Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 101 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3614 Week
» 23907 Month
» 201811 Year
» 1867187 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Ashford Works



Order Details for Lot No: AS/3413
Builder Ashford Works
Order Date 1948
For 15 Diesel locomotives
Class 12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
15211   12 BR   0-6-0 02/04/1949 31/12/1971  
15212   12 BR   0-6-0 09/04/1949 31/12/1971  
15213   12 BR   0-6-0 16/04/1949 03/11/1968  
15214   12 BR   0-6-0 07/05/1949 10/1971  
15215   12 BR   0-6-0 07/05/1949 03/1968  
15216   12 BR   0-6-0 04/06/1949 28/04/1969  
15217   12 BR   0-6-0 18/06/1949 08/1970  
15218   12 BR   0-6-0 02/07/1949 31/01/1970  
15219   12 BR   0-6-0 09/07/1949 31/10/1971  
15220   12 BR   0-6-0 23/07/1949 31/10/1971  
15221   12 BR   0-6-0 20/08/1949 31/10/1971  
15222   12 BR   0-6-0 03/09/1949 31/10/1971  
15223   12 BR   0-6-0 01/10/1949 09/06/1969  
15224   12 BR   0-6-0 22/10/1949 31/10/1971  
15225   12 BR   0-6-0 09/11/1949 31/10/1971