Manufacturer: Armstrong Whitworth
Builder | Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Date | 1919 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2253 | 1 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 11/1919 | 05/06/1966 | |
2262 | 10 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 07/06/1965 | |
2263 | 11 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1920 | 05/02/1967 | |
2264 | 12 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1920 | 05/06/1966 | |
2265 | 13 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1920 | 18/05/1964 | |
2266 | 14 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1920 | 16/11/1964 | |
2267 | 15 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1920 | 13/01/1964 | |
2268 | 16 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1920 | 15/04/1963 | |
2269 | 17 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 04/1920 | 22/06/1967 | |
2270 | 18 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 04/1920 | 14/06/1965 | |
2271 | 19 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 04/1920 | 29/04/1963 | |
2254 | 2 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 12/1919 | 06/04/1965 | |
2272 | 20 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 01/07/1967 | |
2273 | 21 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 29/04/1963 | |
2274 | 22 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 07/08/1967 | |
2275 | 23 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 17/05/1965 | |
2276 | 24 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 30/09/1963 | |
2277 | 25 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 25/09/1963 | |
2278 | 26 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1920 | 05/06/1966 | |
2279 | 27 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1920 | 24/04/1967 | |
2280 | 28 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1920 | 05/06/1967 | |
2281 | 29 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1920 | 12/11/1964 | |
2255 | 3 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 12/1919 | 11/07/1966 | |
2282 | 30 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1920 | 07/04/1964 | |
2283 | 31 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1920 | 31/12/1966 | |
2284 | 32 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1920 | 23/12/1963 | |
2285 | 33 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1920 | 15/07/1963 | |
2286 | 34 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1920 | 18/10/1965 | |
2287 | 35 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 08/1920 | 17/05/1965 | |
2288 | 36 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 09/1920 | 26/06/1966 | |
2289 | 37 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 09/1920 | 05/06/1966 | |
2290 | 38 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 10/1920 | 29/04/1963 | |
2291 | 39 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 10/1920 | 08/11/1963 | |
2256 | 4 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 23/01/1967 | |
2292 | 40 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 10/1920 | 15/07/1963 | |
2293 | 41 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 11/1920 | 31/12/1966 | |
2294 | 42 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 11/1920 | 01/01/1964 | |
2295 | 43 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 11/1920 | 29/04/1963 | |
2296 | 44 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 12/1920 | 02/10/1966 | |
2297 | 45 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 12/1920 | 05/06/1966 | |
2298 | 46 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 12/1920 | 22/06/1967 | |
2299 | 47 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 01/1921 | 15/12/1964 | |
2300 | 48 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 01/1921 | 18/12/1961 | |
2301 | 49 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1921 | 01/07/1967 | |
2257 | 5 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 17/05/1965 | |
2302 | 50 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 03/1921 | 30/10/1966 | |
2258 | 6 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 15/04/1964 | |
2259 | 7 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 15/07/1963 | |
2260 | 8 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 13/02/1966 | |
2261 | 9 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 02/1920 | 15/07/1963 |