Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 34 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2960 Week
» 4698 Month
» 132141 Year
» 1797517 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
FR C2 0-4-0ST 23 1543 1864 1904
FR C2 0-4-0ST 24 1544 1864 1904
FR D1 0-6-0 29 1697 1866 07/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 30 1698 1866 12/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 38 1760 1866 1915
FR D1 0-6-0 39 1761 1866 1915
FR D1 0-6-0 31 1764 1866 05/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 32 1765 1866 1900
FR D1 0-6-0 33 1766 1866 1900
CambR Small side tank 2-4-0T 1196   05/1866 19/04/1948
CambR Small side tank 2-4-0T 1197   05/1866 24/04/1948
FR D1 0-6-0 40 1784 1867 06/1927
FR D1 0-6-0 41 1785 1867 1916
FR G1 0-6-0T 51 1842 1867 1915
FR G1 0-6-0T 52 1843 1867 1918
FR D1 0-6-0 17 2064 1870 10/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 18 2065 1870 1910
FR D1 0-6-0 19 2095 1870 1910
FR D1 0-6-0 20 2096 1870 02/1924
FR 1 2-4-0 1 2057 1870 1916
FR 1 2-4-0 2 2058 1870 1918
FR 1 2-4-0 57 2093 1870 1918
FR 1 2-4-0 58 2094 1870 1918
FR D1 0-6-0 53 2097 1871 1916
FR D1 0-6-0 54 2098 1871 07/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 55 2099 1871 1918
FR D1 0-6-0 56 2100 1871 1918
FR D1 0-6-0 59 2145 1871 1913
FR D1 0-6-0 60 2146 1871 1921
FR D1 0-6-0 61 2147 1871 1916
FR D1 0-6-0 62 2148 1871 1916
FR D1 0-6-0 63 2149 1871 1918
FR D1 0-6-0 64 2150 1871 1918
FR D1 0-6-0 65 2151 1871 03/1930
FR D1 0-6-0 66 2152 1871 1916
FR D1 0-6-0 67 2153 1871 1914
FR D1 0-6-0 43 2154 1871 06/1925
FR G1 0-6-0T 68 2204 1872 04/1925
FR G1 0-6-0T 69 2205 1872 05/1925
FR 1 2-4-0 70 2245 1872 02/1924
FR 1 2-4-0 71 2246 1872 08/1924
FR 1 2-4-0 72 2247 1872 1919
FR 1 2-4-0 73 2248 1872 1919
FR 1 2-4-0 74 2249 1872 1920
FR 1 2-4-0 46 2256 1872 1920
FR 1 2-4-0 75 2257 1872 1914
FR 1 2-4-0 47 2258 1872 1919
FR 1 2-4-0 48 2259 1872 1920
FR D1 0-6-0 25 2278 1873 1910
FR D1 0-6-0 26 2279 1873 12/1929
FR D1 0-6-0 76 2280 1873 1925
FR D1 0-6-0 77 2283 1873 1914
FR D1 0-6-0 78 2284 1873 1915
FR D1 0-6-0 79 2285 1873 06/1930
FR D1 0-6-0 80 2316 1873 1916
FR D1 0-6-0 81 2317 1873 1921
FR D1 0-6-0 84 2337 1873 1915
FR D1 0-6-0 85 2338 1873 07/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 86 2340 1873 10/1924
FR D1 0-6-0 87 2341 1873 02/1924
NSR 69 0-6-0 69 2342 1873 1922
NSR 69 0-6-0 70 2346 1873 05/1927
FR G1 0-6-0T 82 2300 1873 10/1925
FR G1 0-6-0T 83 2301 1873 06/1926
FR 1 2-4-0 5 2364 1873 1907
FR 1 2-4-0 6 2365 1873 1907
FR 1 2-4-0 11 2366 1873 1916
FR 1 2-4-0 12 2367 1873 1920
FR C2 0-4-0ST 94 2448 1874 1914
FR C2 0-4-0ST 95 2449 1874 1916
FR C2 0-4-0ST 96 2450 1874 1916
FR C2 0-4-0ST 97 2451 1874 08/1924
FR D1 0-6-0 92 2422 1874 1924
FR D1 0-6-0 93 2423 1874 09/1924
NSR 69 0-6-0 64 2378 1874 1919
NSR 69 0-6-0 65 2379 1874 1919
NSR 69 0-6-0 114 2424 1874 1920
NSR 69 0-6-0 115 2425 1874 1920
NSR 69 0-6-0 116 2426 1874 09/1926
NSR 69 0-6-0 117 2427 1874 1916
FR D1 0-6-0 88 2506 1875 1926
FR D1 0-6-0 89 2507 1875 1926
FR D1 0-6-0 90 2508 1875 06/1930
FR D1 0-6-0 91 2509 1875 1924
LYR 568 0-6-0 550 2692 06/1877 12/1928
LYR 568 0-6-0 551 2693 06/1877 12/1930
LYR 568 0-6-0 552 2694 06/1877 10/1963
LYR 568 0-6-0 553 2695 06/1877 12/1964
LYR 568 0-6-0 554 2696 06/1877 03/1939
LYR 568 0-6-0 555 2697 07/1877 05/11/1960
LYR 568 0-6-0 556 2702 08/1877 04/1928
LYR 568 0-6-0 557 2703 08/1877 11/1932
LYR 568 0-6-0 558 2704 08/1877 12/1961
LYR 568 0-6-0 559 2705 08/1877 03/1949
LYR 568 0-6-0 560 2706 09/1877 11/1933
LYR 568 0-6-0 561 2707 09/1877 14/11/1959
LYR 568 0-6-0 562 2729 10/1877 20/07/1957
LYR 568 0-6-0 563 2730 10/1877 05/05/1956
LYR 568 0-6-0 564 2731 10/1877 08/11/1947
LYR 568 0-6-0 565 2732 10/1877 06/1928
LYR 568 0-6-0 566 2733 11/1877 10/04/1948
LYR 568 0-6-0 567 2734 11/1877 12/1928
SER O 0-6-0 279 2796 10/1878 01/1909
SER O 0-6-0 280 2797 10/1878 02/1908
SER O 0-6-0 281 2798 10/1878 04/1914
SER O 0-6-0 282 2799 10/1878 12/1912
SER O 0-6-0 283 2800 10/1878 07/1912
SER O 0-6-0 284 2801 11/1878 02/1911
SER O 0-6-0 285 2802 11/1878 01/1911
SER O 0-6-0 286 2803 11/1878 11/1911
SER O 0-6-0 287 2804 11/1878 04/1909
SER O 0-6-0 288 2805 12/1878 08/1911
SER O 0-6-0 289 2806 12/1878 01/1912
SER O 0-6-0 290 2807 12/1878 08/1910
SER O 0-6-0 291 2810 02/1879 04/1909
SER O 0-6-0 292 2811 02/1879 10/1912
SER O 0-6-0 293 2812 02/1879 04/1909
SER O 0-6-0 294 2813 03/1879 04/1909
SER O 0-6-0 295 2814 04/1879 02/1909
SER O 0-6-0 296 2815 04/1879 02/1911
SER O 0-6-0 297 2816 04/1879 01/1908
SER O 0-6-0 298 2817 04/1879 04/1909
LYR 629 4-4-0 629 2910 08/1880 03/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 630 2911 09/1880 11/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 643 2912 09/1880 03/1898
LYR 629 4-4-0 644 2913 09/1880 05/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 645 2914 09/1880 04/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 646 2915 09/1880 11/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 653 2917 10/1880 01/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 649 2916 12/1880 02/1897
FR D1 0-6-0 114 2945 1881 06/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 115 2946 1881 09/1892
FR D1 0-6-0 116 2947 1881 11/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 117 2948 1881 11/1927
FR D1 0-6-0 118 2949 1881 08/1925
FR D1 0-6-0 119 2950 1881 10/1925
LYR 629 4-4-0 627 2992 07/1881 11/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 668 2993 07/1881 05/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 681 2994 07/1881 11/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 656 2995 07/1881 09/1901
LYR 629 4-4-0 658 2996 07/1881 11/1898
LYR 629 4-4-0 661 2997 08/1881 11/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 664 2998 08/1881 10/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 667 2999 08/1881 09/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 669 3000 09/1881 03/1899
LYR 629 4-4-0 670 3001 09/1881 02/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 671 3002 09/1881 09/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 672 3003 09/1881 08/1892
LYR 629 4-4-0 674 3004 09/1881 07/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 675 3005 10/1881 10/1897
LYR 629 4-4-0 678 3006 10/1881 04/1896
LYR 629 4-4-0 152 3007 10/1881 09/1899
FR 1 2-4-0 44 3086 1882 1924
FR 1 2-4-0 45 3087 1882 1921
FR D1 0-6-0 49 3170 1884 06/1928
FR D1 0-6-0 50 3171 1884 11/1927
FR D1 0-6-0 120 3172 1884 1897
FR D1 0-6-0 121 3173 1884 1897
GER J15 0-6-0 37 3146 04/1884 08/1923
GER J15 0-6-0 38 3147 04/1884 09/1932
GER J15 0-6-0 39 3148 04/1884 03/1933
GER J15 0-6-0 40 3149 04/1884 10/1922
GER J15 0-6-0 41 3150 04/1884 06/1934
GER J15 0-6-0 119 3151 05/1884 09/1929
GER J15 0-6-0 120 3152 05/1884 02/1928
GER J15 0-6-0 121 3153 05/1884 03/1933
GER J15 0-6-0 122 3154 05/1884 01/1930
GER J15 0-6-0 123 3155 05/1884 07/1922
GER J15 0-6-0 124 3156 05/1884 07/1933
GER J15 0-6-0 592 3157 05/1884 08/1928
GER J15 0-6-0 593 3158 06/1884 12/1926
GER J15 0-6-0 594 3159 06/1884 07/1926
GER J15 0-6-0 595 3160 06/1884 06/1929
GER J15 0-6-0 596 3161 07/1884 11/1932
GER J15 0-6-0 597 3162 07/1884 04/1928
GER J15 0-6-0 598 3163 07/1884 09/1926
GER J15 0-6-0 599 3164 07/1884 05/1931
BaR B 0-6-2T 212   05/1889 10/07/1948
BaR B 0-6-2T 213   05/1889 03/01/1949
FR K1 4-4-0 120 3618 1890 05/1927
FR K1 4-4-0 121 3619 1890 12/1924
FR K1 4-4-0 122 3620 1890 10/1927
FR K1 4-4-0 123 3621 1890 09/1925
BaR B 0-6-2T 231   02/1890 31/10/1949
BaR B1 0-6-2T 238   06/1890 25/06/1948
BaR B1 0-6-2T 240   07/1890 27/03/1951
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1891 05/11/1955
SER O 0-6-0 369 3711 08/1891 02/1960
SER O 0-6-0 370 3712 08/1891 01/1949
SER O 0-6-0 371 3713 08/1891 02/1949
SER O 0-6-0 372 3714 08/1891 05/1923
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1658   09/1891 12/1952
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1659   09/1891 09/1951
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1660   09/1891 12/1953
SER O 0-6-0 373 3715 09/1891 07/1951
SER O 0-6-0 374 3716 09/1891 09/1949
SER O 0-6-0 375 3717 09/1891 01/1924
SER O 0-6-0 376 3718 09/1891 09/1928
SER O 0-6-0 377 3719 09/1891 01/1950
SER O 0-6-0 378 3720 09/1891 11/1948
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1661   10/1891 09/1955
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1662   10/1891 10/1953
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1663   10/1891 07/1953
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1665   10/1891 10/1952
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1666   11/1891 24/12/1955
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1667   11/1891 04/1951
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1670   11/1891 14/04/1951
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1671   11/1891 06/11/1954
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1672   11/1891 12/1949
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1673   11/1891 10/1952
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1674   12/1891 07/06/1952
SR Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1675   12/1891 12/1952
MR 3F 0-6-0 3370   1892 21/11/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3371   1892 26/08/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3373   1892 21/05/1960
MR 3F 0-6-0 3374   1892 24/06/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3378   1892 19/12/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3379   1892 28/11/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3381   1892 27/06/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3386   1892 22/04/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3387   1892 19/12/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3388   1892 12/09/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3389   1892 04/08/1962
MR 3F 0-6-0 3392   1892 25/01/1958
MR 3F 0-6-0 3394   1892 09/07/1960
MR 3F 0-6-0 3395   1892 11/03/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3396   1892 17/08/1957
MR 3F 0-6-0 3398   1892 05/12/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3399   1892 27/08/1960
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1892 12/1953
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1892 12/1952
NBR J36 0-6-0 678 3768 02/1892 13/10/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 679 3769 02/1892 08/02/1957
NBR J36 0-6-0 680 3770 02/1892 28/11/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 681 3771 02/1892 06/05/1960
NBR J36 0-6-0 682 3772 02/1892 30/05/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 683 3773 02/1892 24/04/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 684 3774 02/1892 07/09/1951
NBR J36 0-6-0 685 3775 02/1892 14/04/1948
NBR J36 0-6-0 686 3776 02/1892 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 687 3777 02/1892 05/03/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 688 3778 02/1892 02/07/1959
NBR J36 0-6-0 689 3779 03/1892 08/10/1962
NBR J36 0-6-0 690 3780 03/1892 27/06/1963
NBR J36 0-6-0 691 3781 03/1892 06/1945
NBR J36 0-6-0 692 3782 03/1892 10/1946
MR 2P 4-4-0 403   04/1892 17/06/1950
MR 2P 4-4-0 404   04/1892 07/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 405   04/1892 06/1955
MR 2P 4-4-0 406   04/1892 01/1951
MR 2P 4-4-0 407   05/1892 06/1958
MR 2P 4-4-0 408   05/1892 25/12/1948
MR 2P 4-4-0 409   05/1892 13/07/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 410   05/1892 02/1953
MR 2P 4-4-0 411   05/1892 18/02/1961
MR 2P 4-4-0 412   05/1892 09/05/1959
MR 2P 4-4-0 414   05/1892 26/01/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 415   05/1892 06/1952
MR 2P 4-4-0 416   05/1892 02/05/1959
MR 2P 4-4-0 417   05/1892 16/02/1952
MR 2P 4-4-0 418   07/1892 05/01/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 419   07/1892 10/09/1955
MR 2P 4-4-0 420   07/1892 22/11/1958
MR 2P 4-4-0 421   07/1892 28/01/1961
MR 2P 4-4-0 422   07/1892 17/10/1953
MR 2P 4-4-0 413   09/1892 10/01/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3400   1893 10/03/1962
MR 3F 0-6-0 3401   1893 27/04/1957
MR 3F 0-6-0 3402   1893 13/04/1957
MR 3F 0-6-0 3405   1893 18/02/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3406   1893 20/02/1960
MR 3F 0-6-0 3408   1893 08/04/1950
MR 2P 4-4-0 430   02/1893 12/04/1952
MR 2P 4-4-0 432   02/1893 10/1953
MR 2P 4-4-0 433   02/1893 11/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 434   02/1893 10/11/1956
MR 2P 4-4-0 436   03/1893 25/09/1954
MR 2P 4-4-0 437   03/1893 05/1949
MR 2P 4-4-0 438   03/1893 14/08/1954
MR 2P 4-4-0 439   03/1893 28/01/1961
SER O 0-6-0 379 3946 09/1893 05/1951
SER O 0-6-0 380 3947 09/1893 11/1949
SER O 0-6-0 381 3948 09/1893 05/1951
SER O 0-6-0 382 3949 09/1893 10/1924
SER O 0-6-0 383 3950 09/1893 07/04/1951
SER O 0-6-0 384 3951 09/1893 12/1949
SER O 0-6-0 385 3952 09/1893 09/1949
SER O 0-6-0 386 3953 10/1893 10/1948
SER O 0-6-0 387 3954 10/1893 01/1926
SER O 0-6-0 388 3955 10/1893 07/1948
SER O 0-6-0 389 3956 10/1893 02/1949
SER O 0-6-0 390 3957 10/1893 05/1951
SER O 0-6-0 391 3958 10/1893 06/1951
SER O 0-6-0 392 3959 10/1893 12/1925
SER O 0-6-0 393 3960 10/1893 06/1926
SER O 0-6-0 394 3961 11/1893 06/1926
SER O 0-6-0 395 3962 11/1893 06/1951
SER O 0-6-0 396 3963 12/1893 08/1948
SER O 0-6-0 397 3964 12/1893 06/1948
SER O 0-6-0 398 3965 12/1893 05/1949
HR I 4-6-0 103 4022 09/1894 07/1934
HR I 4-6-0 104 4023 09/1894 11/1939
HR I 4-6-0 105 4024 09/1894 1933
HR I 4-6-0 106 4025 09/1894 12/1934
HR I 4-6-0 107 4026 09/1894 10/1937
HR I 4-6-0 108 4027 10/1894 1930
HR I 4-6-0 109 4028 10/1894 1929
HR I 4-6-0 110 4029 10/1894 11/1935
HR I 4-6-0 111 4030 10/1894 09/1934
HR I 4-6-0 112 4031 10/1894 02/1940
HR I 4-6-0 113 4032 10/1894 11/1939
HR I 4-6-0 114 4033 10/1894 09/1936
HR I 4-6-0 115 4034 11/1894 1933
HR I 4-6-0 116 4035 11/1894 06/1936
HR I 4-6-0 117 4036 11/1894 11/1939
BaR B1 0-6-2T 258   12/1894 24/11/1949
BaR B1 0-6-2T 259   12/1894 30/08/1948
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1855   04/1895 04/05/1960
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1856   04/1895 06/1951
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1857   04/1895 08/05/1959
MR 1F 0-6-0T 1859   05/1895 10/12/1955
LMS Crane Engine 0-4-2ST     10/1895 03/02/1951
FR K2 4-4-0 21 4174 1896 12/1930
FR K2 4-4-0 22 4175 1896 10/1929
FR K2 4-4-0 34 4176 1896 08/1929
FR K2 4-4-0 35 4177 1896 09/1929
FR K2 4-4-0 36 4178 1896 10/1929
FR K2 4-4-0 37 4179 1896 12/1931
MR 3F 0-6-0 3546   1897 24/11/1956
MR 3F 0-6-0 3548   1897 04/03/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3550   1897 22/12/1956
MR 3F 0-6-0 3553   1897 14/02/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3558   1897 22/08/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3562   1897 18/02/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3565   1897 23/06/1962
MR 3F 0-6-0 3568   1897 21/05/1955
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 01/10/1960
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 05/10/1957
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 12/05/1951
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 02/10/1954
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 18/02/1961
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1897 24/04/1948
LTSR 37 4-4-2T 37   03/1897 25/08/1951
LTSR 37 4-4-2T 38   04/1897 25/08/1951
LTSR 37 4-4-2T 39   04/1897 12/02/1951
LTSR 37 4-4-2T 40   04/1897 28/09/1951
LTSR 37 4-4-2T 41   04/1897 28/09/1951
LTSR 37 4-4-2T 42   04/1897 22/12/1951
SER O 0-6-0 425 4302 08/1897 29/08/1959
SER O 0-6-0 426 4303 08/1897 08/1948
SER O 0-6-0 427 4304 09/1897 09/1926
SER O 0-6-0 428 4305 09/1897 03/1949
SER O 0-6-0 429 4306 09/1897 09/1949
SER O 0-6-0 430 4307 09/1897 16/05/1959
SER O 0-6-0 431 4308 09/1897 09/1926
SER O 0-6-0 432 4309 09/1897 06/1951
SER O 0-6-0 433 4310 09/1897 01/1928
SER O 0-6-0 434 4311 09/1897 15/08/1959
SER O 0-6-0 435 4312 09/1897 05/1927
SER O 0-6-0 436 4313 09/1897 02/1932
SER O 0-6-0 437 4314 10/1897 10/1948
SER O 0-6-0 438 4315 10/1897 11/1948
SER O 0-6-0 439 4316 10/1897 05/1949
FR L1 0-6-2T 112 4364 1898 12/1927
FR L1 0-6-2T 113 4365 1898 03/1928
FR L1 0-6-2T 114 4366 1898 04/1928
BaR B 0-6-2T 198   12/1898 10/01/1948
FR D3 0-6-0 13 4563 1899 08/1930
FR D3 0-6-0 14 4564 1899 11/1932
FR D3 0-6-0 15 4565 1899 07/1930
FR D3 0-6-0 16 4566 1899 04/1930
FR D3 0-6-0 17 4567 1899 12/1929
FR D3 0-6-0 18 4568 1899 08/1936
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1226 4471 04/1899 10/08/1953
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1227 4472 04/1899 11/03/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1228 4473 04/1899 03/01/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1229 4474 04/1899 03/02/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1230 4475 04/1899 10/02/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1231 4476 04/1899 13/07/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1232 4477 04/1899 20/01/1959
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1233 4478 04/1899 21/10/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1234 4479 04/1899 20/02/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1235 4480 04/1899 22/02/1960
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1236 4481 04/1899 10/02/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1237 4482 04/1899 03/10/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1238 4483 04/1899 23/02/1959
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1239 4484 04/1899 07/08/1956
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1240 4485 04/1899 12/04/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1241 4486 05/1899 27/01/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1242 4487 05/1899 01/04/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1243 4488 05/1899 26/07/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1244 4489 05/1899 22/04/1957
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1245 4490 05/1899 25/10/1954
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1246 4491 05/1899 02/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1247 4492 05/1899 08/05/1959
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1248 4493 05/1899 01/08/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1249 4494 05/1899 24/07/1958
GNR J52 0-6-0ST 1250 4495 05/1899 16/12/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 503   10/1899 10/1952
MR 2P 4-4-0 504   10/1899 28/01/1961
MR 2P 4-4-0 505   10/1899 29/10/1953
MR 2P 4-4-0 506   10/1899 11/1949
MR 2P 4-4-0 507   10/1899 07/1952
MR 2P 4-4-0 508   11/1899 14/07/1951
MR 2P 4-4-0 509   11/1899 14/06/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 510   11/1899 05/1949
MR 2P 4-4-0 511   11/1899 28/01/1961
MR 2P 4-4-0 512   11/1899 01/1950
MR 2P 4-4-0 513   12/1899 17/10/1959
MR 2P 4-4-0 514   12/1899 26/01/1952
MR 2P 4-4-0 515   12/1899 19/08/1950
MR 2P 4-4-0 516   12/1899 03/1950
MR 2P 4-4-0 517   12/1899 18/06/1949
MR 2P 4-4-0 518   12/1899 08/1956
MR 2P 4-4-0 519   12/1899 21/12/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 520   12/1899 18/10/1957
MR 2P 4-4-0 521   12/1899 24/03/1956
MR 2P 4-4-0 522   12/1899 22/10/1955
FR K2 4-4-0 124 4651 1900 01/1929
FR K2 4-4-0 125 4652 1900 09/1929
BaR B1 0-6-2T 261   05/1900 16/08/1948
BaR B1 0-6-2T 262   05/1900 20/03/1950
BaR B1 0-6-2T 263   06/1900 09/03/1951
BaR B1 0-6-2T 265   06/1900 29/11/1949
BaR B1 0-6-2T 267   06/1900 27/03/1951
BaR B1 0-6-2T 268   06/1900 24/04/1948
BaR B1 0-6-2T 269   06/1900 10/10/1949
BaR B1 0-6-2T 270   06/1900 06/04/1951
BaR B1 0-6-2T 271   06/1900 06/04/1951
BaR B1 0-6-2T 272   06/1900 20/03/1950
CR 812 0-6-0 849 4634 08/1900 16/07/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 850 4635 08/1900 17/01/1958
CR 812 0-6-0 851 4636 08/1900 19/10/1956
CR 812 0-6-0 852 4637 08/1900 16/09/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 853 4638 08/1900 20/06/1961
CR 812 0-6-0 854 4639 08/1900 12/08/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 855 4640 08/1900 20/11/1961
CR 812 0-6-0 856 4641 08/1900 29/12/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 857 4642 08/1900 20/11/1959
CR 812 0-6-0 858 4643 08/1900 01/10/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 859 4644 08/1900 02/04/1962
CR 812 0-6-0 860 4645 08/1900 10/1946
CR 812 0-6-0 861 4646 08/1900 05/11/1959
CR 812 0-6-0 862 4647 08/1900 29/11/1963
CR 812 0-6-0 863 4648 08/1900 29/12/1962
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2092   09/1900 18/09/1948
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2093   09/1900 09/1953
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2094   09/1900 08/1949
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2095   10/1900 06/1949
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2096   10/1900 05/1950
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2097   10/1900 04/1951
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2098   10/1900 03/1951
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2099   10/1900 03/1951
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2100   10/1900 12/1949
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2101   10/1900 03/1951
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2102   10/1900 06/1949
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T 2103   10/1900 03/1951
SR C 0-6-0 1711   12/1900 05/01/1957
SR C 0-6-0 1712   12/1900 09/02/1957
SR C 0-6-0 1713   12/1900 02/04/1955
SR C 0-6-0 1714   12/1900 07/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1715   12/1900 11/11/1961
MR 3F 0-6-0 3690   1901 24/08/1957
MR 3F 0-6-0 3693   1901 26/12/1959
MR 3F 0-6-0 3698   1901 01/09/1956
MR 3F 0-6-0 3705   1901 03/12/1960
MR 3F 0-6-0 3709   1901 04/08/1962
FR K3 4-4-0 126 4716 1901 12/1931
FR K3 4-4-0 127 4717 1901 05/1930
FR K3 4-4-0 128 4718 1901 06/1930
FR K3 4-4-0 129 4719 1901 12/1930
SR C 0-6-0 1716   01/1901 21/10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1717   01/1901 24/02/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1718   01/1901 24/09/1955
SR C 0-6-0 1719   01/1901 19/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1720   01/1901 21/10/1961
SR C 0-6-0 1721   01/1901 31/03/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1722   01/1901 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1723   01/1901 27/01/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1724   01/1901 05/05/1962
SR C 0-6-0 1725   01/1901 27/08/1960
SR D1 4-4-0 1727   01/1901 11/03/1961
MR 2F 0-6-0     01/01/1901 17/06/1961
PTR Unclassified 0-8-2T 1358   01/01/1901 23/02/1948
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1728   03/1901 05/1953
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1729   03/1901 05/1954
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1730   03/1901 03/1951
MR 2F 0-6-0     04/1901 07/07/1951
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1731   04/1901 06/1951
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1732   04/1901 09/1951
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1733   04/1901 12/1953
SR Coppernobs 4-4-0 1734   04/1901 11/1955
NBR J83 0-6-0T 815 4723 04/1901 09/1947
NBR J83 0-6-0T 816 4724 04/1901 24/11/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 817 4725 04/1901 10/03/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 818 4726 04/1901 12/08/1957
NBR J83 0-6-0T 819 4727 04/1901 23/12/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 820 4728 04/1901 02/09/1959
NBR J83 0-6-0T 821 4729 04/1901 18/06/1959
NBR J83 0-6-0T 822 4730 04/1901 05/10/1956
NBR J83 0-6-0T 823 4731 04/1901 08/10/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 824 4732 04/1901 04/08/1961
NBR J83 0-6-0T 825 4733 04/1901 12/02/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 826 4734 04/1901 26/05/1956
NBR J83 0-6-0T 827 4735 04/1901 18/04/1958
MR 2F 0-6-0     05/1901 28/11/1953
NBR J83 0-6-0T 828 4736 05/1901 10/03/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 829 4737 05/1901 16/03/1956
NBR J83 0-6-0T 830 4738 05/1901 29/12/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 831 4739 05/1901 24/11/1958
NBR J83 0-6-0T 832 4740 05/1901 08/10/1962
NBR J83 0-6-0T 833 4741 05/1901 12/03/1959
NBR J83 0-6-0T 834 4742 05/1901 12/02/1962
MR 2F 0-6-0     06/1901 23/02/1952
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2063   06/1901 06/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2050   07/1901 10/1951
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2051   07/1901 03/1949
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2055   07/1901 12/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2056   07/1901 11/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2060   08/1901 12/1951
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2062   08/1901 05/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2067   09/1901 10/1951
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2068   09/1901 06/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2070   09/1901 09/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2071   09/1901 12/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2072   09/1901 01/12/1951
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2073   10/1901 09/1951
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2074   10/1901 02/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1013 4784 10/1901 11/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1014 4785 10/1901 04/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1015 4786 10/1901 20/03/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1016 4787 10/1901 15/08/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1017 4788 10/1901 16/01/1950
SR D1 4-4-0 1735   11/1901 22/04/1961
GCR D9 4-4-0 1018 4828 02/1902 24/07/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1019 4829 02/1902 01/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1020 4830 02/1902 02/1943
GCR D9 4-4-0 1021 4831 02/1902 12/06/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1022 4832 02/1902 08/1942
GCR D9 4-4-0 1023 4833 02/1902 15/08/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1024 4834 02/1902 21/11/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1025 4835 03/1902 11/1945
GCR D9 4-4-0 1026 4836 03/1902 18/07/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1027 4837 03/1902 04/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1028 4838 03/1902 05/1939
GCR D9 4-4-0 1029 4839 03/1902 12/10/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1030 4840 03/1902 09/05/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1031 4841 03/1902 18/07/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1032 4842 03/1902 03/1945
GCR D9 4-4-0 1033 4843 03/1902 18/07/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1034 4844 03/1902 21/11/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1035 4845 04/1902 18/07/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1036 4846 04/1902 01/1946
GCR D9 4-4-0 1037 4847 05/1902 12/10/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1038 4964 03/1903 01/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1039 4965 03/1903 01/1946
GCR D9 4-4-0 1040 4966 03/1903 07/11/1949
GCR D9 4-4-0 1041 4967 03/1903 06/02/1950
GCR D9 4-4-0 1042 4968 03/1903 07/1939