Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4458 Week
» 4458 Month
» 71320 Year
» 1736696 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Inverurie Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
GNSR D40 4-4-0 27   04/1909 01/1957
GNSR D40 4-4-0 29   07/1909 10/08/1956
GNSR D40 4-4-0 31   06/1910 06/07/1956
GNSR D40 4-4-0 36   08/1910 04/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 28   03/1913 01/1947
GNSR D40 4-4-0 33   09/1913 09/09/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 35   09/1914 12/1956
GNSR D40 4-4-0 34   03/1915 24/09/1953
GNSR D40 4-4-0 45   06/1921 14/01/1955
GNSR D40 4-4-0 46   09/1921 20/09/1955