Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 108 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4454 Week
» 4454 Month
» 71316 Year
» 1736692 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Manning, Wardle & Co.


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
MSLR Y2 0-4-0ST 512 884 03/1883 08/07/1931
MSLR Y2 0-4-0ST 511 885 03/1883 08/07/1931
EWYUR N19 0-6-2ST 4 1398 09/1898 02/1933
EWYUR N19 0-6-2ST 5 1433 05/1899 03/1928
EWYUR N19 0-6-2ST 6 1434 06/1899 07/1923
TVR O4 0-6-2T 38 1698 04/1907 24/08/1953
TVR O4 0-6-2T 43 1699 04/1907 07/12/1949
TVR O4 0-6-2T 59 1700 06/1907 27/07/1951
TVR O4 0-6-2T 67 1701 07/1907 17/07/1950
TVR O4 0-6-2T 68 1702 07/1907 23/06/1951
TVR O4 0-6-2T 69 1703 08/1907 08/04/1951
TVR O4 0-6-2T 94 1704 09/1907 19/09/1949
CMDPR Unclassified 0-6-0PT 28   08/1908 09/11/1953
CMDPR Unclassified 0-6-0PT 29   08/1908 18/02/1954
GNSR Z5 0-4-2T 116 1858 01/1915 28/04/1960
GNSR Z5 0-4-2T 117 1859 01/1915 24/04/1956
GNSR Z4 0-4-2T 116 1884 08/1915 28/04/1960
GNSR Z4 0-4-2T 117 1885 08/1915 31/03/1959