Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2262 Week
» 2262 Month
» 69124 Year
» 1734500 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 271   10/1871 05/1922
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 272   10/1871 07/1928
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 273   10/1871 01/1924
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 275   10/1871 06/1928
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 274   11/1871 06/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 276   11/1871 02/1925
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 277   11/1871 11/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 278   11/1871 12/1910
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 279   12/1871 05/1924
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 280   12/1871 06/1928
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 336   11/1873 12/1928
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 337   11/1873 10/1922
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 338   11/1873 11/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 339   11/1873 01/1929
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 340   12/1873 08/1924
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 341   12/1873 12/1919
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 342   01/1874 02/1927
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 343   01/1874 03/1921
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 344   01/1874 10/1920
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 345   02/1874 02/1919
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 366   10/1875 12/1920
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 367   10/1875 07/1925
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 368   10/1875 03/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 369   10/1875 02/1920
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 370   11/1875 10/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 371   11/1875 08/1925
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 372   12/1875 04/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 373   12/1875 03/1921
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 374   12/1875 02/1927
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 411   04/1880 12/1920
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 412   04/1880 06/1922
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 413   05/1880 05/1924
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 414   05/1880 03/1923
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 415   06/1880 05/1925
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 416   08/1880 05/1922
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 23   12/1880 1920
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 24   12/1880 1920
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 447   02/1881 1920
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 448   02/1881 1920
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 449   03/1881 10/1924
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 450   03/1881 01/1925
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 417   03/1881 03/1924
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 451   04/1881 1914
MSJAR E8 2-4-0T 452   04/1881 1914
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 418   04/1881 06/1927
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 419   05/1881 10/1920
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 420   05/1881 02/1924
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 421   06/1881 01/1929
MSLR J59 0-6-0T 422   06/1881 09/1922
MSLR D8 4-4-0 37   07/1888 07/1923
MSLR D8 4-4-0 89   10/1888 03/1926
MSLR D8 4-4-0 400   10/1888 11/1923
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 574   06/1889 09/1946
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 575   07/1889 10/1945
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 576   08/1889 05/1937
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 577   09/1889 23/03/1948
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 578   11/1889 10/1932
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 579   11/1889 06/1943
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 161   12/1889 01/1938
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 165   12/1889 31/12/1954
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 173   01/1890 10/1949
MSLR D7 4-4-0 562   04/1890 08/1935
MSLR D7 4-4-0 563   04/1890 10/1929
MSLR D7 4-4-0 564   07/1890 12/1926
MSLR D7 4-4-0 565   08/1890 04/1933
MSLR D7 4-4-0 566   09/1890 08/1931
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 580   11/1890 12/1931
MSLR D7 4-4-0 567   12/1890 09/1931
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 581   02/1891 07/1945
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 582   02/1891 01/1949
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 601   05/1891 10/1933
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 602   05/1891 08/1939
MSLR N4 0-6-2T 603   07/1891 08/1933
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 7   09/1891 13/08/1956
MSLR D7 4-4-0 682   11/1891 12/1931
MSLR D7 4-4-0 684   11/1891 06/1939
MSLR D7 4-4-0 683   12/1891 04/1937
MSLR D7 4-4-0 685   01/1892 07/1930
MSLR D7 4-4-0 686   03/1892 08/1933
MSLR D7 4-4-0 687   05/1892 08/1935
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 47   08/1892 18/07/1949
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 171   11/1892 25/08/1951
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 584   12/1892 06/12/1947
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 583   01/1893 08/1936
MSLR F1 2-4-2T 585   02/1893 07/1931
MLSR J10 0-6-0 639   03/1893 03/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 640   04/1893 07/1943
MLSR J10 0-6-0 641   05/1893 10/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 642   06/1893 08/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 643   08/1893 29/12/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 644   12/1893 06/1938
MSLR D7 4-4-0 688   04/1894 04/1931
MSLR D7 4-4-0 689   05/1894 02/1936
MSLR D7 4-4-0 690   05/1894 05/1937
MSLR D7 4-4-0 691   07/1894 07/1933
MSLR D7 4-4-0 692   08/1894 04/1937
MSLR D7 4-4-0 693   09/1894 02/1930
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 536   05/1895 29/11/1960
GCR D5 4-4-0 694   07/1895 10/1932
GCR D5 4-4-0 695   08/1895 07/1931
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 200   09/1895 29/01/1960
GCR D5 4-4-0 696   10/1895 07/1930
GCR D5 4-4-0 697   10/1895 10/1932
GCR D5 4-4-0 698   11/1895 10/1931
GCR D5 4-4-0 699   12/1895 03/1933
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 756   12/1895 10/1938
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 757   02/1896 08/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 758   03/1896 11/1937
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 759   04/1896 12/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 760   05/1896 29/01/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 761   05/1896 03/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 762   06/1896 16/12/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 201   09/1896 06/12/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 202   10/1896 02/10/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 203   12/1896 12/04/1958
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 882   01/1897 06/1937
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 883   02/1897 19/11/1951
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 884   03/1897 06/1937
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 885   03/1897 01/1949
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 886   04/1897 11/1937
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 887   05/1897 05/1937
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 888   05/1897 07/1937
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 889   06/1897 12/1947
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 890   07/1897 02/1949
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 891   07/1897 05/1937
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 892   08/1897 04/1935
GCR D6 4-4-0 268   09/1897 07/1933
GCR D6 4-4-0 269   12/1897 11/1932
MSLR J62 0-6-0ST 893   12/1897 05/1937
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 204   02/1898 11/02/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 205   02/1898 03/1943
GCR D6 4-4-0 852   04/1898 06/1938
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 206   04/1898 03/06/1958
GCR D6 4-4-0 853   05/1898 04/1946
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 207   05/1898 11/03/1957
GCR D6 4-4-0 854   06/1898 05/1931
GCR D6 4-4-0 855   07/1898 12/1947
GCR D6 4-4-0 856   08/1898 01/1939
GCR D6 4-4-0 857   08/1898 08/1931
GCR D6 4-4-0 858   09/1898 11/1931
GCR D6 4-4-0 859   10/1898 09/1945
GCR D6 4-4-0 860   11/1898 11/1931
GCR D6 4-4-0 861   11/1898 04/1931
GCR D6 4-4-0 270   12/1898 04/1945
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 894   03/1899 05/11/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 895   03/1899 12/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 896   04/1899 06/10/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 897   05/1899 08/10/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 898   06/1899 24/06/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 899   06/1899 26/11/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 900   07/1899 08/11/1954
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 901   08/1899 24/09/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 902   09/1899 14/12/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 903   09/1899 17/09/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 904   10/1899 09/01/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 905   11/1899 21/09/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 906   11/1899 12/02/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 907   11/1899 26/01/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 908   12/1899 11/02/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 909   12/1899 02/01/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 910   01/1900 09/07/1956
LNER X4 4-2-2 967   01/1900 05/1924
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 911   02/1900 14/09/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 912   03/1900 11/12/1954
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 913   03/1900 06/08/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 914   04/1900 14/03/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 915   05/1900 17/03/1956
LNER X4 4-2-2 968   05/1900 05/1925
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 916   06/1900 12/05/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 917   06/1900 12/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 918   07/1900 06/08/1959
LNER X4 4-2-2 969   08/1900 07/1926
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 919   09/1900 11/01/1960
LNER X4 4-2-2 970   09/1900 02/1924
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 920   10/1900 12/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 921   11/1900 25/10/1956
LNER X4 4-2-2 971   11/1900 12/1923
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 922   12/1900 09/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 923   12/1900 14/12/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 924   12/1900 25/01/1957
LNER X4 4-2-2 972   12/1900 08/1927
MLSR J10 0-6-0 74   02/1901 16/02/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 75   02/1901 14/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 76   03/1901 08/1947
MLSR J10 0-6-0 77   03/1901 03/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 79   04/1901 01/1939
MLSR J10 0-6-0 80   04/1901 07/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 81   05/1901 26/09/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 82   05/1901 11/10/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 83   06/1901 24/11/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 84   06/1901 04/1937
MLSR J10 0-6-0 90   06/1901 22/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 94   06/1901 06/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 95   07/1901 24/11/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 96   08/1901 12/05/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 97   08/1901 03/10/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 98   08/1901 03/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 99   09/1901 10/08/1957
MLSR J10 0-6-0 100   10/1901 28/02/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 101   10/1901 25/08/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 103   11/1901 22/09/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 116   12/1901 30/03/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 117   12/1901 11/01/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 118   01/1902 14/05/1960
MLSR J10 0-6-0 119   01/1902 04/08/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 120   02/1902 12/12/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 122   02/1902 02/06/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 130   03/1902 30/03/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 131   03/1902 22/03/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 124   04/1902 26/08/1961
MLSR J10 0-6-0 121   04/1902 03/02/1948
MLSR J10 0-6-0 132   05/1902 17/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 134   05/1902 17/11/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 141   06/1902 07/07/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 172   06/1902 28/11/1947
MLSR J10 0-6-0 175   06/1902 12/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 176   07/1902 08/11/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 123   08/1902 12/05/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 125   08/1902 13/12/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 126   09/1902 26/04/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 174   10/1902 04/11/1947
GCR C13 4-4-2T 171   05/1903 05/1954
GCR C13 4-4-2T 178   05/1903 07/12/1957
GCR C13 4-4-2T 179   06/1903 11/06/1955
GCR C13 4-4-2T 188   07/1903 27/02/1956
GCR C13 4-4-2T 190   08/1903 27/12/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 191   08/1903 23/01/1960
GCR C13 4-4-2T 193   09/1903 27/12/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 199   09/1903 10/06/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 177 11/1903 21/10/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 197 12/1903 25/07/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 202 12/1903 15/08/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 204 01/1904 09/04/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 207 02/1904 24/10/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 208 02/1904 15/04/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 217 03/1904 11/07/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 220 03/1904 25/03/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 232 04/1904 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 233 05/1904 11/02/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 240 07/1904 25/07/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 241 07/1904 17/08/1959
GCR C13 4-4-2T 2   08/1904 13/12/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 9   09/1904 12/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 18   09/1904 27/09/1954
GCR C13 4-4-2T 20   10/1904 14/10/1957
GCR C13 4-4-2T 27   10/1904 14/11/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 47   11/1904 13/12/1954
GCR C13 4-4-2T 28   11/1904 06/08/1956
GCR C13 4-4-2T 29   12/1904 06/01/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 50   12/1904 30/11/1957
GCR C13 4-4-2T 55   12/1904 18/12/1954
GCR C13 4-4-2T 457   01/1905 28/04/1956
GCR C13 4-4-2T 454   02/1905 22/10/1956
GCR C13 4-4-2T 455   02/1905 12/1954
GCR C13 4-4-2T 456   03/1905 06/01/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 310   04/1905 03/10/1957
GCR C13 4-4-2T 357   04/1905 15/12/1952
GCR C13 4-4-2T 359   04/1905 25/02/1956
GCR C13 4-4-2T 114   05/1905 05/08/1957
GCR C13 4-4-2T 115   07/1905 13/01/1958
GCR C13 4-4-2T 453   08/1905 14/11/1958
GCR C5 4-4-2 258   12/1905 31/12/1946
GCR C4 4-4-2 260   02/1906 02/12/1950
GCR C5 4-4-2 259   02/1906 11/04/1947
GCR C4 4-4-2 261   03/1906 22/11/1950
GCR C4 4-4-2 262   04/1906 03/02/1948
GCR C4 4-4-2 358   05/1906 05/04/1948
GCR C4 4-4-2 360   06/1906 23/06/1948
GCR C4 4-4-2 362   06/1906 30/01/1948
GCR C4 4-4-2 361   07/1906 04/02/1949
GCR C4 4-4-2 363   08/1906 14/04/1949
GCR J63 0-6-0T 60   08/1906 06/04/1956
GCR J63 0-6-0T 61   09/1906 06/04/1956
GCR J63 0-6-0T 89   10/1906 04/03/1955
GCR J63 0-6-0T 157   10/1906 04/04/1956
GCR J63 0-6-0T 321   11/1906 26/10/1953
GCR J63 0-6-0T 538   11/1906 01/1955
GCR C5 4-4-2 364   12/1906 31/12/1947
GCR C5 4-4-2 365   12/1906 25/08/1947
GCR J11 0-6-0 281 12/1906 12/02/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 282 12/1906 06/05/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 283 01/1907 05/11/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 284 02/1907 28/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 285 02/1907 10/11/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 286 02/1907 14/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 287 03/1907 25/07/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 288 03/1907 11/07/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 289 03/1907 06/02/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 290 03/1907 23/04/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 291 04/1907 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 292 04/1907 11/12/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 293 04/1907 05/11/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 294 05/1907 13/12/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 295 05/1907 29/12/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 296 05/1907 28/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 297 06/1907 14/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 298 06/1907 04/11/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 299 06/1907 22/07/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 300 07/1907 26/10/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 301 07/1907 21/11/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 302 08/1907 29/08/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 303 08/1907 25/11/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 304 08/1907 10/08/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 305 09/1907 09/06/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 306 09/1907 11/12/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 307 10/1907 01/09/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 308 10/1907 30/03/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 309 10/1907 27/01/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 311 11/1907 08/11/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 312 11/1907 09/01/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 313 11/1907 25/07/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 314 11/1907 04/04/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 315 11/1907 22/12/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 316 12/1907 21/05/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 317 12/1907 24/10/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 318 12/1907 28/01/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 319 01/1908 17/02/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 320 01/1908 08/10/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 322 02/1908 05/08/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 323 02/1908 10/11/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 324 03/1908 09/06/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 325 04/1908 11/01/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 326 05/1908 25/02/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 327 06/1908 03/12/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 328 09/1908 10/02/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 329 10/1908 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 330 11/1908 19/04/1962
GCR Q4 0-8-0 39 02/1909 04/12/1950
GCR J11 0-6-0 16 04/1909 18/05/1961
GCR Q4 0-8-0 44 04/1909 26/11/1958
GCR Q4 0-8-0 48 05/1909 20/08/1959
GCR Q4 0-8-0 49 06/1909 17/11/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 62 06/1909 08/05/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 63 07/1909 22/06/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 5212 08/1909 12/03/1938
GCR Q4 0-8-0 213 09/1909 13/07/1938
GCR Q4 0-8-0 356 10/1909 08/05/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 159 10/1909 20/03/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 160 11/1909 05/06/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 161 11/1909 06/02/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 162 12/1909 05/03/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 163 12/1909 07/05/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 164 12/1909 26/05/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 963 1910 03/10/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1177 1910 17/04/1950
GCR J11 0-6-0 947 01/1910 24/08/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 948 02/1910 29/03/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 949 02/1910 21/04/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 950 03/1910 07/02/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 951 03/1910 22/10/1956
GCR J11 0-6-0 952 04/1910 06/04/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 953 04/1910 22/12/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 954 04/1910 31/05/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 955 05/1910 07/10/1957
GCR Q4 0-8-0 401 06/1910 22/12/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1174 06/1910 05/06/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1175 06/1910 19/07/1943
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1176 07/1910 13/06/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 956 08/1910 04/07/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 957 08/1910 28/04/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 958 08/1910 05/03/1937
GCR Q4 0-8-0 959 09/1910 12/11/1958
GCR Q4 0-8-0 960 10/1910 02/05/1936
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1178 10/1910 15/08/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 961 11/1910 03/02/1958
GCR Q4 0-8-0 962 11/1910 06/02/1950
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1179 11/1910 15/09/1959
GCR Q4 0-8-0 964 12/1910 30/08/1938
GCR Q4 0-8-0 965 12/1910 29/10/1938
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1180 01/1911 15/10/1951
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1181 01/1911 16/03/1939
GCR Q4 0-8-0 1182 02/1911 16/05/1939
GCR A5 4-6-2T 165 18/03/1911 24/08/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 166 15/04/1911 01/03/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 167 06/05/1911 24/12/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 168 20/05/1911 23/06/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 169 27/05/1911 07/04/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 170 10/06/1911 23/09/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 23 24/06/1911 03/03/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 24 01/07/1911 14/07/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 447 15/07/1911 21/12/1942
GCR A5 4-6-2T 448 12/08/1911 17/11/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 966 09/1911 18/11/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 331 10/1911 19/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 332 10/1911 03/10/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 333 11/1911 21/04/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 334 11/1911 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 335 11/1911 03/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 26 12/1911 03/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 69 12/1911 03/12/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 93 12/1911 21/08/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 102 01/1912 16/06/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 133 01/1912 05/09/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 155 02/1912 25/05/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 400 02/1912 09/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 402 02/1912 26/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 403 03/1912 14/09/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 404 03/1912 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 405 04/1912 14/11/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 406 05/1912 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 407 05/1912 02/03/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 408 05/1912 18/07/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 346 06/1912 04/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 347 06/1912 12/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 348 06/1912 16/04/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 349 07/1912 16/01/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 350 07/1912 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 351 08/1912 09/05/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 352 08/1912 04/05/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 353 08/1912 30/11/1960
GCR O4 2-8-0 354 09/1912 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 355 10/1912 22/06/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 449 19/10/1912 04/05/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 450 02/11/1912 23/10/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 451 16/11/1912 06/10/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 452 30/11/1912 07/07/1959
GCR B19 4-6-0 423 12/1912 19/04/1947
GCR A5 4-6-2T 128 21/12/1912 01/03/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 129 28/12/1912 14/11/1960
GCR B19 4-6-0 424 01/1913 01/12/1945
GCR B19 4-6-0 425 02/1913 04/07/1947
GCR B19 4-6-0 426 03/1913 22/12/1944
GCR B19 4-6-0 427 03/1913 14/11/1947
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 375 04/1913 11/10/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 376 04/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 378 05/1913 21/07/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 377 05/1913 29/12/1962
GCR B8 4-6-0 4 06/1913 28/11/1947
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 379 06/1913 01/05/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 380 06/1913 08/08/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 381 07/1913 13/06/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 382 07/1913 10/09/1941
GCR D10 4-4-0     08/1913 10/02/1954
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 383 08/1913 10/09/1941
GCR D10 4-4-0     09/1913 09/03/1953
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 384 09/1913 23/09/1962
GCR D10 4-4-0     10/1913 08/05/1954
GCR D10 4-4-0     10/1913 08/10/1955
GCR D10 4-4-0     10/1913 05/09/1953
GCR D10 4-4-0     11/1913 22/08/1953
GCR D10 4-4-0     11/1913 29/01/1955
GCR D10 4-4-0     11/1913 16/03/1953
GCR D10 4-4-0     11/1913 13/08/1955
GCR B19 4-6-0 428 12/1913 19/04/1947
GCR D10 4-4-0     12/1913 27/11/1954
GCR O4 2-8-0 385 12/1913 24/11/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 386 01/1914 26/03/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 387 01/1914 14/11/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 388 02/1914 25/07/1965
GCR O4 2-8-0 389 02/1914 28/04/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 390 02/1914 07/09/1964
GCR O4 2-8-0 391 03/1914 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 392 03/1914 19/09/1941
GCR O4 2-8-0 393 03/1914 24/02/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 394 04/1914 21/10/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 395 04/1914 23/02/1959
GCR O4 2-8-0 396 05/1914 23/09/1962
GCR O4 2-8-0 397 05/1914 01/05/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 398 05/1914 09/02/1962
GCR J63 0-6-0T 277   06/1914 25/02/1957
GCR O4 2-8-0 399 06/1914 09/12/1962
GCR B8 4-6-0 439 07/1914 14/08/1947
GCR B8 4-6-0 440 08/1914 23/10/1947
GCR O4 2-8-0 271 08/1914 05/10/1941
GCR B8 4-6-0 441 09/1914 06/05/1947
GCR B8 4-6-0 442 09/1914 24/03/1949
GCR B8 4-6-0 443 10/1914 15/03/1948
GCR B8 4-6-0 444 10/1914 02/09/1948
GCR B8 4-6-0 445 11/1914 14/08/1947
GCR B8 4-6-0 446 11/1914 23/04/1949
GCR B8 4-6-0 279 12/1914 13/08/1948
GCR L3 2-6-4T 272 12/1914 12/03/1955
GCR L3 2-6-4T 273 12/1914 14/05/1951
GCR B8 4-6-0 280 01/1915 25/03/1947
GCR L3 2-6-4T 274 02/1915 09/08/1954
GCR L3 2-6-4T 275 03/1915 17/07/1950
GCR L3 2-6-4T 276 04/1915 29/08/1949
GCR L3 2-6-4T 336 04/1915 23/07/1951
GCR L3 2-6-4T 337 05/1915 22/01/1951
GCR L3 2-6-4T 338 06/1915 10/10/1949
GCR L3 2-6-4T 339 11/1915 29/08/1949
GCR L3 2-6-4T 340 12/1915 29/08/1949
GCR L3 2-6-4T 341 06/1916 07/06/1954
GCR L3 2-6-4T 342 06/1916 09/02/1953
GCR L3 2-6-4T 343 06/1916 14/05/1951
GCR L3 2-6-4T 344 08/1916 25/07/1947
GCR L3 2-6-4T 370 1917 07/07/1955
GCR L3 2-6-4T 345 01/1917 24/01/1955
GCR L3 2-6-4T 366 02/1917 10/05/1954
GCR L3 2-6-4T 367 03/1917 17/04/1950
GCR L3 2-6-4T 368 03/1917 19/02/1951
GCR L3 2-6-4T 369 04/1917 05/06/1950
GCR A5 4-6-2T 371 30/06/1917 15/07/1957
GCR A5 4-6-2T 372 28/07/1917 19/01/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 373 25/08/1917 04/04/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 374 29/09/1917 16/12/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 411 27/10/1917 03/03/1958
GCR B3 4-6-0 1169 11/1917 06/12/1947
GCR O5 2-8-0 412 01/1918 11/04/1965
GCR O5 2-8-0 413 03/1918 08/11/1941
GCR O5 2-8-0 414 04/1918 23/11/1961
GCR O5 2-8-0 415 05/1918 08/04/1959
GCR O5 2-8-0 417 06/1918 03/01/1965
GCR B6 4-6-0 416 07/1918 28/11/1947
GCR O5 2-8-0 418 08/1918 22/05/1964
GCR O5 2-8-0 419 09/1918 01/10/1963
GCR O4 2-8-0 2005 01/1919 22/06/1961
GCR O4 2-8-0 2006 03/1919 22/02/1952
GCR O4 2-8-0 2007 03/1919 05/09/1965
GCR O5 2-8-0 420 04/1919 14/09/1941
GCR O5 2-8-0 422 06/1919 09/12/1962
GCR O5 2-8-0 421 07/1919 11/10/1941
GCR O5 2-8-0 10 08/1919 09/12/1962
GCR O5 2-8-0 11 08/1919 06/06/1965
GCR O5 2-8-0 12 09/1919 28/05/1964
GCR O5 2-8-0 13 10/1919 23/06/1961
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 506   12/1919 11/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 507   02/1920 18/11/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 508   03/1920 08/08/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 509   03/1920 23/05/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 510   05/1920 08/08/1960
GCR B3 4-6-0 1164 06/1920 27/09/1947
GCR B3 4-6-0 1165 07/1920 31/12/1947
GCR B3 4-6-0 1166 08/1920 14/04/1949
GCR B3 4-6-0 1167 09/1920 31/12/1947
GCR B3 4-6-0 1168 10/1920 28/09/1946
GCR O5 2-8-0 14 11/1920 25/10/1941
GCR O5 2-8-0 15 12/1920 05/06/1962
GCR O5 2-8-0 17 12/1920 18/10/1941
GCR O5 2-8-0 19 01/1921 14/09/1941
GCR O5 2-8-0 22 02/1921 08/08/1962
GCR B6 4-6-0 52 03/1921 31/12/1947
GCR B6 4-6-0 53 04/1921 31/12/1947
GCR B7 4-6-0 72 05/1921 10/09/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 73 06/1921 04/03/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 78 07/1921 20/04/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 465 08/1921 19/08/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 466 10/1921 18/09/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 467 02/1922 13/06/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 468 03/1922 31/12/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 469 04/1922 13/02/1950
GCR B7 4-6-0 470 05/1922 19/08/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 471 06/1922 12/02/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 472 06/1922 03/08/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 473 07/1922 26/12/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 474 08/1922 13/06/1949
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 501   09/1922 08/05/1959
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 502   10/1922 05/12/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 503   11/1922 12/08/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 504   11/1922 17/11/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 505   12/1922 12/08/1960
GCR Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 511   12/1922 15/11/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 3 27/01/1923 14/11/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 6 10/02/1923 19/05/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 7 24/02/1923 03/11/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 30 17/03/1923 05/04/1960
GCR A5 4-6-2T 45 07/04/1923 16/12/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 46 28/04/1923 30/11/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 88 12/05/1923 02/06/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 154 26/05/1923 02/11/1959
GCR A5 4-6-2T 156 16/06/1923 26/11/1958
GCR A5 4-6-2T 158 30/06/1923 30/05/1960
GCR B7 4-6-0 475 11/08/1923 20/02/1950
GCR B7 4-6-0 476 25/08/1923 04/02/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 477 22/09/1923 02/11/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 478 20/10/1923 03/07/1950
GCR B7 4-6-0 479 03/11/1923 13/06/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 480 24/11/1923 03/08/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 5481 08/12/1923 22/04/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 5482 22/12/1923 30/11/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 5483 02/02/1924 05/09/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 5484 01/03/1924 04/06/1948
GER N7 0-6-2T 409   08/1925 24/11/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 421   09/1925 12/02/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 426   10/1925 01/12/1958
GER N7 0-6-2T 456   10/1925 17/04/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 457   10/1925 08/06/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 460   11/1925 23/03/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 464   11/1925 01/12/1958
GER N7 0-6-2T 471   11/1925 29/08/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 473   11/1925 24/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 475   12/1925 23/01/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 826   01/1926 16/09/1962
GER N7 0-6-2T 827   02/1926 10/08/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 828   02/1926 13/01/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 829   02/1926 09/03/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 830   03/1926 24/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 832   04/1926 31/03/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 833   04/1926 19/05/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 834   05/1926 05/01/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 837   06/1926 16/09/1962
GER N7 0-6-2T 838   06/1926 01/12/1958
GER N7 0-6-2T 850   07/1926 24/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 851   07/1926 19/05/1958
GER N7 0-6-2T 853   09/1926 01/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 852   09/1926 27/01/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 865   10/1926 16/09/1962
GER N7 0-6-2T 866   10/1926 24/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 867   11/1926 29/08/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 868   12/1926 27/07/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 870   12/1926 19/05/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 873   02/1927 13/01/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2632   11/1927 05/10/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2633   11/1927 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2634   11/1927 12/06/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2635   11/1927 26/06/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2636   12/1927 16/02/1959
GER N7 0-6-2T 2637   12/1927 24/11/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2638   01/1928 10/09/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2639   01/1928 17/01/1961
GER N7 0-6-2T 2640   02/1928 04/12/1960
GER N7 0-6-2T 2641   02/1928 04/12/1960
GCR S1 0-8-4T 2798   05/1932 06/01/1956
GCR S1 0-8-4T 2799   06/1932 01/01/1957
GNR J50 0-6-0T 599   11/1938 19/11/1958
GNR J50 0-6-0T 600   11/1938 06/02/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 602   12/1938 22/02/1960
GNR J50 0-6-0T 605   12/1938 19/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 606   12/1938 16/09/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 608   01/1939 24/04/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 611   02/1939 25/03/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 615   04/1939 16/11/1959
GNR J50 0-6-0T 584   04/1939 02/07/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 585   05/1939 24/04/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 587   06/1939 23/09/1963
GNR J50 0-6-0T 590   07/1939 11/07/1962
GNR J50 0-6-0T 595   07/1939 21/04/1961
GNR J50 0-6-0T 598   08/1939 30/08/1961
LNER B1 4-6-0 61340 998 27/11/1948 22/04/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 61341 999 18/12/1948 28/12/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 61342 1000 03/01/1949 31/12/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61343 1001 04/02/1949 03/03/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61344 1002 05/03/1949 23/09/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61345 1003 08/04/1949 14/07/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61346 1004 30/04/1949 08/06/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 61347 1005 21/05/1949 04/04/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 61348 1006 09/06/1949 26/12/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 61349 1007 02/07/1949 17/08/1966
  76 Bo+Bo 26001   27/10/1950 02/11/1980
  76 Bo+Bo 26002   27/10/1950 25/06/1978
  76 Bo+Bo 26003   15/11/1950 20/07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26005   13/01/1951 22/03/1970
  76 Bo+Bo 26006   13/01/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26004   17/02/1951 06/1978
  76 Bo+Bo 26007   17/02/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26008   17/03/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26009   17/03/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26010   17/03/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26011   17/03/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26016   15/05/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26017   18/05/1951 22/03/1970
  76 Bo+Bo 26018   18/05/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26012   19/05/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26013   19/05/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26014   23/06/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26015   23/06/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26019   22/09/1951 09/10/1971
  76 Bo+Bo 26020   20/10/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26021   20/10/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26022   20/10/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26023   20/10/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26024   20/10/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26029   28/12/1951 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26028   16/01/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26025   19/01/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26026   19/01/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26030   19/01/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26031   19/01/1952 10/1971
  76 Bo+Bo 26027   16/02/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26035   16/02/1952 22/03/1970
  76 Bo+Bo 26036   16/02/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26037   16/02/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26032   19/04/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26033   19/04/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26034   19/04/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26038   19/04/1952 02/1977
  76 Bo+Bo 26039   19/04/1952 02/1977
  76 Bo+Bo 26042   14/05/1952 22/03/1970
  76 Bo+Bo 26043   14/05/1952 06/1978
  76 Bo+Bo 26040   17/05/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26041   17/05/1952 11/1980
  76 Bo+Bo 26044   19/06/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26045   19/07/1952 28/11/1971
  76 Bo+Bo 26046   23/08/1952 11/1980
  76 Bo+Bo 26047   23/08/1952 11/1980
  76 Bo+Bo 26048   18/10/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26049   18/10/1952 11/1980
  76 Bo+Bo 26050   16/11/1952 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26051   17/01/1953 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26052   14/02/1953 06/1978
  76 Bo+Bo 26053   14/03/1953 11/1980
  76 Bo+Bo 26054   16/05/1953 07/1981
  76 Bo+Bo 26055   20/06/1953 02/1977
  76 Bo+Bo 26056   25/07/1953 06/1978
  76 Bo+Bo 26057   10/09/1953 02/1977
  77 Co-Co 27000   28/12/1953 05/10/1968
  77 Co-Co 27001   22/03/1954 05/10/1968
  77 Co-Co 27002   18/05/1954 05/10/1968
  77 Co-Co 27003   05/08/1954 05/10/1968
  77 Co-Co 27004   18/09/1954 05/10/1968
  77 Co-Co 27005   11/12/1954 05/10/1968
  77 Co-Co 27006   31/12/1954 05/10/1968