Manufacturer: Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 302 | 14 | 09/1864 | 08/1918 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 303 | 15 | 10/1864 | 07/1932 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 304 | 16 | 10/1864 | 05/1928 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 305 | 17 | 11/1864 | 04/1931 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 306 | 18 | 11/1864 | 07/1932 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 307 | 19 | 11/1864 | 05/1931 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 308 | 20 | 12/1864 | 11/1929 | |
GWR | 302 | 0-6-0ST | 309 | 21 | 02/1865 | 04/1931 | |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1017 | B | 48 | 01/1867 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 238 | B | 47 | 02/1867 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1018 | B | 49 | 03/1867 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1019 | B | 50 | 03/1867 | 01/08/1934 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1020 | B | 51 | 04/1867 | 01/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1021 | B | 52 | 05/1867 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1022 | B | 53 | 06/1867 | 12/1925 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1023 | B | 54 | 06/1867 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1024 | B | 55 | 07/1867 | 02/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1025 | B | 56 | 07/1867 | 12/1927 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1026 | B | 57 | 08/1867 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1027 | B | 58 | 09/1867 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1028 | C | 59 | 09/1867 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1029 | C | 60 | 10/1867 | 12/1910 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1030 | C | 61 | 10/1867 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1031 | C | 62 | 11/1867 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1032 | C | 63 | 12/1867 | 04/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1033 | C | 64 | 12/1867 | 11/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1034 | C | 65 | 12/1867 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1035 | C | 66 | 12/1867 | 06/1914 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1036 | C | 67 | 01/1868 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1037 | C | 68 | 02/1868 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1038 | C | 69 | 02/1868 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1039 | C | 70 | 03/1868 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1040 | D | 71 | 04/1868 | 21/02/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1041 | D | 72 | 05/1868 | 02/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1042 | D | 73 | 05/1868 | 26/04/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1043 | D | 74 | 05/1868 | 10/1912 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1044 | D | 75 | 06/1868 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1045 | D | 76 | 06/1868 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1046 | D | 77 | 07/1868 | 07/07/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1047 | D | 78 | 07/1868 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1048 | D | 79 | 07/1868 | 13/01/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1049 | D | 80 | 08/1868 | 16/09/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1050 | D | 81 | 08/1868 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1051 | D | 82 | 09/1868 | 10/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1052 | E | 83 | 09/1868 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1053 | E | 84 | 10/1868 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1054 | E | 85 | 10/1868 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1055 | E | 86 | 10/1868 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1056 | E | 87 | 11/1868 | 27/01/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1057 | E | 88 | 11/1868 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1058 | E | 89 | 12/1868 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1059 | E | 90 | 12/1868 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1060 | E | 91 | 12/1868 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1061 | E | 92 | 01/1869 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1062 | E | 93 | 01/1869 | 06/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1063 | E | 94 | 01/1869 | 06/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1064 | F | 95 | 02/1869 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1065 | F | 96 | 02/1869 | 04/04/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1066 | F | 97 | 03/1869 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1067 | F | 98 | 03/1869 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1068 | F | 99 | 04/1869 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1069 | F | 100 | 04/1869 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1070 | F | 101 | 04/1869 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1071 | F | 102 | 05/1869 | 09/10/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1072 | F | 103 | 05/1869 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1073 | F | 104 | 06/1869 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1074 | F | 105 | 06/1869 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1075 | F | 106 | 06/1869 | 07/1915 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1076 | G | 107 | 07/1869 | 06/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1077 | G | 108 | 07/1869 | 13/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1078 | G | 109 | 08/1869 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1079 | G | 110 | 08/1869 | 23/09/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1080 | G | 111 | 08/1869 | 06/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1081 | G | 112 | 09/1869 | 14/09/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1082 | G | 113 | 09/1869 | 15/02/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1083 | G | 114 | 10/1869 | 02/1913 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1084 | G | 115 | 10/1869 | 02/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1085 | G | 116 | 10/1869 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1086 | G | 117 | 11/1869 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1087 | G | 118 | 11/1869 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1100 | H | 119 | 11/1869 | 12/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1101 | H | 120 | 12/1869 | 03/05/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1102 | H | 121 | 12/1869 | 08/1905 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1103 | H | 122 | 12/1869 | 03/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1104 | H | 123 | 01/1870 | 23/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1105 | H | 124 | 01/1870 | 01/10/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1106 | H | 125 | 03/1870 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1107 | H | 126 | 03/1870 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1108 | H | 127 | 03/1870 | 02/1915 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1109 | H | 128 | 04/1870 | 27/02/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1110 | H | 129 | 04/1870 | 12/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1132 | J | 131 | 05/1870 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1111 | H | 130 | 05/1870 | 07/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1133 | J | 132 | 06/1870 | 30/06/1934 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1134 | J | 133 | 06/1870 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1135 | J | 134 | 07/1870 | 12/1910 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1043 | J | 134 | 07/1870 | 12/1910 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1136 | J | 135 | 07/1870 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1044 | J | 135 | 07/1870 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1045 | J | 136 | 08/1870 | 01/1935 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1046 | J | 137 | 08/1870 | 09/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1047 | J | 138 | 09/1870 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1048 | J | 139 | 09/1870 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1049 | J | 140 | 10/1870 | 06/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1050 | J | 141 | 10/1870 | 12/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1051 | J | 142 | 11/1870 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1052 | K | 143 | 11/1870 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1058 | K | 144 | 11/1870 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1054 | K | 145 | 12/1870 | 08/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1055 | K | 146 | 12/1870 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1056 | K | 147 | 01/1871 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1057 | K | 148 | 01/1871 | 12/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1058 | K | 149 | 02/1871 | 05/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1059 | K | 150 | 02/1871 | 23/05/1933 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1060 | K | 151 | 03/1871 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1061 | K | 152 | 03/1871 | 03/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1062 | K | 153 | 04/1871 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1063 | K | 154 | 04/1871 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1064 | L | 155 | 05/1871 | 02/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1065 | L | 156 | 05/1871 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1066 | L | 157 | 06/1871 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1067 | L | 158 | 06/1871 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1068 | L | 159 | 06/1871 | 11/1910 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1069 | L | 160 | 07/1871 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1070 | L | 161 | 07/1871 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1071 | L | 162 | 07/1871 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1072 | L | 163 | 08/1871 | 09/05/1934 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1073 | L | 164 | 09/1871 | 02/1929 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1074 | L | 165 | 09/1871 | 02/1928 |
GWR | 1016 | 0-6-0ST | 1075 | L | 166 | 10/1871 | 30/06/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 633 | M | 167 | 11/1871 | 31/10/1933 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 634 | M | 168 | 11/1871 | 05/03/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 635 | M | 169 | 12/1871 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 636 | M | 170 | 12/1871 | 10/03/1933 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 637 | M | 171 | 12/1871 | 30/06/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 638 | M | 172 | 01/1872 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 639 | M | 173 | 01/1872 | 17/03/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 640 | M | 174 | 02/1872 | 24/05/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 641 | M | 175 | 02/1872 | 04/11/1933 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 642 | M | 176 | 03/1872 | 17/03/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 643 | M | 177 | 03/1872 | 21/02/1934 |
GWR | 633 | 0-6-0T | 644 | M | 178 | 04/1872 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 645 | O | 179 | 04/1872 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 646 | O | 180 | 05/1872 | 07/07/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 647 | O | 181 | 05/1872 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 648 | O | 182 | 06/1872 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 649 | O | 183 | 06/1872 | 07/1882 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 650 | O | 184 | 06/1872 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 651 | O | 185 | 07/1872 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 652 | O | 186 | 07/1872 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 653 | O | 187 | 08/1872 | 23/05/1933 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 654 | O | 188 | 08/1872 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 655 | O | 189 | 08/1872 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1 | O | 190 | 09/1872 | 04/1910 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 656 | P | 191 | 09/1872 | 03/02/1933 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 2 | P | 193 | 10/1872 | 0000 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 2 | P | 194 | 10/1872 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 757 | P | 192 | 10/1872 | 12/08/1933 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 3 | P | 195 | 11/1872 | 02/1910 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1 | P | 196 | 11/1872 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 758 | P | 197 | 11/1872 | 01/1931 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 759 | P | 198 | 12/1872 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 760 | P | 199 | 12/1872 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 761 | P | 200 | 12/1872 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 762 | P | 201 | 01/1873 | 30/06/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 763 | P | 202 | 01/1873 | 27/03/1933 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 764 | Q | 205 | 02/1873 | 03/1930 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 765 | Q | 206 | 02/1873 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 766 | Q | 207 | 02/1873 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 767 | Q | 208 | 03/1873 | 0000 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 768 | Q | 209 | 03/1873 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 769 | Q | 210 | 04/1873 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 770 | Q | 211 | 04/1873 | 10/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 771 | Q | 212 | 04/1873 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 772 | Q | 213 | 05/1873 | 20/01/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 773 | Q | 214 | 05/1873 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 774 | Q | 215 | 06/1873 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 775 | Q | 216 | 06/1873 | 02/03/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 826 | R | 217 | 09/1873 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 827 | R | 218 | 09/1873 | 13/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 828 | R | 219 | 10/1873 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 829 | R | 220 | 10/1873 | 26/03/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 830 | R | 221 | 10/1873 | 01/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 831 | R | 222 | 11/1873 | 12/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 832 | R | 223 | 11/1873 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 833 | R | 224 | 11/1873 | 17/03/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 834 | R | 225 | 12/1873 | 13/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 835 | R | 226 | 12/1873 | 02/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 836 | R | 227 | 01/1874 | 12/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 837 | R | 228 | 01/1874 | 21/02/1934 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 850 | T | 241 | 02/1874 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 838 | S | 229 | 02/1874 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 839 | S | 230 | 03/1874 | 06/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 840 | S | 231 | 03/1874 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 841 | S | 232 | 04/1874 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 842 | S | 233 | 04/1874 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 851 | T | 242 | 05/1874 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 843 | S | 234 | 05/1874 | 07/1915 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 852 | T | 243 | 06/1874 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 853 | T | 244 | 06/1874 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 854 | T | 245 | 06/1874 | 02/1935 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 855 | T | 246 | 07/1874 | 06/1906 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 856 | T | 247 | 07/1874 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 857 | T | 248 | 08/1874 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 858 | T | 249 | 08/1874 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 859 | T | 250 | 09/1874 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 860 | T | 251 | 09/1874 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 861 | T | 252 | 10/1874 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 862 | V | 253 | 10/1874 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 863 | V | 254 | 11/1874 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 864 | V | 255 | 11/1874 | 12/1912 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 844 | S | 235 | 11/1874 | 03/1913 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 865 | V | 256 | 12/1874 | 06/10/1933 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 866 | V | 257 | 12/1874 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 845 | S | 236 | 12/1874 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 867 | V | 258 | 01/1875 | 24/11/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 846 | S | 237 | 01/1875 | 12/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 868 | V | 259 | 02/1875 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 847 | S | 238 | 02/1875 | 29/05/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 848 | S | 239 | 02/1875 | 22/06/1945 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 869 | V | 260 | 03/1875 | 26/10/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 849 | S | 240 | 03/1875 | 04/1904 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 870 | V | 261 | 04/1875 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 871 | V | 262 | 04/1875 | 07/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 872 | V | 263 | 05/1875 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 873 | V | 264 | 05/1875 | 12/1912 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 987 | X | 265 | 06/1875 | 04/1936 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 988 | X | 266 | 07/1875 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 989 | X | 267 | 08/1875 | 04/1936 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 990 | X | 268 | 09/1875 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 991 | X | 269 | 09/1875 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 992 | X | 270 | 09/1875 | 05/02/1951 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 993 | X | 271 | 10/1875 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1154 | W | 277 | 10/1875 | 01/11/1934 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 93 | 11/1875 | 02/1931 | ||
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 994 | X | 272 | 11/1875 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 995 | X | 273 | 11/1875 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1155 | W | 278 | 11/1875 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1156 | W | 279 | 11/1875 | 10/1930 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 996 | X | 274 | 12/1875 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1157 | W | 280 | 12/1875 | 11/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1158 | W | 281 | 12/1875 | 03/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 997 | X | 275 | 01/1876 | 0000 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1159 | W | 282 | 01/1876 | 22/08/1947 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1160 | W | 283 | 01/1876 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 998 | X | 276 | 02/1876 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1161 | W | 284 | 02/1876 | 27/10/1945 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1162 | W | 285 | 02/1876 | 06/12/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1163 | W | 286 | 03/1876 | 25/05/1946 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1164 | W | 287 | 03/1876 | 12/1937 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1165 | W | 288 | 03/1876 | 03/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 202 | Z | 301 | 04/1876 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 203 | Z | 302 | 05/1876 | 04/1920 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 204 | Z | 303 | 05/1876 | 11/1904 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 205 | Z | 304 | 05/1876 | 13/01/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 215 | Z | 305 | 06/1876 | 13/01/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 216 | Z | 306 | 06/1876 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 217 | Z | 307 | 06/1876 | 10/02/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 218 | Z | 308 | 07/1876 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 219 | Z | 309 | 07/1876 | 24/08/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 220 | Z | 310 | 07/1876 | 12/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 221 | Z | 311 | 08/1876 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 222 | Z | 312 | 08/1876 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1216 | Y | 289 | 09/1876 | 06/1930 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1217 | Y | 290 | 10/1876 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1218 | Y | 291 | 12/1876 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1219 | Y | 292 | 12/1876 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1221 | Y | 294 | 12/1876 | 01/1931 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1220 | Y | 293 | 01/1877 | 11/1938 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1222 | Y | 295 | 01/1877 | 31/10/1933 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 94 | 02/1877 | 07/1932 | ||
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1223 | Y | 296 | 02/1877 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1224 | Y | 297 | 02/1877 | 03/1932 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1225 | Y | 298 | 03/1877 | 07/1938 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1226 | Y | 299 | 03/1877 | 01/1935 |
GWR | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 1227 | Y | 300 | 04/1877 | 04/1938 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1421 | I | 313 | 04/1877 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1422 | I | 314 | 05/1877 | 07/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1423 | I | 315 | 05/1877 | 02/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1424 | I | 316 | 05/1877 | 02/09/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1425 | I | 317 | 06/1877 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1426 | I | 318 | 06/1877 | 30/11/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1427 | I | 319 | 07/1877 | 06/1937 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1428 | I | 320 | 07/1877 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1429 | I | 321 | 07/1877 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1430 | I | 322 | 08/1877 | 19/09/1958 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1431 | I | 323 | 08/1877 | 31/01/1933 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1432 | I | 324 | 09/1877 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1433 | C2 | 349 | 10/1877 | 04/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1434 | C2 | 350 | 10/1877 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1435 | C2 | 351 | 11/1877 | 09/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1436 | C2 | 352 | 11/1877 | 01/10/1958 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1437 | C2 | 353 | 11/1877 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1438 | C2 | 354 | 11/1877 | 04/08/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1439 | C2 | 355 | 12/1877 | 09/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1440 | C2 | 356 | 12/1877 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1441 | C2 | 357 | 01/1878 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1442 | C2 | 358 | 01/1878 | 26/05/1945 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1443 | C2 | 359 | 02/1878 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1444 | C2 | 360 | 02/1878 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1501 | A2 | 325 | 03/1878 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1502 | A2 | 326 | 04/1878 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1503 | A2 | 327 | 05/1878 | 05/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1504 | A2 | 328 | 05/1878 | 11/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1505 | A2 | 329 | 06/1878 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1506 | A2 | 330 | 07/1878 | 12/1937 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1507 | A2 | 331 | 07/1878 | 30/06/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1508 | A2 | 332 | 08/1878 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1509 | A2 | 333 | 08/1878 | 10/1938 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1510 | A2 | 334 | 09/1878 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1511 | A2 | 335 | 09/1878 | 01/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1512 | A2 | 336 | 10/1878 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1513 | B2 | 337 | 11/1878 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1514 | B2 | 338 | 11/1878 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1515 | B2 | 339 | 12/1878 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1516 | B2 | 340 | 12/1878 | 06/1931 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1517 | B2 | 341 | 12/1878 | 08/1928 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1518 | B2 | 342 | 12/1878 | 22/09/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1519 | B2 | 343 | 01/1879 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1520 | B2 | 344 | 02/1879 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1521 | B2 | 345 | 02/1879 | 12/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1522 | B2 | 346 | 03/1879 | 24/08/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1523 | B2 | 347 | 04/1879 | 11/1937 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1524 | B2 | 348 | 04/1879 | 05/1939 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1525 | D2 | 361 | 05/1879 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1526 | D2 | 362 | 05/1879 | 08/07/1933 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1527 | D2 | 363 | 06/1879 | 06/07/1945 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1528 | D2 | 364 | 07/1879 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1529 | D2 | 365 | 07/1879 | 28/06/1933 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1530 | D2 | 366 | 08/1879 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1531 | D2 | 367 | 08/1879 | 16/12/1949 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1532 | D2 | 368 | 09/1879 | 26/07/1948 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1533 | D2 | 369 | 10/1879 | 07/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1534 | D2 | 370 | 10/1879 | 29/08/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1535 | D2 | 371 | 10/1879 | 07/04/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1536 | D2 | 372 | 11/1879 | 02/06/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1537 | E2 | 373 | 11/1879 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1538 | E2 | 374 | 12/1879 | 12/11/1948 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1539 | E2 | 375 | 12/1879 | 08/1938 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1540 | E2 | 376 | 01/1880 | 08/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1541 | E2 | 377 | 02/1880 | 12/1937 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1542 | E2 | 378 | 02/1880 | 21/02/1951 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1543 | E2 | 379 | 03/1880 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1544 | E2 | 380 | 03/1880 | 02/1930 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1545 | E2 | 381 | 04/1880 | 11/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1546 | E2 | 382 | 04/1880 | 12/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1547 | E2 | 383 | 05/1880 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1548 | E2 | 384 | 06/1880 | 02/1937 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1550 | F2 | 386 | 07/1880 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1549 | F2 | 385 | 08/1880 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1551 | F2 | 387 | 08/1880 | 09/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1552 | F2 | 388 | 09/1880 | 10/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1553 | F2 | 389 | 09/1880 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1554 | F2 | 390 | 10/1880 | 04/11/1944 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1555 | F2 | 391 | 10/1880 | 07/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1556 | F2 | 392 | 10/1880 | 09/1932 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1557 | F2 | 393 | 11/1880 | 01/1938 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1558 | F2 | 394 | 11/1880 | 09/1938 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1559 | F2 | 395 | 12/1880 | 08/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1560 | F2 | 396 | 12/1880 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1801 | G2 | 397 | 01/1881 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1802 | G2 | 398 | 02/1881 | 08/1937 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1803 | G2 | 399 | 02/1881 | 22/12/1944 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1804 | G2 | 400 | 03/1881 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1806 | G2 | 402 | 04/1881 | 11/1938 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1807 | G2 | 403 | 04/1881 | 09/1928 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1808 | G2 | 404 | 05/1881 | 08/06/1945 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1809 | G2 | 405 | 05/1881 | 05/1936 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1810 | G2 | 406 | 06/1881 | 22/12/1944 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1811 | G2 | 407 | 07/1881 | 06/1928 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1812 | G2 | 408 | 07/1881 | 04/1937 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1901 | J2 | 410 | 08/1881 | 09/1929 |
GWR | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1805 | G2 | 401 | 08/1881 | 07/1930 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1902 | J2 | 411 | 09/1881 | 22/10/1943 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1903 | J2 | 412 | 09/1881 | 06/06/1952 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1904 | J2 | 413 | 10/1881 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1905 | J2 | 414 | 10/1881 | 10/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1906 | J2 | 415 | 11/1881 | 07/1932 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1907 | J2 | 416 | 11/1881 | 11/01/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1908 | J2 | 417 | 12/1881 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1909 | J2 | 418 | 01/1882 | 11/11/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1910 | J2 | 419 | 04/1882 | 08/07/1944 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1911 | J2 | 420 | 04/1882 | 05/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1912 | J2 | 421 | 04/1882 | 30/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1913 | L2 | 422 | 06/1882 | 11/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1914 | L2 | 423 | 07/1882 | 06/1931 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1915 | L2 | 424 | 07/1882 | 08/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1916 | L2 | 425 | 07/1882 | 07/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1917 | L2 | 426 | 08/1882 | 19/03/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1918 | L2 | 427 | 08/1882 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1919 | L2 | 428 | 09/1882 | 21/11/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1920 | L2 | 429 | 10/1882 | 30/09/1933 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1921 | L2 | 430 | 10/1882 | 05/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1922 | L2 | 431 | 11/1882 | 04/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1923 | L2 | 432 | 11/1882 | 07/1939 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1924 | L2 | 433 | 12/1882 | 08/1938 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1465 | M2 | 434 | 01/1883 | 01/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1466 | M2 | 435 | 01/1883 | 06/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1467 | M2 | 436 | 02/1883 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1468 | M2 | 437 | 02/1883 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1469 | M2 | 438 | 03/1883 | 15/09/1958 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1470 | M2 | 439 | 04/1883 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1471 | M2 | 440 | 04/1883 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1472 | M2 | 441 | 05/1883 | 03/11/1934 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1473 | M2 | 442 | 05/1883 | 08/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1474 | M2 | 443 | 06/1883 | 04/1931 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1475 | M2 | 444 | 07/1883 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1476 | M2 | 445 | 07/1883 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1925 | O2 | 446 | 12/1883 | 20/04/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1926 | O2 | 447 | 01/1884 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1927 | O2 | 448 | 02/1884 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1928 | O2 | 449 | 03/1884 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1929 | O2 | 450 | 04/1884 | 07/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1930 | O2 | 451 | 05/1884 | 15/08/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1931 | O2 | 452 | 06/1884 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1932 | O2 | 453 | 07/1884 | 04/1930 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1933 | O2 | 454 | 07/1884 | 03/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1934 | O2 | 455 | 08/1884 | 04/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1935 | O2 | 456 | 08/1884 | 05/11/1953 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1936 | O2 | 457 | 09/1884 | 02/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1477 | P2 | 458 | 10/1884 | 12/1937 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1478 | P2 | 459 | 10/1884 | 05/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1479 | P2 | 460 | 11/1884 | 04/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1480 | P2 | 461 | 11/1884 | 06/1913 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1481 | P2 | 462 | 12/1884 | 02/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1482 | P2 | 463 | 01/1885 | 06/1935 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1483 | P2 | 464 | 06/1885 | 08/1932 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1484 | P2 | 465 | 07/1885 | 05/1930 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1485 | P2 | 466 | 08/1885 | 12/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1486 | P2 | 467 | 09/1885 | 01/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1487 | P2 | 468 | 10/1885 | 08/1936 |
GWR | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1488 | P2 | 469 | 11/1885 | 11/1937 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1937 | Q2 | 470 | 09/1886 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1938 | Q2 | 471 | 10/1886 | 07/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1939 | Q2 | 472 | 10/1886 | 11/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1940 | Q2 | 473 | 11/1886 | 11/04/1933 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1941 | Q2 | 474 | 11/1886 | 16/02/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1942 | Q2 | 475 | 12/1886 | 12/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1943 | Q2 | 476 | 01/1887 | 20/03/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1944 | Q2 | 477 | 01/1887 | 26/10/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1945 | Q2 | 478 | 02/1887 | 22/11/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1946 | Q2 | 479 | 03/1887 | 01/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1947 | Q2 | 480 | 03/1887 | 11/1938 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1948 | Q2 | 481 | 03/1887 | 18/08/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1949 | R2 | 482 | 02/1888 | 03/04/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1950 | R2 | 483 | 02/1888 | 11/06/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1951 | R2 | 484 | 03/1888 | 10/1937 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1952 | R2 | 485 | 03/1888 | 11/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1953 | R2 | 486 | 04/1888 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1954 | R2 | 487 | 05/1888 | 07/09/1944 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1955 | R2 | 488 | 05/1888 | 08/1939 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1956 | R2 | 489 | 06/1888 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1957 | R2 | 490 | 06/1888 | 09/04/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1958 | R2 | 491 | 07/1888 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1959 | R2 | 492 | 08/1888 | 11/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1960 | R2 | 493 | 09/1888 | 04/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1961 | T2 | 500 | 10/1889 | 09/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1962 | T2 | 501 | 10/1889 | 02/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1963 | T2 | 502 | 11/1889 | 18/01/1943 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1964 | T2 | 503 | 11/1889 | 29/02/1952 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1965 | T2 | 504 | 12/1889 | 25/01/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1966 | T2 | 505 | 12/1889 | 07/1939 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1967 | T2 | 506 | 01/1890 | 15/06/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1968 | T2 | 507 | 02/1890 | 17/09/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1969 | T2 | 508 | 02/1890 | 15/08/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1970 | T2 | 509 | 03/1890 | 07/1938 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1971 | T2 | 510 | 03/1890 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1972 | T2 | 511 | 06/1890 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1973 | V2 | 512 | 07/1890 | 02/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1974 | V2 | 513 | 07/1890 | 08/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1975 | V2 | 514 | 09/1890 | 09/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1976 | V2 | 515 | 09/1890 | 11/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1977 | V2 | 516 | 10/1890 | 02/1931 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1978 | V2 | 517 | 10/1890 | 02/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1979 | V2 | 518 | 11/1890 | 21/08/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1980 | V2 | 519 | 11/1890 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1981 | V2 | 520 | 12/1890 | 07/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1982 | V2 | 521 | 01/1891 | 01/1936 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1983 | V2 | 522 | 01/1891 | 12/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1984 | V2 | 523 | 02/1891 | 06/1928 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1985 | X2 | 527 | 02/1891 | 16/07/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1986 | X2 | 528 | 03/1891 | 10/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1987 | X2 | 529 | 03/1891 | 01/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1988 | X2 | 530 | 05/1891 | 08/01/1947 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1989 | X2 | 531 | 06/1891 | 25/09/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1990 | X2 | 532 | 06/1891 | 02/11/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1991 | X2 | 533 | 07/1891 | 26/01/1953 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1992 | X2 | 534 | 07/1891 | 03/1935 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1993 | X2 | 535 | 08/1891 | 19/04/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1994 | X2 | 536 | 08/1891 | 10/1938 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1995 | X2 | 537 | 09/1891 | 08/1930 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1996 | X2 | 538 | 10/1891 | 05/01/1953 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1997 | Y2 | 539 | 10/1891 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1998 | Y2 | 540 | 11/1891 | 17/11/1934 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1999 | Y2 | 541 | 11/1891 | 20/06/1946 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2000 | Y2 | 542 | 12/1891 | 29/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2001 | Y2 | 543 | 12/1891 | 13/08/1952 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2002 | Y2 | 544 | 01/1892 | 26/02/1952 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2003 | Y2 | 545 | 01/1892 | 05/1929 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 655 | A3 | 563 | 02/1892 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 767 | A3 | 564 | 02/1892 | 13/10/1934 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1741 | A3 | 565 | 03/1892 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1742 | A3 | 566 | 03/1892 | 27/02/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1743 | A3 | 567 | 04/1892 | 22/02/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1744 | A3 | 568 | 04/1892 | 07/1938 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1745 | A3 | 569 | 05/1892 | 23/08/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1746 | A3 | 570 | 06/1892 | 01/06/1946 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1747 | A3 | 571 | 06/1892 | 26/05/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1748 | A3 | 572 | 07/1892 | 02/02/1946 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1749 | A3 | 573 | 07/1892 | 18/10/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1750 | A3 | 574 | 08/1892 | 12/06/1946 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2004 | Y2 | 546 | 09/1892 | 30/01/1952 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2005 | Y2 | 547 | 09/1892 | 22/12/1944 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2006 | Y2 | 548 | 10/1892 | 02/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2007 | Y2 | 549 | 10/1892 | 01/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2008 | Y2 | 550 | 11/1892 | 03/03/1958 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1771 | B3 | 575 | 12/1892 | 01/1937 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1772 | B3 | 576 | 12/1892 | 03/1929 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1773 | B3 | 577 | 01/1893 | 16/03/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1774 | B3 | 578 | 02/1893 | 10/1932 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1775 | B3 | 579 | 02/1893 | 10/1938 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1776 | B3 | 580 | 03/1893 | 06/1938 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1777 | B3 | 581 | 03/1893 | 07/1941 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1778 | B3 | 582 | 04/1893 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1779 | B3 | 583 | 05/1893 | 13/01/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1780 | B3 | 584 | 05/1893 | 02/08/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1781 | B3 | 585 | 06/1893 | 04/1929 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1782 | B3 | 586 | 08/1893 | 03/11/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1783 | B3 | 587 | 09/1893 | 01/1940 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1784 | B3 | 588 | 10/1893 | 10/02/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1785 | B3 | 589 | 10/1893 | 02/09/1946 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1786 | B3 | 590 | 11/1893 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1787 | B3 | 591 | 11/1893 | 04/01/1947 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1788 | B3 | 592 | 02/1894 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2009 | Z2 | 551 | 04/1894 | 10/01/1951 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1789 | B3 | 593 | 05/1894 | 18/10/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2010 | Z2 | 552 | 05/1894 | 23/03/1953 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1790 | B3 | 594 | 06/1894 | 24/06/1946 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2011 | Z2 | 553 | 11/1894 | 18/08/1956 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2012 | Z2 | 554 | 11/1894 | 06/1958 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2013 | Z2 | 555 | 12/1894 | 30/05/1950 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2014 | Z2 | 556 | 12/1894 | 02/11/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2015 | Z2 | 557 | 01/1895 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2016 | Z2 | 558 | 02/1895 | 14/01/1952 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2017 | Z2 | 559 | 02/1895 | 08/03/1951 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2018 | Z2 | 560 | 03/1895 | 16/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2019 | Z2 | 561 | 03/1895 | 07/12/1949 |
GWR | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2020 | Z2 | 562 | 05/1895 | 12/1938 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3571 | C3 | 595 | 05/1895 | 10/1942 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3572 | C3 | 596 | 06/1895 | 10/1928 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3573 | C3 | 597 | 07/1895 | 19/12/1945 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3574 | C3 | 598 | 08/1895 | 23/12/1949 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3575 | C3 | 599 | 09/1895 | 21/10/1949 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3576 | C3 | 600 | 09/1895 | 06/1929 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3577 | C3 | 601 | 10/1895 | 13/05/1949 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3578 | C3 | 602 | 11/1895 | 28/07/1945 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3579 | C3 | 603 | 12/1895 | 09/1942 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2701 | E3 | 605 | 01/1896 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2702 | E3 | 606 | 02/1896 | 09/01/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2703 | E3 | 607 | 02/1896 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2704 | E3 | 608 | 03/1896 | 14/03/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2705 | E3 | 609 | 03/1896 | 10/02/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2706 | E3 | 610 | 04/1896 | 18/10/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2707 | E3 | 611 | 05/1896 | 15/07/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2708 | E3 | 612 | 06/1896 | 06/07/1949 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2709 | E3 | 613 | 06/1896 | 07/09/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2710 | E3 | 614 | 06/1896 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2711 | E3 | 615 | 07/1896 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2712 | E3 | 616 | 08/1896 | 28/03/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2713 | E3 | 617 | 09/1896 | 12/09/1949 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2714 | E3 | 618 | 09/1896 | 10/05/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2715 | E3 | 619 | 10/1896 | 17/07/1950 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2716 | E3 | 620 | 11/1896 | 0000 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2717 | E3 | 621 | 11/1896 | 21/10/1948 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2718 | E3 | 622 | 12/1896 | 19/10/1945 |
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2719 | E3 | 623 | 12/1896 | 06/11/1950 |
GWR | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3580 | C3 | 604 | 01/1897 | 29/12/1945 |
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2021 | 02/1897 | 01/06/1951 | ||
GWR | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2720 | E3 | 624 | 02/1897 | 03/11/1945 |
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2022 | 03/1897 | 06/12/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2023 | 04/1897 | 24/01/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2024 | 04/1897 | 03/1939 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2025 | 05/1897 | 29/05/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2026 | 05/1897 | 26/04/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2027 | 06/1897 | 04/02/1957 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2028 | 06/1897 | 09/1938 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2029 | 07/1897 | 25/11/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2030 | 08/1897 | 18/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2031 | 09/1897 | 16/01/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2032 | 10/1897 | 19/06/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2033 | 11/1897 | 22/03/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2034 | 11/1897 | 12/09/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2035 | 01/1898 | 18/03/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2036 | 01/1898 | 02/1939 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2037 | 01/1898 | 20/07/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2038 | 02/1898 | 20/04/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2039 | 02/1898 | 10/04/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2040 | 03/1898 | 08/10/1956 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2041 | 04/1898 | 31/03/1947 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2042 | 04/1898 | 20/04/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2043 | 05/1898 | 10/01/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2044 | 06/1898 | 30/07/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2045 | 06/1898 | 30/12/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2046 | 06/1898 | 16/06/1947 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2047 | 07/1898 | 16/12/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2048 | 08/1898 | 17/05/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2049 | 09/1898 | 08/11/1944 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2050 | 09/1898 | 10/10/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2051 | 10/1898 | 30/07/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2052 | 10/1898 | 31/05/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2053 | 11/1898 | 13/04/1954 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2054 | 12/1898 | 15/03/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2055 | 01/1899 | 20/01/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2056 | 01/1899 | 27/03/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2057 | 02/1899 | 09/1907 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2058 | 03/1899 | 17/09/1945 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2059 | 03/1899 | 07/11/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2060 | 04/1899 | 29/12/1954 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2061 | 04/1899 | 12/04/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2062 | 05/1899 | 08/1930 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2063 | 06/1899 | 07/05/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2064 | 06/1899 | 23/11/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2065 | 06/1899 | 29/11/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2066 | 07/1899 | 17/09/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2067 | 08/1899 | 13/11/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2068 | 08/1899 | 19/01/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2069 | 09/1899 | 13/04/1959 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2070 | 10/1899 | 31/08/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2071 | 10/1899 | 05/06/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2072 | 11/1899 | 30/07/1956 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2073 | 11/1899 | 18/06/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2074 | 12/1899 | 21/05/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2075 | 01/1900 | 15/03/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2076 | 02/1900 | 02/10/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2077 | 02/1900 | 28/02/1947 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2078 | 03/1900 | 02/12/1944 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2079 | 06/1900 | 20/11/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2080 | 09/1900 | 18/03/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2081 | 10/1900 | 18/10/1954 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2082 | 10/1900 | 13/06/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2083 | 11/1900 | 09/11/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2084 | 11/1900 | 16/02/1946 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2085 | 11/1900 | 24/08/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2086 | 01/1901 | 27/05/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2087 | 01/1901 | 02/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2088 | 03/1901 | 31/08/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2089 | 03/1901 | 03/09/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2090 | 03/1901 | 30/03/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2091 | 04/1901 | 24/04/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2092 | 04/1901 | 24/08/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2093 | 05/1901 | 26/01/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2094 | 05/1901 | 23/05/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2095 | 06/1901 | 26/04/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2096 | 07/1901 | 08/05/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2097 | 07/1901 | 30/03/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2098 | 08/1901 | 07/05/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2099 | 09/1901 | 01/06/1954 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2100 | 11/1901 | 11/06/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2101 | 01/1902 | 12/03/1956 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2102 | 01/1902 | 28/11/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2103 | 02/1902 | 26/03/1946 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2104 | 03/1902 | 11/05/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2105 | 04/1902 | 03/10/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2106 | 04/1902 | 26/08/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2107 | 05/1902 | 05/06/1956 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2108 | 05/1902 | 29/12/1954 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2109 | 06/1902 | 26/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2110 | 07/1902 | 21/07/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2111 | 07/1902 | 16/03/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2112 | 08/1902 | 13/09/1954 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2113 | 09/1902 | 20/03/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2114 | 09/1902 | 23/12/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2115 | 10/1902 | 23/06/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2116 | 10/1902 | 06/02/1946 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2117 | 11/1902 | 25/06/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2118 | 11/1902 | 04/04/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2119 | 12/1902 | 15/08/1946 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2120 | 01/1903 | 02/09/1946 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2121 | 02/1903 | 02/06/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2122 | 03/1903 | 19/11/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2123 | 03/1903 | 06/10/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2124 | 05/1903 | 03/07/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2125 | 05/1903 | 31/08/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2126 | 05/1903 | 0000 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2127 | 05/1903 | 19/09/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2128 | 06/1903 | 01/1911 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2129 | 07/1903 | 23/03/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2130 | 07/1903 | 31/05/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2131 | 08/1903 | 15/11/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2132 | 09/1903 | 11/08/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2133 | 09/1903 | 11/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2134 | 10/1903 | 08/05/1957 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2135 | 10/1903 | 09/01/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2136 | 11/1903 | 23/04/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2137 | 11/1903 | 12/12/1949 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2138 | 12/1903 | 12/05/1956 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2139 | 01/1904 | 24/02/1945 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2140 | 01/1904 | 17/05/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2141 | 03/1904 | 16/10/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2142 | 03/1904 | 14/02/1947 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2143 | 04/1904 | 26/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2144 | 05/1904 | 26/05/1955 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2145 | 05/1904 | 30/10/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2146 | 06/1904 | 25/03/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2147 | 06/1904 | 07/03/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2148 | 07/1904 | 04/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2149 | 08/1904 | 23/12/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2150 | 09/1904 | 03/01/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2151 | 09/1904 | 19/05/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2152 | 10/1904 | 22/11/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2153 | 10/1904 | 11/12/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2154 | 11/1904 | 05/02/1952 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2155 | 11/1904 | 01/11/1950 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2156 | 12/1904 | 09/02/1953 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2157 | 01/1905 | 13/04/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2158 | 02/1905 | 10/11/1945 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2159 | 02/1905 | 07/08/1951 | ||
GWR | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2160 | 03/1905 | 04/03/1957 | ||
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3101 | Sdn147 | 765 | 07/1905 | 25/10/1954 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3102 | Sdn147 | 766 | 07/1905 | 14/12/1949 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3103 | Sdn147 | 767 | 10/1905 | 20/01/1953 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3104 | Sdn147 | 768 | 12/1905 | 26/03/1952 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3105 | Sdn147 | 769 | 01/1906 | 12/09/1955 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3106 | Sdn147 | 770 | 02/1906 | 12/09/1955 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3107 | Sdn147 | 771 | 04/1906 | 18/03/1953 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3108 | Sdn147 | 772 | 05/1906 | 15/01/1953 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3109 | Sdn147 | 773 | 06/1906 | 05/02/1951 |
GWR | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3110 | Sdn147 | 774 | 06/1906 | 12/09/1955 |
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2161 | 10/1906 | 24/08/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2162 | 11/1906 | 04/03/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2163 | 12/1906 | 08/10/1951 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2164 | 30/01/1907 | 29/01/1951 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2165 | 02/1907 | 25/06/1952 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2166 | 02/1907 | 07/10/1957 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2167 | 04/1907 | 19/03/1955 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2168 | 05/1907 | 10/10/1963 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2169 | 06/1907 | 05/10/1959 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2170 | 06/1907 | 05/06/1951 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2171 | 07/1907 | 02/03/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2172 | 09/1907 | 16/11/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2173 | 09/1907 | 10/02/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2174 | 10/1907 | 27/10/1950 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2175 | 11/1907 | 14/02/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2176 | 12/1907 | 16/04/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2177 | 01/1908 | 11/12/1952 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2178 | 02/1908 | 13/02/1953 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2179 | 03/1908 | 01/10/1952 | ||
GWR | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 2180 | 04/1908 | 06/02/1959 |