Manufacturer: Derby Works
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LMS | 700 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1873 | 03/1950 | |||
LMS | 700 | 0-6-0 | 02/1873 | 09/1949 | |||
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 143 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 17/05/1925 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 142 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 31/01/1926 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 141 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 06/11/1927 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 140 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 01/12/1928 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 137 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 19/04/1930 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 18 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 31/12/1938 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 15 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 01/12/1928 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 6 | 0.1 | 06/1875 | 29/11/1930 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 144 | 0.1 | 12/1875 | 06/09/1930 | |
MR | 6 | 0-4-4T | 147 | 0.1 | 12/1875 | 23/02/1935 | |
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 146 | 1876 | 02/1934 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 74 | 1876 | 03/1928 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 73 | 1876 | 11/1937 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 71 | 1876 | 11/1925 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 70 | 1876 | 07/1919 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 13 | 1876 | 04/1923 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 10 | 1876 | 12/1928 | ||
MR | 50 | 2-4-0 | 50 | 1876 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 50 | 2-4-0 | 51 | 1876 | 09/1936 | ||
MR | 50 | 2-4-0 | 52 | 1876 | 10/1926 | ||
MR | 50 | 2-4-0 | 53 | 1876 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 50 | 2-4-0 | 54 | 1876 | 12/1928 | ||
MR | 55 | 2-4-0 | 57 | 1876 | 06/1939 | ||
MR | 55 | 2-4-0 | 55 | 1876 | 12/1927 | ||
MR | 55 | 2-4-0 | 58 | 1876 | 12/1933 | ||
MR | 55 | 2-4-0 | 58 | 1876 | 02/1934 | ||
MR | 55 | 2-4-0 | 59 | 1876 | 04/1924 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 9 | 02/1876 | 11/1912 | ||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 1 | 02/1876 | 04/1924 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 04/1876 | 09/10/1948 | |||
MR | 1070 | 2-4-0 | 04/1876 | 28/10/1950 | |||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1347 | 1877 | 04/1924 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1348 | 1877 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1349 | 1877 | 07/1919 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1350 | 1877 | 12/1928 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1351 | 1877 | 11/1928 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1352 | 1877 | 01/1926 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1353 | 1877 | 10/1934 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1354 | 1877 | 1941 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1355 | 1877 | 10/1926 | ||
MR | 1347 | 2-4-0 | 1356 | 1877 | 02/1928 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1377 | 204 | 05/1878 | 16/05/1953 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1378 | 204 | 06/1878 | 07/1959 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1379 | 204 | 06/1878 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1380 | 204 | 06/1878 | 09/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1384 | 204 | 07/1878 | 09/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1385 | 204 | 07/1878 | 02/1948 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1382 | 204 | 07/1878 | 12/1937 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1383 | 204 | 07/1878 | 06/1953 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1381 | 204 | 07/1878 | 21/11/1953 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1386 | 204 | 08/1878 | 08/1935 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1388 | 218 | 10/1878 | 14/02/1948 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1387 | 218 | 10/1878 | 07/1938 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1390 | 218 | 11/1878 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1391 | 218 | 11/1878 | 29/05/1948 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1389 | 218 | 11/1878 | 31/12/1955 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1395 | 218 | 12/1878 | 05/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1394 | 218 | 12/1878 | 07/1931 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1392 | 218 | 12/1878 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1393 | 218 | 12/1878 | 03/1949 | |
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1401 | 1879 | 05/1933 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1405 | 1879 | 02/1929 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1406 | 1879 | 12/1934 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1407 | 1879 | 10/1934 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1408 | 1879 | 10/1934 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1404 | 1879 | 10/1934 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1403 | 1879 | 06/1926 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1402 | 1879 | 12/1932 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1400 | 1879 | 02/1937 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1396 | 218 | 01/1879 | 10/1934 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1347 | 218 | 01/1879 | 02/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1353 | 218 | 02/1879 | 09/1956 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1352 | 218 | 02/1879 | 06/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1351 | 218 | 02/1879 | 07/1928 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1348 | 218 | 02/1879 | 05/1946 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1349 | 218 | 02/1879 | 29/01/1955 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1350 | 218 | 02/1879 | 11/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1354 | 218 | 03/1879 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1355 | 218 | 03/1879 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1356 | 218 | 03/1879 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1420 | 239 | 10/1879 | 05/1951 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1422 | 239 | 11/1879 | 10/1934 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1421 | 239 | 11/1879 | 05/1935 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1424 | 239 | 11/1879 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1423 | 239 | 11/1879 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 11/1879 | 11/1949 | |||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1426 | 239 | 12/1879 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1427 | 239 | 12/1879 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 220 | 239 | 12/1879 | 08/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 221 | 239 | 12/1879 | 23/02/1957 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1425 | 239 | 12/1879 | 11/04/1953 | |
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1477 | 1880 | 02/1934 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1489 | 1880 | 06/1928 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1490 | 1880 | 07/1933 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1491 | 1880 | 11/1929 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1478 | 1880 | 10/1934 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1476 | 1880 | 09/1931 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1475 | 1880 | 11/1939 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1474 | 1880 | 12/1932 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1473 | 1880 | 08/1926 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1472 | 1880 | 09/1931 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1479 | 1880 | 12/1932 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1480 | 1880 | 11/1930 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1481 | 1880 | 09/1929 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1482 | 1880 | 05/1925 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1483 | 1880 | 10/1928 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1488 | 1880 | 12/1938 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1487 | 1880 | 10/1931 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1486 | 1880 | 07/1928 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1484 | 1880 | 11/1929 | ||
MR | 1400 | 2-4-0 | 1485 | 1880 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 111 | 2-4-0 | 114 | 1880 | 12/1932 | ||
MR | 111 | 2-4-0 | 115 | 1880 | 02/1936 | ||
MR | 111 | 2-4-0 | 112 | 1880 | 03/1928 | ||
MR | 111 | 2-4-0 | 111 | 1880 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 111 | 2-4-0 | 113 | 1880 | 1943 | ||
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 03/1880 | 04/09/1954 | |||
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 03/1880 | 05/07/1958 | |||
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 03/1880 | 09/11/1960 | |||
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 03/1880 | 09/09/1959 | |||
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 03/1880 | 26/12/1959 | |||
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 03/1880 | 17/06/1954 | |||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1411 | 262 | 05/1880 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1410 | 262 | 05/1880 | 01/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1418 | 262 | 06/1880 | 25/12/1966 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1416 | 262 | 06/1880 | 06/04/1957 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1415 | 262 | 06/1880 | 11/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1414 | 262 | 06/1880 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1413 | 262 | 06/1880 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1412 | 262 | 06/1880 | 30/06/1962 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1419 | 262 | 06/1880 | 07/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1417 | 262 | 06/1880 | 08/1930 | |
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1499 | 1881 | 12/1931 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1493 | 1881 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1494 | 1881 | 12/1931 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1495 | 1881 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1496 | 1881 | 12/1933 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1497 | 1881 | 12/1924 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1498 | 1881 | 12/1930 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1500 | 1881 | 12/1928 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1501 | 1881 | 12/1926 | ||
MR | 1492 | 2-4-0 | 1492 | 1881 | 08/1931 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 04/1881 | 19/03/1955 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1881 | 01/04/1950 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1881 | 08/12/1951 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1534 | 08/1881 | 17/05/1925 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1533 | 08/1881 | 04/11/1944 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1532 | 08/1881 | 18/05/1935 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1536 | 09/1881 | 12/07/1925 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1535 | 09/1881 | 18/05/1935 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 10/1881 | 09/02/1951 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1539 | 10/1881 | 19/03/1955 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1538 | 10/1881 | 09/10/1948 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1537 | 10/1881 | 06/11/1927 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1541 | 11/1881 | 01/04/1950 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1540 | 11/1881 | 01/01/1938 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1545 | 12/1881 | 27/02/1937 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1546 | 12/1881 | 20/04/1924 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1544 | 12/1881 | 08/12/1951 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1543 | 12/1881 | 18/05/1946 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1542 | 12/1881 | 26/03/1938 | ||
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1565 | 370 | 1882 | 04/1928 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1570 | 370 | 1882 | 08/1932 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1569 | 370 | 1882 | 06/1927 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1568 | 370 | 1882 | 04/1930 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1567 | 370 | 1882 | 12/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1564 | 370 | 1882 | 11/1932 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1563 | 370 | 1882 | 05/1930 | |
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1548 | 02/1882 | 04/1920 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1547 | 02/1882 | 08/1919 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1549 | 03/1882 | 20/06/1926 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1551 | 04/1882 | 28/11/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1550 | 04/1882 | 24/04/1927 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1552 | 340 | 04/1882 | 07/1957 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1553 | 340 | 05/1882 | 09/10/1954 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1554 | 340 | 05/1882 | 10/1964 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1555 | 340 | 05/1882 | 13/08/1955 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1556 | 340 | 05/1882 | 15/05/1948 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1557 | 340 | 05/1882 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1558 | 340 | 06/1882 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1559 | 340 | 06/1882 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1561 | 340 | 06/1882 | 06/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1560 | 340 | 06/1882 | 21/08/1948 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1562 | 370 | 09/1882 | 02/1928 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 370 | 10/1882 | 22/09/1959 | ||
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 370 | 11/1882 | 12/04/1958 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 12/1882 | 17/04/1948 | |||
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1322 | 341 | 1883 | 01/1926 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1323 | 341 | 1883 | 25/12/1966 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1324 | 341 | 1883 | 09/1924 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1325 | 341 | 1883 | 07/1928 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1326 | 341 | 1883 | 11/1927 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1663 | 430 | 1883 | 10/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1666 | 430 | 1883 | 11/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1664 | 430 | 1883 | 09/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1661 | 430 | 1883 | 07/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1659 | 430 | 1883 | 04/1932 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1658 | 430 | 1883 | 10/1927 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1657 | 430 | 1883 | 04/1927 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1581 | 400 | 1883 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1580 | 400 | 1883 | 03/1928 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1579 | 400 | 1883 | 08/1925 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1578 | 400 | 1883 | 12/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1577 | 400 | 1883 | 01/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1576 | 400 | 1883 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1575 | 400 | 1883 | 12/1926 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1574 | 400 | 1883 | 08/1930 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1573 | 400 | 1883 | 05/1928 | |
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 1572 | 400 | 1883 | 02/1937 | |
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 02/1883 | 20/10/1951 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 04/1883 | 15/12/1951 | |||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 210 | 414 | 04/1883 | 24/11/1956 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 215 | 414 | 05/1883 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 212 | 414 | 05/1883 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 211 | 414 | 05/1883 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1633 | 06/1883 | 24/02/1951 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1632 | 06/1883 | 10/08/1946 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1399 | 414 | 06/1883 | 07/1931 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 216 | 414 | 06/1883 | 14/06/1958 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1398 | 414 | 06/1883 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1397 | 414 | 06/1883 | 01/03/1952 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 219 | 414 | 06/1883 | 04/07/1959 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 218 | 414 | 06/1883 | 08/1955 | |
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1636 | 07/1883 | 17/04/1948 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1634 | 07/1883 | 28/11/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1635 | 08/1883 | 03/10/1931 | ||
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 430 | 10/1883 | 07/1953 | ||
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 430 | 10/1883 | 12/1953 | ||
MR | 1562 | 4-4-0 | 430 | 11/1883 | 24/08/1957 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1638 | 12/1883 | 03/10/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1637 | 12/1883 | 29/11/1930 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1639 | 12/1883 | 02/11/1935 | ||
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1673 | 444 | 1884 | 19/08/1960 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1672 | 444 | 1884 | 16/12/1950 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1671 | 444 | 1884 | 28/01/1961 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1670 | 444 | 1884 | 23/02/1957 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1669 | 444 | 1884 | 10/08/1957 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1668 | 444 | 1884 | 29/08/1953 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1667 | 444 | 1884 | 08/1949 | |
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1643 | 02/1884 | 05/10/1946 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1640 | 02/1884 | 20/04/1946 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1641 | 02/1884 | 03/11/1951 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1642 | 02/1884 | 29/01/1938 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 03/1884 | 10/1949 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1644 | 03/1884 | 29/12/1951 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1645 | 03/1884 | 04/10/1930 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1646 | 03/1884 | 18/06/1938 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1648 | 03/1884 | 05/10/1946 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1647 | 03/1884 | 13/06/1936 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1651 | 04/1884 | 05/09/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1649 | 04/1884 | 09/08/1952 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1650 | 04/1884 | 22/03/1930 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1652 | 05/1884 | 18/05/1935 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1653 | 05/1884 | 21/02/1948 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1654 | 06/1884 | 25/01/1930 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1655 | 06/1884 | 01/12/1934 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1656 | 06/1884 | 28/12/1924 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 08/1884 | 07/1952 | |||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1677 | 496 | 09/1884 | 12/1936 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1684 | 496 | 10/1884 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1678 | 496 | 10/1884 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1679 | 496 | 10/1884 | 11/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1680 | 496 | 10/1884 | 05/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1681 | 496 | 10/1884 | 25/12/1966 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1682 | 496 | 10/1884 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1683 | 496 | 10/1884 | 08/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1685 | 496 | 11/1884 | 02/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1686 | 496 | 11/1884 | 16/06/1963 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1090 | 496 | 11/1884 | 12/1938 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1091 | 496 | 11/1884 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1092 | 496 | 11/1884 | 03/1946 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1094 | 496 | 11/1884 | 12/1939 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1689 | 499 | 12/1884 | 11/12/1954 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1693 | 499 | 12/1884 | 07/1946 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1694 | 499 | 12/1884 | 18/01/1958 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1695 | 499 | 12/1884 | 09/02/1957 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1696 | 499 | 12/1884 | 31/12/1959 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1690 | 499 | 12/1884 | 28/09/1957 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1691 | 499 | 12/1884 | 25/06/1955 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1692 | 499 | 12/1884 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1687 | 499 | 12/1884 | 07/04/1951 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1095 | 496 | 12/1884 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1688 | 499 | 12/1884 | 06/1935 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3137 | 1885 | 24/10/1959 | ||
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1675 | 444 | 1885 | 04/10/1960 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1674 | 444 | 1885 | 14/01/1950 | |
MR | 1667 | 4-4-0 | 1676 | 444 | 1885 | 18/12/1948 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1741 | 554 | 1885 | 11/1929 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1740 | 554 | 1885 | 12/1923 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1098 | 499 | 01/1885 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1099 | 499 | 01/1885 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1097 | 499 | 01/1885 | 05/1949 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1096 | 499 | 01/1885 | 09/1946 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1100 | 499 | 01/1885 | 24/01/1948 | |
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1885 | 07/1954 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1885 | 01/01/1955 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1885 | 05/11/1955 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1885 | 07/07/1951 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1885 | 30/11/1957 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 02/1885 | 16/06/1956 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1718 | 05/1885 | 30/11/1924 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1719 | 05/1885 | 13/07/1935 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 06/1885 | 03/1950 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 06/1885 | 02/1953 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1726 | 06/1885 | 01/1924 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1724 | 06/1885 | 12/08/1933 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1723 | 06/1885 | 09/08/1925 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1722 | 06/1885 | 05/11/1949 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1721 | 06/1885 | 14/06/1925 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1720 | 06/1885 | 01/12/1934 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1725 | 06/1885 | 22/02/1930 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1727 | 06/1885 | 26/12/1931 | ||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 11/1885 | 09/1952 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 11/1885 | 06/1954 | |||
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1738 | 554 | 11/1885 | 07/1929 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 554 | 11/1885 | 02/1954 | ||
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 554 | 12/1885 | 15/12/1956 | ||
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1751 | 815 | 1886 | 06/1927 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1746 | 554 | 1886 | 08/1931 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1747 | 554 | 1886 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1748 | 815 | 1886 | 12/1939 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1749 | 815 | 1886 | 1940 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1745 | 554 | 1886 | 12/1936 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1743 | 554 | 1886 | 09/1928 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1752 | 815 | 1886 | 06/1940 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1753 | 815 | 1886 | 11/1925 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1754 | 815 | 1886 | 05/1935 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1755 | 815 | 1886 | 07/1926 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 1756 | 815 | 1886 | 10/1935 | |
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 554 | 01/1886 | 16/06/1956 | ||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1886 | 05/1950 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1886 | 02/05/1953 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1886 | 30/06/1955 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1886 | 11/12/1954 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 03/1886 | 14/04/1951 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1729 | 03/1886 | 25/03/1950 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1728 | 03/1886 | 01/12/1934 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1730 | 03/1886 | 12/07/1925 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1731 | 03/1886 | 21/02/1953 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1733 | 04/1886 | 29/11/1930 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1732 | 04/1886 | 11/09/1937 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1737 | 05/1886 | 03/11/1956 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1734 | 05/1886 | 20/04/1940 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1735 | 05/1886 | 28/11/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1736 | 05/1886 | 13/07/1935 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 06/1886 | 27/10/1956 | |||
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 815 | 06/1886 | 06/01/1951 | ||
MR | 1738 | 4-4-0 | 815 | 12/1886 | 09/1955 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3178 | 1887 | 12/03/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3180 | 1887 | 17/01/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3181 | 1887 | 13/04/1957 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3183 | 1887 | 27/06/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3185 | 1887 | 19/08/1961 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3186 | 1887 | 03/01/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3187 | 1887 | 20/08/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3188 | 1887 | 23/04/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3189 | 1887 | 03/12/1960 | ||
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 26 | 655 | 1887 | 07/1919 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 27 | 655 | 1887 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 28 | 655 | 1887 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 29 | 655 | 1887 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 3168 | 01/01/1887 | 18/06/1949 | ||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1887 | 06/1954 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1887 | 05/1950 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1887 | 13/06/1959 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1887 | 11/01/1958 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1887 | 07/1951 | |||
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 25 | 655 | 06/1887 | 09/1928 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3174 | 10/1887 | 20/02/1960 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1816 | 678 | 1888 | 10/1931 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1820 | 734 | 1888 | 11/1932 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1819 | 734 | 1888 | 02/1935 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1818 | 734 | 1888 | 03/1930 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1817 | 678 | 1888 | 12/1936 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1808 | 678 | 1888 | 09/1947 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1809 | 678 | 1888 | 12/1937 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1810 | 678 | 1888 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1811 | 678 | 1888 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1812 | 678 | 1888 | 10/1935 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1814 | 678 | 1888 | 10/1925 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 1822 | 734 | 1888 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 678 | 06/1888 | 08/1949 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 678 | 06/1888 | 05/07/1952 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3191 | 09/1888 | 22/05/1954 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3192 | 09/1888 | 22/08/1959 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 734 | 09/1888 | 08/1949 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3193 | 10/1888 | 22/03/1958 | ||
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 30 | 655 | 12/1888 | 10/1921 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 202 | 816 | 1889 | 01/1907 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1428 | 816 | 1889 | 12/1924 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1861 | 655 | 1889 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1856 | 655 | 1889 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1857 | 655 | 1889 | 02/1922 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1859 | 655 | 1889 | 02/1922 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1860 | 655 | 1889 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1855 | 655 | 1889 | 02/1922 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1865 | 809 | 1889 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1864 | 809 | 1889 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1863 | 809 | 1889 | 02/1922 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 32 | 655 | 01/1889 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 31 | 655 | 01/1889 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 04/1889 | 14/02/1953 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1823 | 04/1889 | 28/11/1931 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1889 | 18/11/1955 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1889 | 05/06/1948 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1889 | 08/1954 | |||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1832 | 05/1889 | 21/02/1953 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1829 | 05/1889 | 21/04/1951 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1830 | 05/1889 | 05/10/1947 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1825 | 05/1889 | 26/12/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1831 | 05/1889 | 26/12/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1824 | 05/1889 | 05/09/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1826 | 05/1889 | 02/11/1946 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1827 | 05/1889 | 12/07/1925 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1828 | 05/1889 | 28/11/1931 | ||
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1854 | 655 | 06/1889 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 34 | 745 | 06/1889 | 09/1920 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1853 | 745 | 06/1889 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 37 | 655 | 08/1889 | 09/1925 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1858 | 655 | 09/1889 | 11/1922 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 201 | 824 | 11/1889 | 06/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 200 | 824 | 11/1889 | 08/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 214 | 824 | 12/1889 | 25/12/1966 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 213 | 824 | 12/1889 | 09/1948 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1429 | 816 | 1890 | 01/1905 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 1697 | 816 | 1890 | 07/1928 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1867 | 809 | 1890 | 02/1922 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1866 | 809 | 1890 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 217 | 824 | 01/1890 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 25 | 4-2-2 | 1862 | 655 | 01/1890 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 222 | 824 | 02/1890 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 223 | 824 | 02/1890 | 10/1934 | |
MR | 1322 | 0-4-0ST | 816 | 03/1890 | 10/1949 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1431 | 824 | 03/1890 | 28/02/1962 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1101 | 824 | 03/1890 | 31/12/1949 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1093 | 824 | 03/1890 | 08/09/1951 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1846 | 854 | 04/1890 | 07/1960 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1845 | 854 | 04/1890 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1844 | 854 | 04/1890 | 07/1946 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1843 | 854 | 04/1890 | 07/1953 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 14 | 854 | 05/1890 | 07/1957 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 86 | 854 | 05/1890 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 85 | 854 | 05/1890 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1847 | 854 | 05/1890 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 11 | 854 | 06/1890 | 02/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 87 | 854 | 06/1890 | 03/03/1956 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1974 | 869 | 07/1890 | 12/1931 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1975 | 869 | 07/1890 | 04/1949 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 203 | 869 | 07/1890 | 02/1953 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1848 | 869 | 07/1890 | 07/1951 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1849 | 869 | 07/1890 | 05/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1850 | 869 | 07/1890 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1851 | 869 | 07/1890 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1852 | 869 | 07/1890 | 08/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1973 | 869 | 07/1890 | 10/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1976 | 869 | 08/1890 | 12/1933 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1981 | 924 | 10/1890 | 05/1952 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1977 | 924 | 10/1890 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1878 | 924 | 10/1890 | 11/1927 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1979 | 924 | 10/1890 | 09/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1980 | 924 | 10/1890 | 13/10/1951 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 882 | 883 | 10/1890 | 09/1959 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 881 | 883 | 10/1890 | 11/1937 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 880 | 883 | 10/1890 | 05/1959 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 887 | 883 | 11/1890 | 09/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 886 | 883 | 11/1890 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 885 | 883 | 11/1890 | 07/1931 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 884 | 883 | 11/1890 | 12/1938 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 883 | 883 | 11/1890 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3258 | 12/1890 | 18/07/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3259 | 12/1890 | 16/02/1957 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 889 | 883 | 12/1890 | 25/12/1966 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 888 | 883 | 12/1890 | 23/11/1957 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3340 | 1891 | 15/10/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3341 | 1891 | 25/09/1957 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3342 | 1891 | 24/08/1963 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3344 | 1891 | 07/05/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3351 | 1891 | 10/12/1955 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3355 | 1891 | 02/05/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3356 | 1891 | 19/07/1958 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3357 | 1891 | 02/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3359 | 1891 | 20/08/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3361 | 1891 | 15/10/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3364 | 1891 | 26/12/1953 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3367 | 1891 | 04/01/1958 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3368 | 1891 | 14/11/1961 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3369 | 1891 | 08/08/1959 | ||
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1869 | 935 | 1891 | 03/1922 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1870 | 935 | 1891 | 04/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1871 | 935 | 1891 | 11/1926 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1872 | 935 | 1891 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 1868 | 935 | 1891 | 02/1922 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 80 | 920 | 1891 | 12/1928 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 86 | 920 | 1891 | 10/1925 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 85 | 920 | 1891 | 09/1926 | |
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 06/1891 | 01/1949 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 06/1891 | 03/03/1951 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 06/1891 | 18/02/1961 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 06/1891 | 25/09/1954 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 06/1891 | 03/1949 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 08/1891 | 17/09/1960 | ||
MR | 1808 | 4-4-0 | 920 | 08/1891 | 08/1953 | ||
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1982 | 968 | 09/1891 | 21/04/1956 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1983 | 968 | 09/1891 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1984 | 968 | 09/1891 | 12/1938 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1985 | 968 | 09/1891 | 07/1931 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1988 | 968 | 10/1891 | 04/09/1954 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1986 | 968 | 10/1891 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1989 | 968 | 10/1891 | 09/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1990 | 968 | 10/1891 | 15/05/1954 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1991 | 968 | 10/1891 | 03/1956 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1987 | 968 | 10/1891 | 10/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1110 | 991 | 11/1891 | 08/1937 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1109 | 991 | 11/1891 | 26/06/1948 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1108 | 991 | 11/1891 | 11/1936 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1107 | 991 | 11/1891 | 01/1946 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1992 | 991 | 11/1891 | 08/1947 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1115 | 991 | 12/1891 | 02/1951 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1111 | 991 | 12/1891 | 02/08/1952 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1114 | 991 | 12/1891 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1113 | 991 | 12/1891 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1112 | 991 | 12/1891 | 12/1930 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3410 | 1892 | 24/03/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3411 | 1892 | 27/05/1961 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3419 | 1892 | 06/09/1958 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3427 | 1892 | 27/06/1961 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3428 | 1892 | 08/12/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3429 | 1892 | 23/04/1960 | ||
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 16 | 1080 | 1892 | 08/1927 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 17 | 1080 | 1892 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 36 | 998 | 1892 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 8 | 998 | 1892 | 10/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 122 | 998 | 1892 | 10/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 20 | 998 | 1892 | 10/1926 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 145 | 998 | 1892 | 06/1927 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 24 | 998 | 1892 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 33 | 998 | 1892 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 94 | 1080 | 1892 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 35 | 998 | 1892 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 4 | 1080 | 1892 | 04/1927 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 39 | 998 | 1892 | 04/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 38 | 998 | 1892 | 11/1927 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 99 | 1080 | 1892 | 10/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 97 | 1080 | 1892 | 04/1926 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 133 | 1080 | 1892 | 10/1927 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 100 | 1080 | 1892 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 98 | 1080 | 1892 | 09/1927 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 129 | 1080 | 1892 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1322 | 02/1892 | 03/12/1955 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1323 | 02/1892 | 12/06/1948 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1324 | 02/1892 | 22/05/1937 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 202 | 02/1892 | 30/11/1947 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1430 | 03/1892 | 28/11/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1697 | 03/1892 | 01/11/1952 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1429 | 03/1892 | 21/05/1949 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1428 | 03/1892 | 01/12/1934 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1326 | 03/1892 | 26/12/1931 | ||
MR | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1325 | 03/1892 | 11/09/1954 | ||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1892 | 05/1949 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 05/1892 | 18/10/1952 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 09/1892 | 07/11/1953 | |||
MR | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 10/1892 | 11/1955 | |||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3431 | 1893 | 20/02/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3433 | 1893 | 05/12/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3435 | 1893 | 21/04/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3436 | 1893 | 30/06/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3439 | 1893 | 19/06/1948 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3440 | 1893 | 05/12/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3441 | 1893 | 29/11/1958 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3443 | 1893 | 14/12/1957 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3444 | 1893 | 22/11/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3446 | 1893 | 17/04/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3448 | 1893 | 16/01/1954 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3449 | 1893 | 08/09/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3453 | 1893 | 02/03/1963 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3454 | 1893 | 12/02/1955 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3456 | 1893 | 23/04/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3457 | 1893 | 04/06/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3458 | 1893 | 04/1949 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3459 | 1893 | 08/04/1961 | ||
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1119 | 1162 | 1893 | 11/1928 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1118 | 1162 | 1893 | 07/1936 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 174 | 1094 | 1893 | 09/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 177 | 1094 | 1893 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 176 | 1094 | 1893 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 175 | 1094 | 1893 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 172 | 1094 | 1893 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 173 | 1094 | 1893 | 04/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 171 | 1094 | 1893 | 06/1925 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 170 | 1094 | 1893 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 149 | 1094 | 1893 | 10/1921 | |
MR | 1853 | 4-2-2 | 178 | 1094 | 1893 | 04/1925 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 179 | 1124 | 1893 | 01/1926 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 180 | 1124 | 1893 | 11/1925 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 181 | 1124 | 1893 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 182 | 1124 | 1893 | 04/1926 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 183 | 1124 | 1893 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 2F | 0-6-0 | 01/01/1893 | 15/05/1948 | |||
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1116 | 1162 | 06/1893 | 07/1926 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1117 | 1162 | 06/1893 | 05/1925 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1120 | 1162 | 07/1893 | 15/06/1957 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3462 | 1894 | 07/04/1956 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3463 | 1894 | 09/02/1957 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3464 | 1894 | 31/03/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3468 | 1894 | 27/05/1961 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3469 | 1894 | 09/03/1957 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 186 | 1235 | 1894 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 190 | 1235 | 1894 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 192 | 1235 | 1894 | 02/1926 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 162 | 1276 | 1894 | 02/1930 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 198 | 1276 | 1894 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 02/1894 | 11/07/1953 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 02/1894 | 28/01/1961 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 03/1894 | 17/06/1950 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 03/1894 | 03/05/1958 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 04/1894 | 12/11/1955 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 04/1894 | 16/03/1957 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1235 | 05/1894 | 28/01/1961 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 06/1894 | 22/09/1962 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 06/1894 | 10/1949 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 06/1894 | 07/1954 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 06/1894 | 10/09/1960 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 08/1894 | 02/02/1957 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 08/1894 | 31/12/1949 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 09/1894 | 28/04/1951 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1276 | 09/1894 | 14/02/1959 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 234 | 1410 | 1895 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 232 | 1410 | 1895 | 11/1931 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 236 | 1410 | 1895 | 12/1926 | |
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 02/1895 | 05/1949 | |||
MR | 1P | 0-4-4T | 02/1895 | 08/1950 | |||
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1121 | 1395 | 03/1895 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1122 | 1395 | 03/1895 | 24/10/1953 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1123 | 1395 | 04/1895 | 12/03/1960 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1124 | 1395 | 05/1895 | 10/1932 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1125 | 1395 | 05/1895 | 12/1938 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1126 | 1395 | 06/1895 | 01/1947 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1127 | 1395 | 06/1895 | 01/1939 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1129 | 1395 | 07/1895 | 16/10/1954 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1130 | 1395 | 07/1895 | 07/04/1951 | |
MR | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1128 | 1395 | 08/1895 | 14/04/1951 | |
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 08/1895 | 07/1956 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 09/1895 | 01/03/1958 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 10/1895 | 03/1949 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 11/1895 | 05/1950 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 11/1895 | 12/05/1951 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 12/1895 | 05/01/1952 | ||
MR | 2203 | 4-4-0 | 1410 | 12/1895 | 10/09/1955 | ||
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 88 | 1454 | 1896 | 04/1927 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 75 | 1454 | 1896 | 11/1926 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 76 | 1454 | 1896 | 04/1925 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | T7 | 1454 | 1896 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 179 | 4-2-2 | 79 | 1454 | 1896 | 04/1925 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3194 | 01/1896 | 07/12/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3201 | 02/1896 | 12/04/1957 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3204 | 02/1896 | 09/1956 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3211 | 03/1896 | 07/1961 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1458 | 08/1896 | 14/04/1951 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1458 | 08/1896 | 12/1952 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1458 | 08/1896 | 26/12/1953 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1458 | 09/1896 | 11/1957 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1458 | 09/1896 | 06/05/1950 | ||
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 115 | 1?74 | 11/1896 | 01/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 116 | 1?74 | 12/1896 | 12/1926 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1133 | 1534 | 1897 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1131 | 1534 | 1897 | 08/1926 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 2360 | 1534 | 1897 | 11/1930 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 2359 | 1534 | 1897 | 07/1925 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1135 | 1552 | 1897 | 07/1928 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1137 | 1552 | 1897 | 07/09/1964 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1136 | 1552 | 1897 | 07/1928 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1138 | 1552 | 1897 | 07/1928 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 117 | 1?74 | 01/1897 | 09/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 118 | 1?74 | 02/1897 | 04/1928 | |
MR | 1116 | 0-4-0ST | 1534 | 03/1897 | 01/10/1955 | ||
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 119 | 1?74 | 03/1897 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1552 | 07/1897 | 15/02/1958 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 09/1897 | 07/1959 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 09/1897 | 18/12/1948 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 10/1897 | 07/1957 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 10/1897 | 02/1949 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 10/1897 | 13/10/1951 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 11/1897 | 16/08/1952 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 11/1897 | 26/08/1950 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 12/1897 | 11/02/1961 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 12/1897 | 16/07/1949 | ||
MR | 156 | 4-4-0 | 1597 | 12/1897 | 27/08/1960 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 690 | 02/1898 | 05/10/1946 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 691 | 02/1898 | 21/05/1949 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 692 | 02/1898 | 02/11/1946 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 695 | 03/1898 | 07/09/1947 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 694 | 03/1898 | 13/07/1935 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 781 | 04/1898 | 30/11/1947 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 695 | 04/1898 | 09/09/1950 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 780 | 04/1898 | 18/05/1946 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 783 | 05/1898 | 01/01/1938 | ||
MR | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 782 | 05/1898 | 02/11/1946 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 06/1898 | 25/10/1952 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 07/1898 | 07/1954 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 08/1898 | 04/05/1957 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 08/1898 | 07/1956 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 09/1898 | 01/1956 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 10/1898 | 08/1956 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 10/1898 | 04/01/1952 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 10/1898 | 13/12/1952 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 10/1898 | 08/05/1954 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1635 | 11/1898 | 01/1951 | ||
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 127 | 1659 | 1899 | 01/1922 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 125 | 1659 | 1899 | 03/1928 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 126 | 1659 | 1899 | 09/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 128 | 1659 | 1899 | 12/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 130 | 1659 | 1899 | 04/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 131 | 1659 | 1899 | 10/1921 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 124 | 1659 | 1899 | 08/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 123 | 1659 | 1899 | 08/1926 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 121 | 1659 | 1899 | 08/1925 | |
MR | 115 | 4-2-2 | 120 | 1659 | 1899 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 06/1899 | 28/01/1950 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 07/1899 | 07/1959 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 07/1899 | 09/1955 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 08/1899 | 31/08/1962 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 08/1899 | 09/05/1959 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 09/1899 | 16/05/1959 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 10/1899 | 22/08/1959 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 10/1899 | 07/08/1954 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 10/1899 | 15/02/1962 | ||
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 10/1899 | 08/03/1958 | ||
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2601 | 1926 | 12/1899 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3630 | 1900 | 19/05/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3631 | 1900 | 16/08/1958 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3633 | 1900 | 28/04/1956 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3634 | 1900 | 02/11/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3636 | 1900 | 12/11/1955 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3637 | 1900 | 15/02/1964 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3638 | 1900 | 26/12/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3639 | 1900 | 20/08/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3644 | 1900 | 15/10/1960 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3645 | 1900 | 17/11/1962 | ||
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2607 | 1926 | 1900 | 07/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2602 | 1926 | 1900 | 07/1919 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2603 | 1926 | 1900 | 03/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2604 | 1926 | 1900 | 03/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2605 | 1926 | 1900 | 03/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2606 | 1926 | 1900 | 07/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 19 | 1926 | 1900 | 07/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 20 | 1926 | 1900 | 07/1922 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 2608 | 1926 | 1900 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 21 | 1926 | 1900 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 22 | 1926 | 1900 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 2601 | 4-2-2 | 23 | 1926 | 1900 | 11/1921 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 2610 | 1869 | 1900 | 08/1927 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 800 | 1869 | 1900 | 08/1927 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 2609 | 1869 | 1900 | 05/1928 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 2608 | 1869 | 1900 | 11/1931 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 2607 | 1869 | 1900 | 08/1931 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 803 | 1869 | 1900 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 802 | 1869 | 1900 | 11/1947 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 801 | 1869 | 1900 | 05/1932 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 2606 | 1869 | 09/1900 | 11/1927 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 809 | 2041 | 1901 | 01/1953 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 805 | 2041 | 1901 | 28/01/1961 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 806 | 2041 | 1901 | 10/1949 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 807 | 2041 | 1901 | 18/12/1948 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 808 | 2041 | 1901 | 23/06/1951 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 2636 | 2041 | 1901 | 28/01/1961 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 2637 | 2041 | 1901 | 05/1951 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 2638 | 2041 | 1901 | 13/06/1959 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 2639 | 2041 | 1901 | 17/10/1953 | |
MR | 60 | 4-4-0 | 2640 | 2041 | 1901 | 23/06/1960 | |
MR | 2606 | 4-4-0 | 804 | 1869 | 01/1901 | 08/1928 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2785 | 2135 | 1902 | 10/1928 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2781 | 2135 | 1902 | 04/1941 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 814 | 2250 | 1902 | 04/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2788 | 2135 | 1902 | 06/1935 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2789 | 2135 | 1902 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2790 | 2135 | 1902 | 10/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 810 | 2250 | 1902 | 16/07/1949 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 811 | 2250 | 1902 | 04/1945 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 812 | 2250 | 1902 | 06/1939 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 813 | 2250 | 1902 | 06/1939 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 815 | 2250 | 1902 | 09/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 816 | 2250 | 1902 | 06/09/1952 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 817 | 2250 | 1902 | 05/1950 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 818 | 2250 | 1902 | 05/07/1952 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 819 | 2250 | 1902 | 06/1951 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2787 | 2135 | 1902 | 12/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2786 | 2135 | 1902 | 17/01/1948 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2784 | 2135 | 1902 | 10/1935 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2783 | 2135 | 1902 | 12/1938 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 2631 | 2109 | 01/1902 | 29/09/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 2632 | 2109 | 01/1902 | 20/10/1951 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2135 | 01/1902 | 03/1949 | ||
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1141 | 2514 | 1903 | 12/1928 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1142 | 2514 | 1903 | 07/03/1961 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1140 | 2514 | 1903 | 12/1932 | |
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 1143 | 2514 | 1903 | 21/09/1963 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 830 | 2601 | 1903 | 05/11/1949 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 828 | 2458 | 1903 | 12/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 827 | 2458 | 1903 | 09/1925 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 826 | 2458 | 1903 | 01/1948 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 825 | 2458 | 1903 | 02/1949 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 824 | 2458 | 1903 | 10/1949 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 823 | 2458 | 1903 | 09/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 822 | 2458 | 1903 | 05/1929 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 821 | 2458 | 1903 | 25/12/1948 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 820 | 2458 | 1903 | 07/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 829 | 2458 | 1903 | 11/1949 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 832 | 2601 | 1903 | 03/1925 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 831 | 2601 | 1903 | 15/09/1951 | |
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3765 | 01/1903 | 19/05/1951 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3766 | 01/1903 | 04/08/1962 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3767 | 02/1903 | 03/10/1953 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3769 | 03/1903 | 12/06/1948 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3770 | 03/1903 | 11/02/1956 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3771 | 04/1903 | 02/1959 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3772 | 04/1903 | 25/03/1950 | ||
MR | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3773 | 05/1903 | 07/05/1960 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3775 | 07/1903 | 26/11/1955 | ||
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 2633 | 2109 | 07/1903 | 05/06/1948 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3776 | 08/1903 | 23/11/1957 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3777 | 08/1903 | 08/09/1951 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3778 | 09/1903 | 04/03/1961 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3779 | 09/1903 | 06/03/1954 | ||
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 2634 | 2109 | 09/1903 | 31/03/1951 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3781 | 10/1903 | 26/11/1955 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3782 | 11/1903 | 30/01/1954 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3783 | 11/1903 | 02/1949 | ||
MR | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 2514 | 11/1903 | 26/03/1955 | ||
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 2635 | 2109 | 11/1903 | 23/02/1952 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3784 | 12/1903 | 17/09/1960 | ||
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 840 | 2726 | 1904 | 06/1939 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 833 | 2601 | 1904 | 05/07/1952 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 834 | 2601 | 1904 | 07/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 836 | 2601 | 1904 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 837 | 2601 | 1904 | 16/06/1951 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 841 | 2726 | 1904 | 04/1927 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 842 | 2726 | 1904 | 04/1929 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 843 | 2726 | 1904 | 06/1935 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 844 | 2726 | 1904 | 02/1930 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 845 | 2726 | 1904 | 07/1946 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 846 | 2726 | 1904 | 05/1949 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 847 | 2726 | 1904 | 08/05/1948 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 848 | 2726 | 1904 | 17/03/1951 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 839 | 2601 | 1904 | 05/1925 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 838 | 2601 | 1904 | 19/06/1948 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 2601 | 01/1904 | 18/03/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3785 | 02/1904 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3786 | 02/1904 | 26/10/1957 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3787 | 03/1904 | 10/01/1959 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3789 | 03/1904 | 09/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3790 | 04/1904 | 02/06/1956 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3791 | 04/1904 | 19/11/1955 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3792 | 05/1904 | 25/04/1953 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3793 | 05/1904 | 10/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3795 | 06/1904 | 06/04/1957 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3796 | 06/1904 | 11/09/1948 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3797 | 06/1904 | 13/06/1953 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3798 | 07/1904 | 28/06/1958 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3799 | 07/1904 | 26/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3800 | 08/1904 | 04/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3801 | 08/1904 | 29/09/1951 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3802 | 08/1904 | 25/11/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3803 | 09/1904 | 10/09/1955 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3804 | 09/1904 | 20/12/1952 | ||
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 857 | 2798 | 1905 | 05/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 849 | 2726 | 1905 | 02/1946 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 850 | 2798 | 1905 | 04/1946 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 851 | 2798 | 1905 | 04/1929 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 852 | 2798 | 1905 | 02/1951 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 853 | 2798 | 1905 | 12/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 854 | 2798 | 1905 | 12/1934 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 855 | 2798 | 1905 | 09/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 859 | 2798 | 1905 | 09/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 858 | 2798 | 1905 | 05/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 856 | 2798 | 1905 | 05/1928 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 869 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 10/1925 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 868 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 05/1925 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 861 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 07/1935 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 862 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 06/1926 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 863 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 04/1940 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 864 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 04/1940 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 865 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 01/1947 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 866 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 05/1936 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 867 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 06/1939 | |
MR | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 860 | 2918 | 09/1905 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1000 | 2889 | 10/1905 | 23/06/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1003 | 2889 | 11/1905 | 16/07/1949 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1001 | 2889 | 11/1905 | 12/05/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1002 | 2889 | 11/1905 | 10/05/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1004 | 2889 | 12/1905 | 11/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1005 | 2889 | 12/1905 | 16/07/1949 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1006 | 2889 | 12/1905 | 28/02/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1007 | 2889 | 12/1905 | 13/01/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1008 | 2889 | 12/1905 | 06/1949 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1009 | 2889 | 12/1905 | 10/05/1952 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3805 | 01/1906 | 03/06/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3806 | 01/1906 | 09/11/1957 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3807 | 01/1906 | 06/09/1952 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3808 | 02/1906 | 08/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3809 | 02/1906 | 22/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3810 | 02/1906 | 23/04/1955 | ||
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1010 | 2998 | 03/1906 | 10/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1011 | 2998 | 03/1906 | 27/10/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1012 | 2998 | 03/1906 | 05/08/1950 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1013 | 2998 | 04/1906 | 10/07/1948 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1014 | 2998 | 04/1906 | 10/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1015 | 2998 | 04/1906 | 05/05/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1016 | 2998 | 04/1906 | 20/09/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1017 | 2998 | 05/1906 | 22/04/1950 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1018 | 2998 | 05/1906 | 11/08/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1019 | 2998 | 05/1906 | 02/10/1948 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1020 | 2998 | 05/1906 | 17/01/1953 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1021 | 2998 | 06/1906 | 21/08/1948 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1022 | 2998 | 06/1906 | 25/09/1948 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1023 | 2998 | 06/1906 | 20/09/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1024 | 2998 | 07/1906 | 05/06/1948 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1025 | 2998 | 09/1906 | 25/08/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1026 | 2998 | 09/1906 | 11/1949 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1027 | 2998 | 10/1906 | 15/03/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1028 | 2998 | 10/1906 | 14/08/1948 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3811 | 12/1906 | 03/02/1951 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3812 | 12/1906 | 17/06/1961 | ||
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1029 | 2998 | 12/1906 | 29/04/1950 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2005 | 3187 | 1907 | 05/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2004 | 3187 | 1907 | 05/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2001 | 3187 | 1907 | 09/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2003 | 3187 | 1907 | 08/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2009 | 3187 | 1907 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2006 | 3187 | 1907 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2007 | 3187 | 1907 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2008 | 3187 | 1907 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2032 | 3258 | 1907 | 05/1938 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2033 | 3258 | 1907 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2034 | 3258 | 1907 | 06/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2035 | 3258 | 1907 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2036 | 3258 | 1907 | 08/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2037 | 3258 | 1907 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2038 | 3258 | 1907 | 08/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2039 | 3258 | 1907 | 11/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2002 | 3187 | 1907 | 11/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2031 | 3258 | 1907 | 05/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2024 | 3258 | 1907 | 06/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2023 | 3258 | 1907 | 03/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2022 | 3258 | 1907 | 08/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2021 | 3258 | 1907 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2020 | 3258 | 1907 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2026 | 3258 | 1907 | 02/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2027 | 3258 | 1907 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2028 | 3258 | 1907 | 09/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2029 | 3258 | 1907 | 01/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2030 | 3258 | 1907 | 08/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2010 | 3187 | 1907 | 11/1935 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2025 | 3258 | 1907 | 09/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2019 | 3187 | 1907 | 09/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2018 | 3187 | 1907 | 12/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2017 | 3187 | 1907 | 12/1937 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2016 | 3187 | 1907 | 07/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2015 | 3187 | 1907 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2014 | 3187 | 1907 | 03/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2013 | 3187 | 1907 | 10/1936 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2012 | 3187 | 1907 | 11/1938 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2011 | 3187 | 1907 | 08/1935 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3813 | 01/1907 | 14/01/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3814 | 01/1907 | 15/10/1960 | ||
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 999 | 3139 | 03/1907 | 02/1929 | |
MR | 2000 | 0-6-4T | 2000 | 3187 | 04/1907 | 11/1937 | |
MR | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 1528 | 3031 | 08/1907 | 25/12/1966 | |
MR | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 3031 | 09/1907 | 21/04/1961 | ||
MR | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 3031 | 10/1907 | 04/05/1957 | ||
MR | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 3031 | 11/1907 | 06/1963 | ||
MR | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 1532 | 3031 | 12/1907 | 18/03/1961 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3815 | 01/1908 | 06/09/1958 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3817 | 02/1908 | 10/09/1955 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3818 | 02/1908 | 13/05/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3819 | 02/1908 | 20/02/1954 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3820 | 02/1908 | 28/06/1952 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3821 | 02/1908 | 10/04/1954 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3822 | 02/1908 | 11/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3823 | 02/1908 | 15/03/1958 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3824 | 03/1908 | 18/05/1951 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3825 | 03/1908 | 07/04/1962 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3826 | 03/1908 | 14/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3827 | 04/1908 | 16/12/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3828 | 04/1908 | 16/01/1960 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3829 | 04/1908 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3830 | 04/1908 | 14/01/1950 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3831 | 05/1908 | 08/05/1948 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3832 | 05/1908 | 14/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3833 | 05/1908 | 05/09/1953 | ||
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1035 | 3410 | 11/1908 | 10/05/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1036 | 3410 | 11/1908 | 25/09/1948 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1039 | 3410 | 12/1908 | 03/06/1950 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1038 | 3410 | 12/1908 | 02/08/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1037 | 3410 | 12/1908 | 24/03/1951 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 997 | 3371 | 1909 | 11/1927 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 996 | 3371 | 1909 | 02/1928 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 995 | 3371 | 1909 | 02/1928 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 994 | 3371 | 1909 | 07/1926 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 993 | 3371 | 1909 | 02/1928 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 992 | 3371 | 1909 | 10/1928 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 991 | 3371 | 1909 | 11/1927 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1040 | 3410 | 01/1909 | 17/05/1952 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1041 | 3410 | 01/1909 | 11/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1042 | 3410 | 02/1909 | 05/1949 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1043 | 3410 | 03/1909 | 22/12/1951 | |
MR | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1044 | 3410 | 03/1909 | 09/1952 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 998 | 3371 | 04/1909 | 01/1929 | |
MR | 999 | 4-4-0 | 990 | 3371 | 10/1909 | 03/1925 | |
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3835 | 10/1911 | 01/10/1955 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3836 | 11/1911 | 11/07/1959 | ||
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 80 | 02/1914 | 19/06/1959 | ||
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 81 | 03/1914 | 19/06/1961 | ||
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 82 | 03/1914 | 08/03/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 323 | 04/1914 | 09/1956 | ||
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 83 | 04/1914 | 08/02/1962 | ||
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 84 | 04/1914 | 08/02/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 322 | 05/1914 | 02/1953 | ||
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 85 | 08/1914 | 21/03/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3838 | 1917 | 14/07/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3839 | 1917 | 05/03/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3840 | 1917 | 27/08/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3841 | 1917 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3842 | 1917 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3843 | 1917 | 21/05/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3844 | 1917 | 24/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3845 | 1917 | 20/07/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3846 | 1917 | 24/06/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3847 | 1917 | 25/05/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3848 | 1917 | 11/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3849 | 1917 | 12/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3850 | 1917 | 02/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3851 | 1917 | 17/08/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3837 | 05/1917 | 11/10/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3852 | 1918 | 04/05/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3853 | 1918 | 14/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3854 | 1918 | 06/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3855 | 1918 | 09/02/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3856 | 1918 | 26/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3857 | 1918 | 30/03/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3858 | 1918 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3859 | 1918 | 03/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3860 | 1918 | 26/09/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3861 | 1918 | 18/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3862 | 1918 | 08/05/1954 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3863 | 1918 | 02/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3864 | 1918 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3865 | 1918 | 15/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3866 | 1918 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3867 | 1918 | 08/10/1955 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3868 | 1918 | 26/11/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3869 | 1918 | 21/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3870 | 1918 | 02/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3871 | 1918 | 20/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3872 | 1918 | 26/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3873 | 1918 | 13/06/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3874 | 1918 | 17/03/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3875 | 1918 | 05/05/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3876 | 1918 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3877 | 1918 | 03/10/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3878 | 1918 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3879 | 12/1918 | 12/04/1958 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3880 | 1919 | 02/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3881 | 1919 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3882 | 1919 | 29/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3883 | 1919 | 27/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3884 | 1919 | 21/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3885 | 1919 | 15/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3886 | 1919 | 10/10/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3887 | 1919 | 06/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3888 | 1919 | 26/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3889 | 1919 | 23/03/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3890 | 1919 | 21/02/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3891 | 1919 | 05/01/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3892 | 1919 | 08/02/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3893 | 1919 | 22/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3894 | 1919 | 03/09/1955 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3895 | 1919 | 23/06/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3896 | 1919 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3897 | 1919 | 09/01/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3898 | 1919 | 13/07/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3899 | 1919 | 01/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3900 | 1919 | 01/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3901 | 1919 | 07/09/1957 | ||
LMS | Big Bertha | 0-10-0 | 2290 | 12/1919 | 19/05/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3902 | 1920 | 02/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3903 | 1920 | 09/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3904 | 1920 | 27/06/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3905 | 1920 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3906 | 1920 | 11/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3907 | 1920 | 19/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3908 | 1920 | 14/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3909 | 1920 | 06/08/1955 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3910 | 1920 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3911 | 1920 | 27/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3912 | 1920 | 16/02/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3913 | 1920 | 03/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3914 | 1920 | 08/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3915 | 1920 | 16/02/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3916 | 1920 | 23/11/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3917 | 1920 | 25/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3918 | 1920 | 27/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3919 | 1920 | 05/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3920 | 1920 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3921 | 1920 | 03/06/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3922 | 1920 | 15/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3923 | 1920 | 08/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3925 | 1920 | 13/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3926 | 1920 | 06/07/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3927 | 1920 | 26/10/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3928 | 1920 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3929 | 1920 | 14/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3930 | 1920 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3931 | 1920 | 17/08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3932 | 1920 | 01/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3933 | 1920 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3924 | 10/1920 | 16/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3934 | 12/1920 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3987 | 1921 | 13/07/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3988 | 1921 | 10/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3989 | 1921 | 23/04/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3990 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3991 | 1921 | 15/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3992 | 1921 | 09/02/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3993 | 1921 | 13/07/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3994 | 1921 | 27/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3995 | 1921 | 15/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3996 | 1921 | 12/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3997 | 1921 | 05/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3998 | 1921 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3999 | 1921 | 22/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4000 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4001 | 1921 | 26/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4002 | 1921 | 09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4003 | 1921 | 03/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4004 | 1921 | 22/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4005 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4006 | 1921 | 29/10/1955 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4007 | 1921 | 11/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4008 | 1921 | 09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4009 | 1921 | 27/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4010 | 1921 | 10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4011 | 1921 | 01/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4012 | 1921 | 09/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3935 | 01/1921 | 02/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3936 | 01/1921 | 04/02/1956 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 324 | 04/1921 | 17/01/1953 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 325 | 04/1921 | 13/10/1951 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 326 | 04/1921 | 12/05/1956 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4013 | 12/1921 | 05/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4015 | 1922 | 09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4016 | 1922 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4017 | 1922 | 10/08/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4018 | 1922 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4019 | 1922 | 17/06/1960 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4020 | 1922 | 01/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4021 | 1922 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4022 | 1922 | 30/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4023 | 1922 | 05/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4024 | 1922 | 19/01/1957 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4025 | 1922 | 07/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4026 | 1922 | 06/07/1963 | ||
LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4014 | 01/1922 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2110 | 5871 | 05/1923 | 16/02/1959 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2112 | 5871 | 06/1923 | 23/08/1952 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2111 | 5871 | 06/1923 | 01/09/1951 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2115 | 5871 | 07/1923 | 18/08/1951 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2114 | 5871 | 07/1923 | 01/09/1951 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2113 | 5871 | 07/1923 | 10/03/1951 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2116 | 5871 | 07/1923 | 09/1951 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2119 | 5871 | 08/1923 | 21/03/1952 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2118 | 5871 | 08/1923 | 11/09/1958 | |
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2117 | 5871 | 08/1923 | 28/09/1951 | |
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1047 | 02/1924 | 10/02/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1046 | 02/1924 | 24/01/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1045 | 02/1924 | 08/06/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1048 | 03/1924 | 19/10/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1049 | 03/1924 | 03/1959 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1050 | 03/1924 | 02/06/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1051 | 03/1924 | 06/11/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1052 | 04/1924 | 04/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1053 | 04/1924 | 26/05/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1055 | 04/1924 | 02/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1054 | 04/1924 | 18/09/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1056 | 05/1924 | 24/10/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1057 | 05/1924 | 02/05/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1058 | 05/1924 | 10/02/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1062 | 06/1924 | 02/05/1959 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1060 | 06/1924 | 01/03/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1061 | 06/1924 | 28/05/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1059 | 06/1924 | 12/11/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1063 | 07/1924 | 04/10/1960 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1064 | 07/1924 | 19/01/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1065 | 07/1924 | 10/03/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1068 | 08/1924 | 12/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1067 | 08/1924 | 05/02/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1066 | 08/1924 | 10/05/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1072 | 09/1924 | 29/10/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1069 | 09/1924 | 19/11/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1070 | 09/1924 | 19/11/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1071 | 09/1924 | 10/03/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1073 | 10/1924 | 17/08/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1074 | 10/1924 | 07/08/1954 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4028 | 6213 | 11/1924 | 11/10/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4027 | 6213 | 11/1924 | 14/11/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4034 | 6213 | 12/1924 | 07/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4032 | 6213 | 12/1924 | 28/11/1959 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4031 | 6213 | 12/1924 | 05/1960 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4030 | 6213 | 12/1924 | 04/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4029 | 6213 | 12/1924 | 02/07/1960 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4033 | 6213 | 12/1924 | 07/10/1961 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4035 | 6213 | 01/1925 | 13/02/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4036 | 6213 | 01/1925 | 21/06/1962 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4037 | 6213 | 01/1925 | 09/1961 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4038 | 6213 | 01/1925 | 11/04/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4040 | 6213 | 01/1925 | 28/11/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4039 | 6213 | 01/1925 | 06/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4044 | 6213 | 02/1925 | 12/07/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4043 | 6213 | 02/1925 | 07/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4042 | 6213 | 02/1925 | 17/10/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4041 | 6213 | 02/1925 | 13/06/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4049 | 6213 | 03/1925 | 12/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4045 | 6213 | 03/1925 | 06/11/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4046 | 6213 | 03/1925 | 09/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4047 | 6213 | 03/1925 | 26/10/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4048 | 6213 | 03/1925 | 08/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4050 | 6213 | 03/1925 | 28/11/1959 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4051 | 6213 | 04/1925 | 12/12/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4052 | 6213 | 04/1925 | 18/06/1960 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4053 | 6213 | 04/1925 | 23/03/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4056 | 6213 | 05/1925 | 11/10/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4054 | 6213 | 05/1925 | 19/12/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4055 | 6213 | 05/1925 | 11/1963 | |
SDJR | 7F | 2-8-0 | 90 | 08/1925 | 18/11/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4207 | 6438 | 11/1925 | 11/11/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4208 | 6438 | 11/1925 | 10/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4209 | 6438 | 11/1925 | 14/06/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4210 | 6438 | 11/1925 | 09/10/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4214 | 6438 | 12/1925 | 12/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4211 | 6438 | 12/1925 | 27/03/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4212 | 6438 | 12/1925 | 12/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4213 | 6438 | 12/1925 | 06/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4215 | 6438 | 12/1925 | 20/02/1965 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4216 | 6438 | 12/1925 | 09/1962 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4222 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 14/11/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4224 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 03/02/1962 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4217 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 12/12/1959 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4218 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 26/03/1966 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4219 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 30/11/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4220 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 26/09/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4221 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 02/05/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4223 | 6438 | 01/1926 | 09/11/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4225 | 6438 | 02/1926 | 28/11/1959 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4226 | 6438 | 02/1926 | 09/1964 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4227 | 02/1926 | 12/12/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4228 | 02/1926 | 29/12/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4229 | 02/1926 | 21/11/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4230 | 02/1926 | 12/12/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4231 | 02/1926 | 15/06/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4232 | 03/1926 | 09/11/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4233 | 03/1926 | 28/11/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4234 | 03/1926 | 01/10/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4235 | 03/1926 | 12/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4236 | 03/1926 | 17/10/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4237 | 03/1926 | 19/10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4238 | 03/1926 | 16/12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4241 | 04/1926 | 20/07/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4245 | 04/1926 | 17/05/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4244 | 04/1926 | 10/10/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4243 | 04/1926 | 18/09/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4242 | 04/1926 | 02/05/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4240 | 04/1926 | 26/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4239 | 04/1926 | 10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4246 | 05/1926 | 12/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4247 | 05/1926 | 04/12/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4248 | 05/1926 | 26/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4250 | 06/1926 | 08/05/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4251 | 06/1926 | 01/10/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4249 | 06/1926 | 08/11/1961 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4252 | 07/1926 | 04/05/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4253 | 07/1926 | 01/10/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4254 | 07/1926 | 01/10/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4255 | 07/1926 | 29/12/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4256 | 07/1926 | 30/04/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4257 | 07/1926 | 01/10/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4259 | 08/1926 | 08/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4260 | 08/1926 | 10/10/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4258 | 08/1926 | 21/05/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4261 | 09/1926 | 05/10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4262 | 09/1926 | 09/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4268 | 10/1926 | 02/03/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4263 | 10/1926 | 27/03/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4264 | 10/1926 | 26/10/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4265 | 10/1926 | 12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4266 | 10/1926 | 27/03/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4267 | 10/1926 | 24/05/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4269 | 10/1926 | 03/12/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4270 | 11/1926 | 09/11/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4271 | 11/1926 | 12/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4272 | 11/1926 | 28/06/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4273 | 11/1926 | 16/09/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4274 | 11/1926 | 09/12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4275 | 11/1926 | 24/10/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4285 | 12/1926 | 12/12/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4287 | 12/1926 | 12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4286 | 12/1926 | 02/05/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4284 | 12/1926 | 01/08/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4283 | 12/1926 | 29/12/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4282 | 12/1926 | 13/07/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4280 | 12/1926 | 14/12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4279 | 12/1926 | 11/01/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4278 | 12/1926 | 22/01/1966 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4277 | 12/1926 | 22/05/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4276 | 12/1926 | 22/05/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4281 | 12/1926 | 29/12/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4292 | 01/1927 | 10/08/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4293 | 01/1927 | 12/12/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4291 | 01/1927 | 28/11/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4290 | 01/1927 | 11/06/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4289 | 01/1927 | 20/06/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4288 | 01/1927 | 04/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4294 | 02/1927 | 06/11/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4295 | 02/1927 | 01/02/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4296 | 02/1927 | 15/01/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4297 | 02/1927 | 09/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4298 | 02/1927 | 12/12/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4299 | 02/1927 | 05/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4300 | 02/1927 | 04/12/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4301 | 03/1927 | 04/1964 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1195 | 03/1927 | 30/11/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1198 | 03/1927 | 12/11/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1197 | 03/1927 | 04/05/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 903 | 04/1927 | 19/08/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 907 | 04/1927 | 10/1960 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 902 | 04/1927 | 07/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 904 | 04/1927 | 07/03/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 905 | 04/1927 | 20/11/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 906 | 04/1927 | 07/01/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 901 | 04/1927 | 05/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 900 | 04/1927 | 14/04/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1199 | 04/1927 | 04/01/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 926 | 05/1927 | 03/08/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 929 | 05/1927 | 07/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 925 | 05/1927 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 927 | 05/1927 | 13/07/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 932 | 05/1927 | 08/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 909 | 05/1927 | 07/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 908 | 05/1927 | 06/07/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 930 | 05/1927 | 13/04/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 931 | 05/1927 | 11/10/1958 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2125 | 05/1927 | 25/02/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2126 | 05/1927 | 29/12/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 933 | 06/1927 | 30/04/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 910 | 06/1927 | 06/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 911 | 06/1927 | 11/12/1952 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 912 | 06/1927 | 12/04/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 913 | 06/1927 | 11/08/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 914 | 06/1927 | 03/09/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 915 | 06/1927 | 12/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 916 | 06/1927 | 22/07/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 917 | 06/1927 | 08/12/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 918 | 06/1927 | 08/12/1952 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 928 | 06/1927 | 22/03/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 934 | 06/1927 | 23/03/1957 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2131 | 06/1927 | 07/04/1960 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2130 | 06/1927 | 17/02/1959 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2129 | 06/1927 | 03/12/1960 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2128 | 06/1927 | 17/02/1959 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2127 | 06/1927 | 16/02/1959 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 924 | 07/1927 | 23/03/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 919 | 07/1927 | 29/01/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 920 | 07/1927 | 13/05/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 921 | 07/1927 | 08/11/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 922 | 07/1927 | 11/12/1952 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 923 | 07/1927 | 15/10/1954 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2134 | 07/1927 | 29/12/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2133 | 07/1927 | 19/12/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2132 | 07/1927 | 17/02/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4408 | 08/1927 | 11/10/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4407 | 08/1927 | 01/09/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4409 | 08/1927 | 09/12/1961 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4410 | 08/1927 | 05/03/1960 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1196 | 08/1927 | 07/1958 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4417 | 09/1927 | 27/11/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4416 | 09/1927 | 07/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4415 | 09/1927 | 05/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4414 | 09/1927 | 08/05/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4413 | 09/1927 | 02/03/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4412 | 09/1927 | 05/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4411 | 09/1927 | 21/09/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4418 | 09/1927 | 10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4419 | 09/1927 | 09/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4425 | 10/1927 | 06/02/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4420 | 10/1927 | 09/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4421 | 10/1927 | 12/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4422 | 10/1927 | 03/06/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4423 | 10/1927 | 07/11/1959 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4424 | 10/1927 | 26/10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4427 | 10/1927 | 05/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4428 | 10/1927 | 15/02/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4429 | 10/1927 | 08/05/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4426 | 10/1927 | 12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4430 | 11/1927 | 05/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4431 | 11/1927 | 26/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4432 | 11/1927 | 10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4433 | 11/1927 | 05/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4434 | 11/1927 | 21/09/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4436 | 12/1927 | 11/04/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4435 | 12/1927 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2300 | 09/12/1927 | 26/11/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2301 | 20/12/1927 | 19/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2302 | 22/12/1927 | 20/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2303 | 30/12/1927 | 27/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2304 | 06/01/1928 | 08/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2305 | 13/01/1928 | 28/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2306 | 19/01/1928 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2307 | 26/01/1928 | 27/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2308 | 28/01/1928 | 29/08/1959 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2309 | 03/02/1928 | 26/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2310 | 10/02/1928 | 08/03/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2311 | 22/02/1928 | 13/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2312 | 23/02/1928 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 563 | 03/1928 | 17/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2313 | 01/03/1928 | 23/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2314 | 03/03/1928 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2315 | 10/03/1928 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2316 | 14/03/1928 | 16/02/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2317 | 22/03/1928 | 23/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2318 | 30/03/1928 | 08/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 567 | 04/1928 | 22/08/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 566 | 04/1928 | 13/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 565 | 04/1928 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 564 | 04/1928 | 15/02/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 568 | 04/1928 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2319 | 13/04/1928 | 19/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2320 | 27/04/1928 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 571 | 05/1928 | 29/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 601 | 05/1928 | 11/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 572 | 05/1928 | 11/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 570 | 05/1928 | 23/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 569 | 05/1928 | 08/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 573 | 05/1928 | 05/05/1959 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2321 | 04/05/1928 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2322 | 19/05/1928 | 31/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 574 | 06/1928 | 26/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 575 | 06/1928 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 576 | 06/1928 | 14/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 577 | 06/1928 | 29/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2323 | 04/06/1928 | 23/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2324 | 22/06/1928 | 14/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 582 | 07/1928 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 583 | 07/1928 | 17/09/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 581 | 07/1928 | 04/10/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 580 | 07/1928 | 11/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 578 | 07/1928 | 20/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 579 | 07/1928 | 29/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 584 | 08/1928 | 11/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 585 | 08/1928 | 11/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 586 | 08/1928 | 15/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 587 | 08/1928 | 29/08/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 588 | 08/1928 | 05/11/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 589 | 08/1928 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 594 | 09/1928 | 12/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 596 | 09/1928 | 13/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 595 | 09/1928 | 20/06/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 593 | 09/1928 | 23/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 592 | 09/1928 | 21/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 590 | 09/1928 | 05/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 597 | 10/1928 | 23/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 598 | 10/1928 | 12/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 605 | 11/1928 | 19/10/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 599 | 11/1928 | 05/05/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 600 | 11/1928 | 27/04/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 602 | 11/1928 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 604 | 11/1928 | 30/06/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 572 | 11/1928 | 29/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 609 | 11/1928 | 02/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 608 | 11/1928 | 29/09/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 607 | 11/1928 | 31/07/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 606 | 11/1928 | 25/05/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 603 | 11/1928 | 11/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11271 | 61 | 12/1928 | 10/08/1963 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11272 | 61 | 12/1928 | 09/12/1959 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11273 | 61 | 12/1928 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11274 | 61 | 12/1928 | 05/09/1964 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11275 | 61 | 12/1928 | 05/09/1964 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11276 | 61 | 12/1928 | 11/05/1963 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11270 | 61 | 12/1928 | 26/10/1963 | |
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 612 | 12/1928 | 02/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 611 | 12/1928 | 29/09/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 610 | 12/1928 | 05/05/1959 | ||
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11277 | 61 | 01/1929 | 07/07/1960 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11278 | 61 | 01/1929 | 01/10/1962 | |
LMS | 2F | 0-6-0T | 11279 | 61 | 01/1929 | 04/09/1959 | |
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2325 | 01/01/1929 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2326 | 29/01/1929 | 02/07/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2327 | 02/02/1929 | 28/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2328 | 09/02/1929 | 09/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2329 | 15/02/1929 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2330 | 20/02/1929 | 09/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2331 | 25/02/1929 | 01/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2332 | 03/1929 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2333 | 06/03/1929 | 04/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2334 | 12/03/1929 | 25/12/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2335 | 20/03/1929 | 25/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2337 | 23/03/1929 | 21/12/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2338 | 02/04/1929 | 11/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2336 | 06/04/1929 | 18/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2339 | 06/04/1929 | 28/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2340 | 11/04/1929 | 09/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2341 | 16/04/1929 | 17/10/1959 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2342 | 23/04/1929 | 02/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2343 | 26/04/1929 | 30/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2344 | 02/05/1929 | 27/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2345 | 08/05/1929 | 21/05/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2346 | 14/05/1929 | 10/09/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2347 | 17/05/1929 | 15/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2348 | 23/05/1929 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2349 | 30/05/1929 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2350 | 04/06/1929 | 13/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2351 | 06/06/1929 | 25/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2352 | 11/06/1929 | 28/04/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2353 | 14/06/1929 | 13/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2354 | 20/06/1929 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2355 | 27/06/1929 | 30/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2356 | 02/07/1929 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2357 | 07/07/1929 | 16/03/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2358 | 08/07/1929 | 27/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2359 | 12/07/1929 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2360 | 18/07/1929 | 19/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2361 | 23/07/1929 | 08/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2362 | 26/07/1929 | 02/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2363 | 01/08/1929 | 23/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2364 | 09/08/1929 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2365 | 14/08/1929 | 08/10/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2366 | 27/08/1929 | 11/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2367 | 02/09/1929 | 25/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2368 | 06/09/1929 | 19/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2369 | 11/09/1929 | 15/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2370 | 16/09/1929 | 30/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2371 | 19/09/1929 | 28/04/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2372 | 24/09/1929 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2373 | 27/09/1929 | 19/11/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 613 | 10/1929 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 614 | 10/1929 | 02/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 575 | 10/1929 | 23/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 576 | 10/1929 | 18/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 580 | 10/1929 | 11/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2374 | 03/10/1929 | 02/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 618 | 11/1929 | 27/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 617 | 11/1929 | 05/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 620 | 11/1929 | 23/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 619 | 11/1929 | 02/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 615 | 11/1929 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 622 | 11/1929 | 11/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 621 | 11/1929 | 02/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 616 | 11/1929 | 09/07/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 628 | 12/1929 | 28/01/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 627 | 12/1929 | 01/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 626 | 12/1929 | 02/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 625 | 12/1929 | 02/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 624 | 12/1929 | 11/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 623 | 12/1929 | 06/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 632 | 01/1930 | 18/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 629 | 01/1930 | 22/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 630 | 01/1930 | 04/10/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 631 | 01/1930 | 09/1960 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2151 | 01/1930 | 07/04/1960 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2152 | 01/1930 | 19/12/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2157 | 02/1930 | 26/11/1959 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2158 | 02/1930 | 19/12/1956 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2156 | 02/1930 | 12/02/1955 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2155 | 02/1930 | 12/02/1955 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2154 | 02/1930 | 12/02/1955 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2153 | 02/1930 | 12/02/1955 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2160 | 03/1930 | 17/02/1959 | ||
LTSR | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2159 | 03/1930 | 17/02/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15501 | 17/03/1930 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15500 | 18/03/1930 | 21/01/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15502 | 21/03/1930 | 18/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15503 | 24/03/1930 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15504 | 28/03/1930 | 07/02/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15505 | 01/04/1930 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15506 | 08/04/1930 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15507 | 12/04/1930 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15508 | 23/04/1930 | 19/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15509 | 01/05/1930 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15510 | 07/05/1930 | 06/08/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15511 | 13/05/1930 | 12/11/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15512 | 19/05/1930 | 12/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15513 | 22/05/1930 | 07/05/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15514 | 30/05/1930 | 04/03/1961 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6150 | 02/06/1930 | 23/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6151 | 11/06/1930 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6100 | 19/06/1930 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6153 | 07/1930 | 22/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6154 | 07/07/1930 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6155 | 14/07/1930 | 12/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6156 | 21/07/1930 | 10/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6157 | 28/07/1930 | 04/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6158 | 04/08/1930 | 19/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6159 | 11/08/1930 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6160 | 27/08/1930 | 01/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6161 | 08/09/1930 | 26/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6162 | 09/09/1930 | 30/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6163 | 15/09/1930 | 29/08/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6164 | 22/09/1930 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6165 | 29/09/1930 | 21/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6166 | 06/10/1930 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6167 | 13/10/1930 | 11/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6168 | 20/10/1930 | 02/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6169 | 27/10/1930 | 25/05/1963 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 08/11/1930 | 11/03/1961 | |||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5902 | 13/11/1930 | 26/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15515 | 17/11/1930 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15516 | 24/11/1930 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15517 | 01/12/1930 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15518 | 08/12/1930 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15519 | 15/12/1930 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15520 | 22/12/1930 | 12/09/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15521 | 01/01/1931 | 15/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15522 | 12/01/1931 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15523 | 19/01/1931 | 03/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15524 | 26/01/1931 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15525 | 02/02/1931 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15526 | 09/02/1931 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15527 | 16/02/1931 | 03/12/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15528 | 23/02/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15529 | 02/03/1931 | 29/08/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15530 | 09/03/1931 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15531 | 16/03/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15532 | 23/03/1931 | 23/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15533 | 30/03/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15534 | 08/04/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15535 | 20/04/1931 | 04/06/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15536 | 27/04/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15537 | 04/05/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15538 | 11/05/1931 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15539 | 18/05/1931 | 12/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15540 | 27/05/1931 | 01/10/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15541 | 02/06/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15542 | 15/06/1931 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15543 | 22/06/1931 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15544 | 29/06/1931 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15545 | 06/07/1931 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15546 | 13/07/1931 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15547 | 20/07/1931 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15548 | 27/07/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15549 | 03/08/1931 | 03/06/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15550 | 10/08/1931 | 22/04/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15551 | 14/08/1931 | 19/09/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15552 | 09/1931 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15553 | 14/09/1931 | 18/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15554 | 21/09/1931 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15555 | 28/09/1931 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15556 | 05/10/1931 | 12/03/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15557 | 12/10/1931 | 14/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15558 | 19/10/1931 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15559 | 06/11/1931 | 26/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 661 | 12/1931 | 27/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 662 | 12/1931 | 18/09/1954 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 663 | 12/1931 | 27/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 664 | 12/1931 | 16/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 665 | 12/1931 | 11/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 671 | 01/1932 | 03/12/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 670 | 01/1932 | 17/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 669 | 01/1932 | 13/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 667 | 01/1932 | 20/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 668 | 01/1932 | 31/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 666 | 01/1932 | 31/07/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 673 | 02/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 672 | 02/1932 | 20/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 677 | 02/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 676 | 02/1932 | 17/08/1957 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 675 | 02/1932 | 22/08/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 674 | 02/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 678 | 03/1932 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 679 | 03/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 680 | 03/1932 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 681 | 04/1932 | 04/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 682 | 04/1932 | 11/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 683 | 04/1932 | 18/03/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 684 | 04/1932 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 2P | 4-4-0 | 685 | 04/1932 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2375 | 13/05/1932 | 24/02/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2376 | 18/05/1932 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2377 | 25/05/1932 | 16/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2378 | 01/06/1932 | 18/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2379 | 08/06/1932 | 01/08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2380 | 15/06/1932 | 10/12/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2381 | 22/06/1932 | 08/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2382 | 29/06/1932 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2383 | 07/07/1932 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2384 | 15/07/1932 | 10/08/1963 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 936 | 08/1932 | 28/01/1961 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 937 | 08/1932 | 19/04/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 935 | 08/1932 | 04/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 939 | 09/1932 | 12/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 938 | 09/1932 | 31/07/1956 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15560 | 21/09/1932 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15561 | 27/09/1932 | 03/12/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15562 | 10/1932 | 08/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15563 | 05/10/1932 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15564 | 11/10/1932 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15565 | 19/10/1932 | 07/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15566 | 25/10/1932 | 26/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15567 | 02/11/1932 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15568 | 09/11/1932 | 05/12/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15569 | 16/11/1932 | 12/03/1960 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6408 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6407 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6406 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6405 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6404 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6403 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6402 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6401 | 12/1932 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6400 | 12/1932 | 16/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 2P | 0-4-4T | 6409 | 01/1933 | 28/11/1959 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5954 | 17/02/1933 | 19/05/1962 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5972 | 03/03/1933 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5933 | 04/03/1933 | 28/09/1963 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5916 | 22/03/1933 | 11/05/1963 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5963 | 22/03/1933 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5944 | 27/03/1933 | 05/12/1964 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5996 | 04/04/1933 | 19/01/1963 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5905 | 10/04/1933 | 15/09/1962 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5935 | 25/04/1933 | 09/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2385 | 04/05/1933 | 07/09/1962 | ||
LMS | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 04/05/1933 | 26/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2386 | 11/05/1933 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2387 | 22/05/1933 | 27/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2388 | 25/05/1933 | 02/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2390 | 06/1933 | 10/09/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2389 | 06/1933 | 23/03/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2391 | 05/06/1933 | 02/03/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2392 | 13/06/1933 | 09/02/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2393 | 20/06/1933 | 26/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2394 | 22/06/1933 | 05/06/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2395 | 28/08/1933 | 18/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2396 | 29/08/1933 | 07/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2397 | 09/1933 | 21/01/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2398 | 04/09/1933 | 03/12/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2399 | 06/09/1933 | 03/09/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2401 | 13/09/1933 | 29/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2400 | 13/09/1933 | 23/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2402 | 20/09/1933 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2403 | 26/09/1933 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2404 | 29/09/1933 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2405 | 05/10/1933 | 17/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2406 | 10/10/1933 | 28/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2407 | 12/10/1933 | 12/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2408 | 18/10/1933 | 04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2409 | 19/10/1933 | 14/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2410 | 25/10/1933 | 04/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2411 | 28/10/1933 | 08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2412 | 01/11/1933 | 03/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2413 | 04/11/1933 | 06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2414 | 08/11/1933 | 10/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2415 | 13/11/1933 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2416 | 15/11/1933 | 27/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2417 | 20/11/1933 | 11/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2418 | 22/11/1933 | 09/04/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2419 | 28/11/1933 | 11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2420 | 01/12/1933 | 19/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2421 | 06/12/1933 | 22/08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2422 | 11/12/1933 | 22/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2423 | 19/12/1933 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2424 | 15/01/1934 | 26/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2507 | 06/03/1934 | 20/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2500 | 28/03/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2501 | 04/04/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2502 | 09/04/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2503 | 16/04/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2504 | 27/04/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2505 | 29/04/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
D3/6 | 0-6-0 | 7079 | 30/04/1934 | 16/06/1956 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2506 | 06/1934 | 26/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2508 | 12/06/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2509 | 15/06/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2510 | 21/06/1934 | 26/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2511 | 28/06/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2512 | 04/07/1934 | 26/11/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2513 | 11/07/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2514 | 25/07/1934 | 11/04/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2515 | 02/08/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2516 | 09/08/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2517 | 15/08/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2518 | 21/08/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2519 | 27/08/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2520 | 09/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2521 | 06/09/1934 | 03/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2522 | 12/09/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2523 | 14/09/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2524 | 25/09/1934 | 29/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2525 | 28/09/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2526 | 05/10/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2527 | 12/10/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2528 | 18/10/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2529 | 23/10/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2530 | 26/10/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2531 | 02/11/1934 | 29/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2532 | 07/11/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2533 | 09/11/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2534 | 15/11/1934 | 01/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2535 | 22/11/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2536 | 05/12/1934 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5655 | 13/12/1934 | 17/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5656 | 17/12/1934 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5657 | 17/12/1934 | 26/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5658 | 18/12/1934 | 13/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5659 | 20/12/1934 | 25/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5661 | 27/12/1934 | 17/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5660 | 27/12/1934 | 26/06/1966 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5662 | 28/12/1934 | 23/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5664 | 01/01/1935 | 03/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5663 | 01/01/1935 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 72 | 15/02/1935 | 01/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 71 | 15/02/1935 | 23/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 73 | 20/02/1935 | 18/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 74 | 25/02/1935 | 17/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 76 | 02/03/1935 | 20/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 75 | 05/03/1935 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 77 | 07/03/1935 | 08/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 78 | 08/03/1935 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 80 | 18/03/1935 | 08/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 79 | 19/03/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 82 | 25/03/1935 | 27/02/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 83 | 27/03/1935 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 81 | 27/03/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 84 | 02/04/1935 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 86 | 08/04/1935 | 24/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 87 | 11/04/1935 | 24/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 88 | 12/04/1935 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 89 | 17/04/1935 | 04/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 90 | 20/04/1935 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 85 | 08/05/1935 | 07/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 91 | 09/05/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 92 | 16/05/1935 | 20/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 93 | 16/05/1935 | 27/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 94 | 16/05/1935 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 95 | 22/05/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 96 | 23/05/1935 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 97 | 25/05/1935 | 05/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 98 | 29/05/1935 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 99 | 30/05/1935 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 100 | 06/1935 | 18/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 101 | 06/06/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 102 | 08/06/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 103 | 14/06/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 104 | 20/06/1935 | 15/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 105 | 25/06/1935 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 106 | 27/06/1935 | 24/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 107 | 29/06/1935 | 02/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 108 | 03/07/1935 | 25/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 109 | 06/07/1935 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 110 | 10/07/1935 | 05/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 111 | 18/07/1935 | 20/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 112 | 20/07/1935 | 19/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 113 | 08/1935 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 122 | 08/1935 | 23/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 114 | 03/08/1935 | 19/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 115 | 07/08/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 116 | 14/08/1935 | 24/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 117 | 14/08/1935 | 19/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 118 | 16/08/1935 | 19/08/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 119 | 21/08/1935 | 18/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 120 | 23/08/1935 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 121 | 30/08/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 123 | 03/09/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 125 | 07/09/1935 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 124 | 09/09/1935 | 02/09/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 126 | 11/09/1935 | 20/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 127 | 13/09/1935 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 128 | 18/09/1935 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 129 | 19/09/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 130 | 21/09/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 131 | 26/09/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 132 | 28/09/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 133 | 03/10/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 134 | 04/10/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 135 | 08/10/1935 | 24/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 136 | 10/10/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 137 | 15/10/1935 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 138 | 17/10/1935 | 22/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 139 | 19/10/1935 | 29/10/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 140 | 24/10/1935 | 04/11/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 141 | 30/10/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 142 | 01/11/1935 | 22/07/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 143 | 05/11/1935 | 21/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 144 | 13/11/1935 | 23/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2539 | 09/12/1935 | 11/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2538 | 11/12/1935 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2540 | 12/12/1935 | 03/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2541 | 13/12/1935 | 15/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2542 | 16/12/1935 | 17/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2537 | 17/12/1935 | 22/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2543 | 20/12/1935 | 11/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2544 | 23/12/1935 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2429 | 02/1936 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2425 | 14/02/1936 | 07/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2426 | 17/02/1936 | 11/12/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2427 | 20/02/1936 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2428 | 26/02/1936 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2430 | 04/03/1936 | 27/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2431 | 10/03/1936 | 07/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2432 | 14/03/1936 | 21/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2433 | 19/03/1936 | 12/05/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2434 | 24/03/1936 | 28/03/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2435 | 28/03/1936 | 03/04/1965 | ||
D3/6 | 0-6-0 | 7074 | 04/1936 | 29/04/1961 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2437 | 14/04/1936 | 23/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2436 | 14/04/1936 | 28/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2438 | 16/04/1936 | 25/02/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2439 | 24/04/1936 | 14/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2440 | 28/04/1936 | 28/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2441 | 02/05/1936 | 11/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2444 | 06/05/1936 | 16/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2442 | 07/05/1936 | 07/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2443 | 13/05/1936 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2445 | 29/05/1936 | 17/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2446 | 06/06/1936 | 25/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2447 | 13/06/1936 | 13/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2448 | 18/06/1936 | 06/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2449 | 24/06/1936 | 14/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2450 | 01/07/1936 | 04/06/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2451 | 08/07/1936 | 10/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2452 | 20/07/1936 | 10/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2453 | 30/07/1936 | 16/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2454 | 06/08/1936 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2456 | 20/08/1936 | 24/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2455 | 22/08/1936 | 02/04/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2457 | 27/08/1936 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2458 | 03/09/1936 | 26/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2459 | 09/09/1936 | 23/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2460 | 17/09/1936 | 28/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2461 | 23/09/1936 | 28/03/1964 | ||
D3/6 | 0-6-0 | 7076 | 30/09/1936 | 03/02/1962 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2462 | 01/10/1936 | 14/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2463 | 08/10/1936 | 25/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2464 | 14/10/1936 | 14/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2466 | 21/10/1936 | 12/01/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2465 | 21/10/1936 | 13/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2467 | 05/11/1936 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2468 | 13/11/1936 | 25/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2469 | 18/11/1936 | 04/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2470 | 25/11/1936 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2471 | 04/12/1936 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2472 | 09/12/1936 | 03/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2473 | 16/12/1936 | 03/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2474 | 22/12/1936 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2475 | 30/12/1936 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2476 | 06/01/1937 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2477 | 14/01/1937 | 26/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2478 | 20/01/1937 | 06/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2479 | 28/01/1937 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2480 | 04/02/1937 | 19/01/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 10/02/1937 | 26/09/1964 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2482 | 18/02/1937 | 24/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2483 | 25/02/1937 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2484 | 04/03/1937 | 29/01/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2485 | 11/03/1937 | 08/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2486 | 18/03/1937 | 09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 25/03/1937 | 07/09/1963 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2488 | 02/04/1937 | 13/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2489 | 08/04/1937 | 14/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2490 | 15/04/1937 | 14/05/1960 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2491 | 22/04/1937 | 28/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2492 | 05/1937 | 12/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2493 | 06/05/1937 | 02/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2494 | 15/05/1937 | 08/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 145 | 20/07/1937 | 22/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 146 | 04/08/1937 | 04/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 147 | 14/08/1937 | 19/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 148 | 20/08/1937 | 25/08/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 149 | 26/08/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 150 | 02/09/1937 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 151 | 09/09/1937 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 152 | 16/09/1937 | 08/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 153 | 22/09/1937 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 154 | 24/09/1937 | 08/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 155 | 10/1937 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 156 | 06/10/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 157 | 09/10/1937 | 01/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 158 | 14/10/1937 | 08/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 159 | 21/10/1937 | 12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 160 | 28/10/1937 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 161 | 04/11/1937 | 28/12/1960 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 162 | 10/11/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 163 | 16/11/1937 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 164 | 20/11/1937 | 13/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 165 | 25/11/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 166 | 12/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 172 | 12/1937 | 21/11/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 167 | 07/12/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 168 | 10/12/1937 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 169 | 16/12/1937 | 23/10/1959 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 170 | 18/12/1937 | 08/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 171 | 24/12/1937 | 20/05/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 173 | 05/01/1938 | 21/07/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 174 | 08/01/1938 | 09/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 175 | 17/03/1938 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 176 | 24/03/1938 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 177 | 04/1938 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 178 | 08/04/1938 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 179 | 14/04/1938 | 27/02/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 180 | 22/04/1938 | 20/01/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 181 | 28/04/1938 | 30/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 182 | 05/05/1938 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 183 | 12/05/1938 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 3P | 2-6-2T | 184 | 20/05/1938 | 28/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2618 | 21/06/1938 | 12/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2619 | 24/06/1938 | 30/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2620 | 07/1938 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2621 | 06/07/1938 | 03/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2622 | 13/07/1938 | 20/02/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2623 | 14/07/1938 | 22/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2624 | 18/07/1938 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2625 | 01/08/1938 | 07/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2626 | 05/08/1938 | 23/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2627 | 10/08/1938 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2635 | 09/1938 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2628 | 09/1938 | 25/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2629 | 03/09/1938 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2630 | 08/09/1938 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2631 | 13/09/1938 | 12/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2632 | 17/09/1938 | 15/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2633 | 22/09/1938 | 25/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2634 | 27/09/1938 | 09/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2636 | 06/10/1938 | 04/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2637 | 14/10/1938 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2638 | 28/10/1938 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2644 | 11/1938 | 11/03/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2639 | 02/11/1938 | 07/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2640 | 05/11/1938 | 26/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2641 | 11/11/1938 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2642 | 18/11/1938 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2643 | 25/11/1938 | 14/12/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2651 | 12/1938 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2645 | 02/12/1938 | 11/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2646 | 09/12/1938 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2647 | 14/12/1938 | 13/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2648 | 17/12/1938 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2649 | 22/12/1938 | 06/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2650 | 30/12/1938 | 06/06/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2652 | 05/01/1939 | 25/06/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4577 | 04/1939 | 19/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4578 | 04/1939 | 15/02/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4579 | 04/1939 | 03/11/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4580 | 05/1939 | 21/11/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4581 | 05/1939 | 12/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4582 | 05/1939 | 18/11/1963 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7080 | 26/05/1939 | 18/11/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7081 | 26/05/1939 | 09/12/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7082 | 27/05/1939 | 09/09/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7083 | 27/05/1939 | 30/09/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7084 | 27/05/1939 | 14/10/1967 | |||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4583 | 06/1939 | 08/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4584 | 07/1939 | 18/11/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4585 | 07/1939 | 09/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4586 | 09/1939 | 07/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4587 | 09/1939 | 15/05/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4588 | 09/1939 | 19/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4589 | 09/1939 | 14/11/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4590 | 09/1939 | 09/1961 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7085 | 11/09/1939 | 15/07/1967 | |||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4595 | 10/1939 | 10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4594 | 10/1939 | 08/10/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4593 | 10/1939 | 26/12/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4592 | 10/1939 | 10/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4591 | 10/1939 | 28/11/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4596 | 11/1939 | 09/1963 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7086 | 09/11/1939 | 30/09/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7088 | 12/1939 | 12/03/1966 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7087 | 02/12/1939 | 30/09/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7089 | 30/12/1939 | 30/12/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7090 | 20/01/1940 | 18/11/1967 | |||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4597 | 03/1940 | 09/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4598 | 03/1940 | 10/1963 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7091 | 09/03/1940 | 21/10/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7092 | 21/03/1940 | 28/10/1967 | |||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4599 | 04/1940 | 11/1965 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7093 | 13/04/1940 | 30/09/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7094 | 20/04/1940 | 28/10/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7095 | 07/05/1940 | 28/10/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7096 | 25/05/1940 | 14/10/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7097 | 15/06/1940 | 18/11/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7099 | 07/1940 | 12/11/1966 | |||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4600 | 07/1940 | 05/03/1960 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7098 | 07/07/1940 | 28/10/1967 | |||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4602 | 08/1940 | 09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4601 | 08/1940 | 13/11/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4604 | 09/1940 | 20/01/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4603 | 09/1940 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2653 | 12/1940 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2654 | 20/01/1941 | 21/11/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4605 | 02/1941 | 09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2655 | 02/1941 | 12/01/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2656 | 03/02/1941 | 06/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2657 | 07/02/1941 | 07/11/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2658 | 19/02/1941 | 29/09/1962 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4606 | 03/1941 | 23/03/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2659 | 12/03/1941 | 06/04/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2660 | 11/04/1941 | 17/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2661 | 10/05/1941 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2662 | 10/06/1941 | 12/12/1964 | ||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7110 | 23/01/1942 | 23/12/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7111 | 31/01/1942 | 16/12/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7112 | 07/02/1942 | 11/11/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7113 | 14/02/1942 | 21/10/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7114 | 19/02/1942 | 04/11/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7116 | 03/1942 | 21/05/1966 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7115 | 11/03/1942 | 24/06/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7117 | 28/03/1942 | 08/08/1964 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7118 | 29/04/1942 | 30/12/1967 | |||
D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 7119 | 09/06/1942 | 16/12/1967 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2663 | 20/06/1942 | 18/03/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2664 | 08/07/1942 | 12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2665 | 01/08/1942 | 12/06/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2666 | 19/08/1942 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2667 | 03/10/1942 | 13/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2668 | 23/11/1942 | 17/08/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2669 | 07/12/1942 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2670 | 28/12/1942 | 05/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2671 | 23/01/1943 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2672 | 13/02/1943 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5472 | 151 | 04/1943 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5474 | 151 | 05/1943 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5473 | 151 | 05/1943 | 19/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5475 | 151 | 06/1943 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5477 | 151 | 07/1943 | 17/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5476 | 151 | 07/1943 | 10/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5480 | 151 | 08/1943 | 22/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5479 | 151 | 08/1943 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5478 | 151 | 08/1943 | 10/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5483 | 152 | 09/1943 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5481 | 151 | 09/1943 | 30/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5482 | 152 | 09/1943 | 29/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5485 | 152 | 10/1943 | 28/10/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5486 | 152 | 10/1943 | 06/12/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5484 | 152 | 10/1943 | 13/02/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5487 | 152 | 11/1943 | 02/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5488 | 152 | 11/1943 | 29/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5489 | 152 | 11/1943 | 29/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5490 | 152 | 12/1943 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5491 | 152 | 12/1943 | 17/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5492 | 153 | 01/1944 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5493 | 153 | 01/1944 | 06/01/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5494 | 153 | 01/1944 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5495 | 153 | 02/1944 | 04/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5496 | 153 | 02/1944 | 08/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5499 | 153 | 04/1944 | 07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5498 | 153 | 04/1944 | 26/06/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5497 | 153 | 04/1944 | 02/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4800 | 153 | 05/1944 | 16/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4801 | 153 | 05/1944 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4802 | 153 | 06/1944 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4803 | 153 | 06/1944 | 06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4804 | 153 | 06/1944 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4805 | 153 | 06/1944 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4806 | 153 | 07/1944 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4808 | 170 | 09/1944 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4807 | 170 | 09/1944 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4809 | 170 | 09/1944 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4810 | 170 | 10/1944 | 13/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4811 | 170 | 10/1944 | 08/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4812 | 170 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4813 | 170 | 10/1944 | 03/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4814 | 170 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4818 | 170 | 11/1944 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4815 | 170 | 11/1944 | 24/02/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4819 | 170 | 11/1944 | 11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4817 | 170 | 11/1944 | 12/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4816 | 170 | 11/1944 | 20/07/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4825 | 170 | 12/1944 | 07/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4824 | 170 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4820 | 170 | 12/1944 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4821 | 170 | 12/1944 | 10/06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4822 | 170 | 12/1944 | 21/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4823 | 170 | 12/1944 | 20/11/1965 | |
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2673 | 28/03/1945 | 14/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2674 | 04/04/1945 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2675 | 17/04/1945 | 18/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2676 | 27/04/1945 | 25/08/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2680 | 05/1945 | 27/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2677 | 03/05/1945 | 18/06/1962 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7120 | 14/05/1945 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2678 | 14/05/1945 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2679 | 23/05/1945 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2684 | 06/1945 | 18/06/1962 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7121 | 05/06/1945 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2681 | 09/06/1945 | 29/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2682 | 18/06/1945 | 25/07/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7122 | 19/06/1945 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2683 | 23/06/1945 | 07/10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2685 | 09/07/1945 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2686 | 13/07/1945 | 16/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2687 | 28/07/1945 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2688 | 08/1945 | 08/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2689 | 08/1945 | 10/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2690 | 08/1945 | 31/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2691 | 08/1945 | 09/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7123 | 09/08/1945 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2692 | 09/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2693 | 09/1945 | 10/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2694 | 09/1945 | 10/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2695 | 10/1945 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2698 | 10/1945 | 10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2699 | 10/1945 | 09/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2200 | 10/1945 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2696 | 11/10/1945 | 15/08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2697 | 16/10/1945 | 14/01/1967 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7124 | 30/10/1945 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2204 | 11/1945 | 06/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2205 | 11/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2203 | 11/1945 | 21/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2201 | 11/1945 | 30/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2202 | 06/11/1945 | 22/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2206 | 22/11/1945 | 20/04/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2207 | 27/11/1945 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2216 | 12/1945 | 17/07/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2208 | 12/1945 | 30/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2215 | 12/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2214 | 12/1945 | 26/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2209 | 04/12/1945 | 06/02/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7125 | 05/12/1945 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2210 | 07/12/1945 | 06/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2211 | 11/12/1945 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2212 | 14/12/1945 | 21/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2213 | 19/12/1945 | 09/01/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2217 | 29/12/1945 | 10/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2219 | 01/1946 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2218 | 22/01/1946 | 24/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2220 | 09/02/1946 | 04/12/1961 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2221 | 25/02/1946 | 12/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2222 | 12/03/1946 | 08/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2223 | 06/04/1946 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2224 | 16/04/1946 | 21/01/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2225 | 24/04/1946 | 18/06/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2226 | 02/05/1946 | 27/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2227 | 08/05/1946 | 20/10/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2228 | 16/05/1946 | 14/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2229 | 22/05/1946 | 18/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2230 | 05/06/1946 | 07/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2231 | 05/06/1946 | 22/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2232 | 12/06/1946 | 29/01/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2233 | 25/06/1946 | 05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2234 | 02/07/1946 | 15/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2235 | 10/07/1946 | 07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2236 | 15/08/1946 | 29/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2237 | 23/08/1946 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2238 | 29/08/1946 | 12/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2244 | 09/1946 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2243 | 09/1946 | 07/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2242 | 09/1946 | 30/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2241 | 09/1946 | 09/11/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2239 | 09/1946 | 06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2240 | 07/09/1946 | 16/04/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2245 | 10/1946 | 08/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2246 | 10/1946 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2247 | 11/10/1946 | 14/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2248 | 16/10/1946 | 15/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2249 | 18/10/1946 | 16/07/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2250 | 24/10/1946 | 12/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2251 | 30/10/1946 | 10/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2258 | 11/1946 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2252 | 02/11/1946 | 10/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2253 | 08/11/1946 | 22/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2254 | 13/11/1946 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2255 | 16/11/1946 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2256 | 21/11/1946 | 20/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2257 | 27/11/1946 | 18/06/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2259 | 04/12/1946 | 15/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2260 | 07/12/1946 | 25/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2261 | 12/12/1946 | 28/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2262 | 18/12/1946 | 12/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2263 | 20/12/1946 | 30/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2264 | 27/12/1946 | 14/07/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2268 | 01/1947 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2265 | 03/01/1947 | 05/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2266 | 15/01/1947 | 25/03/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2267 | 21/01/1947 | 03/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2269 | 02/1947 | 07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2271 | 02/1947 | 08/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2270 | 12/02/1947 | 26/01/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2272 | 03/1947 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2273 | 05/1947 | 02/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2274 | 06/1947 | 01/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2275 | 06/1947 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2277 | 07/1947 | 09/08/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2276 | 07/1947 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2278 | 12/07/1947 | 25/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2279 | 05/08/1947 | 13/07/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2280 | 12/08/1947 | 07/03/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7126 | 15/08/1947 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2281 | 19/08/1947 | 27/04/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2282 | 25/08/1947 | 19/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2283 | 01/09/1947 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2284 | 08/09/1947 | 26/12/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7127 | 12/09/1947 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2285 | 13/09/1947 | 30/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2286 | 24/09/1947 | 26/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2287 | 01/10/1947 | 07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2288 | 08/10/1947 | 28/09/1963 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7128 | 09/10/1947 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2289 | 14/10/1947 | 08/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2290 | 21/10/1947 | 29/09/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2291 | 28/10/1947 | 26/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2292 | 03/11/1947 | 16/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2293 | 07/11/1947 | 06/04/1963 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7129 | 13/11/1947 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2294 | 13/11/1947 | 18/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2295 | 19/11/1947 | 16/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2296 | 24/11/1947 | 31/07/1965 | ||
D16/1 | Co-Co | 10000 | 30/11/1947 | 12/1963 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2297 | 01/12/1947 | 06/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2298 | 05/12/1947 | 17/11/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2299 | 11/12/1947 | 20/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2187 | 17/12/1947 | 15/03/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2188 | 22/12/1947 | 18/05/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2189 | 24/12/1947 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2190 | 17/01/1948 | 08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2191 | 24/01/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2192 | 31/01/1948 | 11/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2193 | 31/01/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7130 | 04/02/1948 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2194 | 07/02/1948 | 23/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2195 | 21/02/1948 | 24/04/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2196 | 28/02/1948 | 29/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42196 | 28/02/1948 | 29/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2197 | 06/03/1948 | 25/05/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 7131 | 11/03/1948 | 19/10/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2198 | 13/03/1948 | 08/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2199 | 07/04/1948 | 11/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42147 | 23/04/1948 | 01/05/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12045 | 28/04/1948 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42148 | 03/05/1948 | 19/12/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42149 | 07/05/1948 | 24/06/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42150 | 15/05/1948 | 06/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42151 | 24/05/1948 | 07/09/1963 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12046 | 04/06/1948 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42153 | 05/06/1948 | 08/08/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42152 | 05/06/1948 | 10/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42154 | 10/06/1948 | 14/01/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 16/06/1948 | 15/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42156 | 22/06/1948 | 05/02/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42157 | 29/06/1948 | 20/07/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42158 | 02/07/1948 | 24/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42159 | 07/07/1948 | 25/06/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42160 | 09/07/1948 | 22/05/1965 | ||
D16/1 | Co-Co | 10001 | 10/07/1948 | 12/03/1966 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42161 | 06/08/1948 | 05/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 14/08/1948 | 29/12/1962 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12047 | 18/08/1948 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 21/08/1948 | 08/06/1964 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 28/08/1948 | 29/12/1962 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42165 | 09/1948 | 06/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42166 | 09/1948 | 28/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42167 | 09/1948 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42168 | 09/1948 | 31/03/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42169 | 09/1948 | 07/02/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42173 | 10/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42172 | 10/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42171 | 10/1948 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42170 | 10/1948 | 29/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42174 | 30/10/1948 | 07/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42175 | 11/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42177 | 11/1948 | 17/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 13/11/1948 | 23/06/1966 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42178 | 26/11/1948 | 29/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42179 | 01/12/1948 | 06/03/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42180 | 07/12/1948 | 30/11/1963 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12048 | 14/12/1948 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42181 | 14/12/1948 | 23/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42182 | 24/12/1948 | 06/04/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42183 | 11/01/1949 | 01/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42184 | 24/01/1949 | 04/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42185 | 11/02/1949 | 02/05/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12050 | 17/02/1949 | 11/07/1970 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42186 | 28/02/1949 | 06/06/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12051 | 10/03/1949 | 09/10/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42107 | 22/03/1949 | 27/02/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42108 | 25/03/1949 | 12/12/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12052 | 12/04/1949 | 13/06/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42109 | 20/04/1949 | 26/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42110 | 09/05/1949 | 11/06/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12053 | 13/05/1949 | 18/04/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12054 | 30/05/1949 | 25/07/1970 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42111 | 02/06/1949 | 08/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42112 | 10/06/1949 | 24/07/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12055 | 08/07/1949 | 17/07/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42114 | 16/07/1949 | 19/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42115 | 16/07/1949 | 12/11/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42113 | 16/07/1949 | 24/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42116 | 16/07/1949 | 12/06/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42117 | 02/08/1949 | 29/12/1962 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12056 | 09/08/1949 | 09/10/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42118 | 09/08/1949 | 25/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42119 | 23/08/1949 | 21/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42120 | 31/08/1949 | 28/09/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42122 | 09/1949 | 29/12/1962 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42121 | 15/09/1949 | 09/07/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12057 | 16/09/1949 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42123 | 10/1949 | 28/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42124 | 10/1949 | 27/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42125 | 10/1949 | 31/12/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12058 | 20/10/1949 | 28/04/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42126 | 11/1949 | 22/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42127 | 11/1949 | 12/10/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12059 | 04/11/1949 | 25/01/1969 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12060 | 11/11/1949 | 07/02/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12061 | 21/11/1949 | 09/10/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 03/12/1949 | 19/11/1966 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 03/12/1949 | 20/09/1965 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 03/12/1949 | 29/12/1962 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12062 | 06/12/1949 | 19/04/1970 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12063 | 12/12/1949 | 01/01/1972 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12064 | 20/12/1949 | 19/04/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 24/12/1949 | 05/08/1965 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42132 | 28/12/1949 | 18/06/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12065 | 30/12/1949 | 10/05/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12066 | 30/12/1949 | 19/04/1969 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12049 | 31/12/1949 | 03/10/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 31/12/1949 | 26/06/1966 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42133 | 11/01/1950 | 01/04/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42134 | 17/01/1950 | 01/04/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42135 | 27/01/1950 | 22/02/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42136 | 09/02/1950 | 12/01/1963 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12067 | 24/02/1950 | 25/01/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42137 | 27/02/1950 | 25/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42138 | 09/03/1950 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42139 | 15/03/1950 | 27/12/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12068 | 24/03/1950 | 23/12/1967 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42140 | 16/04/1950 | 29/06/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42141 | 18/04/1950 | 10/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42143 | 05/1950 | 12/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42145 | 06/1950 | 09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42144 | 06/1950 | 29/12/1962 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12069 | 04/07/1950 | 14/03/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12070 | 11/08/1950 | 30/09/1969 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42146 | 29/08/1950 | 03/11/1962 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12071 | 31/08/1950 | 09/10/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | 31/08/1950 | 21/12/1968 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42050 | 07/09/1950 | 24/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42051 | 14/09/1950 | 24/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42052 | 27/09/1950 | 09/05/1967 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | 30/09/1950 | 06/11/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12074 | 30/09/1950 | 01/01/1972 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12075 | 30/09/1950 | 13/11/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42053 | 06/10/1950 | 12/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42054 | 16/10/1950 | 04/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42055 | 25/10/1950 | 27/06/1967 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12076 | 31/10/1950 | 12/12/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12077 | 31/10/1950 | 09/10/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12078 | 31/10/1950 | 17/01/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12079 | 30/11/1950 | 11/09/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12080 | 30/11/1950 | 24/04/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12081 | 30/11/1950 | 20/06/1970 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12082 | 30/11/1950 | 03/10/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12083 | 30/11/1950 | 09/10/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42056 | 30/11/1950 | 12/10/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42057 | 30/11/1950 | 23/07/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42058 | 30/11/1950 | 24/08/1966 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42059 | 30/11/1950 | 08/06/1964 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | 08/12/1950 | 25/09/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12084 | 09/12/1950 | 16/05/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42062 | 15/12/1950 | 22/05/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42063 | 20/12/1950 | 26/10/1963 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42064 | 21/12/1950 | 12/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42065 | 29/12/1950 | 24/07/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12085 | 31/12/1950 | 22/05/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12086 | 31/12/1950 | 31/07/1969 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12087 | 31/12/1950 | 17/07/1971 | |||
LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42060 | 31/12/1950 | 10/04/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73000 | 12/04/1951 | 30/03/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73003 | 05/1951 | 31/12/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73001 | 09/05/1951 | 31/12/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73002 | 18/05/1951 | 19/03/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73004 | 08/06/1951 | 28/10/1967 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12088 | 16/06/1951 | 11/05/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12089 | 16/06/1951 | 12/09/1970 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73005 | 20/06/1951 | 26/06/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73006 | 28/06/1951 | 11/03/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73007 | 09/07/1951 | 03/03/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73008 | 13/07/1951 | 20/09/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12090 | 17/07/1951 | 17/07/1971 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12091 | 17/07/1951 | 20/06/1970 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73009 | 19/07/1951 | 14/07/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12092 | 11/08/1951 | 16/04/1969 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73010 | 14/08/1951 | 22/06/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73011 | 17/08/1951 | 11/11/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73012 | 24/08/1951 | 06/11/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73013 | 31/08/1951 | 07/05/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73014 | 06/09/1951 | 22/07/1967 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12093 | 08/09/1951 | 16/05/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73015 | 12/09/1951 | 25/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | 21/09/1951 | 04/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73017 | 28/09/1951 | 04/10/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73018 | 04/10/1951 | 09/07/1967 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12094 | 06/10/1951 | 09/10/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73019 | 10/10/1951 | 14/01/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73020 | 16/10/1951 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73021 | 22/10/1951 | 25/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73022 | 26/10/1951 | 16/04/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73023 | 05/11/1951 | 25/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73024 | 15/11/1951 | 06/11/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73025 | 19/11/1951 | 14/10/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73026 | 27/11/1951 | 01/04/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73027 | 18/12/1951 | 07/02/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73028 | 28/12/1951 | 10/12/1966 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12095 | 29/12/1951 | 16/04/1969 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12096 | 29/12/1951 | 25/01/1969 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12097 | 29/12/1951 | 28/03/1971 | |||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41320 | 01/1952 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73029 | 17/01/1952 | 09/07/1967 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41321 | 02/1952 | 02/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41322 | 02/1952 | 07/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12098 | 23/02/1952 | 27/02/1970 | |||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41323 | 03/1952 | 07/1964 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 03/1952 | 03/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41325 | 03/1952 | 13/06/1965 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12099 | 22/03/1952 | 17/07/1971 | |||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41326 | 04/1952 | 03/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41327 | 04/1952 | 03/05/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12100 | 19/04/1952 | 31/03/1969 | |||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41329 | 05/1952 | 07/1964 | ||
LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41328 | 05/1952 | 07/1964 | ||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12101 | 15/05/1952 | 15/08/1970 | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12102 | 14/06/1952 | 17/01/1971 | |||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80000 | 26/09/1952 | 31/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80001 | 14/10/1952 | 17/07/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80002 | 17/10/1952 | 01/03/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80003 | 24/10/1952 | 06/03/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80004 | 04/11/1952 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80005 | 13/11/1952 | 09/08/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13005 | 232 | 14/11/1952 | 04/09/1977 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80006 | 24/11/1952 | 02/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80007 | 08/12/1952 | 17/07/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80008 | 15/12/1952 | 13/07/1964 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13010 | 232 | 17/12/1952 | 24/02/1980 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13011 | 232 | 19/12/1952 | 01/10/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13012 | 232 | 23/12/1952 | 28/01/1973 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13013 | 232 | 23/12/1952 | 01/10/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13014 | 232 | 24/12/1952 | 01/10/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13006 | 232 | 27/12/1952 | 26/11/1972 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13007 | 232 | 27/12/1952 | 12/12/1977 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13008 | 232 | 27/12/1952 | 21/08/1983 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13009 | 232 | 27/12/1952 | 15/10/1978 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80009 | 30/12/1952 | 24/09/1964 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13015 | 232 | 24/01/1953 | 27/11/1983 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13016 | 232 | 24/01/1953 | 30/11/1975 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13017 | 232 | 21/03/1953 | 18/12/1977 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13018 | 232 | 21/03/1953 | 13/12/1991 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13019 | 232 | 21/03/1953 | 10/06/1973 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13020 | 232 | 18/04/1953 | 01/12/1973 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13021 | 232 | 16/05/1953 | 18/05/1980 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13022 | 232 | 16/05/1953 | 21/09/1980 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13023 | 232 | 13/06/1953 | 18/05/1980 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13024 | 232 | 13/06/1953 | 26/08/1973 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73030 | 20/06/1953 | 25/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73031 | 03/07/1953 | 10/09/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73032 | 10/07/1953 | 07/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73033 | 07/08/1953 | 30/01/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73034 | 14/08/1953 | 16/03/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73035 | 24/08/1953 | 30/01/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73036 | 01/09/1953 | 25/09/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73037 | 08/09/1953 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73038 | 12/09/1953 | 09/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73039 | 25/09/1953 | 09/09/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73040 | 05/10/1953 | 11/05/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73041 | 14/10/1953 | 20/06/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73042 | 27/10/1953 | 08/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73043 | 30/10/1953 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73044 | 09/11/1953 | 19/03/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73045 | 18/11/1953 | 26/08/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73046 | 25/11/1953 | 06/09/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73047 | 08/12/1953 | 05/12/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73048 | 17/12/1953 | 14/10/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73049 | 30/12/1953 | 19/03/1965 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13040 | 22/01/1954 | 05/04/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13041 | 27/01/1954 | 05/03/1978 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13042 | 03/02/1954 | 10/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13043 | 20/02/1954 | 04/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13044 | 17/03/1954 | 25/08/1974 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13045 | 26/03/1954 | 05/11/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13046 | 09/04/1954 | 06/01/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13047 | 14/04/1954 | 15/07/1973 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73050 | 14/04/1954 | 29/06/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13048 | 23/04/1954 | 30/09/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13049 | 23/04/1954 | 07/09/1981 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73051 | 10/05/1954 | 25/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73052 | 20/05/1954 | 26/12/1964 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13050 | 22/05/1954 | 03/02/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73054 | 06/1954 | 25/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73053 | 04/06/1954 | 09/03/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13051 | 19/06/1954 | 03/06/1973 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13052 | 19/06/1954 | 01/12/1973 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13053 | 19/06/1954 | 10/06/1973 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73055 | 23/06/1954 | 25/05/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73056 | 02/07/1954 | 26/06/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73057 | 08/07/1954 | 29/03/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73058 | 13/07/1954 | 05/11/1964 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13054 | 17/07/1954 | 08/08/1978 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13055 | 17/07/1954 | 11/03/1979 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73059 | 13/08/1954 | 01/05/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13056 | 14/08/1954 | 18/12/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13057 | 14/08/1954 | 04/01/1978 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73060 | 26/08/1954 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73061 | 02/09/1954 | 26/12/1964 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13058 | 11/09/1954 | 04/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13059 | 11/09/1954 | 18/05/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73062 | 15/09/1954 | 26/06/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73063 | 29/09/1954 | 23/06/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73064 | 01/10/1954 | 01/05/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13082 | 09/10/1954 | 17/07/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13083 | 09/10/1954 | 17/07/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13084 | 09/10/1954 | 27/02/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13085 | 06/11/1954 | 18/12/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13086 | 06/11/1954 | 14/02/1978 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13087 | 06/11/1954 | 10/06/1973 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13088 | 06/11/1954 | 01/12/1973 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13092 | 27/11/1954 | 01/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13089 | 04/12/1954 | 09/12/1973 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13090 | 04/12/1954 | 13/12/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13091 | 04/12/1954 | 21/09/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13093 | 04/12/1954 | 31/05/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80054 | 04/12/1954 | 29/06/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13094 | 11/12/1954 | 01/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13095 | 18/12/1954 | 31/05/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80055 | 23/12/1954 | 02/09/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13096 | 25/12/1954 | 31/05/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80056 | 30/12/1954 | 10/10/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80057 | 31/12/1954 | 31/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80058 | 08/01/1955 | 17/07/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13097 | 15/01/1955 | 31/05/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13098 | 22/01/1955 | 01/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13099 | 22/01/1955 | 08/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13100 | 29/01/1955 | 01/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13101 | 05/02/1955 | 31/05/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13102 | 11/02/1955 | 27/11/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13103 | 16/02/1955 | 14/08/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13104 | 23/02/1955 | 04/12/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13105 | 23/02/1955 | 02/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13106 | 04/03/1955 | 06/04/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13107 | 11/03/1955 | 02/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13108 | 11/03/1955 | 08/07/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13109 | 16/03/1955 | 02/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13110 | 22/03/1955 | 23/03/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13111 | 25/03/1955 | 03/08/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13112 | 01/04/1955 | 16/11/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13113 | 13/04/1955 | 25/09/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13114 | 19/04/1955 | 21/09/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73075 | 22/04/1955 | 16/12/1965 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13115 | 25/04/1955 | 27/11/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13116 | 29/04/1955 | 14/11/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73076 | 29/04/1955 | 13/07/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73077 | 13/05/1955 | 02/01/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73078 | 21/05/1955 | 14/07/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13250 | 25/05/1955 | 15/03/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13251 | 25/05/1955 | 31/03/1984 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73079 | 31/05/1955 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73080 | 06/1955 | 25/12/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13252 | 01/06/1955 | 21/06/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13253 | 01/06/1955 | 14/02/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13254 | 01/06/1955 | 17/03/1985 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13117 | 03/06/1955 | 24/06/1967 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13255 | 08/06/1955 | 30/12/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13256 | 08/06/1955 | 24/07/1983 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13118 | 10/06/1955 | 08/07/1967 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13257 | 13/06/1955 | 24/04/1983 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13119 | 16/06/1955 | 08/07/1967 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73081 | 17/06/1955 | 31/07/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73082 | 24/06/1955 | 19/06/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73083 | 07/1955 | 04/09/1966 | ||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13120 | 08/07/1955 | 08/07/1967 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73084 | 29/07/1955 | 19/12/1965 | ||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13121 | 05/08/1955 | 15/04/1967 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73085 | 05/08/1955 | 02/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73086 | 16/08/1955 | 02/10/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13167 | 24/08/1955 | 14/03/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13168 | 26/08/1955 | 25/09/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73087 | 26/08/1955 | 02/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73088 | 01/09/1955 | 02/10/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13169 | 02/09/1955 | 04/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13170 | 02/09/1955 | 17/07/1983 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13122 | 03/09/1955 | 12/11/1966 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13123 | 03/09/1955 | 12/11/1966 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13124 | 03/09/1955 | 12/11/1966 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13171 | 07/09/1955 | 24/01/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13172 | 07/09/1955 | 07/05/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73089 | 09/09/1955 | 25/09/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13173 | 20/09/1955 | 19/12/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13174 | 23/09/1955 | 08/07/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13175 | 29/09/1955 | 05/04/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13176 | 30/09/1955 | 21/10/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13177 | 30/09/1955 | 01/04/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13178 | 06/10/1955 | 04/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13179 | 07/10/1955 | 18/03/1984 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73090 | 08/10/1955 | 09/10/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73091 | 14/10/1955 | 21/05/1965 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13180 | 18/10/1955 | 06/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13181 | 18/10/1955 | 08/07/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13182 | 18/10/1955 | 15/08/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73092 | 21/10/1955 | 09/07/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13183 | 24/10/1955 | 30/12/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13184 | 27/10/1955 | 01/01/1979 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73095 | 11/1955 | 27/08/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13185 | 04/11/1955 | 23/03/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13186 | 04/11/1955 | 01/06/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13187 | 04/11/1955 | 25/10/1981 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73093 | 04/11/1955 | 09/07/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13188 | 09/11/1955 | 10/06/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13189 | 10/11/1955 | 02/06/1977 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73094 | 10/11/1955 | 13/05/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13190 | 15/11/1955 | 20/03/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13191 | 15/11/1955 | 01/03/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13192 | 18/11/1955 | 31/12/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13193 | 22/11/1955 | 16/09/1967 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13194 | 24/11/1955 | 02/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13195 | 25/11/1955 | 03/08/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73096 | 25/11/1955 | 25/11/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13196 | 02/12/1955 | 06/08/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73097 | 06/12/1955 | 06/05/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13198 | 08/12/1955 | 19/12/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13199 | 08/12/1955 | 15/03/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13200 | 13/12/1955 | 29/01/1986 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73098 | 15/12/1955 | 03/03/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13201 | 16/12/1955 | 21/09/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13202 | 16/12/1955 | 20/08/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13203 | 21/12/1955 | 12/02/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13204 | 21/12/1955 | 07/08/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13205 | 23/12/1955 | 28/11/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13197 | 30/12/1955 | 17/07/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13206 | 30/12/1955 | 14/01/1978 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73099 | 30/12/1955 | 19/10/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13207 | 26/01/1956 | 21/09/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13208 | 03/02/1956 | 02/06/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13209 | 09/02/1956 | 25/01/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13210 | 16/02/1956 | 13/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13211 | 24/02/1956 | 16/03/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13212 | 29/02/1956 | 12/12/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13213 | 05/03/1956 | 12/12/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13214 | 13/03/1956 | 01/12/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13215 | 16/03/1956 | 17/07/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13216 | 23/03/1956 | 31/03/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13245 | 14/05/1956 | 30/10/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13246 | 14/05/1956 | 01/05/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13247 | 14/05/1956 | 22/06/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13248 | 18/05/1956 | 03/05/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13249 | 18/05/1956 | 04/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13258 | 20/06/1956 | 06/12/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13259 | 22/06/1956 | 12/10/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13260 | 29/06/1956 | 20/01/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13261 | 05/07/1956 | 30/12/1972 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73125 | 06/07/1956 | 29/06/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13262 | 12/07/1956 | 09/07/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73126 | 13/07/1956 | 20/04/1968 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73127 | 09/08/1956 | 04/11/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13263 | 10/08/1956 | 10/07/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13264 | 20/08/1956 | 09/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13265 | 23/08/1956 | 25/09/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13266 | 24/08/1956 | 01/11/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73128 | 28/08/1956 | 11/05/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13267 | 31/08/1956 | 25/04/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73129 | 31/08/1956 | 02/12/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13268 | 07/09/1956 | 01/12/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73130 | 12/09/1956 | 21/01/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13269 | 14/09/1956 | 25/01/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73131 | 24/09/1956 | 30/01/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13270 | 29/09/1956 | 13/04/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13271 | 29/09/1956 | 19/12/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73132 | 04/10/1956 | 30/03/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13272 | 06/10/1956 | 23/05/1989 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13273 | 11/10/1956 | 01/07/1987 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73133 | 11/10/1956 | 29/06/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13274 | 17/10/1956 | 21/08/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73134 | 18/10/1956 | 22/06/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13275 | 22/10/1956 | 13/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13276 | 26/10/1956 | 19/02/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13277 | 26/10/1956 | 28/09/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73135 | 27/10/1956 | 30/03/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13278 | 02/11/1956 | 07/10/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13279 | 02/11/1956 | 27/02/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73136 | 03/11/1956 | 16/03/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13280 | 09/11/1956 | 26/09/1988 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73137 | 09/11/1956 | 17/06/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13281 | 10/11/1956 | 03/03/1985 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73138 | 15/11/1956 | 27/04/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13282 | 16/11/1956 | 06/09/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13283 | 16/11/1956 | 02/11/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73139 | 22/11/1956 | 13/05/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13284 | 23/11/1956 | 19/02/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13285 | 23/11/1956 | 26/09/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73140 | 29/11/1956 | 28/10/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13286 | 30/11/1956 | 02/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13287 | 30/11/1956 | 25/04/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73141 | 06/12/1956 | 29/07/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13288 | 10/12/1956 | 20/07/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13289 | 10/12/1956 | 20/03/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73142 | 13/12/1956 | 27/04/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13290 | 14/12/1956 | 30/03/1986 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73143 | 20/12/1956 | 29/06/1968 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13291 | 21/12/1956 | 01/03/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13292 | 27/12/1956 | 23/12/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13293 | 28/12/1956 | 24/06/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13294 | 28/12/1956 | 27/07/1988 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73144 | 28/12/1956 | 26/08/1967 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13295 | 14/01/1957 | 06/10/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13296 | 17/01/1957 | 24/11/1985 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73145 | 24/01/1957 | 26/09/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13297 | 04/02/1957 | 01/11/1983 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73146 | 12/02/1957 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73147 | 13/02/1957 | 21/08/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73148 | 07/03/1957 | 20/09/1965 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13337 | 20/03/1957 | 17/12/1977 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73149 | 20/03/1957 | 10/12/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13338 | 23/03/1957 | 14/07/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13339 | 29/03/1957 | 08/07/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13340 | 30/03/1957 | 19/12/1982 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73150 | 04/04/1957 | 10/12/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13341 | 05/04/1957 | 22/07/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13342 | 12/04/1957 | 06/07/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13343 | 12/04/1957 | 19/12/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13344 | 18/04/1957 | 23/12/1984 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73151 | 18/04/1957 | 22/08/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13345 | 26/04/1957 | 22/02/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13346 | 26/04/1957 | 21/06/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13347 | 03/05/1957 | 22/11/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13348 | 03/05/1957 | 21/06/1977 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73152 | 09/05/1957 | 06/12/1965 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13349 | 10/05/1957 | 12/04/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13350 | 10/05/1957 | 27/10/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13351 | 17/05/1957 | 01/12/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13362 | 17/05/1957 | 01/05/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13363 | 24/05/1957 | 24/12/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13364 | 24/05/1957 | 02/11/1980 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73153 | 24/05/1957 | 10/12/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13365 | 31/05/1957 | 23/05/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13366 | 31/05/1957 | 30/10/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13352 | 07/06/1957 | 02/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13353 | 11/06/1957 | 24/02/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13354 | 14/06/1957 | 01/05/1985 | |||
BR | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73154 | 14/06/1957 | 31/12/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13355 | 19/06/1957 | 12/09/1988 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13125 | 21/06/1957 | 08/07/1967 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13356 | 21/06/1957 | 25/04/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | 13357 | 27/06/1957 | 27/02/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3358 | 28/06/1957 | 21/01/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3359 | 28/06/1957 | 22/12/1985 | |||
D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13126 | 29/06/1957 | 12/11/1966 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3360 | 05/07/1957 | 25/04/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3361 | 05/07/1957 | 04/01/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3367 | 11/07/1957 | 16/08/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3368 | 11/07/1957 | 08/03/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3369 | 26/07/1957 | 19/07/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3370 | 02/08/1957 | 17/07/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3371 | 07/08/1957 | 31/12/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3372 | 10/08/1957 | 29/06/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3373 | 15/08/1957 | 31/12/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3374 | 16/08/1957 | 19/05/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3375 | 22/08/1957 | 30/10/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3376 | 23/08/1957 | 21/12/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3377 | 30/08/1957 | 21/12/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3378 | 30/08/1957 | 21/02/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3379 | 05/09/1957 | 17/07/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3380 | 06/09/1957 | 04/09/1977 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3381 | 12/09/1957 | 19/12/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3382 | 13/09/1957 | 09/05/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3384 | 20/09/1957 | 22/02/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3383 | 27/09/1957 | 23/05/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3385 | 27/09/1957 | 12/02/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3386 | 27/09/1957 | 09/03/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3387 | 27/09/1957 | 31/10/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3388 | 04/10/1957 | 03/10/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3389 | 11/10/1957 | 25/04/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3390 | 16/10/1957 | 19/12/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3391 | 18/10/1957 | 01/06/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3392 | 18/10/1957 | 18/09/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3393 | 25/10/1957 | 11/07/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3394 | 29/10/1957 | 23/12/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3395 | 01/11/1957 | 08/07/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3396 | 08/11/1957 | 01/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3397 | 08/11/1957 | 28/02/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3398 | 15/11/1957 | 31/12/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3399 | 15/11/1957 | 24/06/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3400 | 23/11/1957 | 02/12/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3401 | 23/11/1957 | 14/03/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3402 | 29/11/1957 | 16/09/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3403 | 29/11/1957 | 19/12/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3404 | 06/12/1957 | 03/09/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3405 | 13/12/1957 | 16/01/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3406 | 19/12/1957 | 05/04/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3407 | 27/12/1957 | 06/02/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3408 | 01/01/1958 | 15/07/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3409 | 08/01/1958 | 07/10/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3410 | 16/01/1958 | 16/08/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3411 | 22/01/1958 | 01/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3412 | 24/01/1958 | 04/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3413 | 31/01/1958 | 01/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3414 | 07/02/1958 | 01/05/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3415 | 14/02/1958 | 01/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3416 | 21/02/1958 | 01/03/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3417 | 28/02/1958 | 01/11/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3418 | 12/03/1958 | 09/07/1982 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3503 | 14/04/1958 | 20/07/2001 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3504 | 17/04/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3505 | 18/04/1958 | 19/03/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3506 | 18/04/1958 | 04/08/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3507 | 25/04/1958 | 01/12/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3508 | 25/04/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3509 | 02/05/1958 | 20/11/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3510 | 02/05/1958 | 27/07/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3511 | 09/05/1958 | 13/03/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3512 | 09/05/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3513 | 16/05/1958 | 15/07/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3514 | 16/05/1958 | 13/11/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3515 | 23/05/1958 | 21/12/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3516 | 23/05/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3517 | 23/05/1958 | 30/09/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3518 | 30/05/1958 | 18/10/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3519 | 30/05/1958 | 27/07/1978 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3520 | 06/06/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3521 | 06/06/1958 | 20/04/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3522 | 06/06/1958 | 01/02/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3523 | 13/06/1958 | 29/04/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3524 | 13/06/1958 | 15/06/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3525 | 20/06/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3526 | 20/06/1958 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3527 | 20/06/1958 | 24/11/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3528 | 27/06/1958 | 30/06/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3529 | 27/06/1958 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3530 | 04/07/1958 | 30/09/1996 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3531 | 04/07/1958 | 14/02/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3532 | 04/07/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3533 | 10/07/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3534 | 11/07/1958 | 23/04/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3535 | 11/07/1958 | 12/09/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3536 | 08/08/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3537 | 08/08/1958 | 09/12/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3538 | 15/08/1958 | 24/11/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3539 | 15/08/1958 | 10/06/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3540 | 22/08/1958 | 09/09/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3541 | 22/08/1958 | 02/07/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3542 | 29/08/1958 | 14/11/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3543 | 29/08/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3544 | 05/09/1958 | 01/10/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3545 | 05/09/1958 | 18/12/1985 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5000 | 05/09/1958 | 31/01/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3546 | 12/09/1958 | 04/07/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3547 | 19/09/1958 | 16/10/1983 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3548 | 26/09/1958 | 17/03/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3549 | 26/09/1958 | 10/02/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3550 | 03/10/1958 | 30/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3551 | 03/10/1958 | 10/01/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3552 | 10/10/1958 | 01/12/1984 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3553 | 17/10/1958 | 23/03/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3554 | 24/10/1958 | 17/10/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3555 | 24/10/1958 | 03/05/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5001 | 29/10/1958 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3556 | 30/10/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3557 | 03/11/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3558 | 07/11/1958 | 07/07/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3559 | 07/11/1958 | 02/11/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3560 | 14/11/1958 | 20/07/2001 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3561 | 21/11/1958 | 02/12/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3562 | 28/11/1958 | 11/11/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3563 | 28/11/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3564 | 28/11/1958 | 31/01/2003 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5002 | 03/12/1958 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3565 | 05/12/1958 | 02/05/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3566 | 05/12/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3567 | 12/12/1958 | 10/06/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3568 | 12/12/1958 | 05/10/1980 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5003 | 12/12/1958 | 16/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3569 | 19/12/1958 | 12/10/1981 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5004 | 22/12/1958 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3570 | 24/12/1958 | 01/09/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3571 | 03/01/1959 | 29/04/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3572 | 03/01/1959 | 01/09/1985 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5005 | 03/01/1959 | 25/01/1969 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5006 | 03/01/1959 | 16/08/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5007 | 07/02/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5008 | 28/02/1959 | 16/08/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5009 | 14/03/1959 | 18/07/1976 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5010 | 21/03/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5011 | 28/03/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5012 | 11/04/1959 | 16/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3763 | 18/04/1959 | 12/03/1977 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5013 | 18/04/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3764 | 25/04/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3765 | 02/05/1959 | 10/11/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3766 | 09/05/1959 | 31/12/2007 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5014 | 09/05/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3767 | 16/05/1959 | 30/07/1999 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3768 | 16/05/1959 | 31/05/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3769 | 30/05/1959 | 30/03/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3770 | 30/05/1959 | 31/01/1994 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5015 | 30/05/1959 | 16/08/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5016 | 30/05/1959 | 16/08/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5017 | 06/06/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3771 | 13/06/1959 | 16/07/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3772 | 13/06/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3773 | 27/06/1959 | 29/02/1988 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5018 | 27/06/1959 | 16/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3774 | 04/07/1959 | 31/01/2003 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3775 | 11/07/1959 | 07/11/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3776 | 11/07/1959 | 08/11/1993 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5019 | 11/07/1959 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3777 | 25/07/1959 | 26/06/1998 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3778 | 08/08/1959 | ||||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D1 | 14/08/1959 | 30/10/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3779 | 15/08/1959 | 21/09/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5020 | 20/08/1959 | 10/08/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5021 | 20/08/1959 | 10/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3780 | 22/08/1959 | 01/12/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3781 | 29/08/1959 | 05/02/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3782 | 05/09/1959 | 01/12/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3783 | 05/09/1959 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5022 | 07/09/1959 | 31/01/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3784 | 12/09/1959 | 12/10/1981 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D3 | 18/09/1959 | 17/07/1976 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | 19/09/1959 | 01/02/1979 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3785 | 19/09/1959 | 14/09/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5023 | 25/09/1959 | 03/09/1978 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D4 | 26/09/1959 | 30/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3786 | 26/09/1959 | 12/10/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3787 | 26/09/1959 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5024 | 02/10/1959 | 10/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3788 | 10/10/1959 | 20/06/1988 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D5 | 14/10/1959 | 30/04/1978 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5025 | 16/10/1959 | 31/01/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3789 | 17/10/1959 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5026 | 22/10/1959 | 10/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3790 | 24/10/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3791 | 24/10/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3792 | 31/10/1959 | 31/01/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3793 | 31/10/1959 | 27/04/1988 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5027 | 31/10/1959 | 17/07/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3794 | 07/11/1959 | 31/01/1994 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D6 | 12/11/1959 | 25/01/1977 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5028 | 13/11/1959 | 04/06/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3795 | 21/11/1959 | 12/10/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3796 | 21/11/1959 | ||||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D7 | 28/11/1959 | 30/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3797 | 28/11/1959 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5029 | 28/11/1959 | 10/08/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3798 | 05/12/1959 | 11/12/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3799 | 05/12/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3800 | 12/12/1959 | ||||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D8 | 18/12/1959 | 30/11/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3801 | 19/12/1959 | 01/02/1993 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5066 | 19/12/1959 | 02/02/1976 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D9 | 24/12/1959 | 01/03/1979 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5067 | 24/12/1959 | 09/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3802 | 26/12/1959 | 28/02/2007 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5068 | 31/12/1959 | 09/10/1972 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5069 | 01/01/1960 | 01/12/1976 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5070 | 23/01/1960 | 02/02/1976 | |||
44 | 1Co-Co1 | D10 | 05/02/1960 | 12/05/1977 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5071 | 06/02/1960 | 16/08/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5072 | 17/02/1960 | 05/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3937 | 04/03/1960 | 23/05/1989 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3938 | 04/03/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5073 | 04/03/1960 | 02/02/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3939 | 10/03/1960 | 20/03/1992 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5074 | 14/03/1960 | 04/10/1975 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3940 | 16/03/1960 | 14/01/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3941 | 19/03/1960 | 20/07/2001 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3942 | 26/03/1960 | 20/09/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3943 | 26/03/1960 | 30/09/2008 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5075 | 26/03/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3944 | 31/03/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3945 | 31/03/1960 | 22/11/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3946 | 02/04/1960 | 25/09/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3947 | 02/04/1960 | 23/02/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3950 | 08/04/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3949 | 09/04/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3951 | 09/04/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3948 | 18/04/1960 | 01/03/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3952 | 23/04/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3953 | 23/04/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3955 | 23/04/1960 | 14/02/1991 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5114 | 23/04/1960 | 09/10/1972 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3954 | 29/04/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3957 | 30/04/1960 | 23/04/1993 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5115 | 30/04/1960 | 31/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3956 | 07/05/1960 | 14/01/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3959 | 07/05/1960 | 01/10/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3960 | 07/05/1960 | 28/02/2007 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5116 | 07/05/1960 | 15/09/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3958 | 14/05/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5117 | 14/05/1960 | 02/02/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3961 | 21/05/1960 | 23/07/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3962 | 21/05/1960 | 13/11/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3963 | 21/05/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3964 | 21/05/1960 | 04/05/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5118 | 21/05/1960 | 31/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3965 | 28/05/1960 | 12/11/1990 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3966 | 28/05/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5119 | 28/05/1960 | 18/07/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3967 | 04/06/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3968 | 04/06/1960 | 25/01/1993 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5120 | 04/06/1960 | 31/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3969 | 11/06/1960 | 31/01/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3970 | 11/06/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5121 | 11/06/1960 | 31/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3971 | 18/06/1960 | 11/12/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3972 | 18/06/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5122 | 18/06/1960 | 02/10/1968 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3973 | 25/06/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3974 | 25/06/1960 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3975 | 25/06/1960 | 28/02/2007 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5123 | 25/06/1960 | 18/07/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3976 | 02/07/1960 | 15/05/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5124 | 02/07/1960 | 01/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3977 | 09/07/1960 | 01/12/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3978 | 09/07/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3980 | 09/07/1960 | 06/02/1978 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5125 | 14/07/1960 | 27/03/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3979 | 16/07/1960 | 29/08/1997 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5126 | 23/07/1960 | 02/02/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3981 | 25/07/1960 | 13/09/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3982 | 25/07/1960 | 20/11/1992 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5127 | 30/07/1960 | 02/02/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3984 | 05/08/1960 | 01/02/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3983 | 13/08/1960 | 01/04/1996 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3985 | 13/08/1960 | 31/05/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3986 | 13/08/1960 | 02/04/1997 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5128 | 13/08/1960 | 18/07/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3987 | 20/08/1960 | 30/06/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3988 | 27/08/1960 | 22/02/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5129 | 27/08/1960 | 31/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3989 | 03/09/1960 | 11/12/1992 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5130 | 03/09/1960 | 01/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3990 | 09/09/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3991 | 09/09/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5131 | 17/09/1960 | 11/09/1971 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3992 | 22/09/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3993 | 22/09/1960 | 30/06/2005 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5132 | 23/09/1960 | 02/02/1976 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5133 | 24/09/1960 | 12/03/1978 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D11 | 01/10/1960 | 27/04/1987 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3994 | 01/10/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3996 | 01/10/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5134 | 06/10/1960 | 04/12/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3995 | 08/10/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3997 | 08/10/1960 | 16/06/1993 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5135 | 08/10/1960 | 04/01/1976 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D12 | 15/10/1960 | 31/05/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 15/10/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5137 | 18/10/1960 | 17/07/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 22/10/1960 | 07/04/1993 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5136 | 22/10/1960 | 04/10/1975 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5138 | 27/10/1960 | 10/08/1969 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4000 | 29/10/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5139 | 29/10/1960 | 10/08/1969 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D13 | 05/11/1960 | 20/01/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4001 | 05/11/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5140 | 05/11/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4002 | 12/11/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4003 | 12/11/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4004 | 12/11/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5141 | 12/11/1960 | 17/07/1976 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5142 | 19/11/1960 | 01/07/1976 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D14 | 24/11/1960 | 03/03/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4005 | 26/11/1960 | 30/11/2005 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5143 | 26/11/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4006 | 03/12/1960 | 09/05/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5144 | 03/12/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5145 | 07/12/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D15 | 09/12/1960 | 14/12/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4007 | 10/12/1960 | 10/01/1992 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5146 | 10/12/1960 | 31/01/1976 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D16 | 15/12/1960 | 18/11/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4008 | 17/12/1960 | 24/06/1991 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5147 | 17/12/1960 | 18/07/1976 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D17 | 23/12/1960 | 14/12/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4009 | 23/12/1960 | 14/06/1990 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5148 | 23/12/1960 | 05/10/1975 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D18 | 31/12/1960 | 19/11/1987 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D19 | 31/12/1960 | 10/05/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4010 | 31/12/1960 | ||||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5149 | 07/02/1961 | 09/10/1972 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D20 | 24/02/1961 | 27/04/1987 | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5150 | 27/02/1961 | 01/12/1976 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D21 | 03/03/1961 | 07/04/1986 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D22 | 30/03/1961 | 11/05/1987 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D23 | 08/04/1961 | 01/08/1985 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D24 | 15/04/1961 | 31/05/1981 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D25 | 15/04/1961 | 14/12/1980 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D26 | 22/04/1961 | 08/12/1985 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D27 | 29/04/1961 | 14/12/1980 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D28 | 04/05/1961 | 22/01/1988 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D29 | 13/05/1961 | 16/09/1984 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D30 | 20/05/1961 | 14/12/1980 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D31 | 03/06/1961 | 30/11/1980 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D32 | 12/06/1961 | 27/04/1987 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D33 | 19/06/1961 | 04/09/1985 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D34 | 29/06/1961 | 07/05/1987 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D35 | 30/06/1961 | 12/05/1986 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D36 | 06/07/1961 | 31/05/1981 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D37 | 10/07/1961 | 13/09/1986 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D38 | 13/07/1961 | 14/12/1980 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D39 | 20/07/1961 | 04/02/1988 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D40 | 26/07/1961 | 10/05/1987 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D41 | 29/07/1961 | 04/01/1985 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D42 | 19/08/1961 | 07/1988 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D43 | 28/08/1961 | 27/07/1988 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D44 | 02/09/1961 | 31/05/1981 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D45 | 08/09/1961 | 11/05/1986 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D47 | 30/09/1961 | 22/12/1986 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D46 | 02/10/1961 | 27/07/1988 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D48 | 02/10/1961 | 05/06/1985 | |||
45 | 1Co-Co1 | D49 | 07/10/1961 | 14/12/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D138 | 21/10/1961 | 20/12/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D139 | 03/11/1961 | 20/09/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D141 | 17/11/1961 | 26/06/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D140 | 25/11/1961 | 05/10/1978 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D143 | 01/12/1961 | 31/01/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D142 | 05/12/1961 | 04/12/1977 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D144 | 09/12/1961 | 07/02/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D145 | 09/12/1961 | 11/10/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D146 | 15/12/1961 | 01/10/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D147 | 16/12/1961 | 04/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D148 | 22/12/1961 | 25/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D149 | 30/12/1961 | 27/07/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D150 | 30/12/1961 | 01/11/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D151 | 17/01/1962 | 06/05/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D153 | 25/01/1962 | 31/12/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D152 | 01/02/1962 | 14/12/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D154 | 16/02/1962 | 22/04/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D155 | 16/02/1962 | 18/12/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D156 | 23/02/1962 | 14/12/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D157 | 03/03/1962 | 14/12/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D158 | 15/03/1962 | 16/01/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D159 | 23/03/1962 | 28/03/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D160 | 31/03/1962 | 01/11/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D161 | 31/03/1962 | 16/04/1978 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D162 | 09/04/1962 | 25/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D163 | 18/04/1962 | 25/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D164 | 19/04/1962 | 25/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D165 | 04/05/1962 | 27/05/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D166 | 09/05/1962 | 30/01/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D167 | 31/05/1962 | 01/11/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D168 | 31/05/1962 | 24/04/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D169 | 07/06/1962 | 11/10/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D170 | 21/06/1962 | 19/06/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D172 | 02/07/1962 | 01/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D171 | 06/07/1962 | 02/11/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D173 | 13/07/1962 | 02/05/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D174 | 13/07/1962 | 24/06/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D175 | 03/08/1962 | 28/03/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D176 | 14/08/1962 | 23/10/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D177 | 24/08/1962 | 26/10/1980 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D178 | 14/09/1962 | 01/11/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D180 | 14/09/1962 | 09/11/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D179 | 21/09/1962 | 01/11/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D181 | 22/09/1962 | 08/04/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D182 | 27/09/1962 | 01/11/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D183 | 04/10/1962 | 06/05/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D184 | 15/10/1962 | 02/09/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D185 | 16/10/1962 | 13/09/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D186 | 09/11/1962 | 12/12/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D187 | 23/11/1962 | 26/10/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D188 | 17/12/1962 | 04/12/1983 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D189 | 26/01/1963 | 30/09/1984 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D190 | 26/01/1963 | 22/02/1981 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D191 | 26/01/1963 | 10/01/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D192 | 26/01/1963 | 31/10/1982 | |||
46 | 1Co-Co1 | D193 | 26/01/1963 | 31/10/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5186 | 19/03/1963 | 19/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5187 | 22/03/1963 | 19/01/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5188 | 23/03/1963 | 31/05/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5189 | 27/03/1963 | 31/05/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5190 | 04/04/1963 | 16/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5192 | 29/04/1963 | 08/05/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5193 | 29/04/1963 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5191 | 30/04/1963 | 31/05/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5194 | 30/04/1963 | 08/07/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5195 | 30/04/1963 | 04/10/1975 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5197 | 09/05/1963 | 07/09/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5196 | 10/05/1963 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5198 | 16/05/1963 | 20/02/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5199 | 17/05/1963 | 08/01/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5201 | 20/05/1963 | 18/09/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5202 | 28/05/1963 | 05/10/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5203 | 29/05/1963 | 01/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5200 | 31/05/1963 | 24/04/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5204 | 07/06/1963 | 13/05/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5205 | 14/06/1963 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5206 | 19/06/1963 | 01/08/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5207 | 21/06/1963 | 15/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5208 | 21/06/1963 | 03/02/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5209 | 21/06/1963 | 20/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5210 | 21/06/1963 | 09/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5211 | 24/06/1963 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5212 | 28/06/1963 | 19/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5213 | 05/07/1963 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5214 | 05/07/1963 | 09/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5216 | 11/07/1963 | 21/06/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5215 | 15/07/1963 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5217 | 02/08/1963 | 12/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5218 | 02/08/1963 | 14/07/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5219 | 09/08/1963 | 19/12/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5221 | 31/08/1963 | 21/06/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5220 | 17/09/1963 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5222 | 17/09/1963 | 05/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7568 | 27/09/1963 | 25/01/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7570 | 04/10/1963 | 13/06/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7569 | 08/10/1963 | 03/04/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7571 | 09/10/1963 | 31/01/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7572 | 17/10/1963 | 14/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7573 | 23/10/1963 | 05/10/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7574 | 23/10/1963 | 08/05/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7576 | 09/11/1963 | 10/06/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7577 | 09/11/1963 | 26/06/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7575 | 30/11/1963 | 05/10/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5234 | 11/12/1963 | 18/12/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5233 | 19/12/1963 | 01/07/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5235 | 19/12/1963 | 21/03/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5236 | 19/12/1963 | 09/10/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5237 | 19/12/1963 | 28/09/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5238 | 19/12/1963 | 16/08/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5239 | 20/12/1963 | 24/02/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5242 | 30/12/1963 | 11/05/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5240 | 31/12/1963 | 22/05/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5241 | 31/12/1963 | 15/10/1978 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5243 | 08/01/1964 | 07/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5244 | 20/01/1964 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5245 | 21/01/1964 | 23/07/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5246 | 24/01/1964 | 31/12/1977 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5247 | 31/01/1964 | 13/11/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5248 | 06/02/1964 | 15/10/1978 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5249 | 07/02/1964 | 01/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5250 | 14/02/1964 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5251 | 19/02/1964 | 16/01/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5252 | 21/02/1964 | 11/05/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5253 | 26/02/1964 | 07/09/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5254 | 28/02/1964 | 26/09/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5255 | 06/03/1964 | 04/04/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5256 | 13/03/1964 | 09/10/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5257 | 17/03/1964 | 03/05/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5258 | 20/03/1964 | 14/07/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5259 | 25/03/1964 | 11/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5260 | 26/03/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5261 | 02/04/1964 | 30/03/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5262 | 10/04/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5263 | 14/04/1964 | 26/06/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5264 | 17/04/1964 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5265 | 22/04/1964 | 02/10/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5266 | 29/04/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5267 | 29/04/1964 | 22/01/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5269 | 06/05/1964 | 14/06/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5268 | 08/05/1964 | 04/01/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5270 | 14/05/1964 | 27/11/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5271 | 15/05/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5272 | 22/05/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5273 | 22/05/1964 | 01/05/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5274 | 29/05/1964 | 20/10/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5275 | 03/06/1964 | 06/12/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5276 | 05/06/1964 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5277 | 11/06/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5278 | 12/06/1964 | 02/05/1971 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5279 | 18/06/1964 | 07/02/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5280 | 20/06/1964 | 05/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5281 | 26/06/1964 | 01/01/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5283 | 02/07/1964 | 28/08/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5284 | 09/07/1964 | 19/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5285 | 09/07/1964 | 16/01/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5282 | 10/07/1964 | 19/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5286 | 29/07/1964 | 27/03/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5287 | 29/07/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5288 | 30/07/1964 | 11/12/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5289 | 13/08/1964 | 07/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5290 | 17/08/1964 | 18/12/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5291 | 24/08/1964 | 19/09/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5292 | 26/08/1964 | 18/10/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5293 | 02/09/1964 | 14/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5294 | 07/09/1964 | 17/04/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5295 | 10/09/1964 | 02/01/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5296 | 18/09/1964 | 07/08/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5297 | 18/09/1964 | 30/03/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5298 | 28/09/1964 | 07/09/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7500 | 02/10/1964 | 13/06/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7501 | 06/10/1964 | 12/09/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7502 | 08/10/1964 | 26/01/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7503 | 14/10/1964 | 03/04/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7504 | 17/10/1964 | 27/03/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7505 | 22/10/1964 | 01/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7506 | 27/10/1964 | 20/12/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7507 | 29/10/1964 | 24/10/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7508 | 05/11/1964 | 22/05/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7509 | 05/11/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7510 | 10/11/1964 | 10/10/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7511 | 17/11/1964 | 28/11/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7512 | 20/11/1964 | 31/05/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7513 | 25/11/1964 | 09/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7514 | 25/11/1964 | 21/08/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7515 | 02/12/1964 | 03/11/1978 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7516 | 04/12/1964 | 02/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7517 | 09/12/1964 | 29/05/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7518 | 12/12/1964 | 22/05/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7520 | 22/12/1964 | 08/08/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7519 | 06/01/1965 | 08/09/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7521 | 07/01/1965 | 15/10/1978 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7522 | 08/01/1965 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7523 | 12/01/1965 | 19/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7524 | 18/01/1965 | 20/09/1976 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7525 | 27/01/1965 | 05/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7526 | 28/01/1965 | 09/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7527 | 30/01/1965 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7528 | 02/02/1965 | 03/04/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7529 | 12/02/1965 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7530 | 12/02/1965 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7531 | 17/02/1965 | 11/08/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7532 | 18/02/1965 | 21/01/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7533 | 24/02/1965 | 01/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7534 | 03/03/1965 | 28/08/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7535 | 03/03/1965 | 05/11/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7536 | 12/03/1965 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7537 | 12/03/1965 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7538 | 19/03/1965 | 15/08/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7539 | 25/03/1965 | 09/07/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7540 | 29/03/1965 | 28/01/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7541 | 29/03/1965 | 01/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7542 | 09/04/1965 | 07/05/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7543 | 15/04/1965 | 12/11/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7545 | 06/05/1965 | 14/06/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7546 | 07/05/1965 | 17/03/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7544 | 13/05/1965 | 03/06/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7547 | 14/05/1965 | 01/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7548 | 20/05/1965 | 21/02/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7549 | 28/05/1965 | 09/02/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7550 | 04/06/1965 | 11/02/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7551 | 16/06/1965 | 28/01/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7552 | 23/06/1965 | 25/06/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7553 | 24/06/1965 | 01/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7554 | 03/07/1965 | 06/07/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7555 | 09/07/1965 | 09/05/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7556 | 09/07/1965 | 21/03/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7557 | 04/08/1965 | 12/11/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7558 | 13/08/1965 | 06/05/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7559 | 28/08/1965 | 17/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7560 | 18/09/1965 | 29/04/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D5299 | 15/10/1965 | 10/01/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7561 | 20/10/1965 | 25/07/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7563 | 12/11/1965 | 19/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7562 | 03/12/1965 | 21/05/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7565 | 03/12/1965 | 19/06/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7564 | 12/12/1965 | 14/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7566 | 19/01/1966 | 28/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7567 | 20/01/1966 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7598 | 05/02/1966 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7599 | 05/02/1966 | 29/01/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7600 | 15/02/1966 | 13/05/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7601 | 16/02/1966 | 15/01/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7602 | 21/02/1966 | 30/03/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7603 | 25/02/1966 | 25/09/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7604 | 11/03/1966 | 04/09/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7605 | 12/03/1966 | 31/03/1972 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7606 | 19/03/1966 | 01/04/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7607 | 24/03/1966 | 02/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7608 | 02/04/1966 | 21/12/1984 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7609 | 02/04/1966 | 03/09/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7610 | 07/04/1966 | 12/12/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7611 | 16/04/1966 | 04/01/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7612 | 23/04/1966 | 01/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7613 | 30/04/1966 | 16/11/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7614 | 07/06/1966 | 14/12/1980 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7615 | 12/06/1966 | 18/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7616 | 19/06/1966 | 18/09/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7617 | 12/08/1966 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7618 | 18/08/1966 | 01/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7619 | 20/08/1966 | 02/04/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7620 | 26/08/1966 | 28/11/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7621 | 29/08/1966 | 11/10/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7622 | 02/09/1966 | 12/07/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7623 | 08/09/1966 | 01/02/1981 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7661 | 08/11/1966 | 19/03/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7662 | 17/11/1966 | 13/06/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7663 | 23/11/1966 | 18/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7664 | 23/11/1966 | 01/03/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7665 | 07/12/1966 | 01/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7666 | 16/12/1966 | 01/09/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7660 | 31/12/1966 | 12/10/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7667 | 28/01/1967 | 24/04/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7668 | 28/01/1967 | 01/07/1982 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7670 | 28/01/1967 | 11/12/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7671 | 25/02/1967 | 29/09/1986 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7672 | 25/02/1967 | 01/09/1991 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7669 | 25/03/1967 | 20/03/1983 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7673 | 25/03/1967 | 19/03/1987 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7674 | 25/03/1967 | 23/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7675 | 22/04/1967 | 23/12/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7676 | 22/04/1967 | 23/01/1985 | |||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7677 | 29/04/1967 | 02/02/1984 |