Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 452 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6063 Week
» 17109 Month
» 17109 Year
» 1682485 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/9655
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 1907
For 4 Steam locomotives
Class S1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1170 5002 S1 GCR Robinson 0-8-4T 12/1907 06/01/1956  
1171 5003 S1 GCR Robinson 0-8-4T 12/1907 01/01/1957  
1172 5004 S1 GCR Robinson 0-8-4T 01/1908 13/01/1956  
1173 5005 S1 GCR Robinson 0-8-4T 01/1908 08/03/1954