1896 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2547 |
|
3672 |
09/1896 |
11/12/1948 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2548 |
|
3673 |
09/1896 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
331 |
|
3686 |
10/1896 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1198 |
|
3687 |
10/1896 |
1932 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1199 |
|
3688 |
10/1896 |
1931 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
1200 |
|
3689 |
10/1896 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
10 |
|
3690 |
10/1896 |
15/12/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
11 |
|
3691 |
10/1896 |
10/1949 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
709 |
|
3692 |
10/1896 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
13 |
|
3693 |
10/1896 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2194 |
|
3684 |
10/1896 |
05/1925 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
317 |
|
3741 |
11/1896 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
15 |
|
3694 |
11/1896 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
69 |
|
3695 |
11/1896 |
01/1920 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
868 |
|
3685 |
11/1896 |
05/1911 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
869 |
|
3726 |
11/1896 |
01/1922 |
LNWR |
Waterloo |
2-4-0 |
2157 |
|
3469 |
11/1896 |
07/1925 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2549 |
|
3674 |
12/1896 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2550 |
|
3675 |
12/1896 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2551 |
|
3676 |
12/1896 |
22/09/1962 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2552 |
|
3677 |
12/1896 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2553 |
|
3678 |
12/1896 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2554 |
|
3679 |
12/1896 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
2555 |
|
3680 |
12/1896 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2187 |
|
3727 |
12/1896 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2239 |
|
3731 |
1897 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2241 |
|
3732 |
1897 |
1908 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2287 |
|
3733 |
1897 |
1906 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
681 |
|
3734 |
1897 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
668 |
|
3736 |
1897 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2246 |
|
3737 |
1897 |
09/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1178 |
|
3739 |
1897 |
08/1919 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2286 |
|
3740 |
1897 |
12/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2233 |
|
3747 |
1897 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2236 |
|
3748 |
1897 |
1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2235 |
|
3749 |
1897 |
1909 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2285 |
|
3750 |
1897 |
05/1910 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2249 |
|
3751 |
1897 |
12/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1188 |
|
3752 |
1897 |
04/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1167 |
|
3753 |
1897 |
02/1916 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2281 |
|
3754 |
1897 |
10/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2283 |
|
3755 |
1897 |
12/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2250 |
|
3756 |
1897 |
04/1910 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
200 |
|
3636 |
02/1897 |
01/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
314 |
|
3637 |
02/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
336 |
|
3638 |
02/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
318 |
|
3639 |
02/1897 |
21/06/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
319 |
|
3640 |
02/1897 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
320 |
|
3641 |
02/1897 |
27/06/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
330 |
|
3642 |
02/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
332 |
|
3643 |
02/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
334 |
|
3644 |
02/1897 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
335 |
|
3645 |
02/1897 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2350 |
|
3696 |
02/1897 |
10/1951 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2351 |
|
3697 |
02/1897 |
10/1947 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2352 |
|
3698 |
02/1897 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2353 |
|
3699 |
02/1897 |
22/05/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2354 |
|
3700 |
02/1897 |
05/1927 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2355 |
|
3701 |
02/1897 |
11/1938 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2356 |
|
3702 |
02/1897 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2357 |
|
3703 |
02/1897 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
2358 |
|
3704 |
02/1897 |
24/04/1948 |
LNWR |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
180 |
|
3705 |
02/1897 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1194 |
|
3728 |
02/1897 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
480 |
|
3730 |
02/1897 |
09/1927 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1176 |
|
3735 |
02/1897 |
05/1924 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2279 |
|
3738 |
02/1897 |
03/1913 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1139 |
|
3646 |
03/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1175 |
|
3647 |
03/1897 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
337 |
|
3648 |
03/1897 |
09/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
339 |
|
3649 |
03/1897 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
346 |
|
3650 |
03/1897 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
347 |
|
3651 |
03/1897 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
348 |
|
3652 |
03/1897 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
349 |
|
3653 |
03/1897 |
11/1949 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
350 |
|
3654 |
03/1897 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2180 |
|
3742 |
03/1897 |
02/1926 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
193 |
|
3743 |
03/1897 |
01/1926 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
683 |
|
3655 |
04/1897 |
07/1929 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
262 |
|
3729 |
04/1897 |
07/1932 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1374 |
|
3757 |
04/1897 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1383 |
|
3758 |
04/1897 |
08/05/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1386 |
|
3759 |
04/1897 |
05/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1398 |
|
3760 |
04/1897 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1402 |
|
3761 |
04/1897 |
1944 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1409 |
|
3762 |
04/1897 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2184 |
|
3744 |
05/1897 |
03/1919 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2179 |
|
3746 |
05/1897 |
01/1920 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1410 |
|
3763 |
05/1897 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1423 |
|
3764 |
05/1897 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1425 |
|
3765 |
05/1897 |
07/02/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1367 |
|
3766 |
05/1897 |
08/05/1948 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1378 |
|
3767 |
05/1897 |
16/08/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1381 |
|
3768 |
05/1897 |
23/02/1952 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1389 |
|
3769 |
05/1897 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1391 |
|
3770 |
05/1897 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1393 |
|
3771 |
05/1897 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1451 |
|
3772 |
05/1897 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1458 |
|
3773 |
05/1897 |
06/1946 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1189 |
|
3777 |
06/1897 |
12/1922 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1392 |
|
3774 |
06/1897 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1463 |
|
3775 |
06/1897 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Iron Duke |
4-4-0 |
1501 |
|
3856 |
06/1897 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Iron Duke |
4-4-0 |
1502 |
|
3857 |
06/1897 |
07/1930 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
2189 |
|
3778 |
07/1897 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
857 |
|
3780 |
07/1897 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1P |
2-4-2T |
1468 |
|
3776 |
07/1897 |
02/1953 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1801 |
|
3806 |
10/1897 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1802 |
|
3807 |
10/1897 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1803 |
|
3808 |
10/1897 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1804 |
|
3809 |
10/1897 |
06/1952 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1805 |
|
3810 |
10/1897 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1806 |
|
3811 |
10/1897 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1807 |
|
3812 |
10/1897 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1808 |
|
3813 |
10/1897 |
04/01/1958 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1809 |
|
3814 |
10/1897 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1810 |
|
3815 |
10/1897 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1811 |
|
3816 |
10/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1812 |
|
3817 |
10/1897 |
05/1951 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
462 |
|
3706 |
11/1897 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
909 |
|
3707 |
11/1897 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1470 |
|
3708 |
11/1897 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1813 |
|
3818 |
11/1897 |
05/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1814 |
|
3819 |
11/1897 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1815 |
|
3820 |
11/1897 |
24/10/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1816 |
|
3821 |
11/1897 |
22/12/1962 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1817 |
|
3822 |
12/1897 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1818 |
|
3823 |
12/1897 |
04/1948 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1819 |
|
3824 |
12/1897 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
1105 |
|
3781 |
12/1897 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2288 |
|
3867 |
1898 |
01/1916 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
329 |
|
3868 |
1898 |
04/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1181 |
|
3869 |
1898 |
05/1922 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
1185 |
|
3870 |
1898 |
12/1911 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2284 |
|
3871 |
1898 |
03/1912 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
351 |
|
3872 |
1898 |
05/1914 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2245 |
|
3873 |
1898 |
01/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
951 |
|
3874 |
1898 |
12/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2242 |
|
3875 |
1898 |
05/1913 |
LNWR |
4ft 6 Tank |
2-4-2T |
2237 |
|
3876 |
1898 |
06/1914 |
LNWR |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
2289 |
|
2134 |
01/1898 |
|
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1820 |
|
3825 |
01/1898 |
10/1950 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1505 |
|
3858 |
01/1898 |
05/1912 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1512 |
|
3859 |
02/1898 |
10/1907 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1534 |
|
3860 |
02/1898 |
12/1909 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1535 |
|
3861 |
02/1898 |
08/1910 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1473 |
|
3709 |
03/1898 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1474 |
|
3710 |
03/1898 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1476 |
|
3711 |
03/1898 |
21/06/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1491 |
|
3712 |
03/1898 |
01/1954 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1493 |
|
3713 |
03/1898 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1496 |
|
3714 |
03/1898 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1499 |
|
3715 |
03/1898 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1536 |
|
3862 |
03/1898 |
02/1909 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1548 |
|
3863 |
03/1898 |
03/1909 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1549 |
|
3864 |
03/1898 |
08/1909 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1557 |
|
3865 |
03/1898 |
03/1909 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
870 |
|
3782 |
03/1898 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1821 |
|
3826 |
04/1898 |
04/06/1960 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1822 |
|
3827 |
04/1898 |
10/08/1957 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1823 |
|
3828 |
04/1898 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1824 |
|
3829 |
04/1898 |
24/01/1957 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1825 |
|
3830 |
04/1898 |
05/1950 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1826 |
|
3831 |
04/1898 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
John Hick |
2-(2-2)-2 |
1559 |
|
3866 |
04/1898 |
10/1910 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1560 |
|
3716 |
05/1898 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1862 |
|
3717 |
05/1898 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1563 |
|
3718 |
05/1898 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1564 |
|
3719 |
05/1898 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1574 |
|
3721 |
05/1898 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1587 |
|
3722 |
05/1898 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1827 |
|
3832 |
05/1898 |
05/09/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1828 |
|
3833 |
05/1898 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1829 |
|
3834 |
05/1898 |
10/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1830 |
|
3835 |
05/1898 |
08/1950 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1596 |
|
3720 |
06/1898 |
03/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1588 |
|
3723 |
06/1898 |
05/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1590 |
|
3724 |
06/1898 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1593 |
|
3725 |
06/1898 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1831 |
|
3836 |
07/1898 |
14/01/1950 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1832 |
|
3837 |
07/1898 |
04/1948 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1833 |
|
3838 |
07/1898 |
28/11/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1834 |
|
3839 |
07/1898 |
03/03/1956 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1835 |
|
3840 |
07/1898 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1836 |
|
3841 |
07/1898 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1837 |
|
3842 |
07/1898 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1597 |
|
3878 |
08/1898 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1598 |
|
3879 |
08/1898 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1599 |
|
3880 |
08/1898 |
05/1920 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1601 |
|
3881 |
08/1898 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1608 |
|
3882 |
08/1898 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1615 |
|
3883 |
08/1898 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1838 |
|
3843 |
08/1898 |
03/06/1950 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1839 |
|
3844 |
08/1898 |
06/06/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1840 |
|
3845 |
08/1898 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1622 |
|
3884 |
09/1898 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1626 |
|
3885 |
09/1898 |
06/08/1949 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1627 |
|
3886 |
09/1898 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1635 |
|
3887 |
09/1898 |
28/02/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1636 |
|
3786 |
10/1898 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1641 |
|
3787 |
10/1898 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
903 |
|
3788 |
10/1898 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1646 |
|
3789 |
10/1898 |
09/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1651 |
|
3790 |
10/1898 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1841 |
|
3846 |
10/1898 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1842 |
|
3847 |
10/1898 |
18/02/1950 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1843 |
|
3848 |
10/1898 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1844 |
|
3849 |
10/1898 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1845 |
|
3850 |
10/1898 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1846 |
|
3851 |
10/1898 |
11/02/1950 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1847 |
|
3852 |
10/1898 |
03/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1848 |
|
3853 |
10/1898 |
05/1951 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1849 |
|
3854 |
10/1898 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
954 |
|
3791 |
11/1898 |
07/02/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
415 |
|
3792 |
11/1898 |
09/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1037 |
|
3793 |
11/1898 |
02/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1695 |
|
3794 |
11/1898 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1701 |
|
3795 |
11/1898 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1702 |
|
3796 |
11/1898 |
10/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1705 |
|
3797 |
11/1898 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1712 |
|
3798 |
11/1898 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1715 |
|
3799 |
11/1898 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1716 |
|
3800 |
11/1898 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1717 |
|
3801 |
11/1898 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1718 |
|
3802 |
11/1898 |
04/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1719 |
|
3803 |
11/1898 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1720 |
|
3804 |
11/1898 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1722 |
|
3805 |
11/1898 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1850 |
|
3855 |
11/1898 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1501 |
|
3908 |
02/1899 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1502 |
|
3909 |
02/1899 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
74 |
|
3910 |
02/1899 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1851 |
|
3888 |
02/1899 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1852 |
|
3889 |
02/1899 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1853 |
|
3890 |
02/1899 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1854 |
|
3891 |
02/1899 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1855 |
|
3892 |
02/1899 |
21/04/1962 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1856 |
|
3893 |
02/1899 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1857 |
|
3894 |
02/1899 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1858 |
|
3895 |
02/1899 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1859 |
|
3896 |
02/1899 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
|
|
3897 |
02/1899 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
397 |
|
3911 |
03/1899 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
534 |
|
3912 |
03/1899 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
543 |
|
3913 |
03/1899 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1033 |
|
3914 |
03/1899 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1903 |
|
3928 |
03/1899 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1904 |
|
3929 |
03/1899 |
05/1923 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1905 |
|
3930 |
03/1899 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1034 |
|
3915 |
04/1899 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1724 |
|
3916 |
04/1899 |
08/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1736 |
|
3917 |
04/1899 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1906 |
|
3931 |
04/1899 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1907 |
|
3932 |
04/1899 |
06/1926 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1908 |
|
3933 |
04/1899 |
01/1923 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1909 |
|
3934 |
04/1899 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1910 |
|
3935 |
04/1899 |
04/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
9 |
|
3918 |
05/1899 |
05/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
378 |
|
3919 |
05/1899 |
08/1945 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
456 |
|
3920 |
05/1899 |
04/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
473 |
|
3921 |
05/1899 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
544 |
|
3922 |
05/1899 |
11/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1743 |
|
3923 |
05/1899 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1771 |
|
3924 |
05/1899 |
08/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1773 |
|
3925 |
05/1899 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1779 |
|
3926 |
05/1899 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1780 |
|
3927 |
05/1899 |
07/02/1953 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1861 |
|
3898 |
05/1899 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1862 |
|
3899 |
05/1899 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1863 |
|
3900 |
05/1899 |
26/05/1951 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1864 |
|
3901 |
05/1899 |
29/08/1959 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1865 |
|
3902 |
05/1899 |
26/05/1951 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1866 |
|
3903 |
05/1899 |
15/09/1962 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1867 |
|
3904 |
05/1899 |
05/1933 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1868 |
|
3905 |
05/1899 |
08/1948 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1869 |
|
3906 |
05/1899 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1870 |
|
3907 |
05/1899 |
18/05/1957 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1911 |
|
3936 |
06/1899 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1912 |
|
3937 |
06/1899 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1913 |
|
3938 |
06/1899 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1914 |
|
3939 |
06/1899 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1915 |
|
3940 |
06/1899 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1916 |
|
3941 |
07/1899 |
09/1930 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1917 |
|
3942 |
07/1899 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1918 |
|
3943 |
07/1899 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
29 |
|
3946 |
08/1899 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
76 |
|
3947 |
08/1899 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
80 |
|
3948 |
08/1899 |
24/07/1948 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
115 |
|
3949 |
08/1899 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
118 |
|
3950 |
08/1899 |
22/05/1948 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1919 |
|
3944 |
08/1899 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1920 |
|
3945 |
08/1899 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1232 |
|
3956 |
09/1899 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1234 |
|
3957 |
09/1899 |
08/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1235 |
|
3958 |
09/1899 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1238 |
|
3959 |
09/1899 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1239 |
|
3960 |
09/1899 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
167 |
|
3951 |
09/1899 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
182 |
|
3952 |
09/1899 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
189 |
|
3953 |
09/1899 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
194 |
|
3954 |
09/1899 |
03/1920 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
235 |
|
3955 |
09/1899 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1244 |
|
3961 |
10/1899 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1246 |
|
3962 |
10/1899 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1270 |
|
3963 |
10/1899 |
09/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1275 |
|
3964 |
10/1899 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2008 |
|
3965 |
10/1899 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
317 |
|
3966 |
10/1899 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2016 |
|
3967 |
10/1899 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2019 |
|
3968 |
10/1899 |
08/1946 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
19 |
|
3946 |
11/1899 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
22 |
|
3977 |
11/1899 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
25 |
|
3978 |
11/1899 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
26 |
|
3979 |
11/1899 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
38 |
|
3980 |
11/1899 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
39 |
|
3981 |
11/1899 |
12/1929 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
47 |
|
3982 |
11/1899 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
49 |
|
3983 |
11/1899 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
51 |
|
3984 |
11/1899 |
06/1938 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
52 |
|
3985 |
11/1899 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
54 |
|
3986 |
11/1899 |
11/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
59 |
|
3987 |
11/1899 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
64 |
|
3988 |
11/1899 |
17/02/1951 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
65 |
|
3989 |
11/1899 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
73 |
|
3990 |
11/1899 |
07/06/1952 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2020 |
|
3969 |
11/1899 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2026 |
|
3970 |
11/1899 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2028 |
|
3971 |
11/1899 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2037 |
|
3972 |
11/1899 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
4 |
|
3973 |
11/1899 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
14 |
|
3974 |
11/1899 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
16 |
|
3975 |
11/1899 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
19 |
|
3991 |
12/1899 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
22 |
|
3992 |
12/1899 |
06/08/1955 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
25 |
|
3993 |
12/1899 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
26 |
|
3994 |
12/1899 |
05/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
38 |
|
4005 |
02/1900 |
29/08/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
39 |
|
4006 |
02/1900 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
47 |
|
4007 |
02/1900 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
49 |
|
4008 |
02/1900 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
51 |
|
4009 |
02/1900 |
16/02/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
75 |
|
4010 |
02/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
79 |
|
4011 |
02/1900 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
423 |
|
4012 |
02/1900 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
744 |
|
4013 |
02/1900 |
08/1929 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1921 |
|
3995 |
02/1900 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1922 |
|
3996 |
02/1900 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1740 |
|
4014 |
03/1900 |
06/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
84 |
|
4015 |
03/1900 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
87 |
|
4016 |
03/1900 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
109 |
|
4017 |
03/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
114 |
|
4018 |
03/1900 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
121 |
|
4019 |
03/1900 |
29/09/1951 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
128 |
|
4020 |
03/1900 |
10/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
130 |
|
4021 |
03/1900 |
11/1948 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1923 |
|
3997 |
03/1900 |
03/1925 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1924 |
|
3998 |
03/1900 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1925 |
|
3999 |
03/1900 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1926 |
|
4000 |
03/1900 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1927 |
|
4001 |
03/1900 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
164 |
|
4022 |
04/1900 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
166 |
|
4023 |
04/1900 |
12/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
168 |
|
4024 |
04/1900 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1871 |
|
4025 |
04/1900 |
23/06/1951 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1928 |
|
4002 |
04/1900 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1929 |
|
4003 |
04/1900 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1930 |
|
4004 |
04/1900 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
177 |
|
4035 |
05/1900 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
190 |
|
4036 |
05/1900 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
191 |
|
4037 |
05/1900 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
206 |
|
4038 |
05/1900 |
04/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
212 |
|
4039 |
05/1900 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
213 |
|
4040 |
05/1900 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
219 |
|
4041 |
05/1900 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
236 |
|
4042 |
05/1900 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
245 |
|
4043 |
05/1900 |
08/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
278 |
|
4044 |
05/1900 |
02/1934 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1872 |
|
4026 |
05/1900 |
05/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1873 |
|
4027 |
05/1900 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1874 |
|
4028 |
05/1900 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1875 |
|
4029 |
05/1900 |
01/1930 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1876 |
|
4030 |
05/1900 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1877 |
|
4031 |
05/1900 |
08/03/1957 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1878 |
|
4032 |
05/1900 |
23/02/1957 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1879 |
|
4033 |
05/1900 |
15/09/1962 |
LNWR |
A Compound |
0-8-0 |
1880 |
|
4034 |
05/1900 |
29/12/1962 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
280 |
|
4055 |
08/1900 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
283 |
|
4056 |
08/1900 |
26/07/1952 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
309 |
|
4057 |
08/1900 |
28/02/1953 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
312 |
|
4058 |
08/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
345 |
|
4059 |
08/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
356 |
|
4060 |
08/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
358 |
|
4061 |
08/1900 |
08/1947 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
368 |
|
4062 |
08/1900 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
377 |
|
4063 |
08/1900 |
19/05/1951 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
398 |
|
4064 |
08/1900 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
399 |
|
4065 |
09/1900 |
10/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
400 |
|
4066 |
09/1900 |
01/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
416 |
|
4067 |
09/1900 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
420 |
|
4068 |
09/1900 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
421 |
|
4069 |
09/1900 |
05/1949 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1931 |
|
4045 |
09/1900 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1932 |
|
4046 |
09/1900 |
04/1925 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1933 |
|
4047 |
09/1900 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1934 |
|
4048 |
09/1900 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
422 |
|
4070 |
10/1900 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
428 |
|
4071 |
10/1900 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
432 |
|
4072 |
10/1900 |
05/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
439 |
|
4073 |
10/1900 |
17/12/1955 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
540 |
|
4074 |
10/1900 |
11/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
441 |
|
4075 |
10/1900 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
447 |
|
4076 |
10/1900 |
17/06/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
448 |
|
4077 |
10/1900 |
05/1945 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
449 |
|
4078 |
10/1900 |
17/12/1955 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
450 |
|
4079 |
10/1900 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1935 |
|
4049 |
10/1900 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1936 |
|
4050 |
10/1900 |
06/1925 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1937 |
|
4051 |
10/1900 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1938 |
|
4052 |
10/1900 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1939 |
|
4053 |
10/1900 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Jubilee |
4-4-0 |
1940 |
|
4054 |
10/1900 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
451 |
|
4080 |
11/1900 |
16/01/1954 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
453 |
|
4081 |
11/1900 |
10/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
454 |
|
4082 |
11/1900 |
08/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
455 |
|
4083 |
11/1900 |
01/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1798 |
|
4084 |
11/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
457 |
|
4085 |
11/1900 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
458 |
|
4086 |
11/1900 |
21/11/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
460 |
|
4087 |
11/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
461 |
|
4088 |
11/1900 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
463 |
|
4089 |
11/1900 |
06/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1459 |
|
4090 |
11/1900 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
464 |
|
4091 |
11/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
467 |
|
4092 |
11/1900 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
470 |
|
4093 |
11/1900 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
471 |
|
4094 |
11/1900 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
472 |
|
4095 |
12/1900 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
474 |
|
4096 |
12/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
475 |
|
4097 |
12/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
476 |
|
4098 |
12/1900 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
488 |
|
4099 |
01/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
494 |
|
4100 |
01/1901 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
498 |
|
4101 |
01/1901 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
530 |
|
4102 |
01/1901 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
533 |
|
4103 |
01/1901 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
535 |
|
4104 |
01/1901 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
536 |
|
4115 |
02/1901 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
537 |
|
4116 |
02/1901 |
06/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
538 |
|
4117 |
02/1901 |
04/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
539 |
|
4118 |
02/1901 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
541 |
|
4119 |
02/1901 |
02/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
542 |
|
4120 |
02/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
547 |
|
4121 |
02/1901 |
11/1951 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
548 |
|
4122 |
02/1901 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
550 |
|
4123 |
02/1901 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1221 |
|
4124 |
02/1901 |
11/1945 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
552 |
|
4105 |
03/1901 |
09/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
553 |
|
4106 |
03/1901 |
11/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
555 |
|
4107 |
03/1901 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
556 |
|
4108 |
03/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
559 |
|
4109 |
03/1901 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
560 |
|
4110 |
04/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
566 |
|
4111 |
04/1901 |
06/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
577 |
|
4112 |
04/1901 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
581 |
|
4113 |
04/1901 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2206 |
|
4114 |
04/1901 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
225 |
|
4145 |
05/1901 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
702 |
|
4146 |
05/1901 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
710 |
|
4147 |
05/1901 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
711 |
|
4148 |
05/1901 |
09/1946 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
725 |
|
4149 |
05/1901 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
727 |
|
4150 |
05/1901 |
07/1947 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
583 |
|
4135 |
05/1901 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
586 |
|
4136 |
05/1901 |
27/03/1948 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
587 |
|
4137 |
05/1901 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
593 |
|
4138 |
05/1901 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
599 |
|
4139 |
05/1901 |
08/12/1951 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
624 |
|
4140 |
05/1901 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
646 |
|
4141 |
05/1901 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
654 |
|
4142 |
05/1901 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
656 |
|
4143 |
05/1901 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
664 |
|
4144 |
05/1901 |
30/04/1949 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1941 |
|
4125 |
05/1901 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1942 |
|
4126 |
05/1901 |
02/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
728 |
|
4151 |
06/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
743 |
|
4152 |
06/1901 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
987 |
|
4153 |
06/1901 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1943 |
|
4127 |
06/1901 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1944 |
|
4128 |
06/1901 |
02/1927 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1945 |
|
4129 |
06/1901 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1946 |
|
4130 |
06/1901 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1947 |
|
4131 |
06/1901 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1948 |
|
4132 |
06/1901 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1949 |
|
4133 |
06/1901 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1950 |
|
4134 |
06/1901 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2388 |
|
4154 |
07/1901 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
755 |
|
4165 |
07/1901 |
09/1948 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
759 |
|
4166 |
07/1901 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
774 |
|
4167 |
07/1901 |
06/1947 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
776 |
|
4168 |
07/1901 |
25/10/1952 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
800 |
|
4169 |
07/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
801 |
|
4170 |
07/1901 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
812 |
|
4171 |
07/1901 |
04/1919 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2227 |
|
4172 |
07/1901 |
24/12/1955 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2121 |
|
4173 |
07/1901 |
03/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1298 |
|
4174 |
07/1901 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1881 |
|
4155 |
08/1901 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1882 |
|
4156 |
09/1901 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1883 |
|
4157 |
09/1901 |
10/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1884 |
|
4158 |
09/1901 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1885 |
|
4159 |
09/1901 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1886 |
|
4160 |
09/1901 |
21/12/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1887 |
|
4161 |
09/1901 |
31/07/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1888 |
|
4162 |
09/1901 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1889 |
|
4163 |
09/1901 |
31/01/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1890 |
|
4164 |
09/1901 |
17/05/1952 |
LNWR |
Improved Precedent |
2-4-0 |
861 |
|
3783 |
09/1901 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
813 |
|
4175 |
10/1901 |
12/1929 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
815 |
|
4176 |
10/1901 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
823 |
|
4177 |
10/1901 |
03/11/1956 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
826 |
|
4178 |
11/1901 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
843 |
|
4179 |
11/1901 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
859 |
|
4180 |
11/1901 |
07/11/1953 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
898 |
|
4181 |
11/1901 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
899 |
|
4182 |
11/1901 |
06/1932 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
904 |
|
4183 |
11/1901 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
317 |
0-4-2ST |
905 |
|
4184 |
11/1901 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1891 |
|
4185 |
12/1901 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1892 |
|
4186 |
12/1901 |
21/02/1953 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1893 |
|
4187 |
12/1901 |
12/08/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1894 |
|
4188 |
12/1901 |
20/01/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1895 |
|
4189 |
12/1901 |
02/11/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1896 |
|
4190 |
12/1901 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1897 |
|
4191 |
12/1901 |
30/06/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1898 |
|
4192 |
12/1901 |
21/12/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1899 |
|
4193 |
12/1901 |
22/09/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1900 |
|
4194 |
12/1901 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1951 |
|
4195 |
01/1902 |
04/1925 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1952 |
|
4196 |
01/1902 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1953 |
|
4197 |
02/1902 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1954 |
|
4198 |
02/1902 |
07/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1955 |
|
4199 |
02/1902 |
08/1923 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1956 |
|
4200 |
02/1902 |
01/1923 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
46 |
|
4205 |
03/1902 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
55 |
|
4206 |
03/1902 |
03/1947 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
78 |
|
4207 |
03/1902 |
01/05/1948 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
105 |
|
4208 |
03/1902 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
188 |
|
4209 |
03/1902 |
28/07/1951 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
495 |
|
4210 |
03/1902 |
05/1941 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
741 |
|
4211 |
03/1902 |
03/12/1949 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1095 |
|
4212 |
03/1902 |
07/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2113 |
|
4213 |
03/1902 |
14/02/1948 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2211 |
|
4214 |
03/1902 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
813 |
|
4235 |
03/1902 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1957 |
|
4201 |
03/1902 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1958 |
|
4202 |
03/1902 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1959 |
|
4203 |
03/1902 |
01/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1960 |
|
4204 |
03/1902 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
100 |
|
4215 |
04/1902 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
143 |
|
4216 |
04/1902 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
174 |
|
4217 |
04/1902 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
815 |
|
4236 |
04/1902 |
08/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
823 |
|
4237 |
04/1902 |
10/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
826 |
|
4238 |
04/1902 |
06/06/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
843 |
|
4239 |
04/1902 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
859 |
|
4240 |
04/1902 |
07/1947 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
898 |
|
4241 |
04/1902 |
28/02/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
899 |
|
4242 |
04/1902 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
904 |
|
4243 |
04/1902 |
16/07/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
905 |
|
4244 |
04/1902 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
684 |
|
4218 |
05/1902 |
21/02/1953 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
879 |
|
4219 |
05/1902 |
06/1930 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1010 |
|
4220 |
05/1902 |
07/1933 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
1130 |
|
4221 |
05/1902 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2344 |
|
4222 |
05/1902 |
06/1929 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2070 |
|
4223 |
05/1902 |
12/03/1955 |
LNWR |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
2502 |
|
4224 |
05/1902 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
18 |
|
4245 |
05/1902 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
352 |
|
4246 |
05/1902 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
405 |
|
4247 |
05/1902 |
28/09/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2074 |
|
4248 |
05/1902 |
09/09/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2114 |
|
4249 |
05/1902 |
28/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2342 |
|
4250 |
05/1902 |
02/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2369 |
|
4251 |
05/1902 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2496 |
|
4252 |
05/1902 |
31/12/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
842 |
|
4253 |
05/1902 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
906 |
|
4254 |
05/1902 |
10/1949 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
775 |
|
4225 |
06/1902 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
983 |
|
4226 |
06/1902 |
05/03/1949 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1140 |
|
4227 |
06/1902 |
05/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
2382 |
|
4228 |
06/1902 |
08/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
938 |
|
4229 |
06/1902 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
972 |
|
4230 |
06/1902 |
02/1920 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
973 |
|
4231 |
07/1902 |
05/1947 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1024 |
|
4233 |
07/1902 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1032 |
|
4234 |
07/1902 |
11/1933 |
LNWR |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
1023 |
|
4252 |
07/1902 |
05/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2556 |
|
4255 |
07/1902 |
08/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2557 |
|
4256 |
08/1902 |
28/08/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2558 |
|
4257 |
08/1902 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2559 |
|
4258 |
08/1902 |
13/07/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2560 |
|
4259 |
08/1902 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2561 |
|
4260 |
08/1902 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2562 |
|
4261 |
08/1902 |
09/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2563 |
|
4262 |
08/1902 |
31/10/1954 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2564 |
|
4263 |
08/1902 |
09/11/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2565 |
|
4264 |
08/1902 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1017 |
|
4265 |
09/1902 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2251 |
|
4266 |
09/1902 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1035 |
|
4267 |
09/1902 |
02/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1036 |
|
4268 |
09/1902 |
16/07/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1038 |
|
4269 |
09/1902 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1039 |
|
4270 |
09/1902 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1040 |
|
4271 |
09/1902 |
05/05/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2570 |
|
3279 |
10/1902 |
02/11/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1041 |
|
4272 |
10/1902 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1042 |
|
4273 |
10/1902 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1043 |
|
4274 |
10/1902 |
12/12/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2566 |
|
4275 |
10/1902 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2567 |
|
4276 |
10/1902 |
30/04/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2568 |
|
4277 |
10/1902 |
14/10/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2569 |
|
4278 |
10/1902 |
26/02/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1044 |
|
4280 |
11/1902 |
31/03/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1047 |
|
4281 |
11/1902 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1051 |
|
4282 |
11/1902 |
09/05/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1055 |
|
4283 |
11/1902 |
27/10/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1061 |
|
4284 |
11/1902 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1064 |
|
4295 |
11/1902 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1065 |
|
4296 |
11/1902 |
01/08/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1066 |
|
4297 |
12/1902 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1070 |
|
4298 |
12/1902 |
05/09/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1088 |
|
4299 |
12/1902 |
11/12/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1091 |
|
4300 |
12/1902 |
17/09/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1094 |
|
4301 |
12/1902 |
04/03/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1190 |
|
4302 |
12/1902 |
05/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1222 |
|
4303 |
12/1902 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1223 |
|
4304 |
12/1902 |
07/03/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1224 |
|
4305 |
01/1903 |
08/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1225 |
|
4306 |
01/1903 |
29/08/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1226 |
|
4307 |
01/1903 |
11/11/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1227 |
|
4308 |
01/1903 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1228 |
|
4309 |
01/1903 |
22/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1229 |
|
4310 |
01/1903 |
17/11/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1230 |
|
4311 |
01/1903 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1231 |
|
4312 |
01/1903 |
22/09/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1233 |
|
4313 |
01/1903 |
12/1927 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1236 |
|
4314 |
01/1903 |
12/11/1949 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1961 |
|
4285 |
02/1903 |
10/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1962 |
|
4286 |
02/1903 |
03/1926 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1963 |
|
4287 |
02/1903 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1964 |
|
4288 |
02/1903 |
11/1929 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1965 |
|
4289 |
02/1903 |
06/1925 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1966 |
|
4290 |
02/1903 |
04/1925 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1400 |
|
4365 |
02/1903 |
01/1914 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1237 |
|
4315 |
03/1903 |
29/07/1950 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1967 |
|
4291 |
03/1903 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1968 |
|
4292 |
03/1903 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1969 |
|
4293 |
03/1903 |
04/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1970 |
|
4294 |
03/1903 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1240 |
|
4316 |
04/1903 |
31/03/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1241 |
|
4317 |
04/1903 |
10/05/1952 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1242 |
|
4318 |
04/1903 |
03/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1243 |
|
4319 |
04/1903 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1245 |
|
4320 |
04/1903 |
11/01/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1247 |
|
4321 |
04/1903 |
30/06/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1248 |
|
4322 |
04/1903 |
08/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1249 |
|
4323 |
04/1903 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1271 |
|
4324 |
04/1903 |
04/01/1958 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1272 |
|
4325 |
05/1903 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1273 |
|
4326 |
05/1903 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1404 |
|
4327 |
05/1903 |
12/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2024 |
|
4328 |
05/1903 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1274 |
|
4329 |
05/1903 |
13/01/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2571 |
|
4330 |
05/1903 |
02/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2572 |
|
4331 |
05/1903 |
05/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2573 |
|
4332 |
05/1903 |
08/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2574 |
|
4333 |
05/1903 |
14/10/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2575 |
|
4334 |
05/1903 |
27/10/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
41 |
|
4345 |
06/1903 |
08/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2080 |
|
4346 |
06/1903 |
11/05/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1276 |
|
4347 |
06/1903 |
28/08/1954 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1277 |
|
4348 |
06/1903 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1278 |
|
4349 |
06/1903 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
2033 |
|
4376 |
06/1903 |
04/1914 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1279 |
|
4350 |
07/1903 |
15/09/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1280 |
|
4351 |
07/1903 |
05/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1281 |
|
4352 |
07/1903 |
07/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1282 |
|
4353 |
07/1903 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1283 |
|
4354 |
07/1903 |
20/11/1948 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1971 |
|
4335 |
07/1903 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1972 |
|
4336 |
07/1903 |
04/1925 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1973 |
|
4337 |
07/1903 |
07/1926 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1974 |
|
4338 |
07/1903 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1975 |
|
4339 |
07/1903 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1976 |
|
4340 |
07/1903 |
12/1922 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1977 |
|
4341 |
07/1903 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1978 |
|
4342 |
07/1903 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1979 |
|
4343 |
07/1903 |
08/1923 |
LNWR |
Alfred The Great |
4-4-0 |
1980 |
|
4344 |
08/1903 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2118 |
|
4355 |
09/1903 |
03/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1284 |
|
4356 |
09/1903 |
06/05/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1285 |
|
4357 |
09/1903 |
25/12/1954 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1286 |
|
4358 |
09/1903 |
01/1951 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1287 |
|
4359 |
09/1903 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1288 |
|
4360 |
09/1903 |
05/09/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1289 |
|
4361 |
09/1903 |
26/12/1964 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1308 |
|
4362 |
09/1903 |
28/09/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1310 |
|
4363 |
10/1903 |
06/03/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1318 |
|
4364 |
10/1903 |
17/10/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
134 |
|
4366 |
10/1903 |
03/1922 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
500 |
|
4367 |
10/1903 |
04/1952 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
916 |
|
4368 |
10/1903 |
03/03/1956 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1547 |
|
4369 |
10/1903 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2272 |
|
4370 |
10/1903 |
05/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1299 |
|
4371 |
10/1903 |
16/12/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1401 |
|
4372 |
10/1903 |
28/01/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1448 |
|
4373 |
11/1903 |
02/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2038 |
|
4374 |
11/1903 |
04/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2208 |
|
4375 |
11/1903 |
12/1950 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
170 |
|
4377 |
11/1903 |
02/1916 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
695 |
|
4378 |
11/1903 |
04/1916 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1352 |
|
4379 |
11/1903 |
10/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
545 |
|
4380 |
11/1903 |
02/1916 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1429 |
|
4381 |
11/1903 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1466 |
|
4382 |
12/1903 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1567 |
|
4383 |
12/1903 |
09/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1729 |
|
4384 |
12/1903 |
11/1915 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
640 |
|
4385 |
01/1904 |
05/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1300 |
|
4386 |
01/1904 |
08/10/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1370 |
|
4387 |
01/1904 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1449 |
|
4388 |
01/1904 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1586 |
|
4389 |
01/1904 |
12/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
508 |
|
4390 |
02/1904 |
16/12/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
641 |
|
4391 |
02/1904 |
09/08/1952 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
918 |
|
4392 |
02/1904 |
16/07/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2036 |
|
4394 |
02/1904 |
23/03/1957 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
513 |
|
4415 |
03/1904 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1419 |
|
4417 |
03/1904 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1395 |
|
4416 |
03/1904 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1555 |
|
4393 |
03/1904 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2023 |
|
4418 |
04/1904 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2164 |
|
4419 |
04/1904 |
08/1946 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
410 |
|
4395 |
04/1904 |
28/10/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
509 |
|
4396 |
05/1904 |
17/06/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
647 |
|
4397 |
05/1904 |
03/03/1956 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1110 |
|
4398 |
05/1904 |
04/1950 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1122 |
|
4399 |
05/1904 |
21/07/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
503 |
|
4400 |
05/1904 |
19/01/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
818 |
|
4401 |
05/1904 |
18/04/1959 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1585 |
|
4402 |
05/1904 |
05/12/1964 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2056 |
|
4403 |
05/1904 |
02/02/1952 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2387 |
|
4404 |
05/1904 |
14/10/1961 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
412 |
|
4442 |
06/1904 |
04/1940 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
510 |
|
4443 |
06/1904 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
7 |
|
4441 |
06/1904 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
659 |
|
4444 |
06/1904 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2 |
|
4440 |
06/1904 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
437 |
|
4405 |
07/1904 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
644 |
|
4406 |
07/1904 |
30/12/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1353 |
|
4407 |
07/1904 |
29/09/1962 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1369 |
|
4408 |
07/1904 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1432 |
|
4409 |
07/1904 |
12/1948 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1436 |
|
4410 |
08/1904 |
31/08/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
1543 |
|
4411 |
08/1904 |
18/05/1957 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2057 |
|
4412 |
08/1904 |
19/01/1952 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2060 |
|
4413 |
08/1904 |
14/10/1961 |
LNWR |
4 Cylinder Compound |
0-8-0 |
2169 |
|
4414 |
08/1904 |
22/06/1957 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
173 |
|
4420 |
09/1904 |
07/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
504 |
|
4421 |
09/1904 |
03/1919 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
511 |
|
4422 |
09/1904 |
04/1916 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
637 |
|
4423 |
09/1904 |
01/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
2339 |
|
4424 |
09/1904 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1113 |
|
4425 |
09/1904 |
01/1920 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1407 |
|
4426 |
09/1904 |
06/1920 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1414 |
|
4427 |
09/1904 |
01/1915 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
639 |
|
4445 |
10/1904 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
648 |
|
4446 |
10/1904 |
01/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
685 |
|
4447 |
10/1904 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
106 |
|
4449 |
10/1904 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
60 |
|
4448 |
10/1904 |
11/1938 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1500 |
|
4428 |
10/1904 |
04/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
2063 |
|
4429 |
10/1904 |
07/1915 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1102 |
|
4453 |
11/1904 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1117 |
|
4454 |
11/1904 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
301 |
|
4450 |
11/1904 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
643 |
|
4452 |
11/1904 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
305 |
|
4451 |
11/1904 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
622 |
|
4458 |
12/1904 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
638 |
|
4459 |
12/1904 |
04/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
515 |
|
4457 |
12/1904 |
12/1939 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
333 |
|
4456 |
12/1904 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
310 |
|
4455 |
12/1904 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
645 |
|
4461 |
01/1905 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
303 |
|
4460 |
01/1905 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1120 |
|
4463 |
01/1905 |
08/1939 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
806 |
|
4462 |
01/1905 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
321 |
|
4430 |
01/1905 |
11/1913 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1104 |
|
4466 |
02/1905 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1137 |
|
4464 |
02/1905 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
323 |
|
4465 |
02/1905 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
606 |
|
4431 |
02/1905 |
10/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1131 |
|
4432 |
02/1905 |
08/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
2055 |
|
4433 |
02/1905 |
08/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
307 |
|
4434 |
02/1905 |
01/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
363 |
|
4435 |
02/1905 |
12/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
610 |
|
4436 |
02/1905 |
07/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
1379 |
|
4437 |
02/1905 |
09/1915 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
2058 |
|
4438 |
02/1905 |
06/1914 |
LNWR |
1400 |
4-6-0 |
2059 |
|
4439 |
02/1905 |
09/1920 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
40 |
|
4470 |
03/1905 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1111 |
|
4467 |
03/1905 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1431 |
|
4468 |
03/1905 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
520 |
|
4471 |
03/1905 |
01/1934 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2031 |
|
4474 |
03/1905 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2064 |
|
4469 |
03/1905 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1469 |
|
4472 |
03/1905 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1737 |
|
4473 |
03/1905 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1115 |
|
4476 |
04/1905 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1545 |
|
4477 |
04/1905 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2061 |
|
4479 |
04/1905 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1573 |
|
4478 |
04/1905 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
365 |
|
4475 |
04/1905 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
66 |
|
4505 |
04/1905 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
184 |
|
4480 |
05/1905 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
519 |
|
4482 |
05/1905 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2120 |
|
4483 |
05/1905 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1430 |
|
4484 |
05/1905 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
366 |
|
4481 |
05/1905 |
04/1945 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
353 |
|
4507 |
06/1905 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
372 |
|
4508 |
06/1905 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
507 |
|
4509 |
06/1905 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
113 |
|
4485 |
07/1905 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
315 |
|
4488 |
07/1905 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1509 |
|
4490 |
07/1905 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
688 |
|
4489 |
07/1905 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
300 |
|
4486 |
07/1905 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
302 |
|
4487 |
07/1905 |
01/1947 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
306 |
|
4506 |
07/1905 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2257 |
|
4494 |
08/1905 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2062 |
|
4493 |
08/1905 |
08/1939 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1723 |
|
4492 |
08/1905 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1617 |
|
4491 |
08/1905 |
06/1940 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
311 |
|
4495 |
09/1905 |
05/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
911 |
|
4498 |
09/1905 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1114 |
|
4499 |
09/1905 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1116 |
|
4500 |
09/1905 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1510 |
|
4501 |
09/1905 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
811 |
|
4497 |
09/1905 |
03/1941 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
374 |
|
4496 |
09/1905 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1784 |
|
4502 |
10/1905 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2202 |
|
4504 |
10/1905 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
117 |
|
4510 |
10/1905 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1301 |
|
4511 |
10/1905 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1363 |
|
4512 |
10/1905 |
12/1939 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2166 |
|
4503 |
10/1905 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
127 |
|
4517 |
11/1905 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
229 |
|
4518 |
11/1905 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1396 |
|
4513 |
11/1905 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2007 |
|
4514 |
11/1905 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2012 |
|
4515 |
11/1905 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2115 |
|
4516 |
11/1905 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1439 |
|
4519 |
11/1905 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2576 |
|
4520 |
12/1905 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1307 |
|
4520 |
12/1905 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2579 |
|
4523 |
12/1905 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2580 |
|
4524 |
12/1905 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2581 |
|
4525 |
12/1905 |
08/1934 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2582 |
|
4526 |
12/1905 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2583 |
|
4527 |
12/1905 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2578 |
|
4522 |
12/1905 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2287 |
|
4521 |
12/1905 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2577 |
|
4521 |
12/1905 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2585 |
|
4529 |
01/1906 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2584 |
|
4528 |
01/1906 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
565 |
|
4550 |
01/1906 |
06/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
893 |
|
4551 |
01/1906 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1074 |
|
4552 |
01/1906 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1357 |
|
4553 |
01/1906 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1669 |
|
4554 |
01/1906 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
165 |
|
4555 |
01/1906 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
723 |
|
4530 |
02/1906 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
837 |
|
4531 |
02/1906 |
10/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1312 |
|
4532 |
02/1906 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
828 |
|
4556 |
02/1906 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
978 |
|
4557 |
02/1906 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1405 |
|
4558 |
02/1906 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1575 |
|
4559 |
02/1906 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
234 |
|
4536 |
03/1906 |
02/1932 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
526 |
|
4537 |
03/1906 |
12/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1311 |
|
4538 |
03/1906 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1642 |
|
4534 |
03/1906 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2017 |
|
4539 |
03/1906 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2513 |
|
4535 |
03/1906 |
06/1939 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1287 |
|
4533 |
03/1906 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
561 |
|
4541 |
04/1906 |
03/1941 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
675 |
|
4542 |
04/1906 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
772 |
|
4543 |
04/1906 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
804 |
|
4544 |
04/1906 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
988 |
|
4546 |
04/1906 |
06/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1433 |
|
4547 |
04/1906 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
282 |
|
4540 |
04/1906 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
990 |
|
4545 |
04/1906 |
12/1940 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1650 |
|
4548 |
05/1906 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1787 |
|
4549 |
05/1906 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1986 |
|
4620 |
09/1906 |
10/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1987 |
|
4621 |
09/1906 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1988 |
|
4622 |
09/1906 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1989 |
|
4623 |
09/1906 |
12/1929 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1990 |
|
4624 |
10/1906 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1991 |
|
4625 |
10/1906 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1992 |
|
4626 |
10/1906 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1993 |
|
4627 |
10/1906 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1994 |
|
4628 |
10/1906 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1995 |
|
4629 |
10/1906 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
61 |
|
4630 |
11/1906 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
222 |
|
4631 |
11/1906 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
291 |
|
4632 |
11/1906 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
667 |
|
4633 |
11/1906 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1304 |
|
4634 |
11/1906 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1676 |
|
4635 |
11/1906 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1709 |
|
4636 |
11/1906 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2027 |
|
4637 |
11/1906 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
285 |
|
4600 |
12/1906 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
414 |
|
4601 |
12/1906 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
833 |
|
4602 |
12/1906 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1350 |
|
4603 |
12/1906 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2229 |
|
4604 |
12/1906 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2052 |
|
4638 |
12/1906 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2269 |
|
4639 |
12/1906 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
77 |
|
4605 |
01/1907 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1302 |
|
4606 |
01/1907 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2003 |
|
4607 |
01/1907 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2087 |
|
4608 |
01/1907 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2209 |
|
4609 |
01/1907 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
3 |
|
4610 |
01/1907 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
392 |
|
4611 |
01/1907 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
832 |
|
4612 |
01/1907 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1136 |
|
4613 |
02/1907 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1303 |
|
4614 |
02/1907 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1428 |
|
4615 |
02/1907 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1460 |
|
4616 |
02/1907 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1653 |
|
4617 |
02/1907 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1772 |
|
4618 |
02/1907 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2078 |
|
4619 |
02/1907 |
08/1931 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
393 |
|
4640 |
04/1907 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
989 |
|
4641 |
04/1907 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1141 |
|
4642 |
04/1907 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1656 |
|
4643 |
04/1907 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2029 |
|
4644 |
04/1907 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2044 |
|
4645 |
04/1907 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2173 |
|
4646 |
05/1907 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2424 |
|
4647 |
05/1907 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2503 |
|
4648 |
05/1907 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2522 |
|
4649 |
05/1907 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1996 |
|
4650 |
05/1907 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1997 |
|
4651 |
05/1907 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1998 |
|
4652 |
05/1907 |
07/1938 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1999 |
|
4653 |
05/1907 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1 |
|
4660 |
06/1907 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
218 |
|
4661 |
06/1907 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
419 |
|
4662 |
06/1907 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
665 |
|
4664 |
06/1907 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
469 |
|
4665 |
06/1907 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
564 |
|
4663 |
06/1907 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2000 |
|
4654 |
06/1907 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2586 |
|
4655 |
06/1907 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2587 |
|
4656 |
06/1907 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2588 |
|
4657 |
06/1907 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2589 |
|
4658 |
06/1907 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2590 |
|
4659 |
06/1907 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1011 |
|
4666 |
07/1907 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1364 |
|
4667 |
07/1907 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2053 |
|
4668 |
07/1907 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2181 |
|
4669 |
07/1907 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
276 |
|
4670 |
07/1907 |
11/1927 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
754 |
|
4671 |
07/1907 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
802 |
|
4672 |
07/1907 |
11/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
807 |
|
4673 |
08/1907 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
976 |
|
4674 |
08/1907 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1297 |
|
4675 |
08/1907 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1516 |
|
4677 |
08/1907 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2011 |
|
4678 |
08/1907 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
1309 |
|
4676 |
08/1907 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
2051 |
|
4679 |
08/1907 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
496 |
|
4680 |
09/1907 |
08/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
830 |
|
4681 |
09/1907 |
07/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
902 |
|
4682 |
09/1907 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
937 |
|
4683 |
09/1907 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2112 |
|
4684 |
09/1907 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1014 |
|
4685 |
09/1907 |
03/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1135 |
|
4686 |
09/1907 |
06/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2591 |
|
4690 |
10/1907 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2592 |
|
4691 |
10/1907 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2593 |
|
4692 |
10/1907 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2594 |
|
4693 |
10/1907 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2595 |
|
4694 |
10/1907 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1361 |
|
4687 |
10/1907 |
06/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1526 |
|
4688 |
10/1907 |
11/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2161 |
|
4689 |
10/1907 |
08/1925 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2596 |
|
4695 |
11/1907 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2597 |
|
4696 |
11/1907 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2598 |
|
4697 |
11/1907 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2599 |
|
4698 |
11/1907 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2600 |
|
4699 |
11/1907 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
618 |
|
4700 |
11/1907 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
719 |
|
4701 |
11/1907 |
11/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1434 |
|
4702 |
11/1907 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1512 |
|
4703 |
12/1907 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2270 |
|
4704 |
12/1907 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
992 |
|
4705 |
12/1907 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1643 |
|
4706 |
12/1907 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1645 |
|
4707 |
12/1907 |
09/1931 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2111 |
|
4708 |
12/1907 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2159 |
|
4709 |
12/1907 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1372 |
|
4710 |
01/1908 |
11/1939 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1390 |
|
4711 |
01/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1415 |
|
4712 |
01/1908 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1569 |
|
4713 |
01/1908 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1594 |
|
4714 |
01/1908 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1604 |
|
4715 |
01/1908 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1607 |
|
4716 |
01/1908 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1632 |
|
4717 |
01/1908 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1795 |
|
4718 |
01/1908 |
04/1938 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1796 |
|
4719 |
01/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2601 |
|
4720 |
02/1908 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2602 |
|
4721 |
02/1908 |
03/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2603 |
|
4722 |
02/1908 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2604 |
|
4723 |
02/1908 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2605 |
|
4724 |
02/1908 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2606 |
|
4725 |
02/1908 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2607 |
|
4726 |
02/1908 |
06/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2608 |
|
4727 |
02/1908 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2609 |
|
4728 |
03/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2610 |
|
4729 |
03/1908 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
524 |
|
4730 |
03/1908 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
630 |
|
4731 |
03/1908 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
917 |
|
4732 |
03/1908 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1296 |
|
4733 |
03/1908 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1610 |
|
4734 |
03/1908 |
04/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1640 |
|
4735 |
04/1908 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1654 |
|
4736 |
04/1908 |
05/1946 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1683 |
|
4737 |
04/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1738 |
|
4738 |
04/1908 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2123 |
|
4739 |
04/1908 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
636 |
|
4740 |
04/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
929 |
|
4741 |
04/1908 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
995 |
|
4742 |
04/1908 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1328 |
|
4743 |
04/1908 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
81 |
|
4745 |
05/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
746 |
|
4746 |
05/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1119 |
|
4747 |
05/1908 |
05/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1707 |
|
4748 |
05/1908 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2110 |
|
4749 |
05/1908 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2508 |
|
4744 |
05/1908 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
418 |
|
4750 |
05/1908 |
27/11/1948 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
738 |
|
4751 |
05/1908 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
821 |
|
4752 |
05/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1293 |
|
4753 |
05/1908 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1479 |
|
4754 |
05/1908 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1552 |
|
4755 |
06/1908 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1565 |
|
4756 |
06/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1602 |
|
4757 |
06/1908 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1605 |
|
4758 |
06/1908 |
07/1945 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2188 |
|
4759 |
06/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
254 |
|
4760 |
07/1908 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
705 |
|
4761 |
07/1908 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
933 |
|
4762 |
07/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1058 |
|
4763 |
07/1908 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1292 |
|
4764 |
07/1908 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1482 |
|
4765 |
07/1908 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1524 |
|
4766 |
07/1908 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1544 |
|
4767 |
08/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1708 |
|
4768 |
08/1908 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1731 |
|
4769 |
08/1908 |
07/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2611 |
|
4790 |
08/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2612 |
|
4791 |
08/1908 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2613 |
|
4792 |
08/1908 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2614 |
|
4793 |
08/1908 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2615 |
|
4794 |
08/1908 |
02/1950 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2616 |
|
4795 |
08/1908 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2617 |
|
4796 |
09/1908 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2618 |
|
4797 |
09/1908 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2619 |
|
4798 |
09/1908 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2620 |
|
4799 |
09/1908 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
724 |
|
4800 |
09/1908 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
852 |
|
4801 |
09/1908 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1126 |
|
4802 |
09/1908 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1368 |
|
4803 |
09/1908 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1375 |
|
4804 |
09/1908 |
12/1948 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1457 |
|
4805 |
10/1908 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1686 |
|
4806 |
10/1908 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1739 |
|
4807 |
10/1908 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2009 |
|
4808 |
10/1908 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2241 |
|
4809 |
10/1908 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1782 |
|
4810 |
10/1908 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1377 |
|
4811 |
10/1908 |
04/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1579 |
|
4812 |
10/1908 |
08/1933 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1786 |
|
4813 |
11/1908 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
370 |
|
4814 |
11/1908 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
939 |
|
4815 |
11/1908 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1399 |
|
4816 |
11/1908 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1447 |
|
4817 |
11/1908 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2084 |
|
4818 |
11/1908 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
2518 |
|
4819 |
11/1908 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
322 |
|
4770 |
12/1908 |
06/1929 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
884 |
|
4771 |
12/1908 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
887 |
|
4772 |
01/1909 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1020 |
|
4773 |
01/1909 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1483 |
|
4774 |
01/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1490 |
|
4775 |
01/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1553 |
|
4776 |
01/1909 |
10/1931 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1571 |
|
4777 |
01/1909 |
01/1929 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2076 |
|
4778 |
01/1909 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2116 |
|
4779 |
01/1909 |
07/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2621 |
|
4780 |
02/1909 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2622 |
|
4781 |
02/1909 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2623 |
|
4782 |
02/1909 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2624 |
|
4783 |
02/1909 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2625 |
|
4784 |
02/1909 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2626 |
|
4785 |
02/1909 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2627 |
|
4786 |
02/1909 |
05/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2628 |
|
4787 |
02/1909 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2629 |
|
4788 |
03/1909 |
02/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2630 |
|
4789 |
03/1909 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1406 |
|
4830 |
04/1909 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1413 |
|
4831 |
04/1909 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1477 |
|
4832 |
05/1909 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1498 |
|
4833 |
05/1909 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1566 |
|
4834 |
05/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1603 |
|
4835 |
05/1909 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1649 |
|
4836 |
05/1909 |
09/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1661 |
|
4837 |
05/1909 |
06/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1781 |
|
4838 |
05/1909 |
05/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2022 |
|
4839 |
05/1909 |
04/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2637 |
|
4840 |
06/1909 |
01/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2638 |
|
4841 |
06/1909 |
06/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2639 |
|
4842 |
06/1909 |
04/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2640 |
|
4843 |
06/1909 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2641 |
|
4844 |
06/1909 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2642 |
|
4845 |
06/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2643 |
|
4846 |
06/1909 |
10/1927 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2644 |
|
4847 |
06/1909 |
08/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2645 |
|
4848 |
07/1909 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
2646 |
|
4849 |
07/1909 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1342 |
|
4870 |
08/1909 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1376 |
|
4871 |
08/1909 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1397 |
|
4872 |
08/1909 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1450 |
|
4873 |
08/1909 |
09/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1461 |
|
4874 |
08/1909 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1465 |
|
4875 |
09/1909 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1467 |
|
4876 |
09/1909 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1538 |
|
4877 |
09/1909 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1554 |
|
4878 |
09/1909 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1558 |
|
4879 |
09/1909 |
01/1940 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1421 |
|
4880 |
09/1909 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1541 |
|
4881 |
09/1909 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1576 |
|
4882 |
09/1909 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1581 |
|
4883 |
09/1909 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1612 |
|
4884 |
09/1909 |
06/1932 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1613 |
|
4885 |
10/1909 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1625 |
|
4886 |
10/1909 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1630 |
|
4887 |
10/1909 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1711 |
|
4888 |
10/1909 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
1770 |
|
4889 |
10/1909 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1412 |
|
4850 |
11/1909 |
01/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1418 |
|
4851 |
11/1909 |
12/1931 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1420 |
|
4852 |
11/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1455 |
|
4853 |
11/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1611 |
|
4854 |
11/1909 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1618 |
|
4855 |
11/1909 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1624 |
|
4856 |
11/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1652 |
|
4857 |
11/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1689 |
|
4858 |
12/1909 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1703 |
|
4859 |
12/1909 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
71 |
|
4860 |
12/1909 |
04/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
275 |
|
4861 |
12/1909 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
677 |
|
4862 |
12/1909 |
12/1933 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1002 |
|
4863 |
12/1909 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1534 |
|
4864 |
12/1909 |
09/1925 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2653 |
|
4890 |
01/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2654 |
|
4891 |
01/1910 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2655 |
|
4892 |
01/1910 |
15/12/1962 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1471 |
|
4865 |
01/1910 |
03/1932 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1561 |
|
4866 |
01/1910 |
09/1928 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1618 |
|
4867 |
01/1910 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1658 |
|
4869 |
01/1910 |
07/1931 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2656 |
|
4893 |
02/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2657 |
|
4894 |
02/1910 |
02/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2658 |
|
4895 |
02/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2659 |
|
4896 |
02/1910 |
04/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2660 |
|
4897 |
02/1910 |
22/09/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2661 |
|
4898 |
02/1910 |
16/11/1957 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2662 |
|
4899 |
02/1910 |
14/01/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1354 |
|
4900 |
03/1910 |
15/10/1960 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1380 |
|
4901 |
03/1910 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1411 |
|
4902 |
03/1910 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1456 |
|
4903 |
03/1910 |
27/09/1952 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1497 |
|
4904 |
03/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1556 |
|
4905 |
03/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1582 |
|
4906 |
03/1910 |
06/1948 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1591 |
|
4907 |
03/1910 |
05/04/1952 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1619 |
|
4908 |
03/1910 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1629 |
|
4909 |
03/1910 |
12/05/1951 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1322 |
|
4910 |
04/1910 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1464 |
|
4911 |
04/1910 |
30/09/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1511 |
|
4912 |
04/1910 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1570 |
|
4913 |
04/1910 |
16/07/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1578 |
|
4914 |
04/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1600 |
|
4915 |
05/1910 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1647 |
|
4916 |
05/1910 |
15/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1664 |
|
4917 |
05/1910 |
29/04/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1687 |
|
4918 |
05/1910 |
23/11/1957 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1699 |
|
4919 |
05/1910 |
07/03/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1503 |
|
4920 |
05/1910 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1540 |
|
4921 |
05/1910 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1609 |
|
4922 |
06/1910 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1634 |
|
4923 |
06/1910 |
19/01/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1637 |
|
4924 |
06/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1639 |
|
4925 |
06/1910 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1660 |
|
4926 |
06/1910 |
14/11/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1789 |
|
4927 |
06/1910 |
06/03/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2030 |
|
4928 |
06/1910 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2032 |
|
4929 |
06/1910 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2663 |
|
4970 |
07/1910 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
2664 |
|
4979 |
07/1910 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1385 |
|
4930 |
07/1910 |
30/09/1958 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1492 |
|
4931 |
07/1910 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1507 |
|
4932 |
07/1910 |
01/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1539 |
|
4933 |
08/1910 |
15/09/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1577 |
|
4934 |
08/1910 |
15/09/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1606 |
|
4935 |
08/1910 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1648 |
|
4936 |
08/1910 |
11/1948 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1690 |
|
4937 |
08/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1774 |
|
4938 |
08/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1776 |
|
4939 |
08/1910 |
07/1948 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1403 |
|
4940 |
08/1910 |
31/03/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1424 |
|
4941 |
08/1910 |
11/1949 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1462 |
|
4942 |
09/1910 |
08/1948 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1700 |
|
4943 |
09/1910 |
07/10/1961 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1727 |
|
4944 |
09/1910 |
02/02/1952 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1735 |
|
4945 |
09/1910 |
15/09/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1794 |
|
4946 |
09/1910 |
21/07/1962 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1775 |
|
4947 |
09/1910 |
17/09/1955 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
1788 |
|
4948 |
09/1910 |
24/10/1959 |
LNWR |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
0-8-0 |
2014 |
|
4949 |
09/1910 |
10/11/1962 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
1550 |
|
4984 |
10/1910 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
2271 |
|
4987 |
10/1910 |
11/1938 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
896 |
|
4982 |
10/1910 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
1559 |
|
4985 |
10/1910 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
2151 |
|
4986 |
10/1910 |
11/1937 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
2507 |
|
4988 |
10/1910 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
238 |
|
4981 |
10/1910 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
1195 |
|
4983 |
10/1910 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Queen Mary |
4-4-0 |
2512 |
|
4989 |
10/1910 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1059 |
|
4974 |
11/1910 |
07/02/1948 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1294 |
|
4971 |
11/1910 |
12/1938 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1583 |
|
4975 |
11/1910 |
09/1939 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1725 |
|
4972 |
11/1910 |
11/1938 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2155 |
|
4973 |
11/1910 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
Experiment |
4-6-0 |
1621 |
|
4868 |
11/1910 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2025 |
|
4976 |
12/1910 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2665 |
|
4950 |
12/1910 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2666 |
|
4951 |
12/1910 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
228 |
|
4977 |
01/1911 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
445 |
|
4978 |
01/1911 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2168 |
|
4980 |
01/1911 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2667 |
|
4952 |
01/1911 |
07/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2668 |
|
4953 |
01/1911 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2669 |
|
4954 |
02/1911 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2670 |
|
4955 |
02/1911 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
217 |
|
4956 |
02/1911 |
04/1938 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1183 |
|
4957 |
02/1911 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1366 |
|
4958 |
02/1911 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1797 |
|
4959 |
02/1911 |
03/1938 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
632 |
|
4960 |
03/1911 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1186 |
|
4961 |
03/1911 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1416 |
|
4962 |
03/1911 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1533 |
|
4963 |
03/1911 |
03/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1638 |
|
4964 |
03/1911 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1688 |
|
4965 |
03/1911 |
04/1941 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
956 |
|
4990 |
04/1911 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1489 |
|
4991 |
04/1911 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1504 |
|
4992 |
04/1911 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1692 |
|
4966 |
04/1911 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1710 |
|
4967 |
04/1911 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1728 |
|
4968 |
04/1911 |
03/1938 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1734 |
|
4969 |
04/1911 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1513 |
|
4993 |
05/1911 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1532 |
|
4994 |
05/1911 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1628 |
|
4995 |
05/1911 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1662 |
|
4996 |
05/1911 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1706 |
|
4997 |
05/1911 |
02/1940 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1792 |
|
4998 |
05/1911 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2495 |
|
4999 |
05/1911 |
01/1939 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1800 |
|
5000 |
06/1911 |
06/1940 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
502 |
|
5001 |
06/1911 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
868 |
|
5002 |
06/1911 |
22/05/1948 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
882 |
|
5003 |
06/1911 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1218 |
|
5004 |
06/1911 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2081 |
|
5005 |
06/1911 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2212 |
|
5006 |
06/1911 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2291 |
|
5007 |
06/1911 |
08/1941 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2177 |
|
5008 |
07/1911 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2498 |
|
5009 |
07/1911 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
361 |
|
5010 |
07/1911 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
888 |
|
5011 |
07/1911 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1360 |
|
5012 |
07/1911 |
03/1939 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1394 |
|
5013 |
07/1911 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1623 |
|
5015 |
08/1911 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1631 |
|
5016 |
08/1911 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1644 |
|
5017 |
08/1911 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2089 |
|
5018 |
08/1911 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2494 |
|
5014 |
08/1911 |
11/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2220 |
|
5019 |
08/1911 |
01/1938 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1371 |
|
5020 |
09/1911 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1417 |
|
5021 |
09/1911 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1472 |
|
5022 |
09/1911 |
10/1939 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1595 |
|
5023 |
09/1911 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1681 |
|
5024 |
09/1911 |
08/05/1948 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1713 |
|
5025 |
09/1911 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1730 |
|
5026 |
10/1911 |
12/1947 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1733 |
|
5027 |
10/1911 |
07/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1777 |
|
5028 |
10/1911 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1799 |
|
5029 |
10/1911 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
819 |
|
5030 |
10/1911 |
21/10/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1388 |
|
5031 |
10/1911 |
23/03/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1452 |
|
5032 |
10/1911 |
26/06/1937 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1454 |
|
5033 |
11/1911 |
19/01/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1537 |
|
5034 |
11/1911 |
27/10/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1691 |
|
5035 |
11/1911 |
10/11/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1704 |
|
5036 |
11/1911 |
25/09/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1721 |
|
5037 |
11/1911 |
22/12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2021 |
|
5038 |
12/1911 |
09/02/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2359 |
|
5039 |
12/1911 |
14/10/1933 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7875 |
|
5045 |
01/1912 |
28/08/1948 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7877 |
|
5047 |
01/1912 |
21/02/1953 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1384 |
|
|
02/1912 |
03/02/1951 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1697 |
|
|
02/1912 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2001 |
|
|
03/1912 |
16/05/1953 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1568 |
|
|
03/1912 |
18/09/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1655 |
|
|
04/1912 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1505 |
|
|
05/1912 |
02/1952 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2119 |
|
|
05/1912 |
01/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2345 |
|
|
06/1912 |
18/12/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1746 |
|
|
07/1912 |
01/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
674 |
|
|
07/1912 |
06/1950 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
91 |
|
5080 |
07/1912 |
02/1939 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
375 |
|
5081 |
07/1912 |
02/1938 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
376 |
|
5082 |
07/1912 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
716 |
|
5083 |
07/1912 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
915 |
|
5084 |
08/1912 |
07/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
932 |
|
5085 |
08/1912 |
12/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
944 |
|
5086 |
08/1912 |
11/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
962 |
|
5087 |
08/1912 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
858 |
|
5088 |
08/1912 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2004 |
|
5089 |
08/1912 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
327 |
|
5090 |
09/1912 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
704 |
|
5091 |
09/1912 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
841 |
|
5092 |
09/1912 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
963 |
|
5093 |
09/1912 |
02/1938 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1006 |
|
5094 |
09/1912 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1021 |
|
5095 |
09/1912 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
96 |
|
5347 |
09/1912 |
12/1936 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2162 |
|
|
10/1912 |
16/02/1952 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
1184 |
|
5096 |
10/1912 |
02/1936 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2289 |
|
|
11/1912 |
02/1950 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1529 |
|
|
12/1912 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2286 |
|
|
12/1912 |
05/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
631 |
|
|
12/1912 |
10/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
328 |
|
|
12/1912 |
11/1951 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
82 |
|
5118 |
01/1913 |
02/1937 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
326 |
|
|
01/1913 |
19/06/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2245 |
|
|
01/1913 |
07/04/1951 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2222 |
|
|
01/1913 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
752 |
|
5119 |
02/1913 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2124 |
|
5120 |
02/1913 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1138 |
|
5121 |
02/1913 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2154 |
|
5122 |
02/1913 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2282 |
|
5123 |
02/1913 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
89 |
|
5124 |
03/1913 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
132 |
|
5125 |
03/1913 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1193 |
|
5126 |
03/1913 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
845 |
|
5129 |
03/1913 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2279 |
|
5127 |
03/1913 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
404 |
|
5133 |
04/1913 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
681 |
|
5128 |
04/1913 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1188 |
|
5130 |
04/1913 |
02/1941 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1680 |
|
5131 |
04/1913 |
05/1941 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2086 |
|
5132 |
04/1913 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1481 |
|
5134 |
04/1913 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2197 |
|
5135 |
04/1913 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2242 |
|
5136 |
05/1913 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2428 |
|
5137 |
05/1913 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1327 |
|
|
05/1913 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1319 |
|
|
05/1913 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1161 |
|
|
05/1913 |
05/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1191 |
|
|
05/1913 |
11/1930 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2046 |
|
|
06/1913 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
21 |
|
|
06/1913 |
04/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
163 |
|
|
06/1913 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
650 |
|
|
06/1913 |
02/1933 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
670 |
|
|
07/1913 |
02/1951 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1159 |
|
|
07/1913 |
02/1937 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2201 |
|
|
08/1913 |
09/1951 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2258 |
|
|
09/1913 |
29/09/1951 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2246 |
|
|
09/1913 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
362 |
|
5167 |
10/1913 |
09/10/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
892 |
|
5168 |
10/1913 |
25/05/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1081 |
|
5169 |
10/1913 |
25/01/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1089 |
|
5170 |
10/1913 |
16/02/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1134 |
|
5171 |
10/1913 |
29/12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2040 |
|
5172 |
11/1913 |
09/03/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2075 |
|
5173 |
11/1913 |
01/12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2198 |
|
5174 |
11/1913 |
14/03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2205 |
|
5175 |
11/1913 |
01/09/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2213 |
|
5176 |
11/1913 |
18/09/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
321 |
|
5177 |
11/1913 |
18/01/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
479 |
|
5178 |
12/1913 |
23/02/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
951 |
|
5179 |
12/1913 |
04/08/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1679 |
|
5180 |
12/1913 |
18/05/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2249 |
|
5181 |
12/1913 |
27/02/1937 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2283 |
|
5182 |
12/1913 |
12/12/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
307 |
|
5183 |
12/1913 |
01/12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
637 |
|
5184 |
12/1913 |
15/12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
979 |
|
5185 |
01/1914 |
15/09/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1400 |
|
5186 |
01/1914 |
06/06/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
86 |
|
5187 |
01/1914 |
30/05/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
146 |
|
5188 |
01/1914 |
25/07/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
964 |
|
5189 |
02/1914 |
05/09/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
985 |
|
5190 |
02/1914 |
07/09/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1321 |
|
5191 |
02/1914 |
29/09/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2152 |
|
5192 |
02/1914 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2293 |
|
5193 |
02/1914 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2377 |
|
5194 |
02/1914 |
12/1936 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1486 |
|
|
03/1914 |
02/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
20 |
|
|
03/1914 |
20/03/1948 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2443 |
|
5195 |
03/1914 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2520 |
|
5196 |
03/1914 |
10/1933 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1500 |
|
|
04/1914 |
17/06/1950 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2033 |
|
|
04/1914 |
22/05/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
175 |
|
|
05/1914 |
13/03/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2336 |
|
|
05/1914 |
20/09/1952 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
72 |
|
|
07/1914 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
176 |
|
|
07/1914 |
10/04/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
203 |
|
|
07/1914 |
01/1948 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
250 |
|
|
08/1914 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
260 |
|
|
08/1914 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1131 |
|
|
08/1914 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1429 |
|
|
09/1914 |
08/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
209 |
|
|
09/1914 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
668 |
|
|
09/1914 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
856 |
|
|
09/1914 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2239 |
|
|
09/1914 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1567 |
|
|
10/1914 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2401 |
|
|
10/1914 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
363 |
|
5237 |
05/1915 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
789 |
|
5238 |
05/1915 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
984 |
|
5239 |
05/1915 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
104 |
|
5242 |
06/1915 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
226 |
|
5243 |
06/1915 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
1086 |
|
5244 |
06/1915 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2153 |
|
5240 |
06/1915 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2233 |
|
5241 |
06/1915 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2106 |
|
5245 |
07/1915 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
George V |
4-4-0 |
2370 |
|
5246 |
07/1915 |
06/1939 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7881 |
|
5249 |
08/1915 |
21/07/1951 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7884 |
|
5251 |
09/1915 |
09/06/1951 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7885 |
|
5252 |
09/1915 |
03/1950 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7887 |
|
5254 |
09/1915 |
28/08/1948 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7888 |
|
5255 |
09/1915 |
04/12/1948 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
27 |
|
5297 |
10/1915 |
02/1937 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
88 |
|
5298 |
10/1915 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
122 |
|
5299 |
11/1915 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
160 |
|
5300 |
11/1915 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
185 |
|
5301 |
11/1915 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
877 |
|
5302 |
11/1915 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1333 |
|
5303 |
11/1915 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2275 |
|
5304 |
11/1915 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2396 |
|
5305 |
12/1915 |
16/10/1948 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2408 |
|
5306 |
12/1915 |
10/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
606 |
|
5307 |
01/1916 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
745 |
|
5308 |
01/1916 |
07/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1352 |
|
5309 |
01/1916 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1379 |
|
5310 |
01/1916 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1384 |
|
5311 |
01/1916 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
810 |
|
5312 |
01/1916 |
09/1933 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1084 |
|
5313 |
01/1916 |
08/1938 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1346 |
|
5314 |
01/1916 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2417 |
|
5315 |
01/1916 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2442 |
|
5316 |
02/1916 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
95 |
|
5317 |
03/1916 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
126 |
|
5318 |
03/1916 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
233 |
|
5319 |
03/1916 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
849 |
|
5320 |
03/1916 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1100 |
|
5321 |
03/1916 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1324 |
|
5322 |
04/1916 |
01/1946 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2092 |
|
5323 |
04/1916 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2276 |
|
5324 |
04/1916 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2295 |
|
5325 |
04/1916 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2340 |
|
5326 |
04/1916 |
09/1933 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
170 |
|
|
05/1916 |
03/1950 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
982 |
|
|
05/1916 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1217 |
|
|
05/1916 |
10/03/1951 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1729 |
|
|
06/1916 |
03/1949 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
511 |
|
|
07/1916 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
695 |
|
|
07/1916 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
968 |
|
|
07/1916 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1093 |
|
|
07/1916 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2238 |
|
|
08/1916 |
01/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1345 |
|
|
08/1916 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2174 |
|
|
08/1916 |
03/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2204 |
|
|
08/1916 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2221 |
|
|
08/1916 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2395 |
|
|
09/1916 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
316 |
|
5348 |
09/1916 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
809 |
|
5349 |
09/1916 |
08/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
878 |
|
5350 |
10/1916 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2098 |
|
5351 |
10/1916 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2273 |
|
5352 |
10/1916 |
01/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2292 |
|
5353 |
11/1916 |
09/1939 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2298 |
|
5354 |
11/1916 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2384 |
|
5355 |
11/1916 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
2418 |
|
5356 |
11/1916 |
09/1937 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7892 |
|
5359 |
01/1917 |
14/02/1948 |
LNWR |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7896 |
|
5363 |
01/1917 |
04/11/1950 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
37 |
|
|
02/1917 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
154 |
|
|
03/1917 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
155 |
|
|
03/1917 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
162 |
|
|
03/1917 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
186 |
|
|
03/1917 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
713 |
|
|
03/1917 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2097 |
|
|
04/1917 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2042 |
|
|
04/1917 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1334 |
|
|
04/1917 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2366 |
|
|
05/1917 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2373 |
|
|
05/1917 |
08/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1335 |
|
|
05/1917 |
08/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2230 |
|
|
05/1917 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1019 |
|
|
05/1917 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2411 |
|
|
06/1917 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2431 |
|
|
06/1917 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2427 |
|
|
06/1917 |
02/1941 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2420 |
|
|
06/1917 |
04/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
116 |
|
|
07/1917 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2450 |
|
|
07/1917 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2445 |
|
|
07/1917 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1085 |
|
|
08/1917 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
986 |
|
|
08/1917 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
171 |
|
|
08/1917 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
159 |
|
|
08/1917 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2122 |
|
|
09/1917 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1103 |
|
|
09/1917 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2368 |
|
|
09/1917 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2416 |
|
|
09/1917 |
10/1932 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
112 |
|
|
10/1917 |
09/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2088 |
|
|
10/1917 |
10/04/1948 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2426 |
|
|
10/1917 |
06/1932 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2423 |
|
|
12/1917 |
11/02/1950 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
943 |
|
|
01/1918 |
16/07/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1313 |
|
|
02/1918 |
07/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2082 |
|
|
02/1918 |
24/04/1946 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2297 |
|
|
04/1918 |
14/08/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
230 |
|
|
05/1918 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
880 |
|
|
05/1918 |
27/11/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1071 |
|
|
05/1918 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2199 |
|
|
06/1918 |
03/07/1948 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2054 |
|
|
09/1918 |
12/1949 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1306 |
|
|
10/1918 |
01/08/1953 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
1158 |
|
|
11/1918 |
29/07/1950 |
LMS |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
2497 |
|
|
12/1918 |
09/1950 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
28 |
|
5437 |
01/1919 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
263 |
|
5438 |
01/1919 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
295 |
|
5439 |
01/1919 |
07/1937 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
391 |
|
5440 |
01/1919 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
740 |
|
5441 |
01/1919 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
805 |
|
5442 |
01/1919 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
863 |
|
5443 |
01/1919 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
940 |
|
5444 |
01/1919 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1196 |
|
5445 |
01/1919 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1546 |
|
5446 |
02/1919 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
621 |
|
5447 |
02/1919 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
707 |
|
5448 |
02/1919 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1373 |
|
5449 |
02/1919 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1453 |
|
5450 |
03/1919 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1584 |
|
5451 |
03/1919 |
09/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
57 |
|
5452 |
03/1919 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
504 |
|
5453 |
03/1919 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
974 |
|
5454 |
03/1919 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1673 |
|
5455 |
03/1919 |
08/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2184 |
|
5456 |
03/1919 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
33 |
|
5457 |
04/1919 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
388 |
|
5458 |
04/1919 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1123 |
|
5459 |
04/1919 |
04/1937 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1215 |
|
5460 |
04/1919 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1351 |
|
5461 |
04/1919 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1437 |
|
5462 |
05/1919 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1670 |
|
5463 |
05/1919 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1732 |
|
5464 |
05/1919 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2073 |
|
5465 |
05/1919 |
06/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2285 |
|
5466 |
05/1919 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
444 |
|
5467 |
05/1919 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
497 |
|
5468 |
06/1919 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
501 |
|
5469 |
06/1919 |
06/03/1948 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
522 |
|
5470 |
06/1919 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
601 |
|
5471 |
06/1919 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
783 |
|
5472 |
06/1919 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
924 |
|
5473 |
06/1919 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
56 |
|
5477 |
06/1919 |
07/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1125 |
|
5474 |
07/1919 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1290 |
|
5475 |
07/1919 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1307 |
|
5476 |
07/1919 |
12/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
67 |
|
5478 |
07/1919 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
635 |
|
5479 |
08/1919 |
11/1938 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
686 |
|
5480 |
08/1919 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
812 |
|
5481 |
08/1919 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
969 |
|
5482 |
08/1919 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1325 |
|
5483 |
08/1919 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1341 |
|
5484 |
08/1919 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1355 |
|
5485 |
09/1919 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1620 |
|
5486 |
09/1919 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
35 |
|
5487 |
09/1919 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
487 |
|
5488 |
09/1919 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1178 |
|
5489 |
09/1919 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
395 |
|
5490 |
09/1919 |
01/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
889 |
|
5491 |
10/1919 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1113 |
|
5492 |
10/1919 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1408 |
|
5493 |
10/1919 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1422 |
|
5494 |
10/1919 |
04/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1478 |
|
5495 |
10/1919 |
10/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1535 |
|
5496 |
10/1919 |
01/1946 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1542 |
|
5497 |
11/1919 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1549 |
|
5498 |
11/1919 |
07/1944 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1557 |
|
5499 |
11/1919 |
06/1948 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
1694 |
|
5500 |
11/1919 |
02/1936 |
LNWR |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
2516 |
|
5501 |
11/1919 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
972 |
|
|
01/1920 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2179 |
|
|
01/1920 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1177 |
|
|
01/1920 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1914 |
|
|
01/1920 |
07/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
194 |
|
|
01/1920 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
178 |
|
|
01/1920 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
69 |
|
|
01/1920 |
03/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
484 |
|
|
02/1920 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1407 |
|
|
02/1920 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1599 |
|
|
02/1920 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2499 |
|
|
02/1920 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2511 |
|
|
02/1920 |
12/1930 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2268 |
|
|
03/1920 |
04/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1726 |
|
|
03/1920 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1741 |
|
|
03/1920 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1747 |
|
|
03/1920 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2035 |
|
|
03/1920 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2083 |
|
|
03/1920 |
04/1929 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2231 |
|
|
03/1920 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
103 |
|
|
04/1920 |
11/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
98 |
|
|
04/1920 |
06/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
85 |
|
|
04/1920 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
12 |
|
|
04/1920 |
05/1937 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
201 |
|
|
04/1920 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1096 |
|
|
05/1920 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2059 |
|
|
05/1920 |
02/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
499 |
|
|
05/1920 |
10/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
808 |
|
|
05/1920 |
06/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1092 |
|
|
05/1920 |
11/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1133 |
|
|
05/1920 |
11/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1097 |
|
|
05/1920 |
05/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2101 |
|
|
06/1920 |
08/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
8 |
|
|
06/1920 |
02/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
6 |
|
|
06/1920 |
06/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2095 |
|
|
06/1920 |
05/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2090 |
|
|
06/1920 |
10/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1326 |
|
|
06/1920 |
04/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
11 |
|
|
07/1920 |
03/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
07/1920 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
15 |
|
|
07/1920 |
03/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
2430 |
|
|
07/1920 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
13 |
|
|
07/1920 |
06/1937 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
23 |
|
|
08/1920 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
30 |
|
|
08/1920 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
32 |
|
|
08/1920 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
42 |
|
|
08/1920 |
23/04/1949 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
63 |
|
|
08/1920 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
102 |
|
|
08/1920 |
10/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
68 |
|
|
08/1920 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
119 |
|
|
09/1920 |
05/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
110 |
|
|
09/1920 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
152 |
|
|
03/1921 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
156 |
|
|
03/1921 |
03/1936 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
149 |
|
|
03/1921 |
08/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
150 |
|
|
03/1921 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
180 |
|
|
04/1921 |
12/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
169 |
|
|
04/1921 |
10/1940 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
179 |
|
|
04/1921 |
02/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
161 |
|
|
04/1921 |
01/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
158 |
|
|
04/1921 |
03/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
157 |
|
|
04/1921 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
192 |
|
|
05/1921 |
02/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
183 |
|
|
05/1921 |
07/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
205 |
|
|
05/1921 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
207 |
|
|
05/1921 |
07/1941 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
208 |
|
|
05/1921 |
03/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
210 |
|
|
05/1921 |
08/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1216 |
|
|
06/1921 |
09/1934 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
1220 |
|
|
06/1921 |
12/1935 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
211 |
|
|
06/1921 |
12/1932 |
LNWR |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
517 |
|
|
06/1921 |
01/1933 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
380 |
|
5722 |
02/1923 |
07/08/1948 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
782 |
|
5723 |
02/1923 |
15/12/1951 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
1189 |
|
5724 |
02/1923 |
09/1949 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
|
|
5725 |
02/1923 |
17/06/1950 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
1976 |
|
5726 |
03/1923 |
05/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
256 |
|
5727 |
03/1923 |
09/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
731 |
|
5728 |
04/1923 |
06/1949 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
739 |
|
5729 |
04/1923 |
07/10/1950 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
1908 |
|
5730 |
04/1923 |
21/02/1948 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
1956 |
|
5731 |
04/1923 |
12/1950 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
468 |
|
5732 |
06/1923 |
01/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
792 |
|
5733 |
06/1923 |
12/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
793 |
|
5734 |
06/1923 |
11/1944 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7943 |
|
5735 |
06/1923 |
02/1947 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
1904 |
|
5735 |
06/1923 |
02/1947 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7944 |
|
5736 |
06/1923 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
609 |
|
5736 |
06/1923 |
11/1947 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7945 |
|
5737 |
08/1923 |
09/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7946 |
|
5738 |
08/1923 |
12/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7947 |
|
5739 |
08/1923 |
08/1944 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7948 |
|
5740 |
09/1923 |
03/07/1948 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7949 |
|
5741 |
09/1923 |
10/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7950 |
|
5742 |
10/1923 |
06/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7951 |
|
5743 |
10/1923 |
01/1949 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7952 |
|
5744 |
10/1923 |
08/1945 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7953 |
|
5745 |
10/1923 |
05/1945 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7954 |
|
5746 |
10/1923 |
10/1948 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7955 |
|
5747 |
10/1923 |
08/1946 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7956 |
|
5748 |
11/1923 |
27/11/1948 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7958 |
|
5749 |
11/1923 |
04/12/1948 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7957 |
|
5749 |
11/1923 |
12/1945 |
LNWR |
7F |
0-8-4T |
7959 |
|
5751 |
01/1924 |
06/1948 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4107 |
|
|
12/1924 |
09/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4108 |
|
|
01/1925 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4109 |
|
|
02/1925 |
02/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4112 |
|
|
03/1925 |
19/01/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4111 |
|
|
03/1925 |
09/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4110 |
|
|
03/1925 |
04/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4113 |
|
|
05/1925 |
29/01/1966 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4114 |
|
|
05/1925 |
18/05/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4115 |
|
|
05/1925 |
10/07/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4116 |
|
|
05/1925 |
28/11/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4117 |
|
|
06/1925 |
19/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4118 |
|
|
06/1925 |
15/05/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4119 |
|
|
06/1925 |
07/12/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4124 |
|
|
07/1925 |
02/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4123 |
|
|
07/1925 |
03/06/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4122 |
|
|
07/1925 |
01/09/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4120 |
|
|
07/1925 |
28/11/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4121 |
|
|
07/1925 |
16/01/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4125 |
|
|
08/1925 |
27/03/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4126 |
|
|
08/1925 |
09/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4127 |
|
|
08/1925 |
16/01/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4128 |
|
|
08/1925 |
29/12/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4129 |
|
|
08/1925 |
27/09/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4132 |
|
|
09/1925 |
03/08/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4135 |
|
|
09/1925 |
21/04/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4134 |
|
|
09/1925 |
28/11/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4133 |
|
|
09/1925 |
09/11/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4131 |
|
|
09/1925 |
14/11/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4130 |
|
|
09/1925 |
12/12/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4140 |
|
|
10/1925 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4136 |
|
|
10/1925 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4137 |
|
|
10/1925 |
27/02/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4138 |
|
|
10/1925 |
14/07/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4139 |
|
|
10/1925 |
21/08/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4146 |
|
|
11/1925 |
13/11/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4147 |
|
|
11/1925 |
09/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4146 |
|
|
11/1925 |
20/05/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4149 |
|
|
11/1925 |
07/11/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4150 |
|
|
11/1925 |
26/01/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4141 |
|
|
11/1925 |
03/07/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4142 |
|
|
11/1925 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4143 |
|
|
11/1925 |
13/10/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4144 |
|
|
11/1925 |
08/08/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4145 |
|
|
11/1925 |
21/02/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4152 |
|
|
12/1925 |
09/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4151 |
|
|
12/1925 |
07/12/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4153 |
|
|
12/1925 |
29/04/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4154 |
|
|
12/1925 |
07/04/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4155 |
|
|
12/1925 |
09/10/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4156 |
|
|
12/1925 |
22/02/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4157 |
|
|
12/1925 |
31/07/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4158 |
|
|
12/1925 |
14/07/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4159 |
|
|
02/1926 |
01/10/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4161 |
|
|
02/1926 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4162 |
|
|
02/1926 |
14/12/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4163 |
|
|
02/1926 |
09/07/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4164 |
|
|
02/1926 |
20/07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4165 |
|
|
02/1926 |
08/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4166 |
|
|
02/1926 |
27/01/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4160 |
|
|
02/1926 |
11/12/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4172 |
|
|
03/1926 |
09/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4171 |
|
|
03/1926 |
09/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4170 |
|
|
03/1926 |
14/10/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4169 |
|
|
03/1926 |
28/08/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4168 |
|
|
03/1926 |
10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4167 |
|
|
03/1926 |
22/01/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4173 |
|
|
04/1926 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4176 |
|
|
04/1926 |
06/07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4175 |
|
|
04/1926 |
12/12/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4174 |
|
|
04/1926 |
12/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4308 |
|
|
09/1926 |
05/10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4302 |
|
|
10/1926 |
21/03/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4303 |
|
|
10/1926 |
09/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4304 |
|
|
10/1926 |
02/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4305 |
|
|
10/1926 |
03/04/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4306 |
|
|
10/1926 |
28/11/1959 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4307 |
|
|
10/1926 |
06/10/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4309 |
|
|
10/1926 |
27/07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4310 |
|
|
10/1926 |
05/02/1966 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4311 |
|
|
10/1926 |
09/07/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13030 |
325 |
|
11/1926 |
26/06/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13031 |
325 |
|
12/1926 |
08/02/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13032 |
325 |
|
12/1926 |
12/06/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13033 |
325 |
|
12/1926 |
20/02/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13034 |
325 |
|
12/1926 |
05/03/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13035 |
325 |
|
12/1926 |
30/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13037 |
325 |
|
16/01/1927 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13036 |
325 |
|
08/02/1927 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13038 |
325 |
|
08/02/1927 |
14/05/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13039 |
325 |
|
08/02/1927 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13041 |
325 |
|
07/03/1927 |
29/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13042 |
325 |
|
23/03/1927 |
30/07/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13040 |
325 |
|
27/03/1927 |
24/01/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13044 |
325 |
|
31/03/1927 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13046 |
325 |
|
30/04/1927 |
30/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13045 |
325 |
|
14/05/1927 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13047 |
325 |
|
14/05/1927 |
02/03/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13055 |
325 |
|
02/06/1927 |
31/10/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13049 |
325 |
|
02/06/1927 |
30/07/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13043 |
325 |
|
02/06/1927 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13053 |
325 |
|
04/06/1927 |
28/08/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13056 |
325 |
|
04/06/1927 |
06/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13051 |
325 |
|
09/06/1927 |
24/04/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13050 |
325 |
|
11/06/1927 |
31/08/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13059 |
325 |
|
16/06/1927 |
12/01/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13060 |
325 |
|
16/06/1927 |
15/08/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13062 |
325 |
|
16/06/1927 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13061 |
325 |
|
20/06/1927 |
27/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13054 |
325 |
|
22/06/1927 |
14/11/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13048 |
325 |
|
23/06/1927 |
10/10/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13052 |
325 |
|
27/06/1927 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13057 |
325 |
|
01/07/1927 |
27/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13063 |
325 |
|
01/07/1927 |
06/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13066 |
325 |
|
01/07/1927 |
30/11/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13068 |
325 |
|
14/07/1927 |
14/12/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13064 |
325 |
|
15/07/1927 |
20/01/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13067 |
325 |
|
15/07/1927 |
16/03/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13069 |
325 |
|
19/07/1927 |
15/02/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13070 |
325 |
|
19/07/1927 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13071 |
325 |
|
30/07/1927 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13058 |
325 |
|
05/08/1927 |
26/10/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13072 |
325 |
|
05/08/1927 |
08/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13073 |
325 |
|
11/08/1927 |
24/11/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13065 |
325 |
|
12/08/1927 |
10/12/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13074 |
325 |
|
13/08/1927 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13075 |
325 |
|
02/09/1927 |
06/10/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13079 |
325 |
|
02/09/1927 |
19/05/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13080 |
325 |
|
09/09/1927 |
02/10/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13076 |
325 |
|
12/09/1927 |
06/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13081 |
325 |
|
17/09/1927 |
01/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13082 |
325 |
|
20/09/1927 |
03/12/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13084 |
325 |
|
20/09/1927 |
22/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13078 |
325 |
|
24/09/1927 |
24/04/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13083 |
325 |
|
24/09/1927 |
14/08/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13077 |
325 |
|
27/09/1927 |
14/08/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13088 |
325 |
|
03/10/1927 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13086 |
325 |
|
06/10/1927 |
03/11/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13087 |
325 |
|
06/10/1927 |
17/04/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13085 |
325 |
|
08/10/1927 |
23/11/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13089 |
325 |
|
08/10/1927 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13091 |
325 |
|
15/10/1927 |
09/01/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13090 |
325 |
|
20/10/1927 |
27/07/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13092 |
325 |
|
29/10/1927 |
26/10/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13093 |
325 |
|
29/10/1927 |
05/12/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4437 |
|
|
11/1927 |
12/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13095 |
325 |
|
05/11/1927 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13094 |
325 |
|
05/11/1927 |
09/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13096 |
325 |
|
12/11/1927 |
12/10/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13097 |
325 |
|
26/11/1927 |
10/03/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4443 |
|
|
12/1927 |
07/08/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4444 |
|
|
12/1927 |
09/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4445 |
|
|
12/1927 |
15/06/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4446 |
|
|
12/1927 |
11/10/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4442 |
|
|
12/1927 |
20/07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4441 |
|
|
12/1927 |
09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4439 |
|
|
12/1927 |
11/04/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4438 |
|
|
12/1927 |
12/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4440 |
|
|
12/1927 |
04/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13098 |
325 |
|
03/12/1927 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13099 |
325 |
|
11/12/1927 |
23/01/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4449 |
|
|
01/1928 |
07/08/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4448 |
|
|
01/1928 |
09/11/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4447 |
|
|
01/1928 |
20/07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4455 |
|
|
02/1928 |
23/03/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4454 |
|
|
02/1928 |
10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4453 |
|
|
02/1928 |
12/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4452 |
|
|
02/1928 |
20/06/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4451 |
|
|
02/1928 |
18/12/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4450 |
|
|
02/1928 |
08/05/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4456 |
|
|
02/1928 |
27/03/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4513 |
|
|
06/1928 |
12/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4514 |
|
|
06/1928 |
26/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4516 |
|
|
06/1928 |
09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4515 |
|
|
06/1928 |
05/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4507 |
|
|
06/1928 |
12/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4508 |
|
|
06/1928 |
09/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4510 |
|
|
06/1928 |
20/02/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4511 |
|
|
06/1928 |
12/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4512 |
|
|
06/1928 |
01/02/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4521 |
|
|
07/1928 |
16/09/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4518 |
|
|
07/1928 |
09/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4519 |
|
|
07/1928 |
26/01/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4520 |
|
|
07/1928 |
04/01/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4517 |
|
|
07/1928 |
10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4522 |
|
|
07/1928 |
09/10/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4523 |
|
|
08/1928 |
26/07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4524 |
|
|
08/1928 |
19/01/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4525 |
|
|
08/1928 |
08/10/1966 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4509 |
|
|
08/1928 |
16/09/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4526 |
|
|
08/1928 |
30/11/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4527 |
|
|
08/1928 |
27/03/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4528 |
|
|
08/1928 |
15/05/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4529 |
|
|
08/1928 |
05/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4533 |
|
|
09/1928 |
01/02/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4530 |
|
|
09/1928 |
10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4531 |
|
|
09/1928 |
25/04/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4537 |
|
|
09/1928 |
08/10/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4536 |
|
|
09/1928 |
28/08/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4535 |
|
|
09/1928 |
10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4534 |
|
|
09/1928 |
13/11/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4532 |
|
|
09/1928 |
27/04/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4541 |
|
|
10/1928 |
09/11/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4540 |
|
|
10/1928 |
16/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4539 |
|
|
10/1928 |
07/09/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4538 |
|
|
10/1928 |
25/01/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4544 |
|
|
11/1928 |
03/04/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4548 |
|
|
11/1928 |
09/01/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4547 |
|
|
11/1928 |
09/1961 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4546 |
|
|
11/1928 |
05/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4545 |
|
|
11/1928 |
23/03/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4543 |
|
|
11/1928 |
02/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4542 |
|
|
11/1928 |
07/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4550 |
|
|
12/1928 |
02/03/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4549 |
|
|
12/1928 |
02/05/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4553 |
|
|
12/1928 |
27/10/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4551 |
|
|
12/1928 |
05/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4552 |
|
|
12/1928 |
19/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4554 |
|
|
12/1928 |
03/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4555 |
|
|
12/1928 |
05/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4556 |
|
|
12/1928 |
07/12/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13100 |
330 |
|
11/12/1928 |
15/10/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13101 |
330 |
|
13/12/1928 |
26/06/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13102 |
330 |
|
17/12/1928 |
08/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13103 |
330 |
|
19/12/1928 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13104 |
330 |
|
22/12/1928 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13105 |
330 |
|
27/12/1928 |
02/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13108 |
330 |
|
27/12/1928 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13106 |
330 |
|
28/12/1928 |
28/02/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13107 |
330 |
|
29/12/1928 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13109 |
330 |
|
05/01/1929 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9500 |
|
|
26/03/1929 |
02/06/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9501 |
|
|
30/03/1929 |
25/03/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9502 |
|
|
06/04/1929 |
09/06/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9503 |
|
|
11/04/1929 |
21/08/1954 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9504 |
|
|
18/04/1929 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9505 |
|
|
24/04/1929 |
29/10/1960 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9506 |
|
|
26/04/1929 |
01/11/1952 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9507 |
|
|
26/04/1929 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9508 |
|
|
29/04/1929 |
20/01/1962 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9509 |
|
|
02/05/1929 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9510 |
|
|
06/05/1929 |
08/09/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9511 |
|
|
10/05/1929 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9512 |
|
|
11/05/1929 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9513 |
|
|
17/05/1929 |
08/10/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9514 |
|
|
17/05/1929 |
04/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9515 |
|
|
22/05/1929 |
28/11/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9516 |
|
|
23/05/1929 |
28/07/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9517 |
|
|
24/05/1929 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9518 |
|
|
27/05/1929 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9519 |
|
|
01/06/1929 |
23/03/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9520 |
|
|
05/06/1929 |
03/05/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9521 |
|
|
08/06/1929 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9522 |
|
|
14/06/1929 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9523 |
|
|
17/06/1929 |
20/02/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9524 |
|
|
19/06/1929 |
12/12/1953 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9525 |
|
|
22/06/1929 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9529 |
|
|
28/06/1929 |
14/01/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9528 |
|
|
28/06/1929 |
08/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9527 |
|
|
28/06/1929 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9526 |
|
|
28/06/1929 |
13/08/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9530 |
|
|
12/07/1929 |
06/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9531 |
|
|
16/07/1929 |
07/10/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9532 |
|
|
17/07/1929 |
02/06/1956 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9533 |
|
|
18/07/1929 |
16/07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9534 |
|
|
18/07/1929 |
02/11/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9535 |
|
|
25/07/1929 |
11/11/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9536 |
|
|
25/07/1929 |
18/10/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9537 |
|
|
26/07/1929 |
08/05/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9538 |
|
|
27/07/1929 |
16/08/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9539 |
|
|
30/07/1929 |
15/10/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9540 |
|
|
02/08/1929 |
19/05/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9541 |
|
|
03/08/1929 |
17/07/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9542 |
|
|
09/08/1929 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9544 |
|
|
13/08/1929 |
13/02/1960 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9543 |
|
|
14/08/1929 |
08/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9545 |
|
|
14/08/1929 |
06/07/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9546 |
|
|
17/08/1929 |
10/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9547 |
|
|
20/08/1929 |
04/05/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9548 |
|
|
23/08/1929 |
16/01/1952 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9549 |
|
|
24/08/1929 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9550 |
|
|
03/09/1929 |
08/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9551 |
|
|
03/09/1929 |
26/03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9552 |
|
|
06/09/1929 |
01/09/1956 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9553 |
|
|
07/09/1929 |
08/01/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9554 |
|
|
10/09/1929 |
27/08/1955 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9555 |
|
|
13/09/1929 |
06/04/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9556 |
|
|
14/09/1929 |
08/03/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9557 |
|
|
19/09/1929 |
19/11/1955 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9558 |
|
|
20/09/1929 |
28/04/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9559 |
|
|
21/09/1929 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9560 |
|
|
25/09/1929 |
21/12/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9561 |
|
|
28/09/1929 |
15/06/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9562 |
|
|
28/09/1929 |
23/04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9563 |
|
|
03/10/1929 |
06/1952 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9564 |
|
|
05/10/1929 |
24/09/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9565 |
|
|
08/10/1929 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9566 |
|
|
09/10/1929 |
15/08/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9568 |
|
|
16/10/1929 |
19/05/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9569 |
|
|
17/10/1929 |
14/01/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9570 |
|
|
19/10/1929 |
20/08/1955 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9567 |
|
|
21/10/1929 |
19/01/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9571 |
|
|
23/10/1929 |
02/06/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9587 |
|
|
11/1929 |
16/06/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9573 |
|
|
11/1929 |
12/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9574 |
|
|
01/11/1929 |
04/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9572 |
|
|
02/11/1929 |
09/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9575 |
|
|
05/11/1929 |
03/05/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9576 |
|
|
06/11/1929 |
10/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9577 |
|
|
07/11/1929 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9578 |
|
|
08/11/1929 |
02/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9579 |
|
|
11/11/1929 |
08/05/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9580 |
|
|
12/11/1929 |
24/03/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9581 |
|
|
15/11/1929 |
11/06/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9582 |
|
|
18/11/1929 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9583 |
|
|
20/11/1929 |
23/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9584 |
|
|
22/11/1929 |
13/08/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9585 |
|
|
23/11/1929 |
10/02/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9586 |
|
|
29/11/1929 |
01/08/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9588 |
|
|
02/12/1929 |
12/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9589 |
|
|
06/12/1929 |
09/06/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9590 |
|
|
07/12/1929 |
05/05/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9591 |
|
|
11/12/1929 |
06/12/1952 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9592 |
|
|
12/12/1929 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9593 |
|
|
12/12/1929 |
26/05/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9594 |
|
|
14/12/1929 |
29/09/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9595 |
|
|
17/12/1929 |
08/12/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9596 |
|
|
19/12/1929 |
24/03/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9597 |
|
|
20/12/1929 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9598 |
|
|
21/12/1929 |
17/01/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9599 |
|
|
21/12/1929 |
08/1949 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13150 |
341 |
|
15/02/1930 |
30/07/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13151 |
341 |
|
21/02/1930 |
30/05/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13152 |
341 |
|
27/02/1930 |
25/05/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13153 |
341 |
|
01/03/1930 |
15/06/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13154 |
341 |
|
06/03/1930 |
16/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13155 |
341 |
|
07/03/1930 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13156 |
341 |
|
11/03/1930 |
21/11/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13157 |
341 |
|
12/03/1930 |
15/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13158 |
341 |
|
20/03/1930 |
25/04/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13159 |
341 |
|
21/03/1930 |
31/12/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13160 |
342 |
|
25/03/1930 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13161 |
342 |
|
28/03/1930 |
26/06/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13162 |
342 |
|
02/04/1930 |
30/11/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13163 |
342 |
|
05/04/1930 |
17/08/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13164 |
342 |
|
09/04/1930 |
22/07/1961 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13165 |
342 |
|
11/04/1930 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13166 |
342 |
|
16/04/1930 |
18/10/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13167 |
342 |
|
23/04/1930 |
27/06/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13168 |
342 |
|
24/04/1930 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13169 |
342 |
|
01/05/1930 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13170 |
343 |
|
06/05/1930 |
02/03/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13171 |
343 |
|
09/05/1930 |
28/09/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13172 |
343 |
|
10/05/1930 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13173 |
343 |
|
17/05/1930 |
24/08/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13174 |
343 |
|
20/05/1930 |
06/10/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13175 |
343 |
|
23/05/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13176 |
343 |
|
28/05/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13177 |
343 |
|
31/05/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13178 |
343 |
|
03/06/1930 |
18/09/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13179 |
343 |
|
06/06/1930 |
10/09/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13180 |
344 |
|
11/06/1930 |
27/11/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13181 |
344 |
|
13/06/1930 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13182 |
344 |
|
17/06/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13183 |
344 |
|
21/06/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13184 |
344 |
|
24/06/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13186 |
344 |
|
01/07/1930 |
03/04/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13187 |
344 |
|
04/07/1930 |
29/09/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13188 |
344 |
|
10/07/1930 |
08/02/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13185 |
344 |
|
15/07/1930 |
07/12/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13189 |
344 |
|
18/07/1930 |
05/05/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13190 |
345 |
|
23/07/1930 |
18/05/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13191 |
345 |
|
30/07/1930 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13192 |
345 |
|
01/08/1930 |
08/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13193 |
345 |
|
02/08/1930 |
22/07/1961 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13194 |
345 |
|
02/08/1930 |
05/12/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13195 |
345 |
|
08/08/1930 |
12/01/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13196 |
345 |
|
09/08/1930 |
06/03/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13197 |
345 |
|
13/08/1930 |
18/04/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13198 |
345 |
|
16/08/1930 |
11/09/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13199 |
345 |
|
22/08/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13200 |
346 |
|
23/08/1930 |
09/10/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13201 |
346 |
|
29/08/1930 |
15/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13202 |
346 |
|
03/09/1930 |
29/02/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13203 |
346 |
|
05/09/1930 |
18/08/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13204 |
346 |
|
09/09/1930 |
08/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13205 |
346 |
|
17/09/1930 |
17/07/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13206 |
346 |
|
17/09/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13207 |
346 |
|
24/09/1930 |
31/10/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13208 |
346 |
|
26/09/1930 |
09/08/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13209 |
346 |
|
27/09/1930 |
17/01/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13210 |
347 |
|
01/10/1930 |
30/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13211 |
347 |
|
04/10/1930 |
30/11/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13212 |
347 |
|
10/10/1930 |
03/09/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13213 |
347 |
|
11/10/1930 |
26/06/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13214 |
347 |
|
17/10/1930 |
26/12/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13215 |
347 |
|
18/10/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13216 |
347 |
|
23/10/1930 |
19/06/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13217 |
347 |
|
25/10/1930 |
22/08/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13218 |
347 |
|
01/11/1930 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13219 |
347 |
|
05/11/1930 |
27/10/1966 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13220 |
348 |
|
07/11/1930 |
26/12/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13221 |
348 |
|
12/11/1930 |
02/03/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13222 |
348 |
|
18/11/1930 |
28/03/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13223 |
348 |
|
28/11/1930 |
25/01/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13224 |
348 |
|
10/12/1930 |
26/02/1966 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9600 |
|
|
17/12/1930 |
15/08/1953 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9601 |
|
|
18/12/1930 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9602 |
|
|
21/12/1930 |
27/02/1954 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9603 |
|
|
06/01/1931 |
03/03/1956 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9604 |
|
|
14/01/1931 |
06/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9605 |
|
|
20/01/1931 |
13/02/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9606 |
|
|
23/01/1931 |
06/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9607 |
|
|
30/01/1931 |
16/07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9608 |
|
|
05/02/1931 |
04/07/1953 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9609 |
|
|
07/02/1931 |
12/10/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9610 |
|
|
17/02/1931 |
19/05/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9611 |
|
|
20/02/1931 |
20/08/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9612 |
|
|
26/02/1931 |
05/09/1953 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9613 |
|
|
06/03/1931 |
07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9614 |
|
|
14/03/1931 |
06/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9615 |
|
|
23/03/1931 |
25/04/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9616 |
|
|
27/03/1931 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9617 |
|
|
07/04/1931 |
16/06/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9619 |
|
|
18/04/1931 |
03/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9618 |
|
|
18/04/1931 |
07/10/1961 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13225 |
353 |
|
01/05/1931 |
28/11/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13226 |
353 |
|
07/05/1931 |
17/10/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13227 |
353 |
|
09/05/1931 |
30/07/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13228 |
353 |
|
14/05/1931 |
16/02/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13230 |
353 |
|
23/05/1931 |
22/07/1961 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13229 |
353 |
|
23/05/1931 |
04/08/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13231 |
353 |
|
02/06/1931 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13232 |
353 |
|
06/06/1931 |
01/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13233 |
353 |
|
13/06/1931 |
30/03/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13234 |
353 |
|
20/06/1931 |
10/10/1964 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
636 |
|
|
08/1931 |
12/11/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
643 |
|
|
08/1931 |
31/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
645 |
|
|
08/1931 |
31/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
644 |
|
|
08/1931 |
12/11/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
637 |
|
|
08/1931 |
13/09/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
638 |
|
|
08/1931 |
21/05/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
640 |
|
|
08/1931 |
13/09/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
641 |
|
|
08/1931 |
02/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
642 |
|
|
08/1931 |
31/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
651 |
|
|
09/1931 |
22/11/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
649 |
|
|
09/1931 |
18/11/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
648 |
|
|
09/1931 |
27/09/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
647 |
|
|
09/1931 |
31/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
646 |
|
|
09/1931 |
12/05/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
650 |
|
|
09/1931 |
27/09/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
652 |
|
|
09/1931 |
09/05/1960 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
653 |
|
|
09/1931 |
28/11/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
657 |
|
|
10/1931 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
656 |
|
|
10/1931 |
21/11/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
655 |
|
|
10/1931 |
21/11/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
654 |
|
|
10/1931 |
26/12/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
659 |
|
|
10/1931 |
06/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
658 |
|
|
10/1931 |
21/11/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9620 |
|
|
30/10/1931 |
28/01/1956 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9621 |
|
|
02/11/1931 |
25/01/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9622 |
|
|
09/11/1931 |
16/07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9623 |
|
|
18/11/1931 |
13/01/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9625 |
|
|
20/11/1931 |
05/01/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9624 |
|
|
24/11/1931 |
27/02/1960 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9634 |
|
|
12/1931 |
17/06/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9635 |
|
|
12/1931 |
27/10/1950 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
660 |
|
|
12/1931 |
28/11/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9626 |
|
|
08/12/1931 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9627 |
|
|
08/12/1931 |
14/10/1961 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9628 |
|
|
11/12/1931 |
17/06/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9630 |
|
|
14/12/1931 |
19/03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9629 |
|
|
15/12/1931 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9632 |
|
|
17/12/1931 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9631 |
|
|
17/12/1931 |
28/04/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9633 |
|
|
01/01/1932 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9636 |
|
|
01/01/1932 |
16/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9637 |
|
|
05/01/1932 |
03/06/1961 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9638 |
|
|
06/01/1932 |
23/06/1956 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9639 |
|
|
11/01/1932 |
09/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9641 |
|
|
25/01/1932 |
18/11/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9640 |
|
|
28/01/1932 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9642 |
|
|
01/02/1932 |
16/07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9643 |
|
|
02/02/1932 |
31/12/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9644 |
|
|
04/02/1932 |
05/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9645 |
|
|
10/02/1932 |
12/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9646 |
|
|
10/02/1932 |
03/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9647 |
|
|
17/02/1932 |
16/07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9648 |
|
|
19/02/1932 |
21/09/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9649 |
|
|
23/02/1932 |
29/11/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9650 |
|
|
02/03/1932 |
26/05/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9651 |
|
|
02/03/1932 |
29/12/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9652 |
|
|
10/03/1932 |
09/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9653 |
|
|
17/03/1932 |
04/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9654 |
|
|
21/03/1932 |
12/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9656 |
|
|
23/03/1932 |
09/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9655 |
|
|
30/03/1932 |
14/03/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9657 |
|
|
05/04/1932 |
16/02/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9658 |
|
|
08/04/1932 |
08/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9659 |
|
|
12/04/1932 |
02/03/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9660 |
|
|
22/04/1932 |
31/03/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9661 |
|
|
26/04/1932 |
19/01/1952 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9662 |
|
|
05/05/1932 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9664 |
|
|
26/05/1932 |
16/02/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9663 |
|
|
26/05/1932 |
28/04/1951 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9667 |
|
|
06/1932 |
16/05/1959 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9666 |
|
|
06/1932 |
28/04/1956 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9665 |
|
|
06/1932 |
14/08/1950 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9669 |
|
|
03/06/1932 |
04/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9668 |
|
|
06/06/1932 |
11/11/1961 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9670 |
|
|
15/06/1932 |
07/1949 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9672 |
|
|
20/06/1932 |
09/03/1957 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9671 |
|
|
20/06/1932 |
08/03/1952 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9673 |
|
|
28/06/1932 |
24/02/1951 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5959 |
|
|
01/07/1932 |
03/09/1960 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
|
|
|
14/07/1932 |
12/08/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5987 |
|
|
18/07/1932 |
16/03/1962 |
LMS |
7F |
0-8-0 |
9674 |
|
|
26/07/1932 |
13/02/1959 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5948 |
|
|
26/07/1932 |
02/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5974 |
|
|
01/08/1932 |
16/03/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6010 |
|
|
09/08/1932 |
03/12/1960 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5936 |
|
|
12/08/1932 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6005 |
|
|
19/08/1932 |
12/08/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6012 |
|
|
24/08/1932 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
|
|
|
09/1932 |
11/02/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5966 |
|
|
14/09/1932 |
27/03/1965 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5958 |
|
|
19/09/1932 |
15/09/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5983 |
|
|
21/09/1932 |
27/05/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5992 |
|
|
27/09/1932 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
688 |
|
|
10/1932 |
31/07/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
689 |
|
|
10/1932 |
31/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
686 |
|
|
10/1932 |
12/10/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
687 |
|
|
10/1932 |
31/10/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5982 |
|
|
10/10/1932 |
22/07/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
693 |
|
|
11/1932 |
11/07/1959 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
694 |
|
|
11/1932 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
695 |
|
|
11/1932 |
04/03/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
696 |
|
|
11/1932 |
24/05/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
697 |
|
|
11/1932 |
13/02/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
698 |
|
|
11/1932 |
27/07/1960 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
692 |
|
|
11/1932 |
08/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
691 |
|
|
11/1932 |
11/02/1961 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
690 |
|
|
11/1932 |
04/10/1960 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
700 |
|
|
12/1932 |
28/08/1962 |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
699 |
|
|
12/1932 |
19/12/1959 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13235 |
367 |
|
12/12/1932 |
12/01/1963 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13236 |
367 |
|
20/12/1932 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13237 |
367 |
|
22/12/1932 |
22/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13241 |
367 |
|
29/12/1932 |
08/05/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13238 |
367 |
|
29/12/1932 |
25/09/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13239 |
367 |
|
29/12/1932 |
23/06/1962 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13240 |
367 |
|
29/12/1932 |
25/09/1965 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13242 |
367 |
|
30/12/1932 |
21/01/1967 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13243 |
367 |
|
30/12/1932 |
09/05/1964 |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
13244 |
367 |
|
31/12/1932 |
27/04/1963 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5952 |
|
|
06/02/1933 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6006 |
|
|
20/02/1933 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6008 |
|
|
25/02/1933 |
16/03/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6026 |
|
|
08/03/1933 |
25/01/1964 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5907 |
|
|
14/03/1933 |
15/09/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6022 |
|
|
03/04/1933 |
01/01/1965 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5926 |
|
|
06/04/1933 |
22/02/1964 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6027 |
|
|
07/04/1933 |
30/10/1965 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6011 |
|
|
11/04/1933 |
01/02/1964 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6018 |
|
|
04/05/1933 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6200 |
|
|
27/06/1933 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6015 |
|
|
19/07/1933 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
6000 |
|
|
21/07/1933 |
22/09/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5925 |
|
|
27/07/1933 |
16/09/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5901 |
|
|
07/08/1933 |
06/04/1963 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5903 |
|
|
15/08/1933 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13245 |
|
113 |
21/10/1933 |
26/03/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13247 |
|
115 |
02/11/1933 |
04/12/1965 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6201 |
|
|
03/11/1933 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13246 |
|
114 |
09/11/1933 |
20/11/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13248 |
|
116 |
10/11/1933 |
23/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13251 |
|
119 |
17/11/1933 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13249 |
|
117 |
29/11/1933 |
09/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13250 |
|
118 |
05/12/1933 |
23/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13254 |
|
122 |
06/12/1933 |
11/02/1967 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13253 |
|
121 |
13/12/1933 |
15/01/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13263 |
|
131 |
18/12/1933 |
16/07/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13256 |
|
124 |
19/12/1933 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13252 |
|
120 |
21/12/1933 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13257 |
|
125 |
23/12/1933 |
15/01/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13260 |
|
128 |
23/12/1933 |
15/01/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13255 |
|
123 |
28/12/1933 |
16/04/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13262 |
|
130 |
03/01/1934 |
15/02/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13259 |
|
127 |
04/01/1934 |
25/12/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13264 |
|
132 |
08/01/1934 |
20/11/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13265 |
|
133 |
08/01/1934 |
08/08/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13267 |
|
135 |
08/01/1934 |
30/04/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13261 |
|
129 |
10/01/1934 |
21/08/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13266 |
|
134 |
10/01/1934 |
25/07/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13271 |
|
139 |
10/01/1934 |
19/12/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13258 |
|
126 |
11/01/1934 |
20/11/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13270 |
|
138 |
11/01/1934 |
24/10/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13269 |
|
137 |
12/01/1934 |
14/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13272 |
|
140 |
15/01/1934 |
17/04/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13274 |
|
142 |
16/01/1934 |
25/09/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13273 |
|
141 |
20/01/1934 |
09/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13277 |
|
145 |
23/01/1934 |
18/06/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13268 |
|
136 |
24/01/1934 |
31/12/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13276 |
|
144 |
24/01/1934 |
20/07/1963 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13275 |
|
143 |
25/01/1934 |
26/03/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13278 |
|
146 |
25/01/1934 |
30/04/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13279 |
|
147 |
02/02/1934 |
05/12/1964 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13280 |
|
148 |
07/02/1934 |
08/01/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13282 |
|
150 |
08/02/1934 |
13/11/1965 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13281 |
|
149 |
12/02/1934 |
21/05/1966 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13284 |
|
152 |
07/03/1934 |
28/09/1963 |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13283 |
|
151 |
09/03/1934 |
15/01/1966 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5542 |
|
|
13/03/1934 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5543 |
|
|
16/03/1934 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5544 |
|
|
22/03/1934 |
09/12/1961 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5545 |
|
|
27/03/1934 |
30/05/1964 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5546 |
|
|
29/03/1934 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5547 |
|
|
09/04/1934 |
15/09/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5549 |
|
|
27/04/1934 |
16/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5548 |
|
|
27/04/1934 |
09/06/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5550 |
|
|
01/05/1934 |
01/12/1962 |
LMS |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
5551 |
|
|
02/05/1934 |
16/06/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5642 |
|
|
10/05/1934 |
09/01/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5553 |
|
|
29/05/1934 |
07/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5554 |
|
|
05/06/1934 |
07/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5555 |
|
|
18/06/1934 |
17/08/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5556 |
|
|
22/06/1934 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5607 |
|
|
29/06/1934 |
01/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5608 |
|
|
13/07/1934 |
01/09/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5609 |
|
|
17/07/1934 |
02/09/1960 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5610 |
|
|
19/07/1934 |
11/01/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5611 |
|
|
27/07/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5612 |
|
|
08/1934 |
28/03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5613 |
|
|
06/08/1934 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5614 |
|
|
09/08/1934 |
11/01/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5615 |
|
|
15/08/1934 |
08/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5616 |
|
|
16/08/1934 |
21/01/1961 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5617 |
|
|
24/09/1934 |
07/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5618 |
|
|
02/10/1934 |
03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5619 |
|
|
05/10/1934 |
19/08/1961 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5621 |
|
|
11/10/1934 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5620 |
|
|
11/10/1934 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5622 |
|
|
17/10/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5623 |
|
|
19/10/1934 |
25/07/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5624 |
|
|
19/10/1934 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5625 |
|
|
24/10/1934 |
07/09/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5626 |
|
|
09/11/1934 |
11/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5629 |
|
|
10/11/1934 |
01/05/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5632 |
|
|
11/11/1934 |
09/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5628 |
|
|
13/11/1934 |
08/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5627 |
|
|
13/11/1934 |
17/09/1966 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5630 |
|
|
13/11/1934 |
18/11/1961 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5631 |
|
|
14/11/1934 |
22/08/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5633 |
|
|
21/11/1934 |
16/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5634 |
|
|
22/11/1934 |
11/05/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5635 |
|
|
24/11/1934 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5641 |
|
|
12/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5640 |
|
|
12/1934 |
07/03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5552 |
|
|
01/12/1934 |
26/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5643 |
|
|
04/12/1934 |
19/01/1966 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5645 |
|
|
07/12/1934 |
19/10/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5644 |
|
|
07/12/1934 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5646 |
|
|
14/12/1934 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5636 |
|
|
18/12/1934 |
08/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5637 |
|
|
19/12/1934 |
13/12/1952 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5638 |
|
|
19/12/1934 |
14/03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5639 |
|
|
28/12/1934 |
10/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5647 |
|
|
04/01/1935 |
26/04/1967 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5649 |
|
|
10/01/1935 |
05/10/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5648 |
|
|
10/01/1935 |
09/02/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5650 |
|
|
14/01/1935 |
19/01/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5651 |
|
|
16/01/1935 |
23/11/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5652 |
|
|
21/01/1935 |
16/01/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5653 |
|
|
22/01/1935 |
03/04/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5654 |
|
|
07/02/1935 |
25/06/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5000 |
114 |
216 |
03/1935 |
28/10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5001 |
114 |
217 |
04/1935 |
16/03/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5002 |
114 |
218 |
04/1935 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5003 |
114 |
219 |
04/1935 |
06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5004 |
114 |
220 |
04/1935 |
09/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5005 |
114 |
221 |
04/1935 |
27/01/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5006 |
114 |
222 |
04/1935 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5007 |
114 |
223 |
04/1935 |
23/07/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5008 |
114 |
224 |
04/1935 |
05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5009 |
114 |
225 |
04/1935 |
22/11/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5010 |
114 |
226 |
04/1935 |
29/08/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5011 |
114 |
227 |
04/1935 |
28/12/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5012 |
114 |
228 |
04/1935 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5013 |
114 |
229 |
04/1935 |
05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5014 |
114 |
230 |
04/1935 |
24/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5015 |
114 |
231 |
04/1935 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5016 |
114 |
232 |
05/1935 |
14/07/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5017 |
114 |
233 |
05/1935 |
10/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5018 |
114 |
234 |
05/1935 |
24/12/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5019 |
114 |
235 |
05/1935 |
13/05/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5070 |
122 |
236 |
05/1935 |
20/05/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5071 |
122 |
237 |
05/1935 |
22/07/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8000 |
|
241 |
06/1935 |
18/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8001 |
|
242 |
06/1935 |
09/01/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8003 |
|
244 |
06/1935 |
05/03/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8004 |
|
245 |
06/1935 |
06/11/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8005 |
|
246 |
06/1935 |
19/03/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5072 |
122 |
238 |
06/1935 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5073 |
122 |
239 |
06/1935 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5074 |
122 |
240 |
06/1935 |
18/09/1965 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6202 |
|
|
29/06/1935 |
22/05/1954 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8002 |
|
243 |
07/1935 |
24/09/1966 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6203 |
|
|
01/07/1935 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6204 |
|
|
19/07/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6205 |
|
|
24/07/1935 |
25/11/1961 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6206 |
|
|
01/08/1935 |
03/11/1962 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6207 |
|
|
09/08/1935 |
25/11/1961 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6208 |
|
|
16/08/1935 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6209 |
|
|
23/08/1935 |
29/09/1962 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8006 |
|
247 |
09/1935 |
30/01/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8007 |
|
248 |
09/1935 |
09/01/1965 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6210 |
|
|
06/09/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6211 |
|
|
18/09/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8008 |
|
249 |
10/1935 |
02/05/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8009 |
|
250 |
10/1935 |
22/12/1962 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8010 |
|
251 |
10/1935 |
20/01/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8011 |
|
252 |
10/1935 |
27/05/1967 |
LMS |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
6212 |
|
|
21/10/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5666 |
|
|
18/11/1935 |
17/04/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5665 |
|
|
18/11/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5667 |
|
|
25/11/1935 |
23/01/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5680 |
|
|
12/1935 |
12/01/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5681 |
|
|
12/1935 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5668 |
|
|
02/12/1935 |
21/12/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5669 |
|
|
04/12/1935 |
01/06/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5671 |
|
|
06/12/1935 |
09/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5672 |
|
|
10/12/1935 |
07/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5673 |
|
|
12/12/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5674 |
|
|
16/12/1935 |
10/10/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5675 |
|
|
17/12/1935 |
24/06/1967 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5670 |
|
|
17/12/1935 |
24/10/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5676 |
|
|
18/12/1935 |
26/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5677 |
|
|
19/12/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5678 |
|
|
24/12/1935 |
08/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5679 |
|
|
24/12/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5682 |
|
|
06/01/1936 |
01/06/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5683 |
|
|
16/01/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5685 |
|
|
02/1936 |
01/04/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5686 |
|
|
05/02/1936 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5684 |
|
|
06/02/1936 |
11/12/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5687 |
|
|
10/02/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5688 |
|
|
24/02/1936 |
15/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5689 |
|
|
28/02/1936 |
12/12/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5690 |
|
|
09/03/1936 |
17/03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5691 |
|
|
11/03/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5693 |
|
|
19/03/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5692 |
|
|
19/03/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5694 |
|
|
25/03/1936 |
04/01/1967 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5695 |
|
|
26/03/1936 |
02/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5696 |
|
|
02/04/1936 |
18/07/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5697 |
|
|
07/04/1936 |
05/09/1967 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5698 |
|
|
08/04/1936 |
23/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5699 |
|
|
15/04/1936 |
21/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5700 |
|
|
20/04/1936 |
04/07/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5701 |
|
|
24/04/1936 |
23/02/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5703 |
|
|
05/05/1936 |
21/11/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5702 |
|
|
05/05/1936 |
27/04/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5704 |
|
|
11/05/1936 |
23/01/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5705 |
|
|
21/05/1936 |
06/11/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5706 |
|
|
26/05/1936 |
28/09/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5707 |
|
|
27/05/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5708 |
|
|
01/06/1936 |
03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5709 |
|
|
03/06/1936 |
23/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5710 |
|
|
08/06/1936 |
06/06/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5711 |
|
|
19/06/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5712 |
|
|
24/06/1936 |
30/11/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5713 |
|
|
29/06/1936 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5714 |
|
|
01/07/1936 |
20/07/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5715 |
|
|
03/07/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5716 |
|
|
04/07/1936 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5717 |
|
|
21/07/1936 |
26/10/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5718 |
|
|
30/07/1936 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5719 |
|
|
03/08/1936 |
23/03/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5720 |
|
|
17/08/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5722 |
|
|
24/08/1936 |
01/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5723 |
|
|
26/08/1936 |
22/08/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5721 |
|
|
26/08/1936 |
09/10/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5724 |
|
|
02/09/1936 |
03/11/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5725 |
|
|
25/09/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5728 |
|
|
07/10/1936 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5726 |
|
|
09/10/1936 |
20/03/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5727 |
|
|
12/10/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5729 |
|
|
13/10/1936 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5730 |
|
|
16/10/1936 |
05/10/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5731 |
|
|
21/10/1936 |
20/10/1962 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5732 |
|
|
29/10/1936 |
03/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5733 |
|
|
02/11/1936 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5734 |
|
|
11/11/1936 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5735 |
|
|
16/11/1936 |
03/10/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5737 |
|
|
23/11/1936 |
30/05/1964 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5736 |
|
|
25/11/1936 |
26/09/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
70577 |
|
Lot-130 |
12/1936 |
30/03/1968 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5742 |
|
|
12/1936 |
01/05/1965 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5738 |
|
|
12/1936 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5739 |
|
|
10/12/1936 |
04/01/1967 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5740 |
|
|
19/12/1936 |
26/10/1963 |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5741 |
|
|
29/12/1936 |
01/02/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
70591 |
|
Lot-130 |
01/1937 |
27/11/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8017 |
|
Lot-130 |
01/1937 |
04/11/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
70582 |
|
Lot-130 |
02/1937 |
21/10/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
70579 |
|
Lot-130 |
02/1937 |
07/08/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8024 |
|
Lot-130 |
03/1937 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8026 |
|
Lot-130 |
04/1937 |
22/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
70512 |
|
Lot-130 |
04/1937 |
03/08/1968 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4562 |
|
|
05/1937 |
09/11/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6220 |
|
|
01/06/1937 |
20/04/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6221 |
|
|
14/06/1937 |
18/05/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6222 |
|
|
22/06/1937 |
24/10/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6223 |
|
|
28/06/1937 |
04/10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4563 |
|
|
07/1937 |
05/03/1960 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4564 |
|
|
07/1937 |
19/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4565 |
|
|
07/1937 |
26/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4566 |
|
|
07/1937 |
26/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4567 |
|
|
07/1937 |
06/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6224 |
|
|
13/07/1937 |
17/10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4571 |
|
|
08/1937 |
12/12/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4570 |
|
|
08/1937 |
25/10/1965 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4569 |
|
|
08/1937 |
13/07/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4568 |
|
|
08/1937 |
11/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4573 |
|
|
09/1937 |
24/05/1962 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4574 |
|
|
09/1937 |
10/1963 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4575 |
|
|
09/1937 |
14/11/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4572 |
|
|
09/1937 |
19/09/1964 |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4576 |
|
|
10/1937 |
17/05/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
185 |
|
|
18/10/1937 |
24/02/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
186 |
|
|
21/10/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
187 |
|
|
26/10/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
188 |
|
|
29/10/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
189 |
|
|
02/11/1937 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
190 |
|
|
24/11/1937 |
19/11/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
195 |
|
|
12/1937 |
25/11/1961 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
191 |
|
|
01/12/1937 |
22/09/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
192 |
|
|
09/12/1937 |
23/12/1961 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
193 |
|
|
17/12/1937 |
25/08/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
194 |
|
|
20/12/1937 |
28/10/1961 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
196 |
|
|
03/01/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
197 |
|
|
06/01/1938 |
21/07/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
198 |
|
|
10/01/1938 |
21/07/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
199 |
|
|
24/01/1938 |
28/10/1961 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
200 |
|
|
27/01/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
201 |
|
|
03/02/1938 |
21/07/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
202 |
|
|
14/02/1938 |
15/09/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
203 |
|
|
21/02/1938 |
21/07/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
204 |
|
|
03/03/1938 |
21/11/1959 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
205 |
|
|
09/03/1938 |
24/11/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
206 |
|
|
18/03/1938 |
17/02/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
207 |
|
|
21/04/1938 |
10/02/1962 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
209 |
|
|
21/04/1938 |
28/10/1961 |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
208 |
|
|
22/04/1938 |
28/10/1961 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6225 |
|
|
11/05/1938 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6226 |
|
|
23/05/1938 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6227 |
|
|
07/06/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6228 |
|
|
17/06/1938 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6230 |
|
|
27/06/1938 |
06/11/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6231 |
|
|
28/06/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6232 |
|
|
01/07/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6233 |
|
|
18/07/1938 |
08/02/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6234 |
|
|
04/08/1938 |
26/01/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5452 |
142 |
|
09/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5455 |
142 |
|
09/1938 |
08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5454 |
142 |
|
09/1938 |
08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5453 |
142 |
|
09/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6229 |
|
|
07/09/1938 |
15/02/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5456 |
142 |
|
10/1938 |
07/12/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5457 |
142 |
|
10/1938 |
16/09/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5458 |
142 |
|
10/1938 |
29/12/1962 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5459 |
142 |
|
10/1938 |
14/05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5460 |
142 |
|
10/1938 |
26/06/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5461 |
142 |
|
10/1938 |
22/08/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5465 |
142 |
|
11/1938 |
13/02/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5464 |
142 |
|
11/1938 |
22/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5466 |
142 |
|
11/1938 |
25/02/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5463 |
142 |
|
11/1938 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5462 |
142 |
|
11/1938 |
29/06/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5467 |
142 |
|
11/1938 |
31/12/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8096 |
|
Lot-143 |
12/1938 |
11/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8097 |
|
Lot-143 |
12/1938 |
24/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5468 |
142 |
|
12/1938 |
05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5469 |
142 |
|
12/1938 |
19/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5470 |
142 |
|
12/1938 |
10/09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5471 |
142 |
|
12/1938 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8098 |
|
Lot-143 |
01/1939 |
11/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8099 |
|
Lot-143 |
01/1939 |
24/07/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8100 |
|
Lot-143 |
01/1939 |
30/09/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8101 |
|
Lot-143 |
01/1939 |
09/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8102 |
|
Lot-143 |
01/1939 |
21/08/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8103 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8104 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
17/07/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8105 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
11/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8106 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
24/06/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8107 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
06/04/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8108 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
02/09/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8109 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
22/01/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8110 |
|
Lot-143 |
02/1939 |
01/07/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8111 |
|
Lot-149 |
03/1939 |
16/03/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8112 |
|
Lot-149 |
03/1939 |
13/11/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8113 |
|
Lot-149 |
03/1939 |
02/10/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8114 |
|
Lot-149 |
03/1939 |
01/04/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8115 |
|
Lot-149 |
04/1939 |
06/07/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8116 |
|
Lot-149 |
04/1939 |
19/06/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8117 |
|
Lot-149 |
04/1939 |
23/03/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8118 |
|
Lot-149 |
04/1939 |
11/06/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8119 |
|
Lot-149 |
05/1939 |
02/12/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8120 |
|
Lot-149 |
05/1939 |
15/01/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8121 |
|
Lot-149 |
05/1939 |
22/04/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8122 |
|
Lot-149 |
05/1939 |
18/02/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8123 |
|
Lot-149 |
06/1939 |
12/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8124 |
|
Lot-149 |
06/1939 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8125 |
|
Lot-149 |
06/1939 |
28/10/1967 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6235 |
|
|
27/06/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6236 |
|
|
27/07/1939 |
14/03/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6237 |
|
|
09/08/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6239 |
|
|
29/08/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6238 |
|
|
14/09/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6240 |
|
|
27/03/1940 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6241 |
|
|
03/04/1940 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6242 |
|
|
15/05/1940 |
18/10/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6243 |
|
|
29/05/1940 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6244 |
|
|
12/07/1940 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8126 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1941 |
24/04/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8127 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1941 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8128 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1941 |
27/05/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8129 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1941 |
19/03/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8130 |
|
Lot-154 |
02/1941 |
05/02/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8131 |
|
Lot-154 |
03/1941 |
27/05/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8132 |
|
Lot-154 |
03/1941 |
22/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8133 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1941 |
03/12/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8134 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1941 |
08/01/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8135 |
|
Lot-154 |
05/1941 |
11/09/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8136 |
|
Lot-154 |
08/1941 |
11/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8137 |
|
Lot-154 |
09/1941 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8138 |
|
Lot-154 |
09/1941 |
25/10/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8139 |
|
Lot-154 |
12/1941 |
19/11/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8140 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1942 |
19/04/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8141 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1942 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8142 |
|
Lot-154 |
02/1942 |
26/11/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8143 |
|
Lot-154 |
03/1942 |
12/11/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8144 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1942 |
19/01/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8145 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1942 |
29/05/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8146 |
|
Lot-154 |
07/1942 |
06/01/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8147 |
|
Lot-154 |
07/1942 |
30/07/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8148 |
|
Lot-154 |
07/1942 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8149 |
|
Lot-154 |
08/1942 |
14/01/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8150 |
|
Lot-154 |
08/1942 |
19/01/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8151 |
|
Lot-154 |
09/1942 |
13/01/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8152 |
|
Lot-154 |
09/1942 |
25/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8153 |
|
Lot-154 |
09/1942 |
16/03/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8154 |
|
Lot-154 |
10/1942 |
22/07/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8155 |
|
Lot-154 |
10/1942 |
17/09/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8156 |
|
Lot-154 |
11/1942 |
28/08/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8157 |
|
Lot-154 |
12/1942 |
09/05/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8158 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1943 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8159 |
|
Lot-154 |
01/1943 |
27/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8160 |
|
Lot-154 |
02/1943 |
31/07/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8161 |
|
Lot-154 |
02/1943 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8162 |
|
Lot-154 |
02/1943 |
24/06/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8163 |
|
Lot-154 |
03/1943 |
17/06/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8164 |
|
Lot-154 |
03/1943 |
21/10/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8165 |
|
Lot-154 |
03/1943 |
18/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8166 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1943 |
14/10/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8167 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1943 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8168 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1943 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8169 |
|
Lot-154 |
04/1943 |
04/11/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8170 |
|
Lot-154 |
05/1943 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8171 |
|
Lot-154 |
05/1943 |
23/09/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8172 |
|
Lot-154 |
06/1943 |
14/05/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8173 |
|
Lot-154 |
06/1943 |
31/07/1965 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6245 |
|
|
26/06/1943 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8174 |
|
Lot-154 |
07/1943 |
29/04/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8175 |
|
Lot-154 |
08/1943 |
19/02/1966 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6246 |
|
|
11/08/1943 |
26/01/1963 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8301 |
|
Lot-158 |
09/1943 |
11/03/1967 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6247 |
|
|
13/09/1943 |
25/05/1963 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8302 |
|
Lot-158 |
10/1943 |
15/01/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8303 |
|
Lot-158 |
10/1943 |
30/07/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8304 |
|
Lot-158 |
10/1943 |
02/03/1968 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6248 |
|
|
02/10/1943 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8305 |
|
Lot-158 |
11/1943 |
13/01/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8306 |
|
Lot-158 |
11/1943 |
04/07/1964 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8307 |
|
Lot-158 |
11/1943 |
02/03/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8308 |
|
Lot-158 |
11/1943 |
13/04/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8309 |
|
Lot-158 |
11/1943 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8310 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
30/12/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8311 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
04/09/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8312 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
13/02/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8313 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8314 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
04/12/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8315 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
05/08/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8316 |
|
Lot-158 |
12/1943 |
08/04/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8317 |
|
Lot-158 |
01/1944 |
16/03/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8318 |
|
Lot-158 |
01/1944 |
10/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8319 |
|
Lot-158 |
01/1944 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8320 |
|
Lot-158 |
02/1944 |
18/03/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8321 |
|
Lot-158 |
02/1944 |
22/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8322 |
|
Lot-158 |
02/1944 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8323 |
|
Lot-158 |
02/1944 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8324 |
|
Lot-158 |
02/1944 |
17/06/1967 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8325 |
|
Lot-158 |
03/1944 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8326 |
|
|
03/1944 |
16/07/1966 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8327 |
|
|
03/1944 |
08/06/1968 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8328 |
|
|
04/1944 |
02/10/1965 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8329 |
|
|
04/1944 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6249 |
|
|
19/04/1944 |
05/11/1963 |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8330 |
|
|
05/1944 |
02/10/1965 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6250 |
|
|
20/05/1944 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6252 |
|
|
24/06/1944 |
01/06/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6251 |
|
|
30/06/1944 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4826 |
170 |
|
07/1944 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4827 |
170 |
|
07/1944 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4828 |
170 |
|
07/1944 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4834 |
170 |
|
08/1944 |
09/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4829 |
170 |
|
08/1944 |
11/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4830 |
170 |
|
08/1944 |
19/08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4831 |
170 |
|
08/1944 |
11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4832 |
170 |
|
08/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4833 |
170 |
|
08/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4835 |
170 |
|
09/1944 |
22/07/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4836 |
170 |
|
09/1944 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4837 |
170 |
|
09/1944 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4838 |
170 |
|
09/1944 |
09/03/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4839 |
170 |
|
09/1944 |
10/12/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4840 |
170 |
|
10/1944 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4841 |
170 |
|
10/1944 |
22/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4842 |
170 |
|
10/1944 |
27/01/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4843 |
170 |
|
10/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4844 |
170 |
|
10/1944 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4845 |
170 |
|
10/1944 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4848 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
17/02/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4847 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
12/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4846 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
13/01/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4849 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
21/12/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4850 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
14/07/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4851 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
04/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4852 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4853 |
170 |
|
11/1944 |
12/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4854 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4855 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4856 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
18/02/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4857 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4858 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
30/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4859 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4860 |
170 |
|
12/1944 |
28/01/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4861 |
170 |
|
01/1945 |
11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4864 |
170 |
|
01/1945 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4863 |
170 |
|
01/1945 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4862 |
170 |
|
01/1945 |
29/07/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4865 |
170 |
|
02/1945 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4868 |
170 |
|
02/1945 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4867 |
170 |
|
02/1945 |
17/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4866 |
170 |
|
02/1945 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4873 |
174 |
|
03/1945 |
11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4872 |
174 |
|
03/1945 |
30/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4871 |
170 |
|
03/1945 |
17/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4870 |
170 |
|
03/1945 |
17/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4869 |
170 |
|
03/1945 |
09/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4875 |
174 |
|
04/1945 |
20/05/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4874 |
174 |
|
04/1945 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4876 |
174 |
|
04/1945 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4877 |
174 |
|
04/1945 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4878 |
174 |
|
05/1945 |
06/07/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4881 |
174 |
|
05/1945 |
17/07/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4880 |
174 |
|
05/1945 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4879 |
174 |
|
05/1945 |
22/04/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4884 |
174 |
|
06/1945 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4883 |
174 |
|
06/1945 |
15/07/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4882 |
174 |
|
06/1945 |
15/07/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4886 |
174 |
|
07/1945 |
21/10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4885 |
174 |
|
07/1945 |
26/12/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4890 |
174 |
|
08/1945 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4887 |
174 |
|
08/1945 |
09/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4888 |
174 |
|
08/1945 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4889 |
174 |
|
08/1945 |
27/01/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4891 |
174 |
|
08/1945 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4898 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
28/10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4892 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
08/04/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4893 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4894 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
10/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4895 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
09/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4896 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4897 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4899 |
174 |
|
09/1945 |
20/07/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4902 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4903 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
06/04/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4904 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
25/12/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4905 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4906 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
02/03/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4901 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
21/08/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4900 |
174 |
|
10/1945 |
24/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4911 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4910 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4909 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
30/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4908 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
02/06/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4907 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4912 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
09/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4913 |
174 |
|
11/1945 |
29/07/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4919 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
17/12/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4914 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
19/08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4915 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
09/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4916 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
16/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4917 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4920 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4918 |
174 |
|
12/1945 |
21/01/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4923 |
174 |
|
01/1946 |
29/06/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4922 |
174 |
|
01/1946 |
05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4921 |
174 |
|
01/1946 |
26/02/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4924 |
174 |
|
02/1946 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4927 |
174 |
|
02/1946 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4926 |
174 |
|
02/1946 |
20/04/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4925 |
174 |
|
02/1946 |
02/09/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4928 |
174 |
|
03/1946 |
06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4930 |
174 |
|
03/1946 |
20/05/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4929 |
174 |
|
03/1946 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4931 |
174 |
|
04/1946 |
12/10/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4972 |
183 |
|
04/1946 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4971 |
183 |
|
04/1946 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4967 |
183 |
|
04/1946 |
05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4968 |
183 |
|
04/1946 |
05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4969 |
183 |
|
04/1946 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4970 |
183 |
|
04/1946 |
20/09/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4973 |
183 |
|
05/1946 |
20/09/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4974 |
183 |
|
05/1946 |
26/06/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4975 |
183 |
|
05/1946 |
20/09/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4976 |
183 |
|
05/1946 |
03/02/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4980 |
183 |
|
06/1946 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4977 |
183 |
|
15/06/1946 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4978 |
183 |
|
15/06/1946 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4979 |
183 |
|
22/06/1946 |
03/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4981 |
183 |
|
07/1946 |
14/01/1967 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6253 |
|
|
14/09/1946 |
26/01/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6254 |
|
|
17/09/1946 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6255 |
|
|
16/10/1946 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6400 |
|
|
12/1946 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6401 |
|
|
12/1946 |
07/05/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6409 |
|
|
12/1946 |
13/07/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6407 |
|
|
12/1946 |
18/12/1961 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6406 |
|
|
12/1946 |
21/01/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6402 |
|
|
12/1946 |
06/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6403 |
|
|
12/1946 |
29/06/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6404 |
|
|
12/1946 |
08/05/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6405 |
|
|
12/1946 |
12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6408 |
|
|
12/1946 |
26/10/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1202 |
|
|
14/12/1946 |
26/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1200 |
|
|
14/12/1946 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1203 |
|
|
21/12/1946 |
09/09/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1201 |
|
|
21/12/1946 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1204 |
|
|
21/12/1946 |
11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1205 |
|
|
21/12/1946 |
03/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1206 |
|
|
28/12/1946 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1207 |
|
|
28/12/1946 |
11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1208 |
|
|
28/12/1946 |
02/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6412 |
|
|
01/1947 |
06/08/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6411 |
|
|
01/1947 |
14/01/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6410 |
|
|
01/1947 |
19/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
1209 |
|
|
04/01/1947 |
17/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6413 |
|
|
02/1947 |
18/10/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6414 |
|
|
02/1947 |
11/06/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6415 |
|
|
02/1947 |
31/10/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6416 |
|
|
02/1947 |
23/04/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6419 |
|
|
03/1947 |
09/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6418 |
|
|
03/1947 |
21/01/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
6417 |
|
|
03/1947 |
18/02/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4768 |
187 |
|
04/1947 |
06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4769 |
187 |
|
04/1947 |
07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4770 |
187 |
|
04/1947 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4772 |
187 |
|
05/1947 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4773 |
187 |
|
05/1947 |
16/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4774 |
187 |
|
05/1947 |
26/08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4771 |
187 |
|
05/1947 |
18/03/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4775 |
187 |
|
06/1947 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4776 |
187 |
|
06/1947 |
21/10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4778 |
187 |
|
06/1947 |
18/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4777 |
187 |
|
06/1947 |
22/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4779 |
187 |
|
07/1947 |
17/12/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4780 |
187 |
|
07/1947 |
29/06/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4782 |
187 |
|
08/1947 |
24/12/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4781 |
187 |
|
08/1947 |
17/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4758 |
187 |
|
09/1947 |
20/07/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4759 |
187 |
|
09/1947 |
18/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4760 |
187 |
|
09/1947 |
22/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4761 |
187 |
|
25/09/1947 |
13/04/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4762 |
187 |
|
02/10/1947 |
26/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4763 |
187 |
|
09/10/1947 |
02/10/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4764 |
187 |
|
11/1947 |
09/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4765 |
187 |
|
12/1947 |
16/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4766 |
187 |
|
12/1947 |
19/08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4767 |
187 |
|
12/1947 |
30/12/1967 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
6256 |
|
|
13/12/1947 |
03/10/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4748 |
187 |
|
07/02/1948 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4749 |
187 |
|
14/02/1948 |
05/09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4750 |
187 |
|
28/02/1948 |
09/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4751 |
187 |
|
13/03/1948 |
09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4752 |
187 |
|
20/03/1948 |
18/04/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4753 |
187 |
|
27/03/1948 |
24/07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44754 |
187 |
|
10/04/1948 |
11/04/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44755 |
187 |
|
01/05/1948 |
16/11/1963 |
LMS |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
46257 |
|
|
19/05/1948 |
12/09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44740 |
187 |
|
29/05/1948 |
13/04/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44741 |
187 |
|
12/06/1948 |
13/03/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44756 |
187 |
|
19/06/1948 |
09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44738 |
187 |
|
19/06/1948 |
06/06/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44739 |
187 |
|
19/06/1948 |
23/01/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44743 |
187 |
|
26/06/1948 |
08/01/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44742 |
187 |
|
03/07/1948 |
02/05/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44744 |
187 |
|
03/07/1948 |
09/11/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44745 |
187 |
|
03/07/1948 |
24/10/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44747 |
187 |
|
31/07/1948 |
04/05/1963 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44746 |
187 |
|
07/08/1948 |
01/02/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41211 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
10/09/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41210 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
10/05/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41212 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
11/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41213 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41214 |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
02/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41215 |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
23/01/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41216 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41218 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41217 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
31/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41219 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
09/10/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41222 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
31/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41221 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
31/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41220 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
12/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41223 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41224 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
09/07/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41225 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
27/09/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41226 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
19/09/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41229 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41228 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
07/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41227 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
27/09/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46420 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
16/01/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46421 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46422 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
24/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46423 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
16/01/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46424 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
10/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46429 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
02/07/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46428 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46427 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46426 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
24/09/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46425 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
11/09/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46430 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
09/10/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46431 |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
25/03/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46432 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46434 |
|
|
31/12/1948 |
24/09/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46433 |
|
|
31/12/1948 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44757 |
187 |
|
31/12/1948 |
13/11/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44728 |
192 |
|
31/01/1949 |
06/01/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44729 |
192 |
|
31/01/1949 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44734 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
16/12/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44730 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
11/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44731 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
05/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44732 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
15/07/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44733 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
24/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44735 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
03/08/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44736 |
192 |
|
28/02/1949 |
23/09/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44719 |
192 |
|
31/03/1949 |
30/10/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44718 |
192 |
|
31/03/1949 |
29/11/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44720 |
192 |
|
31/03/1949 |
27/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44721 |
192 |
|
31/03/1949 |
07/1965 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44737 |
192 |
|
31/03/1949 |
14/01/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44723 |
192 |
|
30/04/1949 |
19/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44722 |
192 |
|
30/04/1949 |
22/04/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44724 |
192 |
|
30/04/1949 |
19/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44725 |
192 |
|
30/04/1949 |
14/10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44660 |
199 |
|
31/05/1949 |
09/1964 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44726 |
192 |
|
31/05/1949 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44727 |
192 |
|
31/05/1949 |
21/10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44659 |
199 |
|
31/05/1949 |
17/06/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44658 |
199 |
|
31/05/1949 |
18/11/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44663 |
199 |
|
18/06/1949 |
04/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44662 |
199 |
|
30/06/1949 |
10/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44661 |
199 |
|
30/06/1949 |
12/08/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44664 |
199 |
|
16/07/1949 |
11/05/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44665 |
199 |
|
16/07/1949 |
02/03/1968 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44666 |
199 |
|
16/07/1949 |
18/02/1967 |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44667 |
199 |
|
31/07/1949 |
08/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41231 |
|
|
08/1949 |
09/05/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41230 |
|
|
08/1949 |
02/04/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41232 |
|
|
08/1949 |
21/08/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41233 |
|
|
08/1949 |
12/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41234 |
|
|
08/1949 |
19/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41235 |
|
|
08/1949 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41236 |
|
|
09/1949 |
03/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41237 |
|
|
09/1949 |
09/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41238 |
|
|
09/1949 |
05/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41239 |
|
|
09/1949 |
06/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41240 |
|
|
09/1949 |
09/09/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41242 |
|
|
09/1949 |
30/04/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41241 |
|
|
09/1949 |
10/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41244 |
|
|
10/1949 |
19/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41247 |
|
|
10/1949 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41246 |
|
|
10/1949 |
16/09/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41245 |
|
|
10/1949 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41243 |
|
|
10/1949 |
02/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41252 |
|
|
11/1949 |
23/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41251 |
|
|
11/1949 |
12/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41250 |
|
|
11/1949 |
18/11/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41249 |
|
|
11/1949 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41248 |
|
|
11/1949 |
13/11/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41254 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
24/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41256 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
19/06/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41255 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
19/06/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41253 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
02/05/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41259 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
19/06/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41258 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
27/09/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41257 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
19/06/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46437 |
|
|
01/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46438 |
|
|
01/1950 |
08/02/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46439 |
|
|
01/1950 |
18/03/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46435 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
13/07/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46436 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46440 |
|
|
02/1950 |
25/03/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46441 |
|
|
02/1950 |
15/04/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46442 |
|
|
02/1950 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46444 |
|
|
02/1950 |
10/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46445 |
|
|
02/1950 |
02/07/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46443 |
|
|
02/1950 |
25/03/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46446 |
|
|
03/1950 |
17/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46447 |
|
|
03/1950 |
31/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46448 |
|
|
03/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46449 |
|
|
03/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46454 |
|
|
04/1950 |
08/10/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46455 |
|
|
04/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46453 |
|
|
04/1950 |
16/04/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46451 |
|
|
04/1950 |
12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46452 |
|
|
04/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46450 |
|
|
04/1950 |
17/01/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46459 |
|
|
05/1950 |
09/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46460 |
|
|
05/1950 |
24/08/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46458 |
|
|
05/1950 |
17/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46457 |
|
|
05/1950 |
06/05/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46456 |
|
|
05/1950 |
25/09/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46464 |
|
|
06/1950 |
09/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46463 |
|
|
06/1950 |
07/02/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46462 |
|
|
06/1950 |
22/08/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46461 |
|
|
06/1950 |
30/07/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41260 |
|
|
06/1950 |
27/09/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41263 |
|
|
07/1950 |
12/12/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41262 |
|
|
07/1950 |
11/01/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41261 |
|
|
07/1950 |
18/07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41264 |
|
|
31/07/1950 |
24/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41267 |
|
|
08/1950 |
23/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41268 |
|
|
08/1950 |
11/07/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41269 |
|
|
08/1950 |
08/12/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41266 |
|
|
08/1950 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41265 |
|
|
08/1950 |
10/12/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41273 |
|
|
09/1950 |
23/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41274 |
|
|
09/1950 |
21/02/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41272 |
|
|
09/1950 |
11/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41271 |
|
|
09/1950 |
03/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41270 |
|
|
09/1950 |
05/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41276 |
|
|
10/1950 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41282 |
|
|
10/1950 |
18/11/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41281 |
|
|
10/1950 |
18/11/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41280 |
|
|
10/1950 |
08/12/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41279 |
|
|
10/1950 |
14/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41278 |
|
|
10/1950 |
17/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41277 |
|
|
10/1950 |
01/12/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41275 |
|
|
10/1950 |
03/10/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41287 |
|
|
11/1950 |
17/07/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41286 |
|
|
11/1950 |
19/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41285 |
|
|
11/1950 |
10/12/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41284 |
|
|
11/1950 |
19/03/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41283 |
|
|
11/1950 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41288 |
|
|
12/1950 |
03/11/1962 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41289 |
|
|
12/1950 |
19/01/1963 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70000 |
|
|
05/01/1951 |
28/05/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70001 |
|
|
14/02/1951 |
03/09/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70003 |
|
|
01/03/1951 |
25/03/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70002 |
|
|
06/03/1951 |
14/01/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70004 |
|
|
30/03/1951 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70005 |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
29/07/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70006 |
|
|
12/04/1951 |
20/05/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70007 |
|
|
25/04/1951 |
19/06/1965 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70008 |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
14/01/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70009 |
|
|
04/05/1951 |
21/01/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70010 |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
23/09/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70011 |
|
|
14/05/1951 |
23/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70012 |
|
|
21/05/1951 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70013 |
|
|
30/05/1951 |
17/08/1968 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70014 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70017 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
01/10/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70015 |
|
|
12/06/1951 |
05/08/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70016 |
|
|
18/06/1951 |
19/08/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70018 |
|
|
25/06/1951 |
24/12/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70019 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
12/03/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70020 |
|
|
31/07/1951 |
21/01/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70021 |
|
|
03/08/1951 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70022 |
|
|
16/08/1951 |
23/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70023 |
|
|
21/08/1951 |
30/12/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41290 |
|
|
09/1951 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41291 |
|
|
09/1951 |
20/02/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41292 |
|
|
09/1951 |
21/09/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41298 |
|
|
10/1951 |
09/07/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41293 |
|
|
10/1951 |
21/03/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41294 |
|
|
10/1951 |
04/09/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41295 |
|
|
10/1951 |
16/04/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41296 |
|
|
10/1951 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41297 |
|
|
10/1951 |
05/10/1963 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70024 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
30/12/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41299 |
|
|
11/1951 |
02/10/1966 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72000 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
29/12/1962 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72001 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
29/12/1962 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72002 |
|
|
14/01/1952 |
29/12/1962 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72003 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
29/12/1962 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72005 |
|
|
02/1952 |
01/05/1965 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72007 |
|
|
02/1952 |
04/12/1965 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72008 |
|
|
02/1952 |
16/04/1966 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72004 |
|
|
02/02/1952 |
29/12/1962 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72006 |
|
|
27/02/1952 |
21/05/1966 |
BR |
Std 6P |
4-6-2 |
72009 |
|
|
03/1952 |
28/08/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41300 |
|
|
03/1952 |
18/10/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41304 |
|
|
03/1952 |
19/11/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41303 |
|
|
03/1952 |
04/10/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41302 |
|
|
03/1952 |
12/10/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41301 |
|
|
03/1952 |
10/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41305 |
|
|
04/1952 |
13/06/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41306 |
|
|
04/1952 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41307 |
|
|
04/1952 |
12/03/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41308 |
|
|
04/1952 |
06/02/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41309 |
|
|
05/1952 |
28/12/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41310 |
|
|
05/1952 |
18/10/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41311 |
|
|
05/1952 |
12/01/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41312 |
|
|
05/1952 |
09/07/1967 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41313 |
|
|
05/1952 |
24/10/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41314 |
|
|
05/1952 |
07/1965 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41315 |
|
|
05/1952 |
07/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41318 |
|
|
06/1952 |
05/10/1963 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41317 |
|
|
06/1952 |
14/12/1964 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41316 |
|
|
06/1952 |
02/10/1966 |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41319 |
|
|
06/1952 |
09/07/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70025 |
|
|
13/09/1952 |
23/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70026 |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
14/01/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70027 |
|
|
24/10/1952 |
01/07/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70028 |
|
|
27/10/1952 |
16/09/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70029 |
|
|
08/11/1952 |
21/10/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70030 |
|
|
19/11/1952 |
25/06/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70031 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70032 |
|
|
10/12/1952 |
30/09/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70033 |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
15/07/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70034 |
|
|
20/12/1952 |
06/05/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70035 |
|
|
22/12/1952 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70036 |
|
|
23/12/1952 |
15/10/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70037 |
|
|
24/12/1952 |
05/11/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70038 |
|
|
29/01/1953 |
12/08/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70039 |
|
|
09/02/1953 |
23/09/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70041 |
|
|
20/03/1953 |
15/04/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70040 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
15/04/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70042 |
|
|
09/04/1953 |
13/05/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70043 |
|
|
04/06/1953 |
07/08/1965 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70044 |
|
|
04/06/1953 |
24/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84000 |
|
|
04/07/1953 |
30/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84001 |
|
|
06/07/1953 |
31/10/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84002 |
|
|
07/08/1953 |
17/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84003 |
|
|
10/08/1953 |
02/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84004 |
|
|
19/08/1953 |
30/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84005 |
|
|
24/08/1953 |
30/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84006 |
|
|
26/08/1953 |
30/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84007 |
|
|
31/08/1953 |
18/01/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84008 |
|
|
31/08/1953 |
30/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84009 |
|
|
03/09/1953 |
20/11/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84010 |
|
|
08/09/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84012 |
|
|
17/09/1953 |
12/10/1963 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84011 |
|
|
18/09/1953 |
24/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84013 |
|
|
21/09/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84014 |
|
|
22/09/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84015 |
|
|
02/10/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84016 |
|
|
07/10/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84017 |
|
|
13/10/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84018 |
|
|
23/10/1953 |
24/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
84019 |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
11/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92000 |
|
|
05/01/1954 |
02/07/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92001 |
|
|
12/01/1954 |
17/01/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92002 |
|
|
16/01/1954 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92003 |
|
|
25/01/1954 |
26/03/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92004 |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
23/03/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92005 |
|
|
05/02/1954 |
30/08/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92006 |
|
|
10/02/1954 |
10/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92007 |
|
|
18/02/1954 |
31/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92008 |
|
|
31/03/1954 |
07/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92009 |
|
|
31/03/1954 |
23/03/1968 |
BR |
DUKE |
4-6-2 |
71000 |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
24/11/1962 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92010 |
|
|
31/05/1954 |
02/04/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92011 |
|
|
31/05/1954 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92012 |
|
|
31/05/1954 |
28/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92013 |
|
|
31/05/1954 |
01/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92014 |
|
|
31/05/1954 |
14/10/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70045 |
|
|
14/06/1954 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70046 |
|
|
22/06/1954 |
08/07/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70047 |
|
|
25/06/1954 |
29/07/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70048 |
|
|
08/07/1954 |
06/05/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70049 |
|
|
28/07/1954 |
09/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70050 |
|
|
04/08/1954 |
06/08/1966 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70051 |
|
|
11/08/1954 |
16/12/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70052 |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
01/04/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70053 |
|
|
03/09/1954 |
15/04/1967 |
BR |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70054 |
|
|
13/09/1954 |
26/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92015 |
|
|
30/09/1954 |
29/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73067 |
|
|
10/1954 |
30/03/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73068 |
|
|
10/1954 |
31/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73065 |
|
|
13/10/1954 |
09/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73066 |
|
|
15/10/1954 |
15/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92016 |
|
|
31/10/1954 |
21/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92017 |
|
|
31/10/1954 |
23/12/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92018 |
|
|
31/10/1954 |
22/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92019 |
|
|
31/10/1954 |
10/06/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73069 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
10/08/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92030 |
|
|
07/11/1954 |
27/02/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92031 |
|
|
11/11/1954 |
07/01/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73070 |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
29/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92032 |
|
|
17/11/1954 |
15/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92033 |
|
|
19/11/1954 |
18/09/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73071 |
|
|
20/11/1954 |
16/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92034 |
|
|
02/12/1954 |
31/05/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92036 |
|
|
02/12/1954 |
06/12/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92035 |
|
|
03/12/1954 |
10/02/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92037 |
|
|
08/12/1954 |
21/02/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73072 |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
27/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92038 |
|
|
14/12/1954 |
11/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92039 |
|
|
17/12/1954 |
17/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73073 |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
04/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92040 |
|
|
23/12/1954 |
08/08/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
73074 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
06/09/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92041 |
|
|
31/12/1954 |
29/08/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92042 |
|
|
12/01/1955 |
19/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92043 |
|
|
18/01/1955 |
30/07/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92044 |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
11/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92045 |
|
|
05/02/1955 |
16/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92046 |
|
|
12/02/1955 |
21/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92047 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92048 |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
16/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92049 |
|
|
12/03/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92020 |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
21/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92021 |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92022 |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92023 |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92024 |
|
|
11/06/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92025 |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92026 |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92027 |
|
|
25/06/1955 |
05/08/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92028 |
|
|
09/07/1955 |
22/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92029 |
|
|
09/07/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92050 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
30/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92051 |
|
|
27/08/1955 |
21/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92052 |
|
|
27/08/1955 |
12/08/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92053 |
|
|
17/09/1955 |
19/02/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92054 |
|
|
24/09/1955 |
04/05/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92055 |
|
|
24/09/1955 |
23/12/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92056 |
|
|
31/10/1955 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92057 |
|
|
31/10/1955 |
02/10/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92058 |
|
|
31/10/1955 |
04/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92059 |
|
|
31/10/1955 |
17/09/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92060 |
|
|
30/11/1955 |
23/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92061 |
|
|
30/11/1955 |
04/09/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92062 |
|
|
30/11/1955 |
26/06/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92063 |
|
|
30/11/1955 |
24/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92064 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
24/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92065 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
03/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92066 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
24/05/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92067 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
05/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92068 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
30/01/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92069 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
04/05/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92070 |
|
|
31/01/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92071 |
|
|
31/01/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92072 |
|
|
29/02/1956 |
30/01/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92073 |
|
|
29/02/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92079 |
|
|
29/03/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92074 |
|
|
31/03/1956 |
15/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92075 |
|
|
31/03/1956 |
17/09/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92076 |
|
|
31/03/1956 |
25/02/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92077 |
|
|
31/03/1956 |
22/06/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92078 |
|
|
31/03/1956 |
06/05/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92080 |
|
|
30/04/1956 |
06/05/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92081 |
|
|
31/05/1956 |
12/02/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92082 |
|
|
31/05/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92083 |
|
|
31/05/1956 |
18/02/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92084 |
|
|
31/05/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92085 |
|
|
30/06/1956 |
24/12/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92086 |
|
|
30/06/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92097 |
|
|
30/06/1956 |
23/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92098 |
|
|
31/07/1956 |
31/07/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92099 |
|
|
31/07/1956 |
04/09/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92100 |
|
|
31/08/1956 |
13/05/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92101 |
|
|
31/08/1956 |
14/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92102 |
|
|
31/08/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92103 |
|
|
31/08/1956 |
27/05/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92104 |
|
|
31/08/1956 |
25/02/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92105 |
|
|
30/09/1956 |
14/01/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92106 |
|
|
30/09/1956 |
29/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92107 |
|
|
30/09/1956 |
25/02/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92108 |
|
|
13/10/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92109 |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92110 |
|
|
27/10/1956 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92111 |
|
|
30/11/1956 |
28/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92112 |
|
|
30/11/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92113 |
|
|
30/11/1956 |
07/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92114 |
|
|
30/11/1956 |
22/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92115 |
|
|
31/12/1956 |
19/02/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92116 |
|
|
31/12/1956 |
12/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92117 |
|
|
31/12/1956 |
23/12/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92118 |
|
|
31/12/1956 |
25/05/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92119 |
|
|
28/02/1957 |
23/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92120 |
|
|
28/02/1957 |
08/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92121 |
|
|
28/02/1957 |
29/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92122 |
|
|
28/02/1957 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92123 |
|
|
31/03/1957 |
28/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92124 |
|
|
31/03/1957 |
03/12/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92125 |
|
|
31/03/1957 |
30/12/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92126 |
|
|
31/03/1957 |
05/08/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92127 |
|
|
30/04/1957 |
19/08/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92128 |
|
|
30/04/1957 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92129 |
|
|
30/04/1957 |
01/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92130 |
|
|
30/04/1957 |
14/05/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92131 |
|
|
31/05/1957 |
23/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92132 |
|
|
31/05/1957 |
21/10/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92133 |
|
|
30/06/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92134 |
|
|
30/06/1957 |
10/12/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92135 |
|
|
30/06/1957 |
08/06/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92136 |
|
|
31/07/1957 |
29/10/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92137 |
|
|
31/07/1957 |
09/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92138 |
|
|
31/07/1957 |
08/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92139 |
|
|
31/07/1957 |
09/09/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92140 |
|
|
31/07/1957 |
11/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92142 |
|
|
31/07/1957 |
21/02/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92143 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
21/02/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92144 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
19/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92145 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
10/02/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92146 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
17/04/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92147 |
|
|
30/09/1957 |
04/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92148 |
|
|
30/09/1957 |
19/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92149 |
|
|
31/10/1957 |
27/06/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92150 |
|
|
31/10/1957 |
17/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92151 |
|
|
31/10/1957 |
22/04/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92152 |
|
|
31/10/1957 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92153 |
|
|
31/10/1957 |
30/01/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92154 |
|
|
31/10/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3419 |
|
|
16/11/1957 |
31/07/1983 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92155 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
19/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92156 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92157 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
19/08/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92158 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
23/07/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92159 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
22/07/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92160 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
29/06/1968 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3420 |
|
|
07/12/1957 |
17/01/1984 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3421 |
|
|
20/12/1957 |
17/01/1984 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3422 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
10/07/1983 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92141 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
19/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92161 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
10/12/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92162 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92168 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
27/06/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92169 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
31/05/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92170 |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
31/05/1964 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3423 |
|
|
18/01/1958 |
05/07/1981 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92172 |
|
|
31/01/1958 |
17/04/1966 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3424 |
|
|
05/02/1958 |
10/07/1986 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3425 |
|
|
20/02/1958 |
09/05/1983 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92171 |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
31/05/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92173 |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
06/03/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92174 |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
12/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92175 |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
31/05/1964 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3427 |
|
|
10/03/1958 |
04/09/1977 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3428 |
|
|
21/03/1958 |
06/10/1977 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3426 |
|
|
26/03/1958 |
01/11/1982 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3429 |
|
|
28/03/1958 |
22/01/1984 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92176 |
|
|
31/03/1958 |
31/05/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92177 |
|
|
31/03/1958 |
31/05/1964 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3430 |
|
|
08/04/1958 |
24/01/1983 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3431 |
|
|
17/04/1958 |
23/02/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3432 |
|
|
22/04/1958 |
28/03/1982 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3433 |
|
|
30/04/1958 |
01/08/1982 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92163 |
|
|
30/04/1958 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92164 |
|
|
30/04/1958 |
30/07/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92165 |
|
|
30/04/1958 |
16/03/1968 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3434 |
|
|
08/05/1958 |
21/01/1983 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3435 |
|
|
24/05/1958 |
07/09/1980 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3436 |
|
|
24/05/1958 |
08/12/1980 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92221 |
|
|
30/05/1958 |
10/05/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92166 |
|
|
31/05/1958 |
11/11/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92167 |
|
|
31/05/1958 |
29/06/1968 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92222 |
|
|
02/06/1958 |
26/03/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92223 |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
13/04/1968 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3437 |
|
|
16/06/1958 |
12/09/1988 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92224 |
|
|
16/06/1958 |
30/09/1967 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3438 |
|
|
18/06/1958 |
08/12/1980 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92225 |
|
|
20/06/1958 |
02/07/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92226 |
|
|
26/06/1958 |
10/09/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92227 |
|
|
03/07/1958 |
04/11/1967 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3573 |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
16/08/1988 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92228 |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
28/01/1967 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92229 |
|
|
18/07/1958 |
06/11/1964 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3574 |
|
|
01/08/1958 |
30/10/1988 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92230 |
|
|
01/08/1958 |
31/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92231 |
|
|
01/08/1958 |
17/11/1966 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92232 |
|
|
06/08/1958 |
26/12/1964 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92233 |
|
|
11/08/1958 |
03/02/1968 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3575 |
|
|
13/08/1958 |
|
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92234 |
|
|
19/08/1958 |
11/11/1967 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3576 |
|
|
20/08/1958 |
23/02/1988 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92235 |
|
|
22/08/1958 |
18/11/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3577 |
|
|
28/08/1958 |
|
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92236 |
|
|
04/09/1958 |
21/04/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92237 |
|
|
09/09/1958 |
10/09/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3578 |
|
|
22/09/1958 |
16/03/1989 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92238 |
|
|
22/09/1958 |
10/09/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3579 |
|
|
25/09/1958 |
01/09/1985 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92239 |
|
|
30/09/1958 |
17/11/1966 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3580 |
|
|
01/10/1958 |
09/08/1985 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92240 |
|
|
01/10/1958 |
06/08/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92241 |
|
|
06/10/1958 |
02/07/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3581 |
|
|
07/10/1958 |
|
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92242 |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
13/06/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3582 |
|
|
16/10/1958 |
29/11/1981 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92243 |
|
|
21/10/1958 |
31/12/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3583 |
|
|
03/11/1958 |
23/11/1988 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92245 |
|
|
04/11/1958 |
26/12/1964 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3584 |
|
|
07/11/1958 |
01/09/1985 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3585 |
|
|
07/11/1958 |
23/03/1986 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3586 |
|
|
13/11/1958 |
09/09/1985 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3587 |
|
|
20/11/1958 |
|
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92246 |
|
|
20/11/1958 |
31/12/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3588 |
|
|
28/11/1958 |
17/03/1986 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92244 |
|
|
28/11/1958 |
31/12/1965 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92247 |
|
|
30/11/1958 |
08/10/1966 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3589 |
|
|
02/12/1958 |
07/09/1986 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92248 |
|
|
02/12/1958 |
13/06/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3590 |
|
|
10/12/1958 |
09/03/1987 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92249 |
|
|
10/12/1958 |
04/05/1968 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3591 |
|
|
17/12/1958 |
09/09/1985 |
BR |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92250 |
|
|
31/12/1958 |
31/12/1965 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3592 |
|
|
03/01/1959 |
07/12/1986 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3728 |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3729 |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
31/01/1994 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3730 |
|
|
27/01/1959 |
25/04/1982 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3731 |
|
|
04/02/1959 |
02/12/1985 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3732 |
|
|
26/02/1959 |
23/07/1993 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3733 |
|
|
02/04/1959 |
19/10/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3734 |
|
|
17/04/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3735 |
|
|
24/04/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3736 |
|
|
01/05/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3737 |
|
|
08/05/1959 |
18/01/1992 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3739 |
|
|
27/05/1959 |
22/02/1981 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3738 |
|
|
05/06/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3740 |
|
|
05/06/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3741 |
|
|
05/06/1959 |
01/03/1981 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5030 |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3742 |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3743 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
30/04/2006 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3744 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5031 |
|
|
25/06/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3745 |
|
|
26/06/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3746 |
|
|
02/07/1959 |
07/11/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3747 |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3748 |
|
|
29/07/1959 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5032 |
|
|
29/07/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3749 |
|
|
04/08/1959 |
30/09/2008 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5033 |
|
|
05/08/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3750 |
|
|
10/08/1959 |
23/07/1993 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3751 |
|
|
18/08/1959 |
23/08/1991 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3752 |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
05/10/1981 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5035 |
|
|
31/08/1959 |
15/10/1978 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5034 |
|
|
03/09/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5036 |
|
|
03/09/1959 |
20/11/1977 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3753 |
|
|
07/09/1959 |
01/03/1996 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5037 |
|
|
07/09/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3754 |
|
|
14/09/1959 |
30/09/2008 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5038 |
|
|
15/09/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3755 |
|
|
22/09/1959 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5041 |
|
|
28/09/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3756 |
|
|
05/10/1959 |
24/11/1992 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3757 |
|
|
05/10/1959 |
27/09/1993 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5040 |
|
|
12/10/1959 |
04/01/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5042 |
|
|
12/10/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5043 |
|
|
16/10/1959 |
10/08/1969 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3758 |
|
|
21/10/1959 |
26/02/1993 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5044 |
|
|
23/10/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5039 |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3759 |
|
|
27/10/1959 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5046 |
|
|
29/10/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5048 |
|
|
05/11/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3760 |
|
|
12/11/1959 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5045 |
|
|
12/11/1959 |
10/08/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3761 |
|
|
13/11/1959 |
20/07/2001 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5047 |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
16/11/1978 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3762 |
|
|
25/11/1959 |
23/07/1993 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5050 |
|
|
27/11/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5053 |
|
|
03/12/1959 |
31/01/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5052 |
|
|
04/12/1959 |
04/12/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5051 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
02/12/1967 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5056 |
|
|
11/12/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5054 |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
01/07/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5055 |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5057 |
|
|
22/12/1959 |
15/01/1978 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5059 |
|
|
29/12/1959 |
04/10/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3832 |
|
|
01/01/1960 |
30/09/2008 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3833 |
|
|
01/01/1960 |
16/01/1995 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5058 |
|
|
01/01/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3834 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
11/11/1992 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3835 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
02/04/1997 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3836 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
23/05/1989 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3837 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
12/10/1981 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3838 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
07/11/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3839 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
21/09/1992 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5060 |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5061 |
|
|
15/01/1960 |
01/08/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3840 |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
16/01/1995 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5062 |
|
|
18/01/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5063 |
|
|
26/01/1960 |
09/04/1979 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5064 |
|
|
27/01/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5065 |
|
|
02/02/1960 |
31/12/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3841 |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
05/07/1981 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5076 |
|
|
10/02/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5077 |
|
|
17/02/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5078 |
|
|
18/02/1960 |
24/04/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5079 |
|
|
25/02/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5080 |
|
|
01/03/1960 |
22/09/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3872 |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
07/01/1994 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3873 |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3874 |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
23/07/1993 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5081 |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
05/10/1980 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3875 |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
09/10/1992 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5082 |
|
|
29/03/1960 |
01/03/1979 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3876 |
|
|
01/04/1960 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5049 |
|
|
04/04/1960 |
31/01/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5083 |
|
|
08/04/1960 |
27/03/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3877 |
|
|
21/04/1960 |
25/01/1993 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5084 |
|
|
25/04/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3878 |
|
|
28/04/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3879 |
|
|
28/04/1960 |
11/12/1992 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3880 |
|
|
29/04/1960 |
26/06/1998 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3881 |
|
|
04/05/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3882 |
|
|
04/05/1960 |
30/09/2008 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3883 |
|
|
18/05/1960 |
30/11/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3884 |
|
|
19/05/1960 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5086 |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
04/01/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3885 |
|
|
23/05/1960 |
04/02/1972 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3886 |
|
|
25/05/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3887 |
|
|
31/05/1960 |
22/11/1991 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5087 |
|
|
09/06/1960 |
01/02/1978 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3888 |
|
|
10/06/1960 |
28/02/2007 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5088 |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
27/06/1970 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3889 |
|
|
15/06/1960 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5090 |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
02/02/1976 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5089 |
|
|
20/06/1960 |
04/01/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3890 |
|
|
22/06/1960 |
12/03/1987 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5091 |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
20/11/1977 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3891 |
|
|
27/06/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3892 |
|
|
01/07/1960 |
|
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5092 |
|
|
15/07/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3893 |
|
|
22/07/1960 |
14/08/1992 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3894 |
|
|
27/07/1960 |
26/01/1987 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5093 |
|
|
28/07/1960 |
14/08/1969 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3895 |
|
|
03/08/1960 |
03/03/1993 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3896 |
|
|
12/08/1960 |
12/10/1987 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3897 |
|
|
17/08/1960 |
22/02/1990 |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5085 |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
17/07/1976 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3898 |
|
|
23/08/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3899 |
|
|
01/09/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3900 |
|
|
08/09/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3901 |
|
|
15/09/1960 |
23/07/1993 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3902 |
|
|
20/09/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3903 |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3904 |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
12/10/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D68 |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
02/08/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3905 |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3906 |
|
|
14/10/1960 |
|
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D69 |
|
|
18/10/1960 |
03/08/1980 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3907 |
|
|
18/10/1960 |
30/09/2005 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3908 |
|
|
20/10/1960 |
31/08/2005 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3909 |
|
|
27/10/1960 |
16/04/1991 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3910 |
|
|
01/11/1960 |
|
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3911 |
|
|
09/11/1960 |
03/03/1993 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D70 |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
24/06/1985 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3912 |
|
|
18/11/1960 |
31/03/1992 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D72 |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
12/09/1984 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3913 |
|
|
22/11/1960 |
|
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D71 |
|
|
25/11/1960 |
27/10/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D73 |
|
|
25/11/1960 |
27/07/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3914 |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
31/08/2003 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D76 |
|
|
30/11/1960 |
27/11/1983 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D75 |
|
|
02/12/1960 |
08/06/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3915 |
|
|
02/12/1960 |
11/07/1990 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D74 |
|
|
05/12/1960 |
09/04/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D77 |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
08/12/1985 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3916 |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
21/01/1994 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D78 |
|
|
12/12/1960 |
04/02/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3917 |
|
|
12/12/1960 |
|
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D79 |
|
|
15/12/1960 |
17/03/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D80 |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
02/08/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3918 |
|
|
20/12/1960 |
|
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D81 |
|
|
21/12/1960 |
13/06/1988 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3919 |
|
|
28/12/1960 |
28/02/2004 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3920 |
|
|
30/12/1960 |
|
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D82 |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
04/08/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D83 |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
18/06/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D84 |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
11/04/1985 |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3921 |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
26/03/1993 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D85 |
|
|
06/02/1961 |
27/01/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D87 |
|
|
24/02/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D88 |
|
|
02/03/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D86 |
|
|
09/03/1961 |
10/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D90 |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D91 |
|
|
17/03/1961 |
29/11/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D89 |
|
|
22/03/1961 |
14/09/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D92 |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
22/12/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D93 |
|
|
28/03/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D94 |
|
|
06/04/1961 |
17/02/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D95 |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D96 |
|
|
18/04/1961 |
13/11/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D97 |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
03/09/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D98 |
|
|
26/04/1961 |
03/03/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D99 |
|
|
03/05/1961 |
09/03/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D100 |
|
|
08/05/1961 |
08/12/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D102 |
|
|
18/05/1961 |
29/03/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D101 |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
16/08/1981 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D103 |
|
|
30/05/1961 |
02/07/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D104 |
|
|
01/06/1961 |
02/05/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D105 |
|
|
09/06/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D106 |
|
|
15/06/1961 |
20/02/1989 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D109 |
|
|
30/06/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D107 |
|
|
20/07/1961 |
24/03/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D110 |
|
|
25/07/1961 |
05/03/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D108 |
|
|
28/07/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D111 |
|
|
04/08/1961 |
15/06/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D112 |
|
|
08/08/1961 |
28/03/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D115 |
|
|
28/08/1961 |
31/07/1977 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D116 |
|
|
01/09/1961 |
02/08/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D117 |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
10/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D113 |
|
|
14/09/1961 |
22/04/1989 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D118 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
28/01/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D114 |
|
|
19/09/1961 |
26/07/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D119 |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D120 |
|
|
30/09/1961 |
04/08/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D121 |
|
|
06/10/1961 |
08/07/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D122 |
|
|
11/10/1961 |
29/01/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D124 |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
03/09/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D123 |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D125 |
|
|
31/10/1961 |
12/07/1981 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D126 |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
17/09/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D127 |
|
|
15/11/1961 |
26/04/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D128 |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
23/02/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D129 |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
18/10/1981 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D130 |
|
|
04/12/1961 |
11/02/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D131 |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
04/09/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D132 |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
24/01/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D133 |
|
|
21/12/1961 |
08/12/1985 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D134 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
12/11/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D135 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
14/09/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D136 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
11/05/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D137 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
10/03/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D58 |
|
|
30/01/1962 |
12/09/1984 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D59 |
|
|
06/02/1962 |
13/04/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D60 |
|
|
15/02/1962 |
07/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D61 |
|
|
08/03/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D62 |
|
|
15/03/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D63 |
|
|
29/03/1962 |
15/06/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D64 |
|
|
09/04/1962 |
08/05/1983 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D65 |
|
|
13/04/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D66 |
|
|
17/04/1962 |
07/04/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D67 |
|
|
03/05/1962 |
08/05/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D50 |
|
|
22/05/1962 |
08/1988 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D51 |
|
|
05/06/1962 |
09/09/1986 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D52 |
|
|
07/06/1962 |
22/07/1987 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D53 |
|
|
25/06/1962 |
08/06/1988 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1035 |
|
|
27/07/1962 |
05/01/1975 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D54 |
|
|
08/08/1962 |
12/09/1984 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1036 |
|
|
29/08/1962 |
01/11/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1037 |
|
|
31/08/1962 |
24/05/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1038 |
|
|
07/09/1962 |
08/10/1973 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1039 |
|
|
07/09/1962 |
21/07/1973 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D55 |
|
|
10/09/1962 |
21/12/1987 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1040 |
|
|
20/09/1962 |
29/02/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1041 |
|
|
10/10/1962 |
23/02/1977 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1042 |
|
|
19/10/1962 |
21/07/1973 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1043 |
|
|
26/10/1962 |
04/04/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1044 |
|
|
12/11/1962 |
01/02/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1045 |
|
|
16/11/1962 |
16/12/1974 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D56 |
|
|
23/11/1962 |
15/06/1987 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1049 |
|
|
14/12/1962 |
26/04/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1048 |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
28/02/1977 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1046 |
|
|
24/12/1962 |
11/12/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1050 |
|
|
01/01/1963 |
06/04/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1051 |
|
|
21/01/1963 |
02/09/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1047 |
|
|
04/02/1963 |
29/02/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1052 |
|
|
04/02/1963 |
06/10/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1053 |
|
|
11/02/1963 |
15/11/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1054 |
|
|
02/03/1963 |
25/11/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1055 |
|
|
02/03/1963 |
05/01/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1056 |
|
|
08/03/1963 |
15/12/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1058 |
|
|
25/03/1963 |
24/01/1977 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1057 |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
02/05/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1059 |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
06/10/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1060 |
|
|
11/04/1963 |
18/11/1973 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1061 |
|
|
19/04/1963 |
21/10/1974 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1062 |
|
|
06/05/1963 |
22/08/1974 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1063 |
|
|
17/05/1963 |
04/04/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1064 |
|
|
24/05/1963 |
11/12/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1066 |
|
|
14/06/1963 |
12/11/1974 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1065 |
|
|
18/06/1963 |
04/11/1976 |
|
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D57 |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
29/04/1985 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1068 |
|
|
12/07/1963 |
12/10/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1067 |
|
|
18/07/1963 |
24/01/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1069 |
|
|
21/10/1963 |
06/10/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1070 |
|
|
28/10/1963 |
30/12/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1071 |
|
|
07/11/1963 |
07/12/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1072 |
|
|
07/11/1963 |
02/11/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1073 |
|
|
03/12/1963 |
29/08/1974 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1030 |
|
|
05/12/1963 |
19/04/1976 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1031 |
|
|
20/12/1963 |
01/02/1975 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1032 |
|
|
31/12/1963 |
06/05/1973 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1033 |
|
|
17/01/1964 |
17/09/1976 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1550 |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
15/03/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1552 |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
09/12/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1553 |
|
|
28/01/1964 |
07/04/1987 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1554 |
|
|
28/01/1964 |
08/05/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1551 |
|
|
31/01/1964 |
02/02/1987 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1556 |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
23/07/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1558 |
|
|
26/02/1964 |
12/03/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1555 |
|
|
27/02/1964 |
06/04/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1557 |
|
|
29/02/1964 |
15/12/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1561 |
|
|
05/03/1964 |
24/06/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1560 |
|
|
11/03/1964 |
05/11/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1559 |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
01/10/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1562 |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
20/06/1971 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1564 |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1565 |
|
|
23/03/1964 |
17/05/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1566 |
|
|
23/03/1964 |
14/05/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1567 |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
03/05/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1568 |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
24/06/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1569 |
|
|
31/03/1964 |
16/08/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1570 |
|
|
31/03/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1563 |
|
|
04/04/1964 |
24/02/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1571 |
|
|
04/04/1964 |
15/12/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1573 |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1572 |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
22/11/1991 |
|
52 |
C-C |
D1034 |
|
|
15/04/1964 |
06/10/1975 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1575 |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
15/03/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1574 |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1576 |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
21/10/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1577 |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
21/02/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1579 |
|
|
01/05/1964 |
25/03/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1578 |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
27/05/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1580 |
|
|
08/05/1964 |
07/02/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1581 |
|
|
16/05/1964 |
28/03/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1582 |
|
|
16/05/1964 |
31/01/1999 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1584 |
|
|
16/05/1964 |
01/07/2001 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1585 |
|
|
16/05/1964 |
03/04/1989 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1583 |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
01/05/2002 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1586 |
|
|
25/05/1964 |
21/04/1995 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1587 |
|
|
27/05/1964 |
02/10/1986 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1588 |
|
|
29/05/1964 |
25/08/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1589 |
|
|
29/05/1964 |
22/11/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1590 |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
01/08/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1591 |
|
|
05/06/1964 |
01/04/2002 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1592 |
|
|
06/06/1964 |
05/02/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1593 |
|
|
09/06/1964 |
12/12/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1594 |
|
|
16/06/1964 |
01/08/1995 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1595 |
|
|
16/06/1964 |
19/03/1989 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1596 |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
11/11/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1597 |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
01/01/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1598 |
|
|
29/06/1964 |
31/12/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1599 |
|
|
29/06/1964 |
01/03/2002 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1600 |
|
|
30/06/1964 |
19/04/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1601 |
|
|
06/07/1964 |
01/06/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1602 |
|
|
07/07/1964 |
30/06/2005 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1603 |
|
|
17/07/1964 |
31/01/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1604 |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
28/02/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1605 |
|
|
29/07/1964 |
01/01/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1606 |
|
|
29/07/1964 |
01/02/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1607 |
|
|
31/07/1964 |
28/10/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1608 |
|
|
31/07/1964 |
31/12/2005 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1609 |
|
|
11/08/1964 |
01/04/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1610 |
|
|
13/08/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1611 |
|
|
18/08/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1612 |
|
|
21/08/1964 |
11/12/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1613 |
|
|
25/08/1964 |
31/12/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1614 |
|
|
25/08/1964 |
01/08/1996 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1615 |
|
|
29/08/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1616 |
|
|
29/08/1964 |
01/03/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1617 |
|
|
04/09/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1618 |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1619 |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
01/11/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1620 |
|
|
17/09/1964 |
01/01/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1621 |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
01/03/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1622 |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
01/03/2001 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1623 |
|
|
02/10/1964 |
01/10/1994 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1625 |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
01/02/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1624 |
|
|
04/10/1964 |
01/11/1996 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1626 |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
01/10/2002 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1627 |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
30/04/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1628 |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
01/02/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1629 |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1630 |
|
|
23/10/1964 |
01/12/2001 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1631 |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
21/01/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1632 |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
11/11/1994 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1634 |
|
|
10/11/1964 |
30/04/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1633 |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
12/12/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1635 |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1637 |
|
|
07/12/1964 |
11/06/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1638 |
|
|
08/12/1964 |
17/07/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1636 |
|
|
10/12/1964 |
20/10/1993 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1639 |
|
|
14/12/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1640 |
|
|
16/12/1964 |
01/06/2002 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1641 |
|
|
17/12/1964 |
01/11/1996 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1642 |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
01/03/1996 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1643 |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
01/03/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1644 |
|
|
23/12/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1645 |
|
|
24/12/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1646 |
|
|
31/12/1964 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1647 |
|
|
02/01/1965 |
22/09/1995 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1649 |
|
|
02/01/1965 |
01/02/1999 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1650 |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1651 |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
01/06/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1652 |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1653 |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1648 |
|
|
22/01/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1654 |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1655 |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
01/11/1996 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1656 |
|
|
01/02/1965 |
01/02/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1657 |
|
|
01/02/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1659 |
|
|
06/02/1965 |
01/02/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1658 |
|
|
12/02/1965 |
01/03/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1660 |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1661 |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
01/05/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1662 |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
01/06/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1663 |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
01/05/1997 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1664 |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1665 |
|
|
05/03/1965 |
01/08/1999 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1666 |
|
|
05/03/1965 |
01/02/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1667 |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
01/06/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1668 |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
01/11/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1669 |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
01/09/1990 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1670 |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
18/02/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1671 |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
18/04/1966 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1672 |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
01/07/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1673 |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
01/11/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1674 |
|
|
05/04/1965 |
01/09/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1675 |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
21/06/1987 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1676 |
|
|
16/04/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1677 |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1678 |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
01/06/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1679 |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
05/01/1988 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1681 |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
30/11/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1680 |
|
|
11/05/1965 |
24/02/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1842 |
|
604 |
14/05/1965 |
18/05/1988 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1843 |
|
605 |
21/05/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1844 |
|
606 |
22/05/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1845 |
|
607 |
26/05/1965 |
15/11/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1846 |
|
608 |
29/05/1965 |
24/02/1994 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1847 |
|
609 |
05/06/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1848 |
|
610 |
05/06/1965 |
20/04/1989 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1849 |
|
611 |
12/06/1965 |
20/07/1987 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1851 |
|
613 |
12/06/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1850 |
|
612 |
19/06/1965 |
31/12/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1854 |
|
616 |
02/07/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1852 |
|
614 |
25/07/1965 |
25/03/1987 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1853 |
|
615 |
26/07/1965 |
27/03/1989 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1856 |
|
618 |
06/08/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1857 |
|
619 |
06/08/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1858 |
|
620 |
13/08/1965 |
27/01/1980 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1859 |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1855 |
|
617 |
24/08/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1860 |
|
622 |
28/08/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1861 |
|
623 |
28/08/1965 |
31/05/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1963 |
|
|
17/09/1965 |
01/08/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1964 |
|
|
24/09/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1962 |
|
|
27/09/1965 |
01/07/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1965 |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1966 |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1967 |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
01/04/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1968 |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
01/04/1995 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1969 |
|
|
22/10/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1970 |
|
|
22/10/1965 |
01/04/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1971 |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1972 |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1973 |
|
|
10/11/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1974 |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
01/03/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1975 |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
01/09/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1976 |
|
|
24/11/1965 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1978 |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
13/04/2001 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1977 |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
07/09/1986 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1979 |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
14/07/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1980 |
|
|
16/12/1965 |
28/01/1999 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1981 |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1982 |
|
|
23/12/1965 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1983 |
|
|
30/12/1965 |
17/12/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1984 |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
17/09/1986 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1985 |
|
|
17/01/1966 |
31/08/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1986 |
|
|
21/01/1966 |
14/01/2000 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1987 |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
31/12/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1988 |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1989 |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
30/09/2004 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1990 |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
22/09/1995 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1991 |
|
|
02/03/1966 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1992 |
|
|
15/03/1966 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1993 |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
25/08/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1994 |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1995 |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
28/02/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1996 |
|
|
01/06/1966 |
31/10/2002 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1997 |
|
|
03/06/1966 |
31/01/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1998 |
|
|
14/06/1966 |
31/07/2003 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1999 |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
01/02/1999 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1100 |
|
|
01/08/1966 |
30/04/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1101 |
|
|
12/08/1966 |
14/11/1991 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1102 |
|
|
09/09/1966 |
30/06/2005 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1103 |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
25/08/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1104 |
|
|
19/10/1966 |
21/04/1995 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1105 |
|
|
09/11/1966 |
12/12/1998 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1106 |
|
|
25/11/1966 |
01/06/1999 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1107 |
|
|
23/12/1966 |
|
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1108 |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
31/10/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1109 |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
31/10/2007 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1110 |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
27/11/1992 |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1111 |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
29/02/2008 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87001 |
|
|
01/06/1973 |
01/06/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87002 |
|
|
29/06/1973 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87003 |
|
|
11/07/1973 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87004 |
|
|
13/07/1973 |
01/06/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87005 |
|
|
14/08/1973 |
30/04/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87007 |
|
|
26/10/1973 |
01/07/2006 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87008 |
|
|
02/11/1973 |
01/07/2006 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87006 |
|
|
05/11/1973 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87009 |
|
|
26/11/1973 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87010 |
|
|
15/12/1973 |
30/09/2008 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87011 |
|
|
25/01/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87012 |
|
|
25/01/1974 |
30/11/2006 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87014 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
01/08/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87015 |
|
|
19/02/1974 |
30/04/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87013 |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
01/08/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87017 |
|
|
06/03/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87019 |
|
|
11/03/1974 |
30/11/2006 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87016 |
|
|
12/03/1974 |
14/09/2004 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87020 |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
01/12/2003 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87021 |
|
|
04/04/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87022 |
|
|
11/04/1974 |
30/09/2008 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87023 |
|
|
11/04/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87024 |
|
|
25/04/1974 |
31/05/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87025 |
|
|
26/04/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87026 |
|
|
04/05/1974 |
01/10/2006 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87027 |
|
|
04/05/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87018 |
|
|
07/05/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87028 |
|
|
13/05/1974 |
30/09/2008 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87029 |
|
|
04/06/1974 |
01/08/2004 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87030 |
|
|
08/06/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87031 |
|
|
04/07/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87032 |
|
|
25/07/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87033 |
|
|
15/08/1974 |
01/03/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87034 |
|
|
11/09/1974 |
|
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87035 |
|
|
09/10/1974 |
01/01/2005 |
|
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87101 |
|
|
05/03/1975 |
|
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56116 |
|
|
13/03/1983 |
02/2003 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56117 |
|
|
13/03/1983 |
|
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56118 |
|
|
17/04/1983 |
01/06/2006 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56119 |
|
|
15/05/1983 |
03/2004 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56120 |
|
|
29/05/1983 |
12/2003 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56121 |
|
|
19/06/1983 |
06/2005 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56122 |
|
|
03/07/1983 |
09/10/1992 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56123 |
|
|
31/07/1983 |
08/2003 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56124 |
|
|
25/09/1983 |
04/2009 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56125 |
|
|
20/10/1983 |
|
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56126 |
|
|
15/11/1983 |
04/05/2001 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56127 |
|
|
13/12/1983 |
02/2002 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56128 |
|
|
18/12/1983 |
08/2005 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56129 |
|
|
08/01/1984 |
07/2003 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56130 |
|
|
01/04/1984 |
04/2004 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56131 |
|
|
29/04/1984 |
08/2005 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56132 |
|
|
10/06/1984 |
06/2005 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56133 |
|
|
29/07/1984 |
02/2004 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56134 |
|
|
09/09/1984 |
07/2002 |
|
56 |
Co-Co |
56135 |
|
|
04/11/1984 |
07/2003 |
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90001 |
|
|
04/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90002 |
|
|
04/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90003 |
|
|
04/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90004 |
|
|
04/04/1988 |
|
|
91 |
Bo-Bo |
91001 |
|
|
04/04/1988 |
|
|
91 |
Bo-Bo |
91002 |
|
|
04/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90005 |
|
|
30/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90006 |
|
|
30/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90007 |
|
|
30/04/1988 |
|
|
91 |
Bo-Bo |
91003 |
|
|
30/04/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90008 |
|
|
16/05/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90009 |
|
|
31/05/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90010 |
|
|
30/06/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90011 |
|
|
23/09/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90014 |
|
|
28/10/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90013 |
|
|
23/11/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90015 |
|
|
23/11/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90012 |
|
|
25/11/1988 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
|
|
|
1989 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90028 |
|
|
1989 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90029 |
|
|
1989 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90030 |
|
|
1989 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90046 |
|
|
30/06/1990 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90047 |
|
|
27/07/1990 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90048 |
|
|
27/07/1990 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90049 |
|
|
26/10/1990 |
|
|
90 |
Bo-Bo |
90050 |
|
|
14/11/1990 |
|